Rosenthal v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Loren Rosenthal, Michael Mandelino, Issac Romero, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Florence Rosario, Tyler Melendez, Jennifer Reiss, Ricky Melendez, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Brittney Cofresi, Peter C. Milano, Ann Mistrulli, Amy Martinez, Audrey Model, Margaret Montanez, Carl Stallworth, AnneMarie Medaglia, Adam Reiss, Joseph Mistrulli, Erich Maerz, Maranda Ratchford, MaryEllen Medaglia, Rodney M. Ratchford, Diana Diaz, Cathryn Lostrangio, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., Donna Corbett-Moran, Judith Reiss, Paul Lavelle, Captain Gary Reiss, Alexander Rowe, Jessica Milano, Anthony Pino, Thomas Papasso, James Montoya, Johnny Mistrulli, Paula Nacke Jacobs, Jonathan Reiss, Angela Mistrulli-Cantone, Patricia Coloia, Maryann Pino, Philomena Mistrulli, Amanda Rogers, Joanne Lovett, Noelia Moreno, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, James Perry, Jennie Mandelino, Rina Joy Kaufman, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes, Diane Lostrangio, Diane Ognibene, Michelle Baker, Roosevelt Stallworth, James Mandelino, Sr., Jason Ruben Moreno, James Mandelino, Jr., Diane Romero, Dale Allen Nacke, Helen Rosenthal, Brian Christian, Michael Medaglia, Brendan Cofresi, Diana Medaglia, Jordan Reiss, Marshae R. Ratchford, Maria Lambert, Kathleen Palacio, Jesse Melendez, David Lebor and Devon Marie Rodak
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11866
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 11, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 11, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
January 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (dnh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #10 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Michelle Baker, Brian Christian, Brendan Cofresi, Brittney Cofresi, Patricia Coloia, Donna Corbett-Moran, Diana Diaz(a surviving sibling of Elvin Romero), Diana Diaz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Romero, Deceased, a surviving parent of Elvin Romero), Paula Nacke Jacobs, Rina Joy Kaufman(a surviving sibling of Leon Lebor), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Phillip Lebor, Deceased, a surviving parent of Leon Lebor), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bessie Lebor, Deceased, a surviving parent of Leon Lebor), Maria Lambert, Paul Lavelle, David Lebor, Cathryn Lostrangio, Diane Lostrangio, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., Joanne Lovett, Erich Maerz, Jennie Mandelino, Michael Mandelino, James Mandelino, Jr., James Mandelino, Sr., Amy Martinez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Nacke, Deceased), Amy Martinez(Individually as the surviving spouse of Louis Nacke), AnneMarie Medaglia, Diana Medaglia, MaryEllen Medaglia, Michael Medaglia, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(Individually as a surviving child of Rocco Medaglia), Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rocco Medaglia, Deceased), Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Jesse Melendez, Ricky Melendez, Tyler Melendez, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Jessica Milano, Peter C. Milano, Ann Mistrulli, Johnny Mistrulli, Joseph Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli(Individually as the surviving spouse of Joseph D. Mistrulli), Philomena Mistrulli(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph D. Mistrulli, Deceased), Angela Mistrulli-Cantone, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Rosenthal, Deceased), Audrey Model(a surviving sibling of Richard D. Rosenthal), Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard Rosenthal, Deceased), Margaret Montanez, James Montoya, Jason Ruben Moreno, Noelia Moreno, Dale Allen Nacke, Diane Ognibene(Individually), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene, Deceased), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Deceased), Kathleen Palacio, Thomas Papasso, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., James Perry, Anthony Pino, Maryann Pino, Maranda Ratchford, Marshae R. Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Adam Reiss, Gary Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ida Reiss, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Gary Reiss(a surviving parent of Joshua Reiss), Jennifer Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Jordan Reiss, Judith Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lenore Jackson, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Judith Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ken Jackson, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, Amanda Rogers, Diane Romero(Individually as the surviving spouse of Elvin Romeo), Diane Romero(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elvin Romero), Issac Romero, Florence Rosario, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evan Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal(individually as the surviving spouse of Richard D. Rosenthal), Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Seth Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard D. Rosenthal, Deceased), Alexander Rowe(Individually as a surviving parent of Nicholas Rowe), Alexander Rowe(as the Personal Representative of Nicholas Rowe, Deceased), Carl Stallworth, Roosevelt Stallworth. (Fleming, Timothy)
January 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested needs to be linked to the correctly filed complaint (document 10). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Thomas Papasso, Diane Lostrangio, James Mandelino, Jr., Erich Maerz, David Lebor, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(Individually as a surviving child of Rocco Medaglia), Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Rosenthal, Deceased), Carl Stallworth, James Montoya, Joseph Mistrulli, Diana Medaglia, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evan Rosenthal, Deceased), Gary Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ida Reiss, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Gary Reiss(a surviving parent of Joshua Reiss), Jonathan Reiss, Johnny Mistrulli, Michael Medaglia, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Anthony Pino, Michael Mandelino, Brittney Cofresi, Philomena Mistrulli(Individually as the surviving spouse of Joseph D. Mistrulli), Alexander Rowe(Individually as a surviving parent of Nicholas Rowe), Audrey Model(a surviving sibling of Richard D. Rosenthal), Ann Mistrulli, Judith Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lenore Jackson, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Diane Ognibene(Individually), Margaret Montanez, Diane Romero(Individually as the surviving spouse of Elvin Romeo), Maria Lambert, Angela Mistrulli-Cantone, Florence Rosario, Alexander Rowe(as the Personal Representative of Nicholas Rowe, Deceased), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene, Deceased), Rina Joy Kaufman(a surviving sibling of Leon Lebor), Peter C. Milano, Jessica Milano, Jennie Mandelino, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard Rosenthal, Deceased), Paul Lavelle, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rocco Medaglia, Deceased), Rodney M. Ratchford, Jennifer Reiss, Jordan Reiss, Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Phillip Lebor, Deceased, a surviving parent of Leon Lebor), Loren Rosenthal(individually as the surviving spouse of Richard D. Rosenthal), Amanda Rogers, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Seth Rosenthal, Deceased), Paula Nacke Jacobs, Marshae R. Ratchford, Donna Corbett-Moran, Cathryn Lostrangio, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard D. Rosenthal, Deceased), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bessie Lebor, Deceased, a surviving parent of Leon Lebor), Jason Ruben Moreno, Amy Martinez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Nacke, Deceased), Amy Martinez(Individually as the surviving spouse of Louis Nacke), Judith Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ken Jackson, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Brian Christian, Maranda Ratchford, Devon Marie Rodak, AnneMarie Medaglia, Ricky Melendez, Diana Diaz(a surviving sibling of Elvin Romero), Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., Joanne Lovett, James Mandelino, Sr., Roosevelt Stallworth, Helen Rosenthal, Maryann Pino, Diana Diaz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Romero, Deceased, a surviving parent of Elvin Romero), Tyler Melendez, Noelia Moreno, Brendan Cofresi, Michelle Baker, Patricia Coloia, Kathleen Palacio, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Deceased), Issac Romero, MaryEllen Medaglia, Philomena Mistrulli(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph D. Mistrulli, Deceased), Adam Reiss, Jesse Melendez, Diane Romero(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elvin Romero), Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., Dale Allen Nacke, James Perry, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna.(Fleming, Timothy)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Timothy B. Fleming dated January 3, 2019 re: approval of corrected Complaint. Document filed by Michelle Baker, Brian Christian, Brendan Cofresi, Brittney Cofresi, Patricia Coloia, Donna Corbett-Moran, Diana Diaz(a surviving sibling of Elvin Romero), Diana Diaz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Romero, Deceased, a surviving parent of Elvin Romero), Paula Nacke Jacobs, Rina Joy Kaufman(a surviving sibling of Leon Lebor), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Phillip Lebor, Deceased, a surviving parent of Leon Lebor), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bessie Lebor, Deceased, a surviving parent of Leon Lebor), Maria Lambert, Paul Lavelle, David Lebor, Cathryn Lostrangio, Diane Lostrangio, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., Joanne Lovett, Erich Maerz, Jennie Mandelino, Michael Mandelino, James Mandelino, Jr., James Mandelino, Sr., Amy Martinez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Nacke, Deceased), Amy Martinez(Individually as the surviving spouse of Louis Nacke), AnneMarie Medaglia, Diana Medaglia, MaryEllen Medaglia, Michael Medaglia, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(Individually as a surviving child of Rocco Medaglia), Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rocco Medaglia, Deceased), Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Jesse Melendez, Ricky Melendez, Tyler Melendez, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Jessica Milano, Peter C. Milano, Ann Mistrulli, Johnny Mistrulli, Joseph Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli(Individually as the surviving spouse of Joseph D. Mistrulli), Philomena Mistrulli(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph D. Mistrulli, Deceased), Angela Mistrulli-Cantone, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Rosenthal, Deceased), Audrey Model(a surviving sibling of Richard D. Rosenthal), Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard Rosenthal, Deceased), Margaret Montanez, James Montoya, Jason Ruben Moreno, Noelia Moreno, Dale Allen Nacke, Diane Ognibene(Individually), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene, Deceased), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Deceased), Kathleen Palacio, Thomas Papasso, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., James Perry, Anthony Pino, Maryann Pino, Maranda Ratchford, Marshae R. Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Adam Reiss, Gary Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ida Reiss, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Gary Reiss(a surviving parent of Joshua Reiss), Jennifer Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Jordan Reiss, Judith Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lenore Jackson, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Judith Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ken Jackson, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, Amanda Rogers, Diane Romero(Individually as the surviving spouse of Elvin Romeo), Diane Romero(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elvin Romero), Issac Romero, Florence Rosario, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evan Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal(individually as the surviving spouse of Richard D. Rosenthal), Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Seth Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard D. Rosenthal, Deceased), Alexander Rowe(Individually as a surviving parent of Nicholas Rowe), Alexander Rowe(as the Personal Representative of Nicholas Rowe, Deceased), Carl Stallworth, Roosevelt Stallworth. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Short Form Complaint)(Fleming, Timothy)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Michelle Baker, Brian Christian, Brendan Cofresi, Brittney Cofresi, Patricia Coloia, Donna Corbett-Moran, Diana Diaz(a surviving sibling of Elvin Romero), Diana Diaz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Romero, Deceased, a surviving parent of Elvin Romero), Paula Nacke Jacobs, Rina Joy Kaufman(a surviving sibling of Leon Lebor), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Phillip Lebor, Deceased, a surviving parent of Leon Lebor), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bessie Lebor, Deceased, a surviving parent of Leon Lebor), Maria Lambert, Paul Lavelle, David Lebor, Cathryn Lostrangio, Diane Lostrangio, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., Joanne Lovett, Erich Maerz, Jennie Mandelino, Michael Mandelino, James Mandelino, Jr., James Mandelino, Sr., Amy Martinez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Nacke, Deceased), Amy Martinez(Individually as the surviving spouse of Louis Nacke), AnneMarie Medaglia, Diana Medaglia, MaryEllen Medaglia, Michael Medaglia, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(Individually as a surviving child of Rocco Medaglia), Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rocco Medaglia, Deceased), Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Jesse Melendez, Ricky Melendez, Tyler Melendez, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Jessica Milano, Peter C. Milano, Ann Mistrulli, Johnny Mistrulli, Joseph Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli(Individually as the surviving spouse of Joseph D. Mistrulli), Philomena Mistrulli(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph D. Mistrulli, Deceased), Angela Mistrulli-Cantone, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Rosenthal, Deceased), Audrey Model(a surviving sibling of Richard D. Rosenthal), Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard Rosenthal, Deceased), Margaret Montanez, James Montoya, Jason Ruben Moreno, Noelia Moreno, Dale Allen Nacke, Diane Ognibene(Individually), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene, Deceased), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Deceased), Kathleen Palacio, Thomas Papasso, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., James Perry, Anthony Pino, Maryann Pino, Maranda Ratchford, Marshae R. Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Adam Reiss, Gary Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ida Reiss, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Gary Reiss(a surviving parent of Joshua Reiss), Jennifer Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Jordan Reiss, Judith Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lenore Jackson, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Judith Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ken Jackson, Deceased, a surviving Grandparent of Joshua Reiss), Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, Amanda Rogers, Diane Romero(Individually as the surviving spouse of Elvin Romeo), Diane Romero(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elvin Romero), Issac Romero, Florence Rosario, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evan Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal(individually as the surviving spouse of Richard D. Rosenthal), Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Seth Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard D. Rosenthal, Deceased), Alexander Rowe(Individually as a surviving parent of Nicholas Rowe), Alexander Rowe(as the Personal Representative of Nicholas Rowe, Deceased), Carl Stallworth, Roosevelt Stallworth. (Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 1/4/2019 (pc).
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Timothy)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,,,,,,,,,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
December 27, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1750. (pc)
December 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy B. Fleming. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Loren Rosenthal, Patricia Coloia, Rina Joy Kaufman, Paul Lavelle, Cathryn Lostrangio, Diane Lostrangio, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., Erich Maerz, Amy Martinez, AnneMarie Medaglia, Diana Medaglia, MaryEllen Medaglia, Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Philomena Mistrulli, Audrey Model, Kathleen Palacio, Gary Reiss, Devon Marie Rodak, Maria Lambert, Jennie Mandelino, Michael Mandelino,James Mandelino, Jr., James Mandelino, Sr., Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes, Jesse Melendez,Ricky Melendez,Tyler Melendez,Ramon Melendez, Jr.,Jessica Milano, Peter C. Milano,Margaret Montanez, Florence Rosario updated, Paula Nacke Jacobs,Joanne Lovett, Amy Martinez,Ann Mistrulli,Johnny Mistrulli,Joseph Mistrulli,Philomena Mistrulli,Philomena Mistrulli, Angela Mistrulli-Cantone, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Jason Ruben Moreno, Noelia Moreno, Dale Allen Nacke, Anthony Pino, Maryann Pino, Brian Christian Brittney Cofresi Brendan Cofresi, James Montoya, Thomas Papasso, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., James Perry, Maranda Ratchford, Marshae R. Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Adam Reiss, Gary Reiss, Amanda Rogers, Carl Stallworth, Michelle Baker, Diana Diaz, Jennifer Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Jordan Reiss, Judith Reiss, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, Diane Romero, Issac Romero,Helen Rosenthal, Alexander Rowe, Michael Medaglia, Roosevelt Stallworth. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Timothy B. Fleming. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Karen Moreno, Mateo Pino, Tony Pino, Donna Corbett-Moran, Louis Paul Nacke, II, Kenneth Nacke, Joseph Nicholas Nacke. The party was added to the case in error. (pc)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming re: Document No. #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add Barbara Lurman twice to CM ECF, once with the party textv "individually as a surviving child of Leon Lebor" and once with the party text "as personal representative of the Estate of Leon Lebor, deceased". Add Leiana Moreno with the party text "a surviving sibling of Yvette Nichole Moreno" to CM ECF.. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Timothy B. Fleming to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc)
December 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy B. Fleming. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $999,999,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
December 27, 2018 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16073615, paid on 12/18/2018. (pc)
December 25, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Michelle Baker, Brian Christian, Brittney Cofresi, Brendan Cofresi, Jr., Patricia Coloia, Donna Corbett-Moran, Diana Diaz, Diana Diaz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Romero, Deceased), Paula Nacke Jacobs, Rina Joy Kaufman(Individually), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Phillip Lebor, Deceased), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bessie Lebor, Deceased), Maria Lambert, Paul Lavelle, David Lebor, Cathryn Lostrangio, Diane Lostrangio, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., Joanne Lovett, Erich Maerz, Jennie Mandelino, Michael Mandelino, James Mandelino, Jr., James Mandelino, Sr., Amy Martinez, Amy Martinez, AnneMarie Medaglia, Diana Medaglia, MaryEllen Medaglia, Michael Medaglia, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(Individually), Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rocco Medaglia, Deceased), Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Jesse Melendez, Ricky Melendez, Tyler Melendez, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Jessica Milano, Peter C. Milano, Ann Mistrulli, Johnny Mistrulli, Joseph J. Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli, Angela M. Mistrulli-Cantone, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Rosenthal, Deceased), Audrey Model, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard Rosenthal, Deceased), Margaret Montanez, James Montoya, Jason Ruben Moreno, Karen Moreno, Noelia C. Moreno, Dale Allen Nacke, Joseph Nicholas Nacke, Kenneth Nacke, Louis Paul Nacke, II, Diane Ognibene(Individually), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene, Deceased), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Deceased), Kathleen Palacio, Thomas Papasso, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., James Perry, Anthony Pino, Maryann Pino, Mateo Pino, Tony Pino, Maranda Ratchford, Marshee R. Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Adam Reiss, Gary Reiss, Gary Reiss, Jennifer Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Jordan Reiss, Judith Jackson Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lenore Jackson, Deceased), Judith Jackson Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ken Jackson, Deceased), Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, Amanda Rogers, Diane Romero(Individually), Diane Romero(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elvin Romero), Issac Romero, Florence Rosario, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evan Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Seth Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard D. Rosenthal, Deceased), Alexander Rowe(Individually), Alexander Rowe(as the Personal Representative of Nicholas Rowe, Deceased), Carl Stallworth, Roosevelt Stallworth. (Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 12/27/2018 (pc).
December 25, 2018 Filing 5 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michelle Baker, Brian Christian, Brittney Cofresi, Brendan Cofresi, Jr., Patricia Coloia, Donna Corbett-Moran, Diana Diaz, Diana Diaz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Romero, Deceased), Paula Nacke Jacobs, Rina Joy Kaufman(Individually), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Phillip Lebor, Deceased), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bessie Lebor, Deceased), Maria Lambert, Paul Lavelle, David Lebor, Cathryn Lostrangio, Diane Lostrangio, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., Joanne Lovett, Erich Maerz, Jennie Mandelino, Michael Mandelino, James Mandelino, Jr., James Mandelino, Sr., Amy Martinez, Amy Martinez, AnneMarie Medaglia, Diana Medaglia, MaryEllen Medaglia, Michael Medaglia, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(Individually), Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rocco Medaglia, Deceased), Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Jesse Melendez, Ricky Melendez, Tyler Melendez, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Jessica Milano, Peter C. Milano, Ann Mistrulli, Johnny Mistrulli, Joseph J. Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli, Angela M. Mistrulli-Cantone, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Rosenthal, Deceased), Audrey Model, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard Rosenthal, Deceased), Margaret Montanez, James Montoya, Jason Ruben Moreno, Karen Moreno, Noelia C. Moreno, Dale Allen Nacke, Joseph Nicholas Nacke, Kenneth Nacke, Louis Paul Nacke, II, Diane Ognibene(Individually), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene, Deceased), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Deceased), Kathleen Palacio, Thomas Papasso, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., James Perry, Anthony Pino, Maryann Pino, Mateo Pino, Tony Pino, Maranda Ratchford, Marshee R. Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Adam Reiss, Gary Reiss, Gary Reiss, Jennifer Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Jordan Reiss, Judith Jackson Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lenore Jackson, Deceased), Judith Jackson Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ken Jackson, Deceased), Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, Amanda Rogers, Diane Romero(Individually), Diane Romero(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elvin Romero), Issac Romero, Florence Rosario, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evan Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Seth Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard D. Rosenthal, Deceased), Alexander Rowe(Individually), Alexander Rowe(as the Personal Representative of Nicholas Rowe, Deceased), Carl Stallworth, Roosevelt Stallworth.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 25, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:03-md-01750. Document filed by Michelle Baker, Brian Christian, Brittney Cofresi, Brendan Cofresi, Jr., Patricia Coloia, Donna Corbett-Moran, Diana Diaz, Diana Diaz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Romero, Deceased), Paula Nacke Jacobs, Rina Joy Kaufman(Individually), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Phillip Lebor, Deceased), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bessie Lebor, Deceased), Maria Lambert, Paul Lavelle, David Lebor, Cathryn Lostrangio, Diane Lostrangio, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., Joanne Lovett, Erich Maerz, Jennie Mandelino, Michael Mandelino, James Mandelino, Jr., James Mandelino, Sr., Amy Martinez, Amy Martinez, AnneMarie Medaglia, Diana Medaglia, MaryEllen Medaglia, Michael Medaglia, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(Individually), Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rocco Medaglia, Deceased), Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Jesse Melendez, Ricky Melendez, Tyler Melendez, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Jessica Milano, Peter C. Milano, Ann Mistrulli, Johnny Mistrulli, Joseph J. Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli, Angela M. Mistrulli-Cantone, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Rosenthal, Deceased), Audrey Model, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard Rosenthal, Deceased), Margaret Montanez, James Montoya, Jason Ruben Moreno, Karen Moreno, Noelia C. Moreno, Dale Allen Nacke, Joseph Nicholas Nacke, Kenneth Nacke, Louis Paul Nacke, II, Diane Ognibene(Individually), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene, Deceased), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Deceased), Kathleen Palacio, Thomas Papasso, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., James Perry, Anthony Pino, Maryann Pino, Mateo Pino, Tony Pino, Maranda Ratchford, Marshee R. Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford, Adam Reiss, Gary Reiss, Gary Reiss, Jennifer Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Jordan Reiss, Judith Jackson Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lenore Jackson, Deceased), Judith Jackson Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ken Jackson, Deceased), Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Devon Marie Rodak, Amanda Rogers, Diane Romero(Individually), Diane Romero(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elvin Romero), Issac Romero, Florence Rosario, Helen Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evan Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Seth Rosenthal, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard D. Rosenthal, Deceased), Alexander Rowe(Individually), Alexander Rowe(as the Personal Representative of Nicholas Rowe, Deceased), Carl Stallworth, Roosevelt Stallworth.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 25, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 12/27/2018 (pc).
