Garger et al v. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Brian Kennedy, Steven LaFrance, Iliana E Flores, