Allen v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Laurie Allen, Reinaldo Gongora, John Esposito, Edith Fezzuoglio, Vincent Tulino, Seth Sirota, James Kucinski, Arkadiy Berezovskiy, Christine Esposito, James Coyle, Peter Mele, Wayne Preston, Orest Daszo, Edward Tierney, Richard Casta, Judith Davis, Daniel O'Neil, Richard Sanchez, Sr., Elio Caramb, Eric Cora, Anibal Pichardo, Ralph L. Tedesco, Daniel Ricciardi, Patrick McMahon, Adelia Ramos de Almeida, Michael Mclaughlin, James Hedge, Scott R. Frae, Donald Campbell, Glenn Curtis, Christian Roesch, William Williams, Richard Howe, Randall Stone, Tibor Sekan, Enrique Gonzalez, James O'Garro, Raffaela Caputo, Robert Foley, John Gleason, Christopher Garbarino, Joseph Cama, Abraham Solis, Derek Scibetta, Gerald Showers, James F. McNally, Charles Wells, Salvatore Longo, Salvatore Randazzo, Brian Fleischmann, Donald Goodwin, Jr., William Bost, Evelyn Barrett, Lenny Rintel, Veronica Richards, Marie Celestin, John Sangemino, Matthew Baker, Marino Nunez, Bryan Violetto, Joseph Mogenis, Sharon Stonkey, George Schreiner, Donato Siciliano, Scott Marshall, Dennis Yarczower, Elisa Mizerany, Kevin Russell, Gary Bakalar, Eneida Gongora, Emmanuel Serrano, Lisa Andolg, Stephen Walsh, Kenneth Sumsky, Philip Medeiros, Stewart Rothman, Aurelio DeLa Rosa, Steven Shaughnessy, Rosalind Urbont, Paul Strafaci, Jose Torres, Stephen Connelly, James Jackson, John J. Wilson, Helena Duvivier, Pamela Lupo, Debra Baron, Thomas Silecchia, Charles Feyh, Michael Marino, Thomas J. Pena, Giuseppe Tirone, Anna Nierman, Eric Knutsen, John Distefano, Brien P. McGuire, John Jensen, John M. Dillon, Marie Kernisant and William Wager
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11868
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by Bryan Violetto; Scott Marshall; Joseph Cama; Philip Medeiros; Seth Sirota; Joseph Mogenis; Edith Fezzuoglio; Derek Scibetta; Christian Roesch; James Kucinski; William Wager; Wayne Preston; John M. Dillon; Charles Feyh; Donato Siciliano; Giuseppe Tirone; Steven Shaughnessy; Lisa Andolg; Arkadiy Berezovskiy; James Jackson; George Schreiner; Eric Knutsen; James Hedge; Christopher Garbarino; Daniel Ricciardi; William Bost; Robert Foley; Glenn Curtis; Pamela Lupo; Vincent Tulino; Michael Marino; Helena Duvivier; Aurelio DeLa Rosa; Rosalind Urbont; Anna Nierman; Raffaela Caputo; Randall Stone; Adelia Ramos de Almeida; Salvatore Longo; Reinaldo Gongora; Matthew Baker; Brien P. McGuire; Richard Howe; Debra Baron; Paul Strafaci; James Coyle; Christine Esposito; John Gleason; Stephen Connelly; Donald Campbell; Michael Mclaughlin; Marie Celestin; Orest Daszo; James F. McNally; Dennis Yarczower; Thomas Silecchia; Gary Bakalar; Kenneth Sumsky; Thomas J. Pena; Laurie Allen; William Williams; Charles Wells; Evelyn Barrett; Kevin Russell; Elisa Mizerany; Daniel O'Neil; Veronica Richards; Elio Caramb; Gerald Showers; Sharon Stonkey; Abraham Solis; Emmanuel Serrano; Stewart Rothman; Judith Davis; Brian Fleischmann; Marino Nunez; John Sangemino; Peter Mele; John Distefano; Jose Torres; Tibor Sekan; Eric Cora; Eneida Gongora; Marie Kernisant; Lenny Rintel; Enrique Gonzalez; Anibal Pichardo; Stephen Walsh; James O'Garro; Richard Casta; John Jensen; Patrick McMahon; John J. Wilson; Scott R. Frae; Ralph L. Tedesco; Richard Sanchez, Sr.; John Esposito; Edward Tierney; Donald Goodwin, Jr. ; Salvatore Randazzo. (Kreindler, James)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Laurie Allen, Lisa Andolg, Gary Bakalar, Matthew Baker, Debra Baron, Evelyn Barrett, Arkadiy Berezovskiy, William Bost, Joseph Cama, Donald Campbell, Raffaela Caputo, Elio Caramb, Richard Casta, Marie Celestin, Stephen Connelly, Eric Cora, James Coyle, Glenn Curtis, Orest Daszo, Judith Davis, Aurelio DeLa Rosa, John M. Dillon, John Distefano, Helena Duvivier, Christine Esposito, John Esposito, Charles Feyh, Edith Fezzuoglio, Brian Fleischmann, Robert Foley, Scott R. Frae, Christopher Garbarino, John Gleason, Eneida Gongora, Reinaldo Gongora, Enrique Gonzalez, Donald Goodwin, Jr., James Hedge, Richard Howe, James Jackson, John Jensen, Marie Kernisant, Eric Knutsen, James Kucinski, Salvatore Longo, Pamela Lupo, Michael Marino, Scott Marshall, Brien P. McGuire, Patrick McMahon, James F. McNally, Michael Mclaughlin, Philip Medeiros, Peter Mele, Elisa Mizerany, Joseph Mogenis, Anna Nierman, Marino Nunez, James O'Garro, Daniel O'Neil, Thomas J. Pena, Anibal Pichardo, Wayne Preston, Adelia Ramos de Almeida, Salvatore Randazzo, Daniel Ricciardi, Veronica Richards, Lenny Rintel, Christian Roesch, Stewart Rothman, Kevin Russell, Richard Sanchez, Sr., John Sangemino, George Schreiner, Derek Scibetta, Tibor Sekan, Emmanuel Serrano, Steven Shaughnessy, Gerald Showers, Donato Siciliano, Thomas Silecchia, Seth Sirota, Abraham Solis, Randall Stone, Sharon Stonkey, Paul Strafaci, Kenneth Sumsky, Ralph L. Tedesco, Edward Tierney, Giuseppe Tirone, Jose Torres, Vincent Tulino, Rosalind Urbont, Bryan Violetto, William Wager, Stephen Walsh, Charles Wells, William Williams, John J. Wilson, Dennis Yarczower.(Alexander, Brian)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Bryan Violetto, Scott Marshall, Joseph Cama, Philip Medeiros, Seth Sirota, Joseph Mogenis, Edith Fezzuoglio, Derek Scibetta, Christian Roesch, James Kucinski, William Wager, Wayne Preston, John M. Dillon, Charles Feyh, Donato Siciliano, Giuseppe Tirone, Steven Shaughnessy, Lisa Andolg, Arkadiy Berezovskiy, James Jackson, George Schreiner, Eric Knutsen, James Hedge, Christopher Garbarino, Daniel Ricciardi, William Bost, Robert Foley, Glenn Curtis, Pamela Lupo, Vincent Tulino, Michael Marino, Helena Duvivier, Aurelio DeLa Rosa, Rosalind Urbont, Anna Nierman, Raffaela Caputo, Randall Stone, Adelia Ramos de Almeida, Salvatore Longo, Reinaldo Gongora, Matthew Baker, Brien P. McGuire, Richard Howe, Debra Baron, Paul Strafaci, James Coyle, Christine Esposito, John Gleason, Stephen Connelly, Donald Campbell, Michael Mclaughlin, Marie Celestin, Orest Daszo, James F. McNally, Dennis Yarczower, Thomas Silecchia, Gary Bakalar, Kenneth Sumsky, Thomas J. Pena, Laurie Allen, William Williams, Charles Wells, Evelyn Barrett, Kevin Russell, Elisa Mizerany, Daniel O'Neil, Veronica Richards, Elio Caramb, Gerald Showers, Sharon Stonkey, Abraham Solis, Emmanuel Serrano, Stewart Rothman, Judith Davis, Brian Fleischmann, Marino Nunez, John Sangemino, Peter Mele, John Distefano, Jose Torres, Tibor Sekan, Eric Cora, Eneida Gongora, Marie Kernisant, Lenny Rintel, Enrique Gonzalez, Anibal Pichardo, Stephen Walsh, James O'Garro, Richard Casta, John Jensen, Patrick McMahon, John J. Wilson, Scott R. Frae, Ralph L. Tedesco, Richard Sanchez, Sr., John Esposito, Edward Tierney, Donald Goodwin, Jr., Salvatore Randazzo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Alexander, Brian)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Scott Marshall, Joseph Cama, Philip Medeiros, Joseph Mogenis, Edith Fezzuoglio, James Kucinski, Wayne Preston, John M. Dillon, Charles Feyh, Lisa Andolg, Arkadiy Berezovskiy, James Jackson, Eric Knutsen, James Hedge, Christopher Garbarino, Daniel Ricciardi, William Bost, Robert Foley, Glenn Curtis, Pamela Lupo, Michael Marino, Helena Duvivier, Aurelio DeLa Rosa, Anna Nierman, Raffaela Caputo, Adelia Ramos de Almeida, Salvatore Longo, Reinaldo Gongora, Matthew Baker, Brien P. McGuire, Richard Howe, Debra Baron, James Coyle, Christine Esposito, John Gleason, Stephen Connelly, Donald Campbell, Michael Mclaughlin, Marie Celestin, Orest Daszo, James F. McNally, Gary Bakalar, Thomas J. Pena, Laurie Allen, Evelyn Barrett, Elisa Mizerany, Daniel O'Neil, Veronica Richards, Elio Caramb, Judith Davis, Brian Fleischmann, Marino Nunez, Peter Mele, John Distefano, Eric Cora, Eneida Gongora, Marie Kernisant, Lenny Rintel, Enrique Gonzalez, Anibal Pichardo, James O'Garro, Richard Casta, John Jensen, Patrick McMahon, Scott R. Frae, John Esposito, Donald Goodwin, Jr., Salvatore Randazzo, William Wager, Richard Sanchez, Sr., William Williams, Emmanuel Serrano, Bryan Violetto, John Sangemino, Rosalind Urbont, John J. Wilson, Jose Torres, Christian Roesch, Giuseppe Tirone, Stewart Rothman, Charles Wells, Kenneth Sumsky, Donato Siciliano, Gerald Showers, Steven Shaughnessy, Edward Tierney, Thomas Silecchia, Derek Scibetta, Sharon Stonkey, Dennis Yarczower, Seth Sirota, Vincent Tulino, Paul Strafaci, Stephen Walsh, Randall Stone, Ralph L. Tedesco, Abraham Solis, George Schreiner, Kevin Russell, Tibor Sekan added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Scott Marshall, Joseph Cama, Philip Medeiros, Joseph Mogenis, Edith Fezzuoglio, James Kucinski, Wayne Preston, John M. Dillon, Charles Feyh, Lisa Andolg, Arkadiy Berezovskiy, James Jackson, Eric Knutsen, James Hedge, Christopher Garbarino, Daniel Ricciardi, William Bost, Robert Foley, Glenn Curtis, Pamela Lupo, Michael Marino, Helena Duvivier, Aurelio DeLa Rosa, Anna Nierman, Raffaela Caputo, Adelia Ramos de Almeida, Salvatore Longo, Reinaldo Gongora, Matthew Baker, Brien P. McGuire, Richard Howe, Debra Baron, James Coyle, Christine Esposito, John Gleason, Stephen Connelly, Donald Campbell, Michael Mclaughlin, Marie Celestin, Orest Daszo, James F. McNally, Gary Bakalar, Thomas J. Pena, Laurie Allen, Evelyn Barrett, Elisa Mizerany, Daniel O'Neil, Veronica Richards, Elio Caramb, Judith Davis, Brian Fleischmann, Marino Nunez, Peter Mele, John Distefano, Eric Cora, Eneida Gongora, Marie Kernisant, Lenny Rintel, Enrique Gonzalez, Anibal Pichardo, James O'Garro, Richard Casta, John Jensen, Patrick McMahon, Scott R. Frae, John Esposito, Donald Goodwin, Jr., Salvatore Randazzo, William Wager, Richard Sanchez, Sr., William Williams, Emmanuel Serrano, Bryan Violetto, John Sangemino, Rosalind Urbont, John J. Wilson, Jose Torres, Christian Roesch, Giuseppe Tirone, Stewart Rothman, Charles Wells, Kenneth Sumsky, Donato Siciliano, Gerald Showers, Steven Shaughnessy, Edward Tierney, Thomas Silecchia, Derek Scibetta, Sharon Stonkey, Dennis Yarczower, Seth Sirota, Vincent Tulino, Paul Strafaci, Stephen Walsh, Randall Stone, Ralph L. Tedesco, Abraham Solis, George Schreiner, Kevin Russell, Tibor Sekan. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Alexander, Brian)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Laurie Allen, Daniel O'Neil, Charles Feyh, Matthew Baker, Robert Foley, Joseph Cama, Pamela Lupo, John Esposito, Debra Baron, Christine Esposito, Salvatore Randazzo, Michael Mclaughlin, Scott R. Frae, John Distefano, Patrick McMahon, Marie Kernisant, John M. Dillon, Lisa Andolg, Brian Fleischmann, James Jackson, Philip Medeiros, Salvatore Longo, James F. McNally, Marino Nunez, Joseph Mogenis, Orest Daszo, Elio Caramb, Raffaela Caputo, Enrique Gonzalez, Donald Campbell, Veronica Richards, Richard Casta, Aurelio DeLa Rosa, Daniel Ricciardi, Michael Marino, Anna Nierman, Arkadiy Berezovskiy, James Coyle, James Kucinski, Marie Celestin, Christopher Garbarino, James O'Garro, Helena Duvivier, James Hedge, John Jensen, Glenn Curtis, Eric Knutsen, Donald Goodwin, Jr., Edith Fezzuoglio, Anibal Pichardo, Richard Howe, Wayne Preston, Scott Marshall, Thomas J. Pena, Eric Cora, Reinaldo Gongora, Judith Davis, Stephen Connelly, Gary Bakalar, Evelyn Barrett, Lenny Rintel, Peter Mele, Elisa Mizerany, Brien P. McGuire, William Bost, John Gleason, Eneida Gongora, Adelia Ramos de Almeida added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Laurie Allen, Daniel O'Neil, Charles Feyh, Matthew Baker, Robert Foley, Joseph Cama, Pamela Lupo, John Esposito, Debra Baron, Christine Esposito, Salvatore Randazzo, Michael Mclaughlin, Scott R. Frae, John Distefano, Patrick McMahon, Marie Kernisant, John M. Dillon, Lisa Andolg, Brian Fleischmann, James Jackson, Philip Medeiros, Salvatore Longo, James F. McNally, Marino Nunez, Joseph Mogenis, Orest Daszo, Elio Caramb, Raffaela Caputo, Enrique Gonzalez, Donald Campbell, Veronica Richards, Richard Casta, Aurelio DeLa Rosa, Daniel Ricciardi, Michael Marino, Anna Nierman, Arkadiy Berezovskiy, James Coyle, James Kucinski, Marie Celestin, Christopher Garbarino, James O'Garro, Helena Duvivier, James Hedge, John Jensen, Glenn Curtis, Eric Knutsen, Donald Goodwin, Jr., Edith Fezzuoglio, Anibal Pichardo, Richard Howe, Wayne Preston, Scott Marshall, Thomas J. Pena, Eric Cora, Reinaldo Gongora, Judith Davis, Stephen Connelly, Gary Bakalar, Evelyn Barrett, Lenny Rintel, Peter Mele, Elisa Mizerany, Brien P. McGuire, William Bost, John Gleason, Eneida Gongora, Adelia Ramos de Almeida. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Alexander, Brian)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570(GBD)(SN). Document filed by Laurie Allen.(Alexander, Brian)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Alexander, Brian)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Brian J. Alexander, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN). (dnh)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Brian J. Alexander. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brian J. Alexander re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (dnh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16069571)Document filed by Laurie Allen. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Alexander, Brian) Modified on 12/18/2018 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Allen
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinaldo Gongora
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Esposito
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Fezzuoglio
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Tulino
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Sirota
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kucinski
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkadiy Berezovskiy
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Esposito
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Coyle
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Mele
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Preston
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orest Daszo
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Tierney
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Casta
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Davis
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel O'Neil
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sanchez, Sr.
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elio Caramb
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Cora
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal Pichardo
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph L. Tedesco
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ricciardi
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick McMahon
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelia Ramos de Almeida
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mclaughlin
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hedge
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott R. Frae
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Campbell
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Curtis
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Roesch
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Williams
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Howe
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Stone
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tibor Sekan
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Gonzalez
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Garro
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raffaela Caputo
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Foley
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gleason
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Garbarino
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cama
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Solis
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Scibetta
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Showers
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. McNally
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wells
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Longo
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Randazzo
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fleischmann
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Goodwin, Jr.
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bost
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Barrett
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenny Rintel
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Richards
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Celestin
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sangemino
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Baker
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marino Nunez
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Violetto
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mogenis
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Stonkey
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Schreiner
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donato Siciliano
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Marshall
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Yarczower
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Mizerany
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Russell
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bakalar
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eneida Gongora
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Serrano
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Andolg
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Walsh
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Sumsky
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Medeiros
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Rothman
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelio DeLa Rosa
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Shaughnessy
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Urbont
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Strafaci
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Torres
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Connelly
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jackson
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Wilson
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Duvivier
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lupo
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Baron
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Silecchia
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Feyh
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Marino
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Pena
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuseppe Tirone
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Nierman
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Knutsen
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Distefano
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brien P. McGuire
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jensen
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Dillon
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Kernisant
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wager
Represented By: Brian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?