December 25, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Thomas Papasso, Diane Lostrangio, James Mandelino, Jr., Erich Maerz, David Lebor, Karen Moreno, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(Individually), Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Rosenthal, Deceased), Carl Stallworth, James Montoya, Joseph J. Mistrulli, Diana Medaglia, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evan Rosenthal, Deceased), Gary Reiss, Gary Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Johnny Mistrulli, Michael Medaglia, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Anthony Pino, Michael Mandelino, Brittney Cofresi, Philomena Mistrulli, Alexander Rowe(Individually), Audrey Model, Ann Mistrulli, Judith Jackson Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lenore Jackson, Deceased), Diane Ognibene(Individually), Margaret Montanez, Louis Paul Nacke, II, Diane Romero(Individually), Maria Lambert, Angela M. Mistrulli-Cantone, Florence Rosario, Alexander Rowe(as the Personal Representative of Nicholas Rowe, Deceased), Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene, Deceased), Rina Joy Kaufman(Individually), Peter C. Milano, Jessica Milano, Jennie Mandelino, Audrey Model(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leonard Rosenthal, Deceased), Paul Lavelle, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rocco Medaglia, Deceased), Rodney M. Ratchford, Jennifer Reiss, Jordan Reiss, Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Phillip Lebor, Deceased), Loren Rosenthal, Amanda Rogers, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Seth Rosenthal, Deceased), Paula Nacke Jacobs, Marshee R. Ratchford, Donna Corbett-Moran, Cathryn Lostrangio, Loren Rosenthal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard D. Rosenthal, Deceased), Rina Joy Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bessie Lebor, Deceased), Jason Ruben Moreno, Kenneth Nacke, Amy Martinez, Amy Martinez, Judith Jackson Reiss(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ken Jackson, Deceased), Maranda Ratchford, Brian Christian, Devon Marie Rodak, AnneMarie Medaglia, Ricky Melendez, Diana Diaz, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., Joanne Lovett, James Mandelino, Sr., Roosevelt Stallworth, Helen Rosenthal, Maryann Pino, Tony Pino, Joseph Nicholas Nacke, Diana Diaz(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carmen Romero, Deceased), Tyler Melendez, Noelia C. Moreno, Brendan Cofresi, Jr., Michelle Baker, Patricia Coloia, Kathleen Palacio, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Mateo Pino, Diane Ognibene(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene, Deceased), Issac Romero, MaryEllen Medaglia, Philomena Mistrulli, Adam Reiss, Jesse Melendez, Diane Romero(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elvin Romero), Joseph Lostrangio, Jr., James Perry, Dale Allen Nacke, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 1/7/2019 (dnh).
December 25, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Diane Romero, Alexander Rowe, Issac Romero, Diana Diaz, Diana Diaz, Michelle Baker, Diane Romero, Helen Rosenthal, Alexander Rowe added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Diane Romero, Alexander Rowe, Issac Romero, Diana Diaz, Diana Diaz, Michelle Baker, Diane Romero, Helen Rosenthal, Alexander Rowe. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 25, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners James Perry, Amanda Rogers, Brian Christian, Thomas Papasso, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., Judith Jackson Reiss, Adam Reiss, Roosevelt Stallworth, Carl Stallworth, Gary Reiss, Devon Marie Rodak, Marshee R. Ratchford, Jordan Reiss, Gary Reiss, Judith Jackson Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Jennifer Reiss, James Montoya, Maranda Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by James Perry, Amanda Rogers, Brian Christian, Thomas Papasso, Vincent S. Papasso, Jr., Judith Jackson Reiss, Adam Reiss, Roosevelt Stallworth, Carl Stallworth, Gary Reiss, Devon Marie Rodak, Marshee R. Ratchford, Jordan Reiss, Gary Reiss, Judith Jackson Reiss, Jonathan Reiss, Chelsea Nicole Rodak, Jennifer Reiss, James Montoya, Maranda Ratchford, Rodney M. Ratchford. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Donna Corbett-Moran, Brendan Cofresi, Jr., Joanne Lovett, Kenneth Nacke, Louis Paul Nacke, II, Brittney Cofresi, Diane Ognibene, Joseph Nicholas Nacke, Diane Ognibene, Diane Ognibene added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Donna Corbett-Moran, Brendan Cofresi, Jr., Joanne Lovett, Kenneth Nacke, Louis Paul Nacke, II, Brittney Cofresi, Diane Ognibene, Joseph Nicholas Nacke, Diane Ognibene, Diane Ognibene. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Karen Moreno, Amy Martinez, Noelia C. Moreno, Maryann Pino, Mateo Pino, Jason Ruben Moreno, Tony Pino, Dale Allen Nacke, Amy Martinez, Paula Nacke Jacobs added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Karen Moreno, Amy Martinez, Noelia C. Moreno, Maryann Pino, Mateo Pino, Jason Ruben Moreno, Tony Pino, Dale Allen Nacke, Amy Martinez, Paula Nacke Jacobs. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Johnny Mistrulli, Angela M. Mistrulli-Cantone, Joseph J. Mistrulli, Jennie Mandelino, Michael Mandelino, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Ann Mistrulli, Anthony Pino, Philomena Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Johnny Mistrulli, Angela M. Mistrulli-Cantone, Joseph J. Mistrulli, Jennie Mandelino, Michael Mandelino, Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser, Ann Mistrulli, Anthony Pino, Philomena Mistrulli, Philomena Mistrulli. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Audrey Model, Audrey Model, Loren Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal, Audrey Model, Loren Rosenthal, James Mandelino, Jr. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Audrey Model, Audrey Model, Loren Rosenthal, Loren Rosenthal, Audrey Model, Loren Rosenthal, James Mandelino, Jr.. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Maria Lambert, Florence Rosario, Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Jessica Milano, Jesse Melendez, James Mandelino, Sr., MaryEllen Medaglia, Tyler Melendez, Diana Medaglia, Michael Medaglia, Ricky Melendez, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Erich Maerz, Margaret Montanez, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes, AnneMarie Medaglia, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes, Peter C. Milano added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Maria Lambert, Florence Rosario, Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna, Jessica Milano, Jesse Melendez, James Mandelino, Sr., MaryEllen Medaglia, Tyler Melendez, Diana Medaglia, Michael Medaglia, Ricky Melendez, Ramon Melendez, Jr., Erich Maerz, Margaret Montanez, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes, AnneMarie Medaglia, Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes, Peter C. Milano. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Cathryn Lostrangio, Diane Lostrangio, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Cathryn Lostrangio, Diane Lostrangio, Joseph Lostrangio, Jr.. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Patricia Coloia, Rina Joy Kaufman, Rina Joy Kaufman, Paul Lavelle, David Lebor, Kathleen Palacio, Rina Joy Kaufman added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Patricia Coloia, Rina Joy Kaufman, Rina Joy Kaufman, Paul Lavelle, David Lebor, Kathleen Palacio, Rina Joy Kaufman. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Loren Rosenthal. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Relatedness Statement, #4 Rule 7.1 Statement, #5 Summons)(Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 12/27/2018 (pc).
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 12/24/2018. (dnh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenthal v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Rosenthal
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mandelino
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac Romero
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Mistrulli-Rosser
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Rosario
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Melendez
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Reiss
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Melendez
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Melendez, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Medaglia-Dellapenna
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Cofresi
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter C. Milano
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Mistrulli
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Martinez
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Model
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Montanez
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Stallworth
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AnneMarie Medaglia
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Reiss
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mistrulli
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erich Maerz
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maranda Ratchford
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MaryEllen Medaglia
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney M. Ratchford
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Diaz
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathryn Lostrangio
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent S. Papasso, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Corbett-Moran
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Reiss
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lavelle
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Captain Gary Reiss
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Rowe
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Milano
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Pino
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Papasso
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Montoya
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Mistrulli
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Nacke Jacobs
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Reiss
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mistrulli-Cantone
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Coloia
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Pino
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philomena Mistrulli
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Rogers
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Lovett
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelia Moreno
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Nicole Rodak
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Perry
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Mandelino
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rina Joy Kaufman
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lostrangio, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Medaglia-Cordes
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Lostrangio
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Ognibene
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Baker
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Stallworth
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mandelino, Sr.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ruben Moreno
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mandelino, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Romero
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Allen Nacke
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Rosenthal
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Christian
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Medaglia
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Cofresi
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Medaglia
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Reiss
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshae R. Ratchford
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lambert
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Palacio
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Melendez
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lebor
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Marie Rodak
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?