Bobbitt et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Richard Solomon, Joseph Scattareggia, Kevin Skinner, Sharon Robinson, Victor Rodriguez, Malvin Schuster, Robert Striano, Wanda Ramos, Desmond Seville, John Silverman, Norma Scale, Estate of Salvatore Trani, Estate of Anthony Marotta, Ellen Spencer, Matthew Shafiroff, Dabs Rousseau, Eric Sabinsky, Victoria Sclafani, Sonja Gisela Sil, Shari Ricco, Estate of William Rastatter, Michael Lee Bobbitt, Fred Rubin, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Estate of Chung Lam Mui, Edward Sparrow, Jorge Quiroz, Wendy Sabinsky, John Spencer, Sandra C Reese, Estate of Warren Sulmasy, Bhaskar Sil, Nick Sacco, Estate of Mary Mavromatis, Veronica Serrone, Felipe Roman, Estate of Lorraine Rotter, Lisa Anne Striano, Tej Rana, William Streath, Ceasar Rivera, April Spates, Rosa Ramirez, Scott Resnik, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Saul Rodriguez, Pedro Salazar, Michael J Sclafani, Sylvia D Rhodes, Patricia Russell, Scott Samuels, Patricia Strizak, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Frank Saulle, Catherine Ann Sjursen, Katy Schneck, Anthony Santora, Roland Stancione, Anita Rana, Barbara Sacco, Maureen Shindle, Santhy Subramanian, Terence Stackowitz, Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, Ronald Reda, Paula Quenelle, Thomas R Rhodes, Carole Romeo, Raghunath Subramanian, Guadalupe Salazar, John Sjursen Jr., Ralph Scannapieco, James Rivera, Robert Ramirez, Alton Riddick, Kum S Lee, Winsome Rhabb, Estate of Ann Rendueles, Linda Ragan, Maria Sanabria, Paul Somerville, Pamela Stackowitz, Joseph Russell, Doris Reid, Penelope Simone, Jean Somerville, Estate of Joan Pisano, Barbara Scattareggia, Denise Rodriguez, Isaac Rhabb, Sonia Quinones, Jerone Rolle, David Schneck, Dennis Quinn, Edward Rademaker, Estate of John Cassidy, Duane Ragan, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Michael Sabo, Robert Sullivan, Judith Rubin, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually and Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11886
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 7, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 7, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (pc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Michael Lee Bobbitt, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Kum S Lee, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Paula Quenelle, Dennis Quinn, Sonia Quinones, Jorge Quiroz, Edward Rademaker, Duane Ragan, Linda Ragan, Robert Ramirez, Rosa Ramirez, Wanda Ramos, Anita Rana, Tej Rana, Ronald Reda, Sandra C Reese, Doris Reid, Scott Resnik, Isaac Rhabb, Winsome Rhabb, Sylvia D Rhodes, Thomas R Rhodes, Shari Ricco, Alton Riddick, Ceasar Rivera, James Rivera, Sharon Robinson, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Denise Rodriguez, Saul Rodriguez, Victor Rodriguez, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Jerone Rolle, Felipe Roman, Carole Romeo, Dabs Rousseau, Fred Rubin, Judith Rubin, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Joseph Russell, Patricia Russell, Eric Sabinsky, Wendy Sabinsky, Michael Sabo, Barbara Sacco, Nick Sacco, Guadalupe Salazar, Pedro Salazar, Scott Samuels, Maria Sanabria, Anthony Santora, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Frank Saulle, Norma Scale, Ralph Scannapieco, Barbara Scattareggia, Joseph Scattareggia, David Schneck, Katy Schneck, Malvin Schuster, Michael J Sclafani, Victoria Sclafani, Veronica Serrone, Desmond Seville, Matthew Shafiroff, Maureen Shindle, Bhaskar Sil, Sonja Gisela Sil, John Silverman, Penelope Simone, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Catherine Ann Sjursen, John Sjursen Jr., Kevin Skinner, Richard Solomon, Jean Somerville, Paul Somerville, Edward Sparrow, April Spates, Ellen Spencer, John Spencer, Pamela Stackowitz, Terence Stackowitz, Roland Stancione, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, William Streath, Lisa Anne Striano, Robert Striano, Patricia Strizak, Raghunath Subramanian, Santhy Subramanian, Robert Sullivan, Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually. (Hansen, Daniel)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant Name Error; Defendant name as to whom the summons is being requested on PDF must be clear. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Michael Lee Bobbitt, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Kum S Lee, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Paula Quenelle, Dennis Quinn, Sonia Quinones, Jorge Quiroz, Edward Rademaker, Duane Ragan, Linda Ragan, Robert Ramirez, Rosa Ramirez, Wanda Ramos, Anita Rana, Tej Rana, Ronald Reda, Sandra C Reese, Doris Reid, Scott Resnik, Isaac Rhabb, Winsome Rhabb, Sylvia D Rhodes, Thomas R Rhodes, Shari Ricco, Alton Riddick, Ceasar Rivera, James Rivera, Sharon Robinson, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Denise Rodriguez, Saul Rodriguez, Victor Rodriguez, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Jerone Rolle, Felipe Roman, Carole Romeo, Dabs Rousseau, Fred Rubin, Judith Rubin, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Joseph Russell, Patricia Russell, Eric Sabinsky, Wendy Sabinsky, Michael Sabo, Barbara Sacco, Nick Sacco, Guadalupe Salazar, Pedro Salazar, Scott Samuels, Maria Sanabria, Anthony Santora, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Frank Saulle, Norma Scale, Ralph Scannapieco, Barbara Scattareggia, Joseph Scattareggia, David Schneck, Katy Schneck, Malvin Schuster, Michael J Sclafani, Victoria Sclafani, Veronica Serrone, Desmond Seville, Matthew Shafiroff, Maureen Shindle, Bhaskar Sil, Sonja Gisela Sil, John Silverman, Penelope Simone, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Catherine Ann Sjursen, John Sjursen Jr., Kevin Skinner, Richard Solomon, Jean Somerville, Paul Somerville, Edward Sparrow, April Spates, Ellen Spencer, John Spencer, Pamela Stackowitz, Terence Stackowitz, Roland Stancione, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, William Streath, Lisa Anne Striano, Robert Striano, Patricia Strizak, Raghunath Subramanian, Santhy Subramanian, Robert Sullivan, Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/26/2018 (dnh).
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Kingdom of Saudi Arabia needs to be listed on the summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Daniel J. Hansen dated 12/20/2018 re: Related action. Document filed by Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Michael Lee Bobbitt, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Kum S Lee, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Paula Quenelle, Dennis Quinn, Sonia Quinones, Jorge Quiroz, Edward Rademaker, Duane Ragan, Linda Ragan, Robert Ramirez, Rosa Ramirez, Wanda Ramos, Anita Rana, Tej Rana, Ronald Reda, Sandra C Reese, Doris Reid, Scott Resnik, Isaac Rhabb, Winsome Rhabb, Sylvia D Rhodes, Thomas R Rhodes, Shari Ricco, Alton Riddick, Ceasar Rivera, James Rivera, Sharon Robinson, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Denise Rodriguez, Saul Rodriguez, Victor Rodriguez, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Jerone Rolle, Felipe Roman, Carole Romeo, Dabs Rousseau, Fred Rubin, Judith Rubin, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Joseph Russell, Patricia Russell, Eric Sabinsky, Wendy Sabinsky, Michael Sabo, Barbara Sacco, Nick Sacco, Guadalupe Salazar, Pedro Salazar, Scott Samuels, Maria Sanabria, Anthony Santora, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Frank Saulle, Norma Scale, Ralph Scannapieco, Barbara Scattareggia, Joseph Scattareggia, David Schneck, Katy Schneck, Malvin Schuster, Michael J Sclafani, Victoria Sclafani, Veronica Serrone, Desmond Seville, Matthew Shafiroff, Maureen Shindle, Bhaskar Sil, Sonja Gisela Sil, John Silverman, Penelope Simone, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Catherine Ann Sjursen, John Sjursen Jr., Kevin Skinner, Richard Solomon, Jean Somerville, Paul Somerville, Edward Sparrow, April Spates, Ellen Spencer, John Spencer, Pamela Stackowitz, Terence Stackowitz, Roland