Ajami v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Susan Ajami, Leonard Parr, Michael Scotto Sr., Elisa Alba, Lisa Kung, Willie Mae Atkins, Milton Germosen, Andrew Bryant Jr., Donald Nevins, Fredrick Nordt Jr., Steven Herrera, Steven Schwiering, Doreen Tafarella, Dawn Magnotta, Abbe Goidel, James Grillo, Martha Longo, John Flanagan, Daniel Walcott, Anthony Galetto, Peter Friscia, Michael Rivezzo, Ralph Gonzalez, William Navarro, Maurice Quick, Anthony Montague, Elpida Argenziano, Dennis Minnella, Michael DiBenedetto, Thomas D'Auria, Carmen Fiallo, Jill Licata, Darlene Fonesca, Nicholas Rossini, Carmen White, James Ng, Anthony Mignone, Stephen Clay, Regina Sbarra, Allan Young, James Knight, Georgette Maddalena, Franciene Marion, Louise D'Albora, Robert Korongy, Anthony Grimaldi, Louis Guglielmetti, Michele Naumann, Jon Liggio, Mathew McNichol, Michael Boyle, Mary Bulzomi, Robert Bernardini, Michael DeFillippo, Raymond Winslow, James Rogers, Otis Walker, Charles Messina, Beverly Rosario, Michael Detouche, Emanuel Ruggiero, John Bucalo, Frankie Mack, Clara Fleshman, David State, Richard Allen, Gloria Santos, Robert Ballin, Mari-Ann Brownell, Gioacchino Montanaro, Hill Michael, Denise McCray, Christopher Cincotta, Sherlyn Richardson, Richard Lombardi, Eileen Debold, Nicholas Bulzomi, Leslie Tarver, Bruce Koch, Leon Clini, Richard Sackman, Edmond Brosnan, John McGinley, Joseph Ranocchia, marcy Hoenig, Minerva Roldan, Josephine D'Alessandro, Melissa Welch, Laurence Bissett, Bonnie Pinto, Martin Dennehy, Delroy Ellis, Douglas Goldstein, Anthony Velez, Jacqueline Mitchell, Anne Lordo, Stephen Garland, Michael Alberti, James Lavin and Fran Cotona
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11855
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by William Navarro ; Clara Fleshman ; Michael DeFillippo ; James Rogers ; Stephen Clay ; Bonnie Pinto ; Anthony Galetto ; James Knight ; Anthony Mignone ; Christopher Cincotta ; Darlene Fonesca ; Willie Mae Atkins ; Bruce Koch ; John Flanagan ; Beverly Rosario ; Steven Herrera; James Grillo ; Gloria Santos ; Louis Guglielmetti; Mathew McNichol ; Michael DiBenedetto ; Denise McCray ; Allan Young ; Michael Scotto Sr. ; Otis Walker ; James Ng ; Carmen Fiallo ; Ralph Gonzalez ; Richard Allen ; James Lavin ; Richard Lombardi ; Lisa Kung ; Anthony Grimaldi ; Maurice Quick ; Abbe Goidel ; David State ; Richard Sackman ; Robert Ballin ; Laurence Bissett; Fredrick Nordt Jr. ; Martin Dennehy ; Anthony Velez ; Elisa Alba ; Minerva Roldan ; Robert Korongy ; Mari-Ann Brownell ; Josephine D'Alessandro ; Eileen Debold ; Joseph Ranocchia ; Thomas D'Auria ; Michael Detouche ; John Bucalo ; Edmond Brosnan ; Robert Bernardini ; Michael Alberti ; Susan Ajami; Gioacchino Montanaro ; Anne Lordo ; Mary Bulzomi; Jon Liggio ; Louise D'Albora ; Fran Cotona ; Delroy Ellis ; Franciene Marion ; Charles Messina ; Jacqueline Mitchell ; Carmen White ; Steven Schwiering ; Dennis Minnella ; Dawn Magnotta ; Michael Rivezzo ; Jill Licata ; Daniel Walcott ; John McGinley ; Raymond Winslow ; Douglas Goldstein ; marcy Hoenig ; Emanuel Ruggiero ; Leon Clini ; Georgette Maddalena ; Donald Nevins ; Leslie Tarver ; Andrew Bryant Jr. ; Hill Michael ; Peter Friscia ; Nicholas Rossini ; Nicholas Bulzomi ; Doreen Tafarella ; Sherlyn Richardson ; Michele Naumann ; Anthony Montague ; Milton Germosen ; Frankie Mack ; Michael Boyle ; Regina Sbarra ; Elpida Argenziano ; Leonard Parr ; Martha Longo ; Stephen Garland ; Melissa Welch. (Kreindler, James)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Susan Ajami, Elisa Alba, Michael Alberti, Richard Allen, Elpida Argenziano, Willie Mae Atkins, Robert Ballin, Robert Bernardini, Laurence Bissett, Michael Boyle, Edmond Brosnan, Mari-Ann Brownell, Andrew Bryant Jr., John Bucalo, Mary Bulzomi, Nicholas Bulzomi, Christopher Cincotta, Stephen Clay, Leon Clini, Fran Cotona, Louise D'Albora, Josephine D'Alessandro, Thomas D'Auria, Michael DeFillippo, Eileen Debold, Martin Dennehy, Michael Detouche, Michael DiBenedetto, Delroy Ellis, Carmen Fiallo, John Flanagan, Clara Fleshman, Darlene Fonesca, Peter Friscia, Anthony Galetto, Stephen Garland, Milton Germosen, Abbe Goidel, Douglas Goldstein, Ralph Gonzalez, James Grillo, Anthony Grimaldi, Louis Guglielmetti, Steven Herrera, marcy Hoenig, James Knight, Bruce Koch, Robert Korongy, Lisa Kung, James Lavin, Jill Licata, Jon Liggio, Richard Lombardi, Martha Longo, Anne Lordo, Frankie Mack, Georgette Maddalena, Dawn Magnotta, Franciene Marion, Denise McCray, John McGinley, Mathew McNichol, Charles Messina, Hill Michael, Anthony Mignone, Dennis Minnella, Jacqueline Mitchell, Anthony Montague, Gioacchino Montanaro, Michele Naumann, William Navarro, Donald Nevins, James Ng, Fredrick Nordt Jr., Leonard Parr, Bonnie Pinto, Maurice Quick, Joseph Ranocchia, Sherlyn Richardson, Michael Rivezzo, James Rogers, Minerva Roldan, Beverly Rosario, Nicholas Rossini, Emanuel Ruggiero, Richard Sackman, Gloria Santos, Regina Sbarra, Steven Schwiering, Michael Scotto Sr., David State, Doreen Tafarella, Leslie Tarver, Anthony Velez, Daniel Walcott, Otis Walker, Melissa Welch, Carmen White, Raymond Winslow, Allan Young.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by William Navarro, Clara Fleshman, Michael DeFillippo, James Rogers, Stephen Clay, Bonnie Pinto, Anthony Galetto, James Knight, Anthony Mignone, Christopher Cincotta, Darlene Fonesca, Willie Mae Atkins, Bruce Koch, John Flanagan, Beverly Rosario, Steven Herrera, James Grillo, Gloria Santos, Louis Guglielmetti, Mathew McNichol, Michael DiBenedetto, Denise McCray, Allan Young, Michael Scotto Sr., Otis Walker, James Ng, Carmen Fiallo, Ralph Gonzalez, Richard Allen, James Lavin, Richard Lombardi, Lisa Kung, Anthony Grimaldi, Maurice Quick, Abbe Goidel, David State, Richard Sackman, Robert Ballin, Laurence Bissett, Fredrick Nordt Jr., Martin Dennehy, Anthony Velez, Elisa Alba, Minerva Roldan, Robert Korongy, Mari-Ann Brownell, Josephine D'Alessandro, Eileen Debold, Joseph Ranocchia, Thomas D'Auria, Michael Detouche, John Bucalo, Edmond Brosnan, Robert Bernardini, Michael Alberti, Susan Ajami, Gioacchino Montanaro, Anne Lordo, Mary Bulzomi, Jon Liggio, Louise D'Albora, Fran Cotona, Delroy Ellis, Franciene Marion, Charles Messina, Jacqueline Mitchell, Carmen White, Steven Schwiering, Dennis Minnella, Dawn Magnotta, Michael Rivezzo, Jill Licata, Daniel Walcott, John McGinley, Raymond Winslow, Douglas Goldstein, marcy Hoenig, Emanuel Ruggiero, Leon Clini, Georgette Maddalena, Donald Nevins, Leslie Tarver, Andrew Bryant Jr., Hill Michael, Peter Friscia, Nicholas Rossini, Nicholas Bulzomi, Doreen Tafarella, Sherlyn Richardson, Michele Naumann, Anthony Montague, Milton Germosen, Frankie Mack, Michael Boyle, Regina Sbarra, Elpida Argenziano, Leonard Parr, Martha Longo, Stephen Garland, Melissa Welch. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners William Navarro, Clara Fleshman, Michael DeFillippo, Stephen Clay, Anthony Galetto, James Knight, Anthony Mignone, Christopher Cincotta, Darlene Fonesca, Willie Mae Atkins, Bruce Koch, John Flanagan, Steven Herrera, James Grillo, Louis Guglielmetti, Mathew McNichol, Michael DiBenedetto, Denise McCray, James Ng, Carmen Fiallo, Ralph Gonzalez, Richard Allen, James Lavin, Richard Lombardi, Lisa Kung, Anthony Grimaldi, Abbe Goidel, Robert Ballin, Laurence Bissett, Fredrick Nordt Jr., Martin Dennehy, Elisa Alba, Robert Korongy, Mari-Ann Brownell, Josephine D'Alessandro, Eileen Debold, Thomas D'Auria, Michael Detouche, John Bucalo, Edmond Brosnan, Robert Bernardini, Michael Alberti, Susan Ajami, Gioacchino Montanaro, Anne Lordo, Mary Bulzomi, Jon Liggio, Louise D'Albora, Fran Cotona, Delroy Ellis, Franciene Marion, Charles Messina, Jacqueline Mitchell, Dennis Minnella, Dawn Magnotta, Jill Licata, John McGinley, Douglas Goldstein, marcy Hoenig, Leon Clini, Georgette Maddalena, Donald Nevins, Andrew Bryant Jr., Hill Michael, Peter Friscia, Nicholas Bulzomi, Michele Naumann, Anthony Montague, Milton Germosen, Frankie Mack, Michael Boyle, Elpida Argenziano, Leonard Parr, Martha Longo, Stephen Garland, Sherlyn Richardson, Nicholas Rossini, Michael Rivezzo, Allan Young, Carmen White, Bonnie Pinto, Melissa Welch, Maurice Quick, Anthony Velez, Gloria Santos, Richard Sackman, Emanuel Ruggiero, Otis Walker, Regina Sbarra, Minerva Roldan, Doreen Tafarella, Steven Schwiering, Raymond Winslow, Leslie Tarver, David State, Daniel Walcott, Michael Scotto Sr., James Rogers, Joseph Ranocchia, Beverly Rosario added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by William Navarro, Clara Fleshman, Michael DeFillippo, Stephen Clay, Anthony Galetto, James Knight, Anthony Mignone, Christopher Cincotta, Darlene Fonesca, Willie Mae Atkins, Bruce Koch, John Flanagan, Steven Herrera, James Grillo, Louis Guglielmetti, Mathew McNichol, Michael DiBenedetto, Denise McCray, James Ng, Carmen Fiallo, Ralph Gonzalez, Richard Allen, James Lavin, Richard Lombardi, Lisa Kung, Anthony Grimaldi, Abbe Goidel, Robert Ballin, Laurence Bissett, Fredrick Nordt Jr., Martin Dennehy, Elisa Alba, Robert Korongy, Mari-Ann Brownell, Josephine D'Alessandro, Eileen Debold, Thomas D'Auria, Michael Detouche, John Bucalo, Edmond Brosnan, Robert Bernardini, Michael Alberti, Susan Ajami, Gioacchino Montanaro, Anne Lordo, Mary Bulzomi, Jon Liggio, Louise D'Albora, Fran Cotona, Delroy Ellis, Franciene Marion, Charles Messina, Jacqueline Mitchell, Dennis Minnella, Dawn Magnotta, Jill Licata, John McGinley, Douglas Goldstein, marcy Hoenig, Leon Clini, Georgette Maddalena, Donald Nevins, Andrew Bryant Jr., Hill Michael, Peter Friscia, Nicholas Bulzomi, Michele Naumann, Anthony Montague, Milton Germosen, Frankie Mack, Michael Boyle, Elpida Argenziano, Leonard Parr, Martha Longo, Stephen Garland, Sherlyn Richardson, Nicholas Rossini, Michael Rivezzo, Allan Young, Carmen White, Bonnie Pinto, Melissa Welch, Maurice Quick, Anthony Velez, Gloria Santos, Richard Sackman, Emanuel Ruggiero, Otis Walker, Regina Sbarra, Minerva Roldan, Doreen Tafarella, Steven Schwiering, Raymond Winslow, Leslie Tarver, David State, Daniel Walcott, Michael Scotto Sr., James Rogers, Joseph Ranocchia, Beverly Rosario. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Clara Fleshman, Michael DeFillippo, Stephen Clay, Anthony Galetto, James Knight, Christopher Cincotta, Darlene Fonesca, Willie Mae Atkins, Bruce Koch, John Flanagan, Steven Herrera, James Grillo, Louis Guglielmetti, Michael DiBenedetto, Carmen Fiallo, Ralph Gonzalez, Richard Allen, James Lavin, Lisa Kung, Anthony Grimaldi, Abbe Goidel, Robert Ballin, Laurence Bissett, Martin Dennehy, Elisa Alba, Robert Korongy, Mari-Ann Brownell, Josephine D'Alessandro, Eileen Debold, Thomas D'Auria, Michael Detouche, John Bucalo, Edmond Brosnan, Robert Bernardini, Michael Alberti, Susan Ajami, Mary Bulzomi, Louise D'Albora, Fran Cotona, Delroy Ellis, Douglas Goldstein, marcy Hoenig, Leon Clini, Andrew Bryant Jr., Hill Michael, Peter Friscia, Nicholas Bulzomi, Milton Germosen, Michael Boyle, Elpida Argenziano, Stephen Garland, Martha Longo, Franciene Marion, Anne Lordo, Fredrick Nordt Jr., Jill Licata, James Ng, Jon Liggio, Michele Naumann, Mathew McNichol, John McGinley, Denise McCray, Donald Nevins, Charles Messina, Georgette Maddalena, Anthony Montague, Anthony Mignone, Leonard Parr, Gioacchino Montanaro, Jacqueline Mitchell, William Navarro, Dennis Minnella, Richard Lombardi, Frankie Mack, Dawn Magnotta added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Clara Fleshman, Michael DeFillippo, Stephen Clay, Anthony Galetto, James Knight, Christopher Cincotta, Darlene Fonesca, Willie Mae Atkins, Bruce Koch, John Flanagan, Steven Herrera, James Grillo, Louis Guglielmetti, Michael DiBenedetto, Carmen Fiallo, Ralph Gonzalez, Richard Allen, James Lavin, Lisa Kung, Anthony Grimaldi, Abbe Goidel, Robert Ballin, Laurence Bissett, Martin Dennehy, Elisa Alba, Robert Korongy, Mari-Ann Brownell, Josephine D'Alessandro, Eileen Debold, Thomas D'Auria, Michael Detouche, John Bucalo, Edmond Brosnan, Robert Bernardini, Michael Alberti, Susan Ajami, Mary Bulzomi, Louise D'Albora, Fran Cotona, Delroy Ellis, Douglas Goldstein, marcy Hoenig, Leon Clini, Andrew Bryant Jr., Hill Michael, Peter Friscia, Nicholas Bulzomi, Milton Germosen, Michael Boyle, Elpida Argenziano, Stephen Garland, Martha Longo, Franciene Marion, Anne Lordo, Fredrick Nordt Jr., Jill Licata, James Ng, Jon Liggio, Michele Naumann, Mathew McNichol, John McGinley, Denise McCray, Donald Nevins, Charles Messina, Georgette Maddalena, Anthony Montague, Anthony Mignone, Leonard Parr, Gioacchino Montanaro, Jacqueline Mitchell, William Navarro, Dennis Minnella, Richard Lombardi, Frankie Mack, Dawn Magnotta. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Michael DeFillippo, Robert Bernardini, Stephen Clay, Michael Alberti, Susan Ajami, Christopher Cincotta, Mary Bulzomi, Willie Mae Atkins, Louise D'Albora, Fran Cotona, Richard Allen, Leon Clini, Andrew Bryant Jr., Robert Ballin, Nicholas Bulzomi, Laurence Bissett, Elisa Alba, Mari-Ann Brownell, Michael Boyle, Josephine D'Alessandro, Elpida Argenziano, Eileen Debold, Thomas D'Auria, John Bucalo, Edmond Brosnan, Anthony Grimaldi, Douglas Goldstein, Robert Korongy, Delroy Ellis, Peter Friscia, James Lavin, Louis Guglielmetti, Carmen Fiallo, Lisa Kung, Bruce Koch, Martin Dennehy, James Knight, Michael Detouche, James Grillo, Hill Michael, Ralph Gonzalez, Steven Herrera, Milton Germosen, Michael DiBenedetto, John Flanagan, Stephen Garland, Anthony Galetto, marcy Hoenig, Abbe Goidel, Darlene Fonesca, Clara Fleshman added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Michael DeFillippo, Robert Bernardini, Stephen Clay, Michael Alberti, Susan Ajami, Christopher Cincotta, Mary Bulzomi, Willie Mae Atkins, Louise D'Albora, Fran Cotona, Richard Allen, Leon Clini, Andrew Bryant Jr., Robert Ballin, Nicholas Bulzomi, Laurence Bissett, Elisa Alba, Mari-Ann Brownell, Michael Boyle, Josephine D'Alessandro, Elpida Argenziano, Eileen Debold, Thomas D'Auria, John Bucalo, Edmond Brosnan, Anthony Grimaldi, Douglas Goldstein, Robert Korongy, Delroy Ellis, Peter Friscia, James Lavin, Louis Guglielmetti, Carmen Fiallo, Lisa Kung, Bruce Koch, Martin Dennehy, James Knight, Michael Detouche, James Grillo, Hill Michael, Ralph Gonzalez, Steven Herrera, Milton Germosen, Michael DiBenedetto, John Flanagan, Stephen Garland, Anthony Galetto, marcy Hoenig, Abbe Goidel, Darlene Fonesca, Clara Fleshman. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Susan Ajami, Stephen Clay, Louise D'Albora, Mary Bulzomi, Michael DeFillippo, Elpida Argenziano, Nicholas Bulzomi, Michael Boyle, Fran Cotona, Leon Clini, Willie Mae Atkins, Andrew Bryant Jr., Richard Allen, Robert Ballin, Mari-Ann Brownell, Edmond Brosnan, Eileen Debold, Elisa Alba, Josephine D'Alessandro, John Bucalo, Laurence Bissett, Thomas D'Auria, Michael Alberti, Robert Bernardini, Christopher Cincotta added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Susan Ajami, Stephen Clay, Louise D'Albora, Mary Bulzomi, Michael DeFillippo, Elpida Argenziano, Nicholas Bulzomi, Michael Boyle, Fran Cotona, Leon Clini, Willie Mae Atkins, Andrew Bryant Jr., Richard Allen, Robert Ballin, Mari-Ann Brownell, Edmond Brosnan, Eileen Debold, Elisa Alba, Josephine D'Alessandro, John Bucalo, Laurence Bissett, Thomas D'Auria, Michael Alberti, Robert Bernardini, Christopher Cincotta. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cook, David)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney David Charles Cook to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Charles Cook. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (sj)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Charles Cook to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS - FILER ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as Document filed by Susan Ajami.(Cook, David) Modified on 12/18/2018 (sj).
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cook, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16069038)Document filed by Susan Ajami. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Cook, David) Modified on 12/18/2018 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajami v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ajami
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Parr
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scotto Sr.
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Alba
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kung
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Atkins
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Germosen
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bryant Jr.
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Nevins
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Nordt Jr.
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Herrera
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Schwiering
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Tafarella
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Magnotta
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbe Goidel
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grillo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Longo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Flanagan
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Walcott
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Galetto
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Friscia
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rivezzo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Gonzalez
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Navarro
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Quick
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Montague
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elpida Argenziano
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Minnella
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael DiBenedetto
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D'Auria
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Fiallo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Licata
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Fonesca
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rossini
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen White
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ng
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mignone
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Clay
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Sbarra
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Young
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Knight
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgette Maddalena
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franciene Marion
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise D'Albora
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Korongy
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Grimaldi
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Guglielmetti
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Naumann
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Liggio
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew McNichol
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Boyle
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bulzomi
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bernardini
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael DeFillippo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Winslow
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rogers
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Walker
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Messina
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Rosario
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Detouche
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Ruggiero
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bucalo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Mack
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Fleshman
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David State
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Allen
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Santos
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ballin
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mari-Ann Brownell
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gioacchino Montanaro
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hill Michael
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise McCray
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cincotta
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherlyn Richardson
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lombardi
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Debold
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Bulzomi
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Tarver
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Koch
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Clini
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sackman
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmond Brosnan
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McGinley
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ranocchia
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: marcy Hoenig
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Roldan
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine D'Alessandro
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Welch
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Bissett
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Pinto
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Dennehy
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delroy Ellis
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Goldstein
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Velez
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Mitchell
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Lordo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Garland
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Alberti
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lavin
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran Cotona
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?