Bonomo et al v. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Michelle L Hornback, Joanne Cherry, Matthew Carlone, Francine Calabro, Harry Massa, Martin Armstrong, Anastasia Bowen, Daniel Calabro, James D Carlson, Yolanda Castano, Tammy M Chada Merritt, Virgina Chada, Jamie Cachia, Eugene Bowen, Kizzy Williams, Marguerite Calixte-Williams, Terra Williams, Crystal Ortiz, Nina DeSouza, Darien P Cherry, Nora M Callahan, Evita Ortiz, Janet Cascio, Margarita Perez, Angenette Cash, Kaream Williams, Diana P Castano, Eugene Bowen, Jr, James M Carson, Peter Callahan, Ana L Centeno, Rose Callahan, Alexander Calabro, Joseph Cachia, Anna M Bright, Claudia Rodriguez, Tereza C Antonios, Lenore B Williams, Paul Cascio, Juliana Rose Bono, Francisco Castano, Angeles Rivera, Angelina Camaj, Jeffery M Bright, Carrie Tillman, Havier Massa, Maria Caballero, Peter Anderson Calix, Freddye Jean Carter-Perry, Joseph Anthony Bono, Sabrina C Spencer, Dior P Gordon, Nicholas A Carlone, Harry Callahan, Alexandra Bowen, Evan Cascio, Andrea Caballero, Jesus Centeno, Maria Zayas, Stephen J Carlson, Antonia Torres Ayala, Julio Masa Lebron, Baraheen Ashrafi, Kimberly R Carlson, Margarite Bonomo, Rhonda Branch, Vincent Camaj, Darrick Carlone, Debra Carson, Selena Cherry-Daniel, Katrina Camaj, Remy Williams, Daniel R Carlson, Andres Caballero, Angela Callahan, Carl Calabro, Fahina Chowdhury, Steven Castano, Kathryn B Agugliaro and Claudia Caballero
Defendant: Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11885
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Kathryn B Agugliaro, Tereza C Antonios, Martin Armstrong, Baraheen Ashrafi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mohammed S. Chowdhury, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi(individually, as surviving spouse of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi (as Natural Guardian of FC, a minor, as surviving child of Mohammed S. Chowdhury ), Antonia Torres Ayala, Joseph Anthony Bono, Juliana Rose Bono, Margarite Bonomo(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank J. Bonomo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank J. Bonomo), Margarite Bonomo(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank J. Bonomo), Alexandra Bowen, Anastasia Bowen, Eugene Bowen(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Bowen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Bowen), Eugene Bowen, Jr, Eugene Bowen(individually, as surviving spouse of Donna Bowen), Rhonda Branch, Anna M Bright, Jeffery M Bright(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary L. Bright, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary L. Bright), Jeffery M Bright(individually, as surviving sibling of Gary L. Bright), Andrea Caballero, Andres Caballero, Maria Caballero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel M. Caballero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Daniel M. Caballero), Maria Caballero(individually, as surviving parent of Daniel M. Caballero), Claudia Caballero, Jamie Cachia, Joseph Cachia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Cachia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brian Cachia), Joseph Cachia(individually, as surviving parent of Brian Cachia), Alexander Calabro, Carl Calabro, Daniel Calabro, Francine Calabro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore B. Calabro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore B. Calabro), Francine Calabro(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore B. Calabro), Peter Anderson Calix, Marguerite Calixte-Williams(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Felix Calixte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Felix Calixte), Marguerite Calixte-Williams(individually, as surviving parent of Felix Calixte), Angela Callahan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis J. Callahan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francis J. Callahan), Angela Callahan(individually, as surviving spouse of Francis J. Callahan), Harry Callahan, Nora M Callahan, Peter Callahan, Rose Callahan, Angelina Camaj, Katrina Camaj(individually, as surviving spouse of Roko Camaj), Katrina Camaj(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roko Camaj, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roko Camaj), Vincent Camaj, Darrick Carlone, Matthew Carlone, Nicholas A Carlone, Daniel R Carlson, James D Carlson, Kimberly R Carlson, Stephen J Carlson, Debra Carson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Carson Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Carson Jr.), Debra Carson(individually, as surviving spouse of James Carson Jr.), James M Carson, Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(individually, as surviving child of Angelene C. Carter), Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelene C. Carter, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angelene C. Carter), Evan Cascio(individually, as surviving sibling of Paul R. Cascio), Evan Cascio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul R. Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul R. Cascio), Janet Cascio, Paul Cascio, Angenette Cash, Diana P Castano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Castano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Castano), Diana P Castano(individually, as surviving spouse of Alejandro Castano), Francisco Castano, Steven Castano, Yolanda Castano, Ana L Centeno, Jesus Centeno, Virgina Chada(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Chada, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Chada), Virgina Chada(individually, as surviving spouse of John Chada), Tammy M Chada Merritt, Darien P Cherry, Joanne Cherry, Selena Cherry-Daniel(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Vernon P. Cherry, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel(individually, as surviving child of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ryan Cherry, deceased, the late child of Vernon P. Cherry), Fahina Chowdhury, Nina DeSouza, Dior P Gordon, Michelle L Hornback, Julio Masa Lebron, Harry Massa, Havier Massa, Crystal Ortiz, Evita Ortiz, Margarita Perez, Angeles Rivera(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana M. Centeno, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ana M. Centeno), Angeles Rivera(individually, as surviving sibling of Ana M. Centeno), Claudia Rodriguez, Sabrina C Spencer, Carrie Tillman, Kaream Williams, Kizzy Williams, Lenore B Williams, Remy Williams, Terra Williams, Maria Zayas. (Strong, Bruce)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 3/21/2019. Document filed by Peter Anderson Calix; Rhonda Branch; Sabrina C Spencer; Selena Cherry-Daniel(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Vernon P. Cherry, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Vernon P. Cherry); Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(individually, as surviving child of Angelene C. Carter); Diana P Castano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Castano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Castano); Eugene Bowen(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Bowen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Bowen); Ana L Centeno; Francine Calabro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore B. Calabro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore B. Calabro); Andres Caballero; Claudia Rodriguez; Anna M Bright; Peter Callahan; Evita Ortiz; Jesus Centeno; Francisco Castano; Alexander Calabro; Daniel R Carlson; Baraheen Ashrafi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mohammed S. Chowdhury, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mohammed S. Chowdhury); Debra Carson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Carson Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Carson Jr.); Kathryn B Agugliaro ; Maria Caballero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel M. Caballero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Daniel M. Caballero); Darien P Cherry; Selena Cherry-Daniel(individually, as surviving child of Vernon P. Cherry); Claudia Caballero ; Eugene Bowen, Jr; Marguerite Calixte-Williams(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Felix Calixte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Felix Calixte); Martin Armstrong; Dior P Gordon; Joanne Cherry; Antonia Torres Ayala; Vincent Camaj; Virgina Chada(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Chada, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Chada); Angeles Rivera(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana M. Centeno, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ana M. Centeno); Selena Cherry-Daniel (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ryan Cherry, deceased, the late child of Vernon P. Cherry); Angenette Cash; Carl Calabro; Tereza C Antonios; Kizzy Williams; Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelene C. Carter, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angelene C. Carter); Baraheen Ashrafi (as Natural Guardian of FC, a minor, as surviving child of Mohammed S. Chowdhury ); Carrie Tillman; Stephen J Carlson; Angela Callahan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis J. Callahan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francis J. Callahan); Michelle L Hornback; Maria Zayas; Nicholas A Carlone; Debra Carson(individually, as surviving spouse of James Carson Jr.); Kimberly R Carlson; Yolanda Castano; Evan Cascio(individually, as surviving sibling of Paul R. Cascio); Rose Callahan; Angeles Rivera(individually, as surviving sibling of Ana M. Centeno); Virgina Chada(individually, as surviving spouse of John Chada); Maria Caballero(individually, as surviving parent of Daniel M. Caballero); James M Carson; Crystal Ortiz; Evan Cascio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul R. Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul R. Cascio); Diana P Castano(individually, as surviving spouse of Alejandro Castano); Paul Cascio; Margarite Bonomo(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank J. Bonomo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank J. Bonomo); Andrea Caballero; Margarite Bonomo(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank J. Bonomo); Tammy M Chada Merritt; Marguerite Calixte-Williams(individually, as surviving parent of Felix Calixte); Harry Massa; Francine Calabro(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore B. Calabro); Daniel Calabro; Havier Massa; Steven Castano; Angela Callahan(individually, as surviving spouse of Francis J. Callahan); Jeffery M Bright(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary L. Bright, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary L. Bright); James D Carlson; Janet Cascio; Angelina Camaj; Joseph Cachia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Cachia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brian Cachia); Darrick Carlone; Julio Masa Lebron; Jamie Cachia; Nora M Callahan; Katrina Camaj(individually, as surviving spouse of Roko Camaj); Joseph Cachia(individually, as surviving parent of Brian Cachia); Jeffery M Bright(individually, as surviving sibling of Gary L. Bright); Fahina Chowdhury; Eugene Bowen(individually, as surviving spouse of Donna Bowen); Margarita Perez; Terra Williams; Joseph Anthony Bono; Baraheen Ashrafi(individually, as surviving spouse of Mohammed S. Chowdhury); Anastasia Bowen; Matthew Carlone; Katrina Camaj(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roko Camaj, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roko Camaj); Kaream Williams; Alexandra Bowen; Juliana Rose Bono; Nina DeSouza; Remy Williams; Harry Callahan; Lenore B Williams. (Goldman, Jerry)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 7, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 7, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia. (pne)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570. Document filed by Kathryn B Agugliaro, Tereza C Antonios, Martin Armstrong, Baraheen Ashrafi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mohammed S. Chowdhury, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi(individually, as surviving spouse of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi (as Natural Guardian of FC, a minor, as surviving child of Mohammed S. Chowdhury ), Antonia Torres Ayala, Joseph Anthony Bono, Juliana Rose Bono, Margarite Bonomo(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank J. Bonomo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank J. Bonomo), Margarite Bonomo(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank J. Bonomo), Alexandra Bowen, Anastasia Bowen, Eugene Bowen(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Bowen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Bowen), Eugene Bowen, Jr, Eugene Bowen(individually, as surviving spouse of Donna Bowen), Rhonda Branch, Anna M Bright, Jeffery M Bright(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary L. Bright, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary L. Bright), Jeffery M Bright(individually, as surviving sibling of Gary L. Bright), Andrea Caballero, Andres Caballero, Maria Caballero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel M. Caballero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Daniel M. Caballero), Maria Caballero(individually, as surviving parent of Daniel M. Caballero), Claudia Caballero, Jamie Cachia, Joseph Cachia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Cachia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brian Cachia), Joseph Cachia(individually, as surviving parent of Brian Cachia), Alexander Calabro, Carl Calabro, Daniel Calabro, Francine Calabro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore B. Calabro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore B. Calabro), Francine Calabro(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore B. Calabro), Peter Anderson Calix, Marguerite Calixte-Williams(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Felix Calixte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Felix Calixte), Marguerite Calixte-Williams(individually, as surviving parent of Felix Calixte), Angela Callahan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis J. Callahan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francis J. Callahan), Angela Callahan(individually, as surviving spouse of Francis J. Callahan), Harry Callahan, Nora M Callahan, Peter Callahan, Rose Callahan, Angelina Camaj, Katrina Camaj(individually, as surviving spouse of Roko Camaj), Katrina Camaj(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roko Camaj, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roko Camaj), Vincent Camaj, Darrick Carlone, Matthew Carlone, Nicholas A Carlone, Daniel R Carlson, James D Carlson, Kimberly R Carlson, Stephen J Carlson, Debra Carson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Carson Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Carson Jr.), Debra Carson(individually, as surviving spouse of James Carson Jr.), James M Carson, Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(individually, as surviving child of Angelene C. Carter), Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelene C. Carter, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angelene C. Carter), Evan Cascio(individually, as surviving sibling of Paul R. Cascio), Evan Cascio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul R. Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul R. Cascio), Janet Cascio, Paul Cascio, Angenette Cash, Diana P Castano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Castano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Castano), Diana P Castano(individually, as surviving spouse of Alejandro Castano), Francisco Castano, Steven Castano, Yolanda Castano, Ana L Centeno, Jesus Centeno, Virgina Chada(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Chada, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Chada), Virgina Chada(individually, as surviving spouse of John Chada), Tammy M Chada Merritt, Darien P Cherry, Joanne Cherry, Selena Cherry-Daniel(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Vernon P. Cherry, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel(individually, as surviving child of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ryan Cherry, deceased, the late child of Vernon P. Cherry), Fahina Chowdhury, Nina DeSouza, Dior P Gordon, Michelle L Hornback, Julio Masa Lebron, Harry Massa, Havier Massa, Crystal Ortiz, Evita Ortiz, Margarita Perez, Angeles Rivera(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana M. Centeno, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ana M. Centeno), Angeles Rivera(individually, as surviving sibling of Ana M. Centeno), Claudia Rodriguez, Sabrina C Spencer, Carrie Tillman, Kaream Williams, Kizzy Williams, Lenore B Williams, Remy Williams, Terra Williams, Maria Zayas.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Kathryn B Agugliaro, Tereza C Antonios, Martin Armstrong, Baraheen Ashrafi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mohammed S. Chowdhury, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi(individually, as surviving spouse of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi (as Natural Guardian of FC, a minor, as surviving child of Mohammed S. Chowdhury ), Antonia Torres Ayala, Joseph Anthony Bono, Juliana Rose Bono, Margarite Bonomo(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank J. Bonomo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank J. Bonomo), Margarite Bonomo(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank J. Bonomo), Alexandra Bowen, Anastasia Bowen, Eugene Bowen(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Bowen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Bowen), Eugene Bowen, Jr, Eugene Bowen(individually, as surviving spouse of Donna Bowen), Rhonda Branch, Anna M Bright, Jeffery M Bright(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary L. Bright, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary L. Bright), Jeffery M Bright(individually, as surviving sibling of Gary L. Bright), Andrea Caballero, Andres Caballero, Maria Caballero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel M. Caballero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Daniel M. Caballero), Maria Caballero(individually, as surviving parent of Daniel M. Caballero), Claudia Caballero, Jamie Cachia, Joseph Cachia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Cachia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brian Cachia), Joseph Cachia(individually, as surviving parent of Brian Cachia), Alexander Calabro, Carl Calabro, Daniel Calabro, Francine Calabro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore B. Calabro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore B. Calabro), Francine Calabro(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore B. Calabro), Peter Anderson Calix, Marguerite Calixte-Williams(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Felix Calixte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Felix Calixte), Marguerite Calixte-Williams(individually, as surviving parent of Felix Calixte), Angela Callahan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis J. Callahan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francis J. Callahan), Angela Callahan(individually, as surviving spouse of Francis J. Callahan), Harry Callahan, Nora M Callahan, Peter Callahan, Rose Callahan, Angelina Camaj, Katrina Camaj(individually, as surviving spouse of Roko Camaj), Katrina Camaj(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roko Camaj, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roko Camaj), Vincent Camaj, Darrick Carlone, Matthew Carlone, Nicholas A Carlone, Daniel R Carlson, James D Carlson, Kimberly R Carlson, Stephen J Carlson, Debra Carson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Carson Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Carson Jr.), Debra Carson(individually, as surviving spouse of James Carson Jr.), James M Carson, Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(individually, as surviving child of Angelene C. Carter), Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelene C. Carter, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angelene C. Carter), Evan Cascio(individually, as surviving sibling of Paul R. Cascio), Evan Cascio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul R. Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul R. Cascio), Janet Cascio, Paul Cascio, Angenette Cash, Diana P Castano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Castano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Castano), Diana P Castano(individually, as surviving spouse of Alejandro Castano), Francisco Castano, Steven Castano, Yolanda Castano, Ana L Centeno, Jesus Centeno, Virgina Chada(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Chada, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Chada), Virgina Chada(individually, as surviving spouse of John Chada), Tammy M Chada Merritt, Darien P Cherry, Joanne Cherry, Selena Cherry-Daniel(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Vernon P. Cherry, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel(individually, as surviving child of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ryan Cherry, deceased, the late child of Vernon P. Cherry), Fahina Chowdhury, Nina DeSouza, Dior P Gordon, Michelle L Hornback, Julio Masa Lebron, Harry Massa, Havier Massa, Crystal Ortiz, Evita Ortiz, Margarita Perez, Angeles Rivera(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana M. Centeno, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ana M. Centeno), Angeles Rivera(individually, as surviving sibling of Ana M. Centeno), Claudia Rodriguez, Sabrina C Spencer, Carrie Tillman, Kaream Williams, Kizzy Williams, Lenore B Williams, Remy Williams, Terra Williams, Maria Zayas. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Peter Anderson Calix, Rhonda Branch, Sabrina C Spencer, Selena Cherry-Daniel(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Vernon P. Cherry, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Vernon P. Cherry), Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(individually, as surviving child of Angelene C. Carter), Diana P Castano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Castano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Castano), Eugene Bowen(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Bowen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Bowen), Ana L Centeno, Francine Calabro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore B. Calabro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore B. Calabro), Andres Caballero, Claudia Rodriguez, Anna M Bright, Peter Callahan, Evita Ortiz, Jesus Centeno, Francisco Castano, Alexander Calabro, Daniel R Carlson, Baraheen Ashrafi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mohammed S. Chowdhury, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Debra Carson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Carson Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Carson Jr.), Kathryn B Agugliaro, Maria Caballero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel M. Caballero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Daniel M. Caballero), Darien P Cherry, Selena Cherry-Daniel(individually, as surviving child of Vernon P. Cherry), Claudia Caballero, Eugene Bowen, Jr, Marguerite Calixte-Williams(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Felix Calixte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Felix Calixte), Martin Armstrong, Dior P Gordon, Joanne Cherry, Antonia Torres Ayala, Vincent Camaj, Virgina Chada(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Chada, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Chada), Angeles Rivera(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana M. Centeno, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ana M. Centeno), Selena Cherry-Daniel (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ryan Cherry, deceased, the late child of Vernon P. Cherry), Angenette Cash, Carl Calabro, Tereza C Antonios, Kizzy Williams, Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelene C. Carter, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angelene C. Carter), Baraheen Ashrafi (as Natural Guardian of FC, a minor, as surviving child of Mohammed S. Chowdhury ), Carrie Tillman, Stephen J Carlson, Angela Callahan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis J. Callahan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francis J. Callahan), Michelle L Hornback, Maria Zayas, Nicholas A Carlone, Debra Carson(individually, as surviving spouse of James Carson Jr.), Kimberly R Carlson, Yolanda Castano, Evan Cascio(individually, as surviving sibling of Paul R. Cascio), Rose Callahan, Angeles Rivera(individually, as surviving sibling of Ana M. Centeno), Virgina Chada(individually, as surviving spouse of John Chada), Maria Caballero(individually, as surviving parent of Daniel M. Caballero), James M Carson, Crystal Ortiz, Evan Cascio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul R. Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul R. Cascio), Diana P Castano(individually, as surviving spouse of Alejandro Castano), Paul Cascio, Margarite Bonomo(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank J. Bonomo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank J. Bonomo), Andrea Caballero, Margarite Bonomo(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank J. Bonomo), Tammy M Chada Merritt, Marguerite Calixte-Williams(individually, as surviving parent of Felix Calixte), Harry Massa, Francine Calabro(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore B. Calabro), Daniel Calabro, Havier Massa, Steven Castano, Angela Callahan(individually, as surviving spouse of Francis J. Callahan), Jeffery M Bright(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary L. Bright, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary L. Bright), James D Carlson, Janet Cascio, Angelina Camaj, Joseph Cachia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Cachia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brian Cachia), Darrick Carlone, Julio Masa Lebron, Jamie Cachia, Nora M Callahan, Katrina Camaj(individually, as surviving spouse of Roko Camaj), Joseph Cachia(individually, as surviving parent of Brian Cachia), Jeffery M Bright(individually, as surviving sibling of Gary L. Bright), Fahina Chowdhury, Eugene Bowen(individually, as surviving spouse of Donna Bowen), Margarita Perez, Terra Williams, Joseph Anthony Bono, Baraheen Ashrafi(individually, as surviving spouse of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Anastasia Bowen, Matthew Carlone, Katrina Camaj(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roko Camaj, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roko Camaj), Kaream Williams, Alexandra Bowen, Juliana Rose Bono, Nina DeSouza, Remy Williams, Harry Callahan, Lenore B Williams.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Kathryn B Agugliaro, Claudia Caballero added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.Document filed by Kathryn B Agugliaro, Claudia Caballero. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $999999999000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000;. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the Statement of Relatedness;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties, Kathryn B. Agugliaro with party text 'individually, as surviving parent of Frant J. Bonomo', Claudia Caballero with party text 'individually, as surviving sibling of Daniel m. Caballero'; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570. Document filed by Tereza C Antonios, Martin Armstrong, Baraheen Ashrafi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mohammed S. Chowdhury, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi(individually, as surviving spouse of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi (as Natural Guardian of FC, a minor, as surviving child of Mohammed S. Chowdhury ), Antonia Torres Ayala, Joseph Anthony Bono, Juliana Rose Bono, Margarite Bonomo(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank J. Bonomo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank J. Bonomo), Margarite Bonomo(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank J. Bonomo), Alexandra Bowen, Anastasia Bowen, Eugene Bowen(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Bowen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Bowen), Eugene Bowen, Jr, Eugene Bowen(individually, as surviving spouse of Donna Bowen), Rhonda Branch, Anna M Bright, Jeffery M Bright(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary L. Bright, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary L. Bright), Jeffery M Bright(individually, as surviving sibling of Gary L. Bright), Andrea Caballero, Andres Caballero, Maria Caballero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel M. Caballero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Daniel M. Caballero), Maria Caballero(individually, as surviving parent of Daniel M. Caballero), Jamie Cachia, Joseph Cachia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Cachia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brian Cachia), Joseph Cachia(individually, as surviving parent of Brian Cachia), Alexander Calabro, Carl Calabro, Daniel Calabro, Francine Calabro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore B. Calabro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore B. Calabro), Francine Calabro(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore B. Calabro), Peter Anderson Calix, Marguerite Calixte-Williams(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Felix Calixte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Felix Calixte), Marguerite Calixte-Williams(individually, as surviving parent of Felix Calixte), Angela Callahan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis J. Callahan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francis J. Callahan), Angela Callahan(individually, as surviving spouse of Francis J. Callahan), Harry Callahan, Nora M Callahan, Peter Callahan, Rose Callahan, Angelina Camaj, Katrina Camaj(individually, as surviving spouse of Roko Camaj), Katrina Camaj(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roko Camaj, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roko Camaj), Vincent Camaj, Darrick Carlone, Matthew Carlone, Nicholas A Carlone, Daniel R Carlson, James D Carlson, Kimberly R Carlson, Stephen J Carlson, Debra Carson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Carson Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Carson Jr.), Debra Carson(individually, as surviving spouse of James Carson Jr.), James M Carson, Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(individually, as surviving child of Angelene C. Carter), Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelene C. Carter, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angelene C. Carter), Evan Cascio(individually, as surviving sibling of Paul R. Cascio), Evan Cascio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul R. Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul R. Cascio), Janet Cascio, Paul Cascio, Angenette Cash, Diana P Castano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Castano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Castano), Diana P Castano(individually, as surviving spouse of Alejandro Castano), Francisco Castano, Steven Castano, Yolanda Castano, Ana L Centeno, Jesus Centeno, Virgina Chada(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Chada, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Chada), Virgina Chada(individually, as surviving spouse of John Chada), Tammy M Chada Merritt, Darien P Cherry, Joanne Cherry, Selena Cherry-Daniel(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Vernon P. Cherry, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel(individually, as surviving child of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ryan Cherry, deceased, the late child of Vernon P. Cherry), Fahina Chowdhury, Nina DeSouza, Dior P Gordon, Michelle L Hornback, Julio Masa Lebron, Harry Massa, Havier Massa, Crystal Ortiz, Evita Ortiz, Margarita Perez, Angeles Rivera(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana M. Centeno, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ana M. Centeno), Angeles Rivera(individually, as surviving sibling of Ana M. Centeno), Claudia Rodriguez, Sabrina C Spencer, Carrie Tillman, Kaream Williams, Kizzy Williams, Lenore B Williams, Remy Williams, Terra Williams, Maria Zayas.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Tereza C Antonios, Martin Armstrong, Baraheen Ashrafi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mohammed S. Chowdhury, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi(individually, as surviving spouse of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Baraheen Ashrafi (as Natural Guardian of FC, a minor, as surviving child of Mohammed S. Chowdhury ), Antonia Torres Ayala, Joseph Anthony Bono, Juliana Rose Bono, Margarite Bonomo(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank J. Bonomo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank J. Bonomo), Margarite Bonomo(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank J. Bonomo), Alexandra Bowen, Anastasia Bowen, Eugene Bowen(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Bowen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Bowen), Eugene Bowen, Jr, Eugene Bowen(individually, as surviving spouse of Donna Bowen), Rhonda Branch, Anna M Bright, Jeffery M Bright(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary L. Bright, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary L. Bright), Jeffery M Bright(individually, as surviving sibling of Gary L. Bright), Andrea Caballero, Andres Caballero, Maria Caballero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel M. Caballero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Daniel M. Caballero), Maria Caballero(individually, as surviving parent of Daniel M. Caballero), Jamie Cachia, Joseph Cachia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Cachia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brian Cachia), Joseph Cachia(individually, as surviving parent of Brian Cachia), Alexander Calabro, Carl Calabro, Daniel Calabro, Francine Calabro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore B. Calabro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore B. Calabro), Francine Calabro(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore B. Calabro), Peter Anderson Calix, Marguerite Calixte-Williams(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Felix Calixte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Felix Calixte), Marguerite Calixte-Williams(individually, as surviving parent of Felix Calixte), Angela Callahan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis J. Callahan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francis J. Callahan), Angela Callahan(individually, as surviving spouse of Francis J. Callahan), Harry Callahan, Nora M Callahan, Peter Callahan, Rose Callahan, Angelina Camaj, Katrina Camaj(individually, as surviving spouse of Roko Camaj), Katrina Camaj(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roko Camaj, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roko Camaj), Vincent Camaj, Darrick Carlone, Matthew Carlone, Nicholas A Carlone, Daniel R Carlson, James D Carlson, Kimberly R Carlson, Stephen J Carlson, Debra Carson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Carson Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Carson Jr.), Debra Carson(individually, as surviving spouse of James Carson Jr.), James M Carson, Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(individually, as surviving child of Angelene C. Carter), Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelene C. Carter, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angelene C. Carter), Evan Cascio(individually, as surviving sibling of Paul R. Cascio), Evan Cascio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul R. Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul R. Cascio), Janet Cascio, Paul Cascio, Angenette Cash, Diana P Castano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Castano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Castano), Diana P Castano(individually, as surviving spouse of Alejandro Castano), Francisco Castano, Steven Castano, Yolanda Castano, Ana L Centeno, Jesus Centeno, Virgina Chada(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Chada, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Chada), Virgina Chada(individually, as surviving spouse of John Chada), Tammy M Chada Merritt, Darien P Cherry, Joanne Cherry, Selena Cherry-Daniel(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Vernon P. Cherry, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel(individually, as surviving child of Vernon P. Cherry), Selena Cherry-Daniel (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ryan Cherry, deceased, the late child of Vernon P. Cherry), Fahina Chowdhury, Nina DeSouza, Dior P Gordon, Michelle L Hornback, Julio Masa Lebron, Harry Massa, Havier Massa, Crystal Ortiz, Evita Ortiz, Margarita Perez, Angeles Rivera(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana M. Centeno, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ana M. Centeno), Angeles Rivera(individually, as surviving sibling of Ana M. Centeno), Claudia Rodriguez, Sabrina C Spencer, Carrie Tillman, Kaream Williams, Kizzy Williams, Lenore B Williams, Remy Williams, Terra Williams, Maria Zayas. (Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16070592)Document filed by Peter Anderson Calix, Rhonda Branch, Sabrina C Spencer, Selena Cherry-Daniel(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Vernon P. Cherry, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Vernon P. Cherry), Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(individually, as surviving child of Angelene C. Carter), Diana P Castano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alejandro Castano, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alejandro Castano), Eugene Bowen(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donna Bowen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donna Bowen), Ana L Centeno, Francine Calabro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore B. Calabro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore B. Calabro), Andres Caballero, Claudia Rodriguez, Anna M Bright, Peter Callahan, Evita Ortiz, Jesus Centeno, Francisco Castano, Alexander Calabro, Daniel R Carlson, Baraheen Ashrafi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Mohammed S. Chowdhury, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Debra Carson(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Carson Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Carson Jr.), Maria Caballero(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel M. Caballero, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Daniel M. Caballero), Darien P Cherry, Selena Cherry-Daniel(individually, as surviving child of Vernon P. Cherry), Eugene Bowen, Jr, Marguerite Calixte-Williams(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Felix Calixte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Felix Calixte), Martin Armstrong, Dior P Gordon, Joanne Cherry, Antonia Torres Ayala, Vincent Camaj, Virgina Chada(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of John Chada, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of John Chada), Angeles Rivera(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ana M. Centeno, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Ana M. Centeno), Selena Cherry-Daniel (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ryan Cherry, deceased, the late child of Vernon P. Cherry), Angenette Cash, Carl Calabro, Tereza C Antonios, Kizzy Williams, Freddye Jean Carter-Perry(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelene C. Carter, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angelene C. Carter), Baraheen Ashrafi (as Natural Guardian of FC, a minor, as surviving child of Mohammed S. Chowdhury ), Carrie Tillman, Stephen J Carlson, Angela Callahan(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Francis J. Callahan, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Francis J. Callahan), Michelle L Hornback, Maria Zayas, Nicholas A Carlone, Debra Carson(individually, as surviving spouse of James Carson Jr.), Kimberly R Carlson, Yolanda Castano, Evan Cascio(individually, as surviving sibling of Paul R. Cascio), Rose Callahan, Angeles Rivera(individually, as surviving sibling of Ana M. Centeno), Virgina Chada(individually, as surviving spouse of John Chada), Maria Caballero(individually, as surviving parent of Daniel M. Caballero), James M Carson, Crystal Ortiz, Evan Cascio(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Paul R. Cascio, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Paul R. Cascio), Diana P Castano(individually, as surviving spouse of Alejandro Castano), Paul Cascio, Margarite Bonomo(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank J. Bonomo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Frank J. Bonomo), Andrea Caballero, Margarite Bonomo(individually, as surviving spouse of Frank J. Bonomo), Tammy M Chada Merritt, Marguerite Calixte-Williams(individually, as surviving parent of Felix Calixte), Harry Massa, Francine Calabro(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore B. Calabro), Daniel Calabro, Havier Massa, Steven Castano, Angela Callahan(individually, as surviving spouse of Francis J. Callahan), Jeffery M Bright(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary L. Bright, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary L. Bright), James D Carlson, Janet Cascio, Angelina Camaj, Joseph Cachia(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Cachia, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Brian Cachia), Darrick Carlone, Julio Masa Lebron, Jamie Cachia, Nora M Callahan, Katrina Camaj(individually, as surviving spouse of Roko Camaj), Joseph Cachia(individually, as surviving parent of Brian Cachia), Jeffery M Bright(individually, as surviving sibling of Gary L. Bright), Fahina Chowdhury, Eugene Bowen(individually, as surviving spouse of Donna Bowen), Margarita Perez, Terra Williams, Joseph Anthony Bono, Baraheen Ashrafi(individually, as surviving spouse of Mohammed S. Chowdhury), Anastasia Bowen, Matthew Carlone, Katrina Camaj(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roko Camaj, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Roko Camaj), Kaream Williams, Alexandra Bowen, Juliana Rose Bono, Nina DeSouza, Remy Williams, Harry Callahan, Lenore B Williams.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonomo et al v. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L Hornback
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Cherry
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Carlone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Calabro
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Massa
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Armstrong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Bowen
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Calabro
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Carlson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Castano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy M Chada Merritt
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgina Chada
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Cachia
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Bowen
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kizzy Williams
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Calixte-Williams
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra Williams
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Ortiz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina DeSouza
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darien P Cherry
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora M Callahan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evita Ortiz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Cascio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Perez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angenette Cash
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaream Williams
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana P Castano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Bowen, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M Carson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Callahan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana L Centeno
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Callahan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Calabro
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cachia
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna M Bright
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Rodriguez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tereza C Antonios
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenore B Williams
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Cascio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliana Rose Bono
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Castano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angeles Rivera
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Camaj
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery M Bright
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Tillman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Havier Massa
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Caballero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Anderson Calix
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddye Jean Carter-Perry
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Anthony Bono
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina C Spencer
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dior P Gordon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas A Carlone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Callahan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Bowen
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Cascio
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Caballero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Centeno
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Zayas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J Carlson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Torres Ayala
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Masa Lebron
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baraheen Ashrafi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly R Carlson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarite Bonomo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Branch
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Camaj
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrick Carlone
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Carson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Cherry-Daniel
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Camaj
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remy Williams
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R Carlson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Caballero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Callahan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Calabro
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fahina Chowdhury
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Castano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn B Agugliaro
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Caballero
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?