Stancione, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, William Streath, Lisa Anne Striano, Robert Striano, Patricia Strizak, Raghunath Subramanian, Santhy Subramanian, Robert Sullivan, Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Daniel J. Hansen dated 12/20/2018 re: Related action. Document filed by Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Michael Lee Bobbitt, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Kum S Lee, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Paula Quenelle, Dennis Quinn, Sonia Quinones, Jorge Quiroz, Edward Rademaker, Duane Ragan, Linda Ragan, Robert Ramirez, Rosa Ramirez, Wanda Ramos, Anita Rana, Tej Rana, Ronald Reda, Sandra C Reese, Doris Reid, Scott Resnik, Isaac Rhabb, Winsome Rhabb, Sylvia D Rhodes, Thomas R Rhodes, Shari Ricco, Alton Riddick, Ceasar Rivera, James Rivera, Sharon Robinson, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Denise Rodriguez, Saul Rodriguez, Victor Rodriguez, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Jerone Rolle, Felipe Roman, Carole Romeo, Dabs Rousseau, Fred Rubin, Judith Rubin, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Joseph Russell, Patricia Russell, Eric Sabinsky, Wendy Sabinsky, Michael Sabo, Barbara Sacco, Nick Sacco, Guadalupe Salazar, Pedro Salazar, Scott Samuels, Maria Sanabria, Anthony Santora, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Frank Saulle, Norma Scale, Ralph Scannapieco, Barbara Scattareggia, Joseph Scattareggia, David Schneck, Katy Schneck, Malvin Schuster, Michael J Sclafani, Victoria Sclafani, Veronica Serrone, Desmond Seville, Matthew Shafiroff, Maureen Shindle, Bhaskar Sil, Sonja Gisela Sil, John Silverman, Penelope Simone, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Catherine Ann Sjursen, John Sjursen Jr., Kevin Skinner, Richard Solomon, Jean Somerville, Paul Somerville, Edward Sparrow, April Spates, Ellen Spencer, John Spencer, Pamela Stackowitz, Terence Stackowitz, Roland Stancione, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, William Streath, Lisa Anne Striano, Robert Striano, Patricia Strizak, Raghunath Subramanian, Santhy Subramanian, Robert Sullivan, Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Michael Lee Bobbitt, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Kum S Lee, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Paula Quenelle, Dennis Quinn, Sonia Quinones, Jorge Quiroz, Edward Rademaker, Duane Ragan, Linda Ragan, Robert Ramirez, Rosa Ramirez, Wanda Ramos, Anita Rana, Tej Rana, Ronald Reda, Sandra C Reese, Doris Reid, Scott Resnik, Isaac Rhabb, Winsome Rhabb, Sylvia D Rhodes, Thomas R Rhodes, Shari Ricco, Alton Riddick, Ceasar Rivera, James Rivera, Sharon Robinson, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Denise Rodriguez, Saul Rodriguez, Victor Rodriguez, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Jerone Rolle, Felipe Roman, Carole Romeo, Dabs Rousseau, Fred Rubin, Judith Rubin, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Joseph Russell, Patricia Russell, Eric Sabinsky, Wendy Sabinsky, Michael Sabo, Barbara Sacco, Nick Sacco, Guadalupe Salazar, Pedro Salazar, Scott Samuels, Maria Sanabria, Anthony Santora, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Frank Saulle, Norma Scale, Ralph Scannapieco, Barbara Scattareggia, Joseph Scattareggia, David Schneck, Katy Schneck, Malvin Schuster, Michael J Sclafani, Victoria Sclafani, Veronica Serrone, Desmond Seville, Matthew Shafiroff, Maureen Shindle, Bhaskar Sil, Sonja Gisela Sil, John Silverman, Penelope Simone, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Catherine Ann Sjursen, John Sjursen Jr., Kevin Skinner, Richard Solomon, Jean Somerville, Paul Somerville, Edward Sparrow, April Spates, Ellen Spencer, John Spencer, Pamela Stackowitz, Terence Stackowitz, Roland Stancione, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, William Streath, Lisa Anne Striano, Robert Striano, Patricia Strizak, Raghunath Subramanian, Santhy Subramanian, Robert Sullivan, Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/21/2018 (pc).
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MD1570. Document filed by Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Michael Lee Bobbitt, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Kum S Lee, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Paula Quenelle, Dennis Quinn, Sonia Quinones, Jorge Quiroz, Edward Rademaker, Duane Ragan, Linda Ragan, Robert Ramirez, Rosa Ramirez, Wanda Ramos, Anita Rana, Tej Rana, Ronald Reda, Sandra C Reese, Doris Reid, Scott Resnik, Isaac Rhabb, Winsome Rhabb, Sylvia D Rhodes, Thomas R Rhodes, Shari Ricco, Alton Riddick, Ceasar Rivera, James Rivera, Sharon Robinson, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Denise Rodriguez, Saul Rodriguez, Victor Rodriguez, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Jerone Rolle, Felipe Roman, Carole Romeo, Dabs Rousseau, Fred Rubin, Judith Rubin, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Joseph Russell, Patricia Russell, Eric Sabinsky, Wendy Sabinsky, Michael Sabo, Barbara Sacco, Nick Sacco, Guadalupe Salazar, Pedro Salazar, Scott Samuels, Maria Sanabria, Anthony Santora, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Frank Saulle, Norma Scale, Ralph Scannapieco, Barbara Scattareggia, Joseph Scattareggia, David Schneck, Katy Schneck, Malvin Schuster, Michael J Sclafani, Victoria Sclafani, Veronica Serrone, Desmond Seville, Matthew Shafiroff, Maureen Shindle, Bhaskar Sil, Sonja Gisela Sil, John Silverman, Penelope Simone, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Catherine Ann Sjursen, John Sjursen Jr., Kevin Skinner, Richard Solomon, Jean Somerville, Paul Somerville, Edward Sparrow, April Spates, Ellen Spencer, John Spencer, Pamela Stackowitz, Terence Stackowitz, Roland Stancione, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, William Streath, Lisa Anne Striano, Robert Striano, Patricia Strizak, Raghunath Subramanian, Santhy Subramanian, Robert Sullivan, Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Isaac Rhabb, Frank Saulle, Edward Rademaker, Joseph Russell, Sharon Robinson, Scott Samuels, John Sjursen Jr., Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Maureen Shindle, Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Winsome Rhabb, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Robert Sullivan, Duane Ragan, Nick Sacco, Sonja Gisela Sil, Jerone Rolle, Terence Stackowitz, Victor Rodriguez, Thomas R Rhodes, Edward Sparrow, Anita Rana, Victoria Sclafani, Santhy Subramanian, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Barbara Scattareggia, Jorge Quiroz, Tej Rana, April Spates, Scott Resnik, Ralph Scannapieco, Patricia Strizak, Veronica Serrone, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, Bhaskar Sil, Robert Ramirez, Robert Striano, Dennis Quinn, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Joseph Scattareggia, Linda Ragan, Kevin Skinner, Sylvia D Rhodes, Michael Lee Bobbitt, Desmond Seville, Dabs Rousseau, Fred Rubin, Guadalupe Salazar, Denise Rodriguez, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Norma Scale, Katy Schneck, Sonia Quinones, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Pedro Salazar, Michael J Sclafani, Paula Quenelle, Barbara Sacco, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Kum S Lee, Sandra C Reese, Judith Rubin, William Streath, Catherine Ann Sjursen, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Wanda Ramos, Lisa Anne Striano, Richard Solomon, Wendy Sabinsky, Felipe Roman, Saul Rodriguez, Michael Sabo, Anthony Santora, Roland Stancione, Rosa Ramirez, Carole Romeo, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually, John Spencer, Malvin Schuster, Alton Riddick, James Rivera, David Schneck, Patricia Russell, Jean Somerville, Paul Somerville, Penelope Simone, Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Ronald Reda, Eric Sabinsky, Shari Ricco, Ellen Spencer, Maria Sanabria, John Silverman, Matthew Shafiroff, Ceasar Rivera, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Doris Reid, Raghunath Subramanian, Pamela Stackowitz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually, Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually added. Party added pursuant to #4 Complaint,,,,,,,.Document filed by Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually, Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually, Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually, Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually, Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually, Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually, Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually, Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually, Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually, Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually, Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually. Related document: #4 Complaint,,,,,,,.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MD1570. Document filed by Michael Lee Bobbitt, Kum S Lee, Paula Quenelle, Dennis Quinn, Sonia Quinones, Jorge Quiroz, Edward Rademaker, Duane Ragan, Linda Ragan, Robert Ramirez, Rosa Ramirez, Wanda Ramos, Anita Rana, Tej Rana, Ronald Reda, Sandra C Reese, Doris Reid, Scott Resnik, Isaac Rhabb, Winsome Rhabb, Sylvia D Rhodes, Thomas R Rhodes, Shari Ricco, Alton Riddick, Ceasar Rivera, James Rivera, Sharon Robinson, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Denise Rodriguez, Saul Rodriguez, Victor Rodriguez, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Jerone Rolle, Felipe Roman, Carole Romeo, Dabs Rousseau, Fred Rubin, Judith Rubin, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Joseph Russell, Patricia Russell, Eric Sabinsky, Wendy Sabinsky, Michael Sabo, Barbara Sacco, Nick Sacco, Guadalupe Salazar, Pedro Salazar, Scott Samuels, Maria Sanabria, Anthony Santora, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Frank Saulle, Norma Scale, Ralph Scannapieco, Barbara Scattareggia, Joseph Scattareggia, David Schneck, Katy Schneck, Malvin Schuster, Michael J Sclafani, Victoria Sclafani, Veronica Serrone, Desmond Seville, Matthew Shafiroff, Maureen Shindle, Bhaskar Sil, Sonja Gisela Sil, John Silverman, Penelope Simone, Catherine Ann Sjursen, John Sjursen Jr., Kevin Skinner, Richard Solomon, Jean Somerville, Paul Somerville, Edward Sparrow, April Spates, Ellen Spencer, John Spencer, Pamela Stackowitz, Terence Stackowitz, Roland Stancione, William Streath, Lisa Anne Striano, Robert Striano, Patricia Strizak, Raghunath Subramanian.(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/20/2018 (jgo).
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Office code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE re: Document No. #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties, Anita Chen with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually', Sin Yin Chiu with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually', Toni Franks with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually', Allison Kellan with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually', Walter Rastatter with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually' Stephanie Resvanis with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatic, deceased and individually', Janet Rotter with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually', Patrick Sheldon with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually', Jeriann Stella with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually', and, Dawn Sulmasy with party text 'as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually'; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Estate of Ann Rendueles Estate of Qu Zhao Ou Estate of Chung Lam Mui Estate of Joan Pisano Estate of Salvatore Trani Estate of William Rastatter Estate of Mary Mavromatis Estate of Lorraine Rotter Estate of John Cassidy Estate of Anthony Marotta Estate of Warren Sulmasy. The party was added to the case in error. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Isaac Rhabb, Frank Saulle, Edward Rademaker, Estate of Joan Pisano, Joseph Russell, Sharon Robinson, Scott Samuels, John Sjursen Jr., Maureen Shindle, Estate of William Rastatter, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Winsome Rhabb, Robert Sullivan, Duane Ragan, Estate of Chung Lam Mui, Nick Sacco, Sonja Gisela Sil, Jerone Rolle, Terence Stackowitz, Victor Rodriguez, Estate of John Cassidy, Estate of Salvatore Trani, Estate of Lorraine Rotter, Thomas R Rhodes, Edward Sparrow, Anita Rana, Victoria Sclafani, Estate of Anthony Marotta, Santhy Subramanian, Ebony Robinson-Toone, Barbara Scattareggia, Jorge Quiroz, Tej Rana, April Spates, Estate of Warren Sulmasy, Scott Resnik, Ralph Scannapieco, Patricia Strizak, Veronica Serrone, Estate of Ann Rendueles, Bhaskar Sil, Robert Ramirez, Robert Striano, Dennis Quinn, Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, Joseph Scattareggia, Estate of Mary Mavromatis, Linda Ragan, Kevin Skinner, Sylvia D Rhodes, Michael Lee Bobbitt, Desmond Seville, Dabs Rousseau, Fred Rubin, Guadalupe Salazar, Denise Rodriguez, Norma Scale, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Katy Schneck, Sonia Quinones, Pedro Salazar, Michael J Sclafani, Paula Quenelle, Barbara Sacco, Kum S Lee, Sandra C Reese, Judith Rubin, William Streath, Catherine Ann Sjursen, Wanda Ramos, Lisa Anne Striano, Richard Solomon, Wendy Sabinsky, Felipe Roman, Saul Rodriguez, Michael Sabo, Anthony Santora, Roland Stancione, Rosa Ramirez, Carole Romeo, John Spencer, Malvin Schuster, Alton Riddick, James Rivera, David Schneck, Patricia Russell, Jean Somerville, Paul Somerville, Penelope Simone, Michele Saponara-Grassi, Ronald Reda, Eric Sabinsky, Shari Ricco, Ellen Spencer, Maria Sanabria, John Silverman, Matthew Shafiroff, Ceasar Rivera, Doris Reid, Raghunath Subramanian, Pamela Stackowitz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Robert Sullivan, Sonja Gisela Sil, Kevin Skinner, Santhy Subramanian, John Silverman, Raghunath Subramanian, Robert Striano, Estate of John Cassidy, Lisa Anne Striano, Maureen Shindle, Roland Stancione, Paul Somerville, Jean Somerville, Richard Solomon, Edward Sparrow, William Streath, John Sjursen Jr., Pamela Stackowitz, April Spates, Patricia Strizak, Terence Stackowitz, Estate of Warren Sulmasy, John Spencer, Estate of Anthony Marotta, Ellen Spencer, Bhaskar Sil, Penelope Simone, Catherine Ann Sjursen added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Robert Sullivan, Sonja Gisela Sil, Kevin Skinner, Santhy Subramanian, John Silverman, Raghunath Subramanian, Robert Striano, Estate of John Cassidy, Lisa Anne Striano, Maureen Shindle, Roland Stancione, Paul Somerville, Jean Somerville, Richard Solomon, Edward Sparrow, William Streath, John Sjursen Jr., Pamela Stackowitz, April Spates, Patricia Strizak, Terence Stackowitz, Estate of Warren Sulmasy, John Spencer, Estate of Anthony Marotta, Ellen Spencer, Bhaskar Sil, Penelope Simone, Catherine Ann Sjursen. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Norma Scale, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Joseph Scattareggia, Dabs Rousseau, Frank Saulle, Jerone Rolle, Michele Saponara-Grassi, David Schneck, Maria Sanabria, Denise Rodriguez, Scott Samuels, Saul Rodriguez, Barbara Scattareggia, Nick Sacco, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Judith Rubin, Veronica Serrone, Fred Rubin, Joseph Russell, Pedro Salazar, Carole Romeo, Michael Sabo, Patricia Russell, Katy Schneck, Anthony Santora, Matthew Shafiroff, Barbara Sacco, Desmond Seville, Ralph Scannapieco, Wendy Sabinsky, Victoria Sclafani, Guadalupe Salazar, Eric Sabinsky, Victor Rodriguez, Felipe Roman, Estate of Lorraine Rotter, Malvin Schuster, Michael J Sclafani added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Norma Scale, Vanessa Rogers-Hall, Joseph Scattareggia, Dabs Rousseau, Frank Saulle, Jerone Rolle, Michele Saponara-Grassi, David Schneck, Maria Sanabria, Denise Rodriguez, Scott Samuels, Saul Rodriguez, Barbara Scattareggia, Nick Sacco, Anna Pei Rupprecht, Judith Rubin, Veronica Serrone, Fred Rubin, Joseph Russell, Pedro Salazar, Carole Romeo, Michael Sabo, Patricia Russell, Katy Schneck, Anthony Santora, Matthew Shafiroff, Barbara Sacco, Desmond Seville, Ralph Scannapieco, Wendy Sabinsky, Victoria Sclafani, Guadalupe Salazar, Eric Sabinsky, Victor Rodriguez, Felipe Roman, Estate of Lorraine Rotter, Malvin Schuster, Michael J Sclafani. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Anita Rana, James Rivera, Robert Ramirez, Sylvia D Rhodes, Estate of Mary Mavromatis, Estate of Joan Pisano, Alton Riddick, Sonia Quinones, Winsome Rhabb, Tej Rana, Estate of Salvatore Trani, Isaac Rhabb, Thomas R Rhodes, Ceasar Rivera, Scott Resnik, Estate of Ann Rendueles, Doris Reid, Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, Shari Ricco, Wanda Ramos, Ronald Reda, Rosa Ramirez, Estate of William Rastatter, Duane Ragan, Kum S Lee, Estate of Chung Lam Mui, Edward Rademaker, Jorge Quiroz, Linda Ragan, Sandra C Reese, Sharon Robinson, Dennis Quinn, Paula Quenelle, Ebony Robinson-Toone added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Anita Rana, James Rivera, Robert Ramirez, Sylvia D Rhodes, Estate of Mary Mavromatis, Estate of Joan Pisano, Alton Riddick, Sonia Quinones, Winsome Rhabb, Tej Rana, Estate of Salvatore Trani, Isaac Rhabb, Thomas R Rhodes, Ceasar Rivera, Scott Resnik, Estate of Ann Rendueles, Doris Reid, Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, Shari Ricco, Wanda Ramos, Ronald Reda, Rosa Ramirez, Estate of William Rastatter, Duane Ragan, Kum S Lee, Estate of Chung Lam Mui, Edward Rademaker, Jorge Quiroz, Linda Ragan, Sandra C Reese, Sharon Robinson, Dennis Quinn, Paula Quenelle, Ebony Robinson-Toone. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MD1570. Document filed by Michael Lee Bobbitt.(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16070605)Document filed by Michael Lee Bobbitt. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobbitt et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Solomon
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Scattareggia
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Skinner
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Robinson
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malvin Schuster
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Striano
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Ramos
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Seville
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Silverman
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Scale
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Salvatore Trani
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Anthony Marotta
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Spencer
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Shafiroff
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dabs Rousseau
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Sabinsky
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Sclafani
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Gisela Sil
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Ricco
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of William Rastatter
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Bobbitt
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Rubin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Pei Rupprecht
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Chung Lam Mui
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Sparrow
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Quiroz
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Sabinsky
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Spencer
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra C Reese
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Warren Sulmasy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bhaskar Sil
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Sacco
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Mary Mavromatis
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Serrone
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Roman
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Lorraine Rotter
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Anne Striano
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tej Rana
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Streath
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceasar Rivera
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Spates
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Ramirez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Resnik
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Saponara-Grassi
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Salazar
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Sclafani
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia D Rhodes
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Russell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Samuels
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Strizak
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Rogers-Hall
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Saulle
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Ann Sjursen
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katy Schneck
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Santora
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Stancione
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Rana
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Sacco
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Shindle
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santhy Subramanian
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Stackowitz
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Qu Zhao Ou
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Reda
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Quenelle
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R Rhodes
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Romeo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raghunath Subramanian
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Salazar
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sjursen Jr.
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Scannapieco
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rivera
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ramirez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Riddick
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kum S Lee
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winsome Rhabb
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Ann Rendueles
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ragan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sanabria
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Somerville
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Stackowitz
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Russell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Reid
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penelope Simone
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Somerville
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Joan Pisano
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Scattareggia
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Rhabb
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Quinones
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerone Rolle
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schneck
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Quinn
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Rademaker
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of John Cassidy
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Ragan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Robinson-Toone
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sabo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sullivan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Rubin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Resvanis, as administrator of the Estate of Mary Mavromatis, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sin Yin Chiu, as administrator of the Estate of Chung Lam Mui, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Sheldon, as administrator of the Estate of John Cassidy, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Franks, as administrator of the Estate of Joan Pisano, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeriann Stella, as administrator of the Estate of Anthony Marotta, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Bobbitt, as administrator of the Estate of Ann Rendueles, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Chen, as administrator of the Estate of Qu Zhao Ou, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Sulmasy, as administrator of the Estate of Warren Sulmasy, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Kellan, as administrator of the Estate of Salvatore Trani, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Rastatter, as administrator of the Estate of William Rastatter, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Rotter, as administrator of the Estate of Lorraine Rotter, deceased and individually
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?