Mawra et al. v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Ronald Natole, Peter Morris, Kevin McDevitt, Lisa Merkle, Steven McAllister, Sarah Nikitenko, Angelo Passanante, John Pasqualicchio, Eva Murphy, Igor Nikitenko, Felix Padilla, Sharon Mitchell, Jennifer D Prewitt, Sheilisa McNeal, Juan Montoya, Martha Meade, Rosa Olivencia, Paul R Modafferi, Milton McCormack, Timothy Myles, Daniel McColgan, Ryan E O'Dell, Estate of Chad Milosevich, Leoline Morris, Farooq Muhammad, Karen Porter, Denise Pasqualicchio, Patricia Oleszko, Alisa McCoy, Dulce Amada Pena, Lana Mitchell, Lois McNally, Gwendolyn Pierce, David Morales, Debbie McColgan, Leda Nasse, Jeffrey McClough, Scott W O'Connell, Rose McNally, Thomas Pickarski, Natalie Nurse, Michael Melia, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Gary Meade, Mary Passanante, Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, Estate of Michael Purdy, Steven Mitchell, Lori Morgan, Michael Perry, Lauren Newman, Rosa Miranda, Ricardo Montero, Francine Scotto-Martino, Dennis McGunagle, Jerome Mitchell, Vittoria F McGuckin, Robert McGuckin, Estate of Scott Moore, Estate of John Anthony Nardino, Estate of Thomas Madden, Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, Edda Padilla, Partick Mullooly, Frank Palazzo, Heather O'Dell, Sheryl McClough, Tricia Moretti, Miguel Pena, Carmela Modafferi, Michael Murphy, Jyoti Zaveri, James Prewitt, Barbara C Mawra, Gabriele O'Connell, Michael McNally, Thomas Pournaras, John Pappas, Ira Menkes, Joan O'Brian, Bonnie Miles, Thomas Miller, Joanne Mifsud, Ashia Muhammad, John Steven Murphy, Moshe Portnoy, Thomas McCoy, Frances D Pennington, Erin Perry, Michael Nichols, Maryann Prato, John Mifsud, Estate of Desmond Townsend, Kevin Murphy, Richard Morris, Thomas Pennington, Estate of Edward Mikoleski, Sean Tullo, Joseph P Mawra, Harry Nasse, Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually, Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually, Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually, Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually, Patrick Mullooly, Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually, Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually, Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually, Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually, Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually and Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11839
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (pc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually, Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually, Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually, Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually, Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually, Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually, Barbara C Mawra, Joseph P Mawra, Steven McAllister, Jeffrey McClough, Sheryl McClough, Daniel McColgan, Debbie McColgan, Milton McCormack, Alisa McCoy, Thomas McCoy, Kevin McDevitt, Robert McGuckin, Vittoria F McGuckin, Dennis McGunagle, Lois McNally, Michael McNally, Rose McNally, Sheilisa McNeal, Gary Meade, Martha Meade, Michael Melia, Ira Menkes, Lisa Merkle, Joanne Mifsud, John Mifsud, Bonnie Miles, Thomas Miller, Rosa Miranda, Jerome Mitchell, Lana Mitchell, Sharon Mitchell, Steven Mitchell, Carmela Modafferi, Paul R Modafferi, Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually, Ricardo Montero, Juan Montoya, David Morales, Tricia Moretti, Lori Morgan, Leoline Morris, Peter Morris, Richard Morris, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Ashia Muhammad, Farooq Muhammad, Patrick Mullooly, Eva Murphy, John Steven Murphy, Kevin Murphy, Michael Murphy, Timothy Myles, Harry Nasse, Leda Nasse, Ronald Natole, Lauren Newman, Michael Nichols, Igor Nikitenko, Sarah Nikitenko, Natalie Nurse, Joan O'Brian, Gabriele O'Connell, Scott W O'Connell, Heather O'Dell, Ryan E O'Dell, Patricia Oleszko, Rosa Olivencia, Edda Padilla, Felix Padilla, Frank Palazzo, John Pappas, Denise Pasqualicchio, John Pasqualicchio, Angelo Passanante, Mary Passanante, Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually, Dulce Amada Pena, Miguel Pena, Frances D Pennington, Thomas Pennington, Erin Perry, Michael Perry, Thomas Pickarski, Gwendolyn Pierce, Karen Porter, Moshe Portnoy, Thomas Pournaras, Maryann Prato, James Prewitt, Jennifer D Prewitt, Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually, Francine Scotto-Martino, Sean Tullo, Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually, Jyoti Zaveri. (Hansen, Daniel)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant Name Error; Defendant name as to whom the summons is being requested on PDF must be clear. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually, Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually, Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually, Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually, Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually, Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually, Barbara C Mawra, Joseph P Mawra, Steven McAllister, Jeffrey McClough, Sheryl McClough, Daniel McColgan, Debbie McColgan, Milton McCormack, Alisa McCoy, Thomas McCoy, Kevin McDevitt, Robert McGuckin, Vittoria F McGuckin, Dennis McGunagle, Lois McNally, Michael McNally, Rose McNally, Sheilisa McNeal, Gary Meade, Martha Meade, Michael Melia, Ira Menkes, Lisa Merkle, Joanne Mifsud, John Mifsud, Bonnie Miles, Thomas Miller, Rosa Miranda, Jerome Mitchell, Lana Mitchell, Sharon Mitchell, Steven Mitchell, Carmela Modafferi, Paul R Modafferi, Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually, Ricardo Montero, Juan Montoya, David Morales, Tricia Moretti, Lori Morgan, Leoline Morris, Peter Morris, Richard Morris, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Ashia Muhammad, Farooq Muhammad, Patrick Mullooly, Eva Murphy, John Steven Murphy, Kevin Murphy, Michael Murphy, Timothy Myles, Harry Nasse, Leda Nasse, Ronald Natole, Lauren Newman, Michael Nichols, Igor Nikitenko, Sarah Nikitenko, Natalie Nurse, Joan O'Brian, Gabriele O'Connell, Scott W O'Connell, Heather O'Dell, Ryan E O'Dell, Patricia Oleszko, Rosa Olivencia, Edda Padilla, Felix Padilla, Frank Palazzo, John Pappas, Denise Pasqualicchio, John Pasqualicchio, Angelo Passanante, Mary Passanante, Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually, Dulce Amada Pena, Miguel Pena, Frances D Pennington, Thomas Pennington, Erin Perry, Michael Perry, Thomas Pickarski, Gwendolyn Pierce, Karen Porter, Moshe Portnoy, Thomas Pournaras, Maryann Prato, James Prewitt, Jennifer D Prewitt, Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually, Francine Scotto-Martino, Sean Tullo, Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually, Jyoti Zaveri. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/26/2018 (dnh).
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Daniel J. Hansen dated 12/21/2018 re: Related action. Document filed by Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually, Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually, Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually, Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually, Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually, Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually, Barbara C Mawra, Joseph P Mawra, Steven McAllister, Jeffrey McClough, Sheryl McClough, Daniel McColgan, Debbie McColgan, Milton McCormack, Alisa McCoy, Thomas McCoy, Kevin McDevitt, Robert McGuckin, Vittoria F McGuckin, Dennis McGunagle, Lois McNally, Michael McNally, Rose McNally, Sheilisa McNeal, Gary Meade, Martha Meade, Michael Melia, Ira Menkes, Lisa Merkle, Joanne Mifsud, John Mifsud, Bonnie Miles, Thomas Miller, Rosa Miranda, Jerome Mitchell, Lana Mitchell, Sharon Mitchell, Steven Mitchell, Carmela Modafferi, Paul R Modafferi, Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually, Ricardo Montero, Juan Montoya, David Morales, Tricia Moretti, Lori Morgan, Leoline Morris, Peter Morris, Richard Morris, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Ashia Muhammad, Farooq Muhammad, Patrick Mullooly, Eva Murphy, John Steven Murphy, Kevin Murphy, Michael Murphy, Timothy Myles, Harry Nasse, Leda Nasse, Ronald Natole, Lauren Newman, Michael Nichols, Igor Nikitenko, Sarah Nikitenko, Natalie Nurse, Joan O'Brian, Gabriele O'Connell, Scott W O'Connell, Heather O'Dell, Ryan E O'Dell, Patricia Oleszko, Rosa Olivencia, Edda Padilla, Felix Padilla, Frank Palazzo, John Pappas, Denise Pasqualicchio, John Pasqualicchio, Angelo Passanante, Mary Passanante, Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually, Dulce Amada Pena, Miguel Pena, Frances D Pennington, Thomas Pennington, Erin Perry, Michael Perry, Thomas Pickarski, Gwendolyn Pierce, Karen Porter, Moshe Portnoy, Thomas Pournaras, Maryann Prato, James Prewitt, Jennifer D Prewitt, Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually, Francine Scotto-Martino, Sean Tullo, Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually, Jyoti Zaveri.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Daniel J. Hansen dated 12/21/2018 re: Related action. Document filed by Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually, Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually, Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually, Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually, Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually, Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually, Barbara C Mawra, Joseph P Mawra, Steven McAllister, Jeffrey McClough, Sheryl McClough, Daniel McColgan, Debbie McColgan, Milton McCormack, Alisa McCoy, Thomas McCoy, Kevin McDevitt, Robert McGuckin, Vittoria F McGuckin, Dennis McGunagle, Lois McNally, Michael McNally, Rose McNally, Sheilisa McNeal, Gary Meade, Martha Meade, Michael Melia, Ira Menkes, Lisa Merkle, Joanne Mifsud, John Mifsud, Bonnie Miles, Thomas Miller, Rosa Miranda, Jerome Mitchell, Lana Mitchell, Sharon Mitchell, Steven Mitchell, Carmela Modafferi, Paul R Modafferi, Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually, Ricardo Montero, Juan Montoya, David Morales, Tricia Moretti, Lori Morgan, Leoline Morris, Peter Morris, Richard Morris, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Ashia Muhammad, Farooq Muhammad, Patrick Mullooly, Eva Murphy, John Steven Murphy, Kevin Murphy, Michael Murphy, Timothy Myles, Harry Nasse, Leda Nasse, Ronald Natole, Lauren Newman, Michael Nichols, Igor Nikitenko, Sarah Nikitenko, Natalie Nurse, Joan O'Brian, Gabriele O'Connell, Scott W O'Connell, Heather O'Dell, Ryan E O'Dell, Patricia Oleszko, Rosa Olivencia, Edda Padilla, Felix Padilla, Frank Palazzo, John Pappas, Denise Pasqualicchio, John Pasqualicchio, Angelo Passanante, Mary Passanante, Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually, Dulce Amada Pena, Miguel Pena, Frances D Pennington, Thomas Pennington, Erin Perry, Michael Perry, Thomas Pickarski, Gwendolyn Pierce, Karen Porter, Moshe Portnoy, Thomas Pournaras, Maryann Prato, James Prewitt, Jennifer D Prewitt, Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually, Francine Scotto-Martino, Sean Tullo, Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually, Jyoti Zaveri.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually, Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually, Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually, Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually, Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually, Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually, Barbara C Mawra, Joseph P Mawra, Steven McAllister, Jeffrey McClough, Sheryl McClough, Daniel McColgan, Debbie McColgan, Milton McCormack, Alisa McCoy, Thomas McCoy, Kevin McDevitt, Robert McGuckin, Vittoria F McGuckin, Dennis McGunagle, Lois McNally, Michael McNally, Rose McNally, Sheilisa McNeal, Gary Meade, Martha Meade, Michael Melia, Ira Menkes, Lisa Merkle, Joanne Mifsud, John Mifsud, Bonnie Miles, Thomas Miller, Rosa Miranda, Jerome Mitchell, Lana Mitchell, Sharon Mitchell, Steven Mitchell, Carmela Modafferi, Paul R Modafferi, Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually, Ricardo Montero, Juan Montoya, David Morales, Tricia Moretti, Lori Morgan, Leoline Morris, Peter Morris, Richard Morris, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Ashia Muhammad, Farooq Muhammad, Patrick Mullooly, Eva Murphy, John Steven Murphy, Kevin Murphy, Michael Murphy, Timothy Myles, Harry Nasse, Leda Nasse, Ronald Natole, Lauren Newman, Michael Nichols, Igor Nikitenko, Sarah Nikitenko, Natalie Nurse, Joan O'Brian, Gabriele O'Connell, Scott W O'Connell, Heather O'Dell, Ryan E O'Dell, Patricia Oleszko, Rosa Olivencia, Edda Padilla, Felix Padilla, Frank Palazzo, John Pappas, Denise Pasqualicchio, John Pasqualicchio, Angelo Passanante, Mary Passanante, Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually, Dulce Amada Pena, Miguel Pena, Frances D Pennington, Thomas Pennington, Erin Perry, Michael Perry, Thomas Pickarski, Gwendolyn Pierce, Karen Porter, Moshe Portnoy, Thomas Pournaras, Maryann Prato, James Prewitt, Jennifer D Prewitt, Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually, Francine Scotto-Martino, Sean Tullo, Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually, Jyoti Zaveri. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/26/2018 (dnh).
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Michael Murphy, John Mifsud, Kevin McDevitt, Jeffrey McClough, Denise Pasqualicchio, Sharon Mitchell, Steven Mitchell, Lauren Newman, Moshe Portnoy, Tricia Moretti, Edda Padilla, Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually, Gary Meade, Sarah Nikitenko, Gabriele O'Connell, Robert McGuckin, Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually, Juan Montoya, Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually, Francine Scotto-Martino, Leda Nasse, Sheryl McClough, Frank Palazzo, Thomas Miller, Karen Porter, Rose McNally, Maryann Prato, Paul R Modafferi, John Pappas, Thomas McCoy, Sheilisa McNeal, Thomas Pickarski, Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually, Lisa Merkle, David Morales, Sean Tullo, Felix Padilla, Joseph P Mawra, Thomas Pournaras, Dennis McGunagle, Milton McCormack, Steven McAllister, Lori Morgan, Joanne Mifsud, Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually, Vittoria F McGuckin, Bonnie Miles, Barbara C Mawra, Patrick Mullooly, Erin Perry, Angelo Passanante, John Pasqualicchio, Ashia Muhammad, Harry Nasse, Carmela Modafferi, Ricardo Montero, Heather O'Dell, Alisa McCoy, Thomas Pennington, Debbie McColgan, Timothy Myles, Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually, Ryan E O'Dell, Scott W O'Connell, Daniel McColgan, Michael Melia, Igor Nikitenko, Jennifer D Prewitt, Farooq Muhammad, Michael McNally, Dulce Amada Pena, Eva Murphy, Rosa Olivencia, Frances D Pennington, Peter Morris, Richard Morris, Lois McNally, Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually, Kevin Murphy, Patricia Oleszko, John Steven Murphy, Rosa Miranda, Lana Mitchell, Miguel Pena, Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually, Leoline Morris, Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually, James Prewitt, Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually, Ronald Natole, Joan O'Brian, Martha Meade, Michael Nichols, Gwendolyn Pierce, Natalie Nurse, Mary Passanante, Jerome Mitchell, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Ira Menkes, Michael Perry. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually, Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually, Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually, Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually, Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually, Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually, Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually, Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually, Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually, Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually added. Party added pursuant to #4 Complaint,,,,,,.Document filed by Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually, Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually, Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually, Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually, Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually, Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually, Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually, Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually, Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually, Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually. Related document: #4 Complaint,,,,,,.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MD1570. Document filed by Barbara C Mawra, Joseph P Mawra, Steven McAllister, Jeffrey McClough, Sheryl McClough, Daniel McColgan, Debbie McColgan, Milton McCormack, Alisa McCoy, Thomas McCoy, Kevin McDevitt, Robert McGuckin, Vittoria F McGuckin, Dennis McGunagle, Lois McNally, Michael McNally, Rose McNally, Sheilisa McNeal, Gary Meade, Martha Meade, Michael Melia, Ira Menkes, Lisa Merkle, Joanne Mifsud, John Mifsud, Bonnie Miles, Thomas Miller, Rosa Miranda, Jerome Mitchell, Lana Mitchell, Sharon Mitchell, Steven Mitchell, Carmela Modafferi, Paul R Modafferi, Ricardo Montero, Juan Montoya, David Morales, Tricia Moretti, Lori Morgan, Leoline Morris, Peter Morris, Richard Morris, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Ashia Muhammad, Farooq Muhammad, Patrick Mullooly, Eva Murphy, John Steven Murphy, Kevin Murphy, Michael Murphy, Timothy Myles, Harry Nasse, Leda Nasse, Ronald Natole, Lauren Newman, Michael Nichols, Igor Nikitenko, Sarah Nikitenko, Natalie Nurse, Joan O'Brian, Gabriele O'Connell, Scott W O'Connell, Heather O'Dell, Ryan E O'Dell, Patricia Oleszko, Rosa Olivencia, Edda Padilla, Felix Padilla, Frank Palazzo, John Pappas, Denise Pasqualicchio, John Pasqualicchio, Angelo Passanante, Mary Passanante, Dulce Amada Pena, Miguel Pena, Frances D Pennington, Thomas Pennington, Erin Perry, Michael Perry, Thomas Pickarski, Gwendolyn Pierce, Karen Porter, Moshe Portnoy, Thomas Pournaras, Maryann Prato, James Prewitt, Jennifer D Prewitt, Francine Scotto-Martino, Sean Tullo, Jyoti Zaveri.(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/20/2018 (jgo).
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Michael Murphy, John Mifsud, Kevin McDevitt, Jeffrey McClough, Denise Pasqualicchio, Sharon Mitchell, Steven Mitchell, Lauren Newman, Moshe Portnoy, Tricia Moretti, Edda Padilla, Gary Meade, Sarah Nikitenko, Gabriele O'Connell, Robert McGuckin, Juan Montoya, Francine Scotto-Martino, Leda Nasse, Sheryl McClough, Frank Palazzo, Thomas Miller, Karen Porter, Rose McNally, Maryann Prato, Paul R Modafferi, John Pappas, Thomas McCoy, Sheilisa McNeal, Thomas Pickarski, Lisa Merkle, David Morales, Sean Tullo, Felix Padilla, Joseph P Mawra, Thomas Pournaras, Dennis McGunagle, Steven McAllister, Milton McCormack, Lori Morgan, Joanne Mifsud, Vittoria F McGuckin, Bonnie Miles, Barbara C Mawra, Patrick Mullooly, Erin Perry, Angelo Passanante, John Pasqualicchio, Ashia Muhammad, Harry Nasse, Carmela Modafferi, Ricardo Montero, Alisa McCoy, Heather O'Dell, Thomas Pennington, Debbie McColgan, Timothy Myles, Ryan E O'Dell, Scott W O'Connell, Daniel McColgan, Michael Melia, Igor Nikitenko, Jennifer D Prewitt, Farooq Muhammad, Michael McNally, Dulce Amada Pena, Eva Murphy, Rosa Olivencia, Frances D Pennington, Peter Morris, Richard Morris, Lois McNally, Kevin Murphy, Patricia Oleszko, John Steven Murphy, Lana Mitchell, Rosa Miranda, Miguel Pena, Leoline Morris, James Prewitt, Ronald Natole, Martha Meade, Michael Nichols, Joan O'Brian, Gwendolyn Pierce, Natalie Nurse, Mary Passanante, Jerome Mitchell, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Ira Menkes, Michael Perry. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/20/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Estate of Chad Milosevich, Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, Estate of Desmond Townsend, Estate of Edward Mikoleski, Estate of John Anthony Nardino, Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, Estate of Michael Purdy, Estate of Scott Moore, Estate of Thomas Madden. The parties were added to the case in error. (pc)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Partick Mullooly. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The office which the case is to be assigned was not selected. (pc)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Add each party to CM ECF with the different capacities for each in the party text box; Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased; Patricia McCarthy, individually ;Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased; Monica Mikoleski, individually ;Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased; Jeffrey Milosevich, individually ; Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased; Judith Morris, individually ; Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased, Caroline Nardino, individually ; Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased, Richard Nemickas, individually ; Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased Kristy Parrella, individually ; Yvette Parson, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased, Yvette Parsons, individually ; Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased Kerri Purdy, individually. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1570. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MD1570. Document filed by Barbara C Mawra.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/18/2018 (pc).
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16067609)Document filed by Barbara C Mawra. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/18/2018 (pc).
December 17, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Karen Porter, Jennifer D Prewitt, Moshe Portnoy, Michael Perry, Thomas Pickarski, Sean Tullo, Francine Scotto-Martino, Estate of Michael Purdy, Jyoti Zaveri, Maryann Prato, Gwendolyn Pierce, Thomas Pournaras, James Prewitt added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Karen Porter, Jennifer D Prewitt, Moshe Portnoy, Michael Perry, Thomas Pickarski, Sean Tullo, Francine Scotto-Martino, Estate of Michael Purdy, Jyoti Zaveri, Maryann Prato, Gwendolyn Pierce, Thomas Pournaras, James Prewitt. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Lauren Newman, Ricardo Montero, Sarah Nikitenko, Lori Morgan, John Pasqualicchio, Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, Juan Montoya, Ronald Natole, Miguel Pena, Natalie Nurse, Harry Nasse, Steven Mitchell, Frances D Pennington, John Pappas, Estate of John Anthony Nardino, Carmela Modafferi, Igor Nikitenko, Felix Padilla, Erin Perry, Denise Pasqualicchio, Thomas Pennington, Kevin Murphy, Peter Morris, Leoline Morris, Heather O'Dell, Richard Morris, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Timothy Myles, Angelo Passanante, David Morales, Eva Murphy, Estate of Desmond Townsend, Ashia Muhammad, Joan O'Brian, Leda Nasse, Rosa Olivencia, Frank Palazzo, John Steven Murphy, Estate of Thomas Madden, Patricia Oleszko, Michael Nichols, Edda Padilla, Mary Passanante, Partick Mullooly, Ryan E O'Dell, Michael Murphy, Farooq Muhammad, Paul R Modafferi, Estate of Scott Moore, Dulce Amada Pena, Tricia Moretti, Gabriele O'Connell, Scott W O'Connell added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Lauren Newman, Ricardo Montero, Sarah Nikitenko, Lori Morgan, John Pasqualicchio, Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, Juan Montoya, Ronald Natole, Miguel Pena, Natalie Nurse, Harry Nasse, Steven Mitchell, Frances D Pennington, John Pappas, Estate of John Anthony Nardino, Carmela Modafferi, Igor Nikitenko, Felix Padilla, Erin Perry, Denise Pasqualicchio, Thomas Pennington, Kevin Murphy, Peter Morris, Leoline Morris, Heather O'Dell, Richard Morris, Milivoj Mrakovcic, Timothy Myles, Angelo Passanante, David Morales, Eva Murphy, Estate of Desmond Townsend, Ashia Muhammad, Joan O'Brian, Leda Nasse, Rosa Olivencia, Frank Palazzo, John Steven Murphy, Estate of Thomas Madden, Patricia Oleszko, Michael Nichols, Edda Padilla, Mary Passanante, Partick Mullooly, Ryan E O'Dell, Michael Murphy, Farooq Muhammad, Paul R Modafferi, Estate of Scott Moore, Dulce Amada Pena, Tricia Moretti, Gabriele O'Connell, Scott W O'Connell. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Rose McNally, Lana Mitchell, Dennis McGunagle, Bonnie Miles, Joanne Mifsud, Jeffrey McClough, Rosa Miranda, Alisa McCoy, Estate of Edward Mikoleski, Sheilisa McNeal, Sheryl McClough, John Mifsud, Thomas Miller, Jerome Mitchell, Lisa Merkle, Joseph P Mawra, Ira Menkes, Steven McAllister, Estate of Chad Milosevich, Michael McNally, Martha Meade, Lois McNally, Gary Meade, Robert McGuckin, Daniel McColgan, Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, Kevin McDevitt, Thomas McCoy, Vittoria F McGuckin, Michael Melia, Sharon Mitchell, Milton McCormack, Debbie McColgan added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Rose McNally, Lana Mitchell, Dennis McGunagle, Bonnie Miles, Joanne Mifsud, Jeffrey McClough, Rosa Miranda, Alisa McCoy, Estate of Edward Mikoleski, Sheilisa McNeal, Sheryl McClough, John Mifsud, Thomas Miller, Jerome Mitchell, Lisa Merkle, Joseph P Mawra, Ira Menkes, Steven McAllister, Estate of Chad Milosevich, Michael McNally, Martha Meade, Lois McNally, Gary Meade, Robert McGuckin, Daniel McColgan, Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, Kevin McDevitt, Thomas McCoy, Vittoria F McGuckin, Michael Melia, Sharon Mitchell, Milton McCormack, Debbie McColgan. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mawra et al. v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Natole
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Morris
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McDevitt
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Merkle
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven McAllister
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Nikitenko
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Passanante
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pasqualicchio
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Murphy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Nikitenko
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Padilla
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer D Prewitt
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheilisa McNeal
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Montoya
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Meade
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Olivencia
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul R Modafferi
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton McCormack
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Myles
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McColgan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan E O'Dell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Chad Milosevich
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leoline Morris
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farooq Muhammad
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Porter
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Pasqualicchio
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Oleszko
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa McCoy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dulce Amada Pena
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois McNally
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Pierce
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Morales
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie McColgan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leda Nasse
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey McClough
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott W O'Connell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose McNally
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pickarski
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Nurse
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Melia
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milivoj Mrakovcic
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Meade
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Passanante
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Kestusis Nemickas
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Michael Purdy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Morgan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Perry
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Newman
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Miranda
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Montero
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Scotto-Martino
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis McGunagle
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vittoria F McGuckin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McGuckin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Scott Moore
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of John Anthony Nardino
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Thomas Madden
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edda Padilla
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Partick Mullooly
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Palazzo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather O'Dell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl McClough
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Moretti
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Pena
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmela Modafferi
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Murphy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jyoti Zaveri
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Prewitt
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara C Mawra
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriele O'Connell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McNally
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pournaras
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pappas
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Menkes
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan O'Brian
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Miles
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Mifsud
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashia Muhammad
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Steven Murphy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Portnoy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McCoy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances D Pennington
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Perry
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nichols
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Prato
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mifsud
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Desmond Townsend
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Murphy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Morris
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pennington
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Edward Mikoleski
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Tullo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P Mawra
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Nasse
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nemickas, as administrator of the Estate of Kestusis Nemickas, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Parsons, as administrator of the Estate of Desmond Townsend, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Parrella, as administrator of the Estate of Thomas Madden, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Moore, as administrator of the Estate of Scott Moore, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Mullooly
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Milosevich, as administrator of the Estate of Chad Milosevich, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Mikoleski, as administrator of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Morris, as administrator of the Estate of Richard Morris, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia McCarthy, as administrator of the Estate of Dennis P. McCarthy, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Nardino, as administrator of the Estate of John Anthony Nardino, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Purdy, as administrator of the Estate of Michael Purdy, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?