New York City Transit Authority v. Westfield Fulton Center LLC

Plaintiff: New York City Transit Authority
Defendant: Westfield Fulton Center LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11898
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Case Stayed. (anc)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for the respective parties as follows: This action is stayed pending resolution of the arbitration proceeding to be commenced by NYCTA against Westfield. This Court will retain jurisdiction of this action to address any proceedings for confirmation of the arbitration award. The parties are directed to file a joint status letter with the Court following the outcome of the proposed arbitration. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/16/2019) (anc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by New York City Transit Authority. (Nicolich, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Westfield Fulton Center LLC. (pne)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Westfield Fulton Center LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York City Transit Authority. (Nicolich, John)
December 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John G. Nicolich to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mioko Catherine Tajika on behalf of New York City Transit Authority. (Tajika, Mioko)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel L. Carroll on behalf of New York City Transit Authority. (Carroll, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John G. Nicolich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Transit Authority; Westfield Fulton Center LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John G. Nicolich. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $667371000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $667000;. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Westfield Fulton Center LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York City Transit Authority. (Nicolich, John) Modified on 12/20/2018 (jgo).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nicolich, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Westfield Fulton Center LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16073637)Document filed by New York City Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Westfield Lease Excerpts without Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B. NYCT Notice of Monetary Default, #3 Exhibit C. Fulton Center MTA Fee Statement, #4 Exhibit D. Letter from Westfield Fulton Center to MTA, dated November 14, 2018)(Nicolich, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York City Transit Authority v. Westfield Fulton Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York City Transit Authority
Represented By: John G. Nicolich
Represented By: Daniel L. Carroll
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Fulton Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?