Homer v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Melodie Homer, Douglas Halvorson, Jeanette Diehl, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Stanley Ray, Vicki Lynn Michel, Estate of Herbert K. Hoglan, Cherrie Allen, Robert A. Jones, Michelle Arthurs, Herman Ray, Brenda Sorenson, Tanya Lynn Davis, Joanann Coale, Barbara Haynes Jenkins, Jeanette Coffey, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Alan Gu, Noverta Davis-Dean, Linden D. Hoagland, Susan Bohan, Karen Ventre, Michelle Clendenny, Lee N. Hoglan, Krysty Grazioso, Michaela Havlish, Rachael G. Malubay, Emma Fernandez-Reagan, Lea Michaela Bitterman, Michael Chirchirillo, Heather Strickland, Jason Diehl, Andrew Brian Jordan, Jr., Charles Gengler, Audrey R. Jones, Lauren Grazioso, Brian Collman, Vaughn V. Hoglan, Brian Major, Jane G. Haller, Kathryn Collman, Laurel Homer, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, John R. Jones, Carolee Azzarello, Kelly Arthurs, Sean Bitterman, Richard Fernandez, Keith A. Bradkowski, Malachi Roarke Davis, Daniel D. Coffey, M.D., Anita Lafond Korsonsky, Alice Carpeneto, Irma Joyce Fletcher, Arline Peabody-Bane, Briana Grazioso, Brenda E. Jobe, Joseph Carpeneto, Dina LaFond, Deborah Grazioso, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Carole Grazioso, Charles Collman, Kate Halvorson, Maria Joule, John Haller, Steven Gengler, Sandra Grazioso, Karen Bingham, Dwayne W. Collman, Renee L. Gamboa, Anthony Dorf, Joseph Carpeneto as Personal Representative of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, Deceased, Candy Moyer, Carolyn Sutton, Colleen McDonald, Hank Grazioso and Gabrielle Hunter Davis
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11910
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 11, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 11, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (dnh)
December 24, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #2 Complaint,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Cherrie Allen, Kelly Arthurs, Michelle Arthurs, Carolee Azzarello, Karen Bingham, Lea Michaela Bitterman, Sean Bitterman, Susan Bohan, Keith A. Bradkowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Beverly Sutton), Keith A. Bradkowski(Individually), Keith A. Bradkowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Collman, Deceased), Alice Carpeneto, Joseph Carpeneto, Michael Chirchirillo, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Michelle Clendenny, Joanann Coale, Jeanette Coffey, Daniel D. Coffey, M.D.(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel F. Coffey, Deceased), Brian Collman, Kathryn Collman, Charles Collman, Dwayne W. Collman, Gabrielle Hunter Davis, Malachi Roarke Davis, Tanya Lynn Davis(Individually), Tanya Lynn Davis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Wayne T. Davis, Deceased), Noverta Davis-Dean, Jason Diehl, Jeanette Diehl, Anthony Dorf, Richard Fernandez, Emma Fernandez-Reagan, Irma Joyce Fletcher, Irma Joyce Fletcher(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Earl Ray, Deceased), Renee L. Gamboa, Renee L. Gamboa(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ranulf Gamboa, Deceased), Charles Gengler, Steven Gengler, Briana Grazioso, Carole Grazioso, Deborah Grazioso(Individually), Deborah Grazioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Timmy Grazioso, Deceased), Hank Grazioso, Krysty Grazioso, Lauren Grazioso, Sandra Grazioso, Alan Gu, Jane G. Haller, John Haller, Douglas Halvorson, Kate Halvorson, Michaela Havlish, Estate of Herbert K. Hoglan, Linden D. Hoagland, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Lee N. Hoglan, Vaughn V. Hoglan, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Laurel Homer, Melodie Homer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of LeRoy W. Homer, Jr., Deceased), Melodie Homer, Barbara Haynes Jenkins, Brenda E. Jobe, Audrey R. Jones, John R. Jones, Robert A. Jones, Andrew Brian Jordan, Jr., Maria Joule, Anita Lafond Korsonsky, Dina LaFond, Brian Major, Rachael G. Malubay, Colleen McDonald, Vicki Lynn Michel, Candy Moyer, Arline Peabody-Bane, Herman Ray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Ray, Deceased), Herman Ray(Individually), Herman Ray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Denease Conley, Deceased), Stanley Ray, Brenda Sorenson, Heather Strickland, Carolyn Sutton, Karen Ventre, Joseph Carpeneto as Personal Representative of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, Deceased. (Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 Filing 5 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cherrie Allen, Kelly Arthurs, Michelle Arthurs, Carolee Azzarello, Karen Bingham, Lea Michaela Bitterman, Sean Bitterman, Susan Bohan, Keith A. Bradkowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Beverly Sutton), Keith A. Bradkowski(Individually), Keith A. Bradkowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Collman, Deceased), Alice Carpeneto, Joseph Carpeneto, Michael Chirchirillo, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Michelle Clendenny, Joanann Coale, Jeanette Coffey, Daniel D. Coffey, M.D.