Rite Aid Corporation et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., and Rite Aid Corporation
Defendant: Endo International PLC, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp., Novartis AG, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11835
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL COORDINATION: ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND ORDERED THAT: The Rite Aid Action is hereby coordinated with the Coordinated Actions for purposes of discovery and pretrial proceedings to the extent practicable, and the files of such actions shall be maintained in one file under Docket No. 18-cv-04361. The Complaint in the Rite Aid Action shall be deemed served on Defendants as of the date of entry of this Order. The Rite Aid Action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice as against ONLY Novartis Corporation, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Endo International plc, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (As further set forth in this stipulation) Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novartis Corporation, Endo International PLC and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2019) (ne)
December 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 19, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-04361-AKH. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 18cv4361. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander John Egervary. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-4361. Document filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,.(Egervary, Alexander)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Egervary, Alexander)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novartis AG, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16066963)Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,, Rite Aid Corporation.(Egervary, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rite Aid Corporation et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,
Represented By: Alexander John Egervary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Alexander John Egervary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?