(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel F. Coffey, Deceased), Brian Collman, Kathryn Collman, Charles Collman, Dwayne W. Collman, Gabrielle Hunter Davis, Malachi Roarke Davis, Tanya Lynn Davis(Individually), Tanya Lynn Davis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Wayne T. Davis, Deceased), Noverta Davis-Dean, Jason Diehl, Jeanette Diehl, Anthony Dorf, Richard Fernandez, Emma Fernandez-Reagan, Irma Joyce Fletcher, Irma Joyce Fletcher(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Earl Ray, Deceased), Renee L. Gamboa, Renee L. Gamboa(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ranulf Gamboa, Deceased), Charles Gengler, Steven Gengler, Briana Grazioso, Carole Grazioso, Deborah Grazioso(Individually), Deborah Grazioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Timmy Grazioso, Deceased), Hank Grazioso, Krysty Grazioso, Lauren Grazioso, Sandra Grazioso, Alan Gu, Jane G. Haller, John Haller, Douglas Halvorson, Kate Halvorson, Michaela Havlish, Estate of Herbert K. Hoglan, Linden D. Hoagland, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Lee N. Hoglan, Vaughn V. Hoglan, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Laurel Homer, Melodie Homer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of LeRoy W. Homer, Jr., Deceased), Melodie Homer, Barbara Haynes Jenkins, Brenda E. Jobe, Audrey R. Jones, John R. Jones, Robert A. Jones, Andrew Brian Jordan, Jr., Maria Joule, Anita Lafond Korsonsky, Dina LaFond, Brian Major, Rachael G. Malubay, Colleen McDonald, Vicki Lynn Michel, Candy Moyer, Arline Peabody-Bane, Herman Ray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Ray, Deceased), Herman Ray(Individually), Herman Ray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Denease Conley, Deceased), Stanley Ray, Brenda Sorenson, Heather Strickland, Carolyn Sutton, Karen Ventre, Joseph Carpeneto as Personal Representative of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, Deceased.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:03-md-01750. Document filed by Cherrie Allen, Kelly Arthurs, Michelle Arthurs, Carolee Azzarello, Karen Bingham, Lea Michaela Bitterman, Sean Bitterman, Susan Bohan, Keith A. Bradkowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Beverly Sutton), Keith A. Bradkowski(Individually), Keith A. Bradkowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Collman, Deceased), Alice Carpeneto, Joseph Carpeneto, Michael Chirchirillo, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Michelle Clendenny, Joanann Coale, Jeanette Coffey, Daniel D. Coffey, M.D.(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel F. Coffey, Deceased), Brian Collman, Kathryn Collman, Charles Collman, Dwayne W. Collman, Gabrielle Hunter Davis, Malachi Roarke Davis, Tanya Lynn Davis(Individually), Tanya Lynn Davis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Wayne T. Davis, Deceased), Noverta Davis-Dean, Jason Diehl, Jeanette Diehl, Anthony Dorf, Richard Fernandez, Emma Fernandez-Reagan, Irma Joyce Fletcher, Irma Joyce Fletcher(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Earl Ray, Deceased), Renee L. Gamboa, Renee L. Gamboa(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ranulf Gamboa, Deceased), Charles Gengler, Steven Gengler, Briana Grazioso, Carole Grazioso, Deborah Grazioso(Individually), Deborah Grazioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Timmy Grazioso, Deceased), Hank Grazioso, Krysty Grazioso, Lauren Grazioso, Sandra Grazioso, Alan Gu, Jane G. Haller, John Haller, Douglas Halvorson, Kate Halvorson, Michaela Havlish, Estate of Herbert K. Hoglan, Linden D. Hoagland, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Lee N. Hoglan, Vaughn V. Hoglan, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Laurel Homer, Melodie Homer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of LeRoy W. Homer, Jr., Deceased), Melodie Homer, Barbara Haynes Jenkins, Brenda E. Jobe, Audrey R. Jones, John R. Jones, Robert A. Jones, Andrew Brian Jordan, Jr., Maria Joule, Anita Lafond Korsonsky, Dina LaFond, Brian Major, Rachael G. Malubay, Colleen McDonald, Vicki Lynn Michel, Candy Moyer, Arline Peabody-Bane, Herman Ray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Ray, Deceased), Herman Ray(Individually), Herman Ray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Denease Conley, Deceased), Stanley Ray, Brenda Sorenson, Heather Strickland, Carolyn Sutton, Karen Ventre, Joseph Carpeneto as Personal Representative of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, Deceased.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Michelle Arthurs, Andrew Brian Jordan, Jr., Cherrie Allen, Daniel D. Coffey, M.D.(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel F. Coffey, Deceased), Audrey R. Jones, Keith A. Bradkowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Beverly Sutton), Renee L. Gamboa, Kelly Arthurs, Alice Carpeneto, Lauren Grazioso, Sean Bitterman, Carolyn Sutton, Douglas Halvorson, Renee L. Gamboa(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ranulf Gamboa, Deceased), Vicki Lynn Michel, Deborah Grazioso(Individually), Charles Collman, Hank Grazioso, Estate of Herbert K. Hoglan, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, Anita Lafond Korsonsky, Keith A. Bradkowski(Individually), Krysty Grazioso, Joseph Carpeneto, Kathryn Collman, Steven Gengler, Keith A. Bradkowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Collman, Deceased), Michaela Havlish, Jane G. Haller, Heather Strickland, Jason Diehl, Karen Bingham, Dina LaFond, Susan Bohan, Dwayne W. Collman, Gabrielle Hunter Davis, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Michael Chirchirillo, Carolee Azzarello, Colleen McDonald, Deborah Grazioso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Timmy Grazioso, Deceased), Joseph Carpeneto as Personal Representative of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, Deceased, Brenda Sorenson, Brenda E. Jobe, Jeanette Coffey, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Laurel Homer, Karen Ventre, John R. Jones, Joanann Coale, Melodie Homer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of LeRoy W. Homer, Jr., Deceased), Melodie Homer, Herman Ray(Individually), Herman Ray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Ray, Deceased), Lea Michaela Bitterman, Richard Fernandez, Tanya Lynn Davis(Individually), Jeanette Diehl, Vaughn V. Hoglan, Irma Joyce Fletcher, Stanley Ray, Alan Gu, Candy Moyer, Barbara Haynes Jenkins, Emma Fernandez-Reagan, Linden D. Hoagland, Anthony Dorf, Herman Ray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Denease Conley, Deceased), Malachi Roarke Davis, John Haller, Maria Joule, Michelle Clendenny, Tanya Lynn Davis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Wayne T. Davis, Deceased), Rachael G. Malubay, Kate Halvorson, Charles Gengler, Irma Joyce Fletcher(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Earl Ray, Deceased), Carole Grazioso, Brian Collman, Brian Major, Lee N. Hoglan, Arline Peabody-Bane, Noverta Davis-Dean, Briana Grazioso, Robert A. Jones, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Sandra Grazioso. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Lea Michaela Bitterman, Melodie Homer, Sean Bitterman, Alan Gu, Douglas Halvorson, Robert A. Jones, John R. Jones, Audrey R. Jones, Candy Moyer, Laurel Homer, Andrew Brian Jordan, Jr., Anita Lafond Korsonsky, Dina LaFond, Kate Halvorson, Michaela Havlish, Melodie Homer added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Lea Michaela Bitterman, Melodie Homer, Sean Bitterman, Alan Gu, Douglas Halvorson, Robert A. Jones, John R. Jones, Audrey R. Jones, Candy Moyer, Laurel Homer, Andrew Brian Jordan, Jr., Anita Lafond Korsonsky, Dina LaFond, Kate Halvorson, Michaela Havlish, Melodie Homer. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Richard Fernandez, Rachael G. Malubay, Emma Fernandez-Reagan, Jeanette Diehl, Jason Diehl, Deborah Grazioso, Carolee Azzarello, John Haller, Jane G. Haller, Carole Grazioso, Lauren Grazioso, Renee L. Gamboa, Karen Ventre, Krysty Grazioso, Briana Grazioso, Sandra Grazioso, Deborah Grazioso, Hank Grazioso, Anthony Dorf, Renee L. Gamboa, Maria Joule added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Richard Fernandez, Rachael G. Malubay, Emma Fernandez-Reagan, Jeanette Diehl, Jason Diehl, Deborah Grazioso, Carolee Azzarello, John Haller, Jane G. Haller, Carole Grazioso, Lauren Grazioso, Renee L. Gamboa, Karen Ventre, Krysty Grazioso, Briana Grazioso, Sandra Grazioso, Deborah Grazioso, Hank Grazioso, Anthony Dorf, Renee L. Gamboa, Maria Joule. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 24, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Barbara Haynes Jenkins, Gabrielle Hunter Davis, Herman Ray, Cherrie Allen, Irma Joyce Fletcher, Tanya Lynn Davis, Herman Ray, Irma Joyce Fletcher, Tanya Lynn Davis, Malachi Roarke Davis, Noverta Davis-Dean, Stanley Ray, Herman Ray added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Barbara Haynes Jenkins, Gabrielle Hunter Davis, Herman Ray, Cherrie Allen, Irma Joyce Fletcher, Tanya Lynn Davis, Herman Ray, Irma Joyce Fletcher, Tanya Lynn Davis, Malachi Roarke Davis, Noverta Davis-Dean, Stanley Ray, Herman Ray. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 23, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Brian Collman, Steven Gengler, Charles Collman, Keith A. Bradkowski, Keith A. Bradkowski, Carolyn Sutton, Dwayne W. Collman, Keith A. Bradkowski, Brenda Sorenson, Vicki Lynn Michel, Charles Gengler, Kathryn Collman added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Brian Collman, Steven Gengler, Charles Collman, Keith A. Bradkowski, Keith A. Bradkowski, Carolyn Sutton, Dwayne W. Collman, Keith A. Bradkowski, Brenda Sorenson, Vicki Lynn Michel, Charles Gengler, Kathryn Collman. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 23, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Michael Chirchirillo, Colleen McDonald, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Susan Bohan, Joseph Carpeneto as Personal Representative of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, Deceased, Joanann Coale, Jeanette Coffey, Daniel D. Coffey, M.D., Alice Carpeneto, Joseph Carpeneto added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Michael Chirchirillo, Colleen McDonald, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Susan Bohan, Joseph Carpeneto as Personal Representative of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, Deceased, Joanann Coale, Jeanette Coffey, Daniel D. Coffey, M.D., Alice Carpeneto, Joseph Carpeneto. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 23, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Vaughn V. Hoglan, Kelly Arthurs, Heather Strickland, Estate of Herbert K. Hoglan, Michelle Arthurs, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, Arline Peabody-Bane, Karen Bingham, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Brenda E. Jobe, Lee N. Hoglan, Linden D. Hoagland, Brian Major, Michelle Clendenny added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Vaughn V. Hoglan, Kelly Arthurs, Heather Strickland, Estate of Herbert K. Hoglan, Michelle Arthurs, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, Arline Peabody-Bane, Karen Bingham, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Brenda E. Jobe, Lee N. Hoglan, Linden D. Hoagland, Brian Major, Michelle Clendenny. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 3- MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN). (dnh)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy B. Fleming. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy B. Fleming. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Melodie Homer. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Timothy B. Fleming to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The caption on the pleading must include all party names in their entirety. Do not use 'et al' in the caption of a pleading. All of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party Melodie Homer with party text 'as Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF LEROY W. HOMER, JR., Deceased'. Due to the omitted party all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 12/24/2018. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16074108)Document filed by Melodie Homer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Relatedness Statement, #4 Rule 7.1 Statement, #5 Summons)(Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 12/19/2018 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homer v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melodie Homer
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Halvorson
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Diehl
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candyce Sue Hoglan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Ray
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Lynn Michel
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Herbert K. Hoglan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherrie Allen
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Jones
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Arthurs
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Ray
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Sorenson
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Lynn Davis
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanann Coale
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Haynes Jenkins
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Coffey
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Gu
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noverta Davis-Dean
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linden D. Hoagland
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bohan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ventre
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Clendenny
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee N. Hoglan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krysty Grazioso
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaela Havlish
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael G. Malubay
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Fernandez-Reagan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Michaela Bitterman
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chirchirillo
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Strickland
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Diehl
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Brian Jordan, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gengler
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey R. Jones
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Grazioso
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Collman
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn V. Hoglan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Major
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane G. Haller
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Collman
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Homer
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Bertelsen Hoglan
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Jones
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolee Azzarello
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Arthurs
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Bitterman
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Fernandez
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A. Bradkowski
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malachi Roarke Davis
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel D. Coffey, M.D.
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Lafond Korsonsky
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Carpeneto
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Joyce Fletcher
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arline Peabody-Bane
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Grazioso
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda E. Jobe
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Carpeneto
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina LaFond
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Grazioso
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Chirchirillo
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Grazioso
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Collman
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Halvorson
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Joule
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Haller
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gengler
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Grazioso
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bingham
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne W. Collman
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee L. Gamboa
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dorf
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Carpeneto as Personal Representative of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, Deceased
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Moyer
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sutton
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen McDonald
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hank Grazioso
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Hunter Davis
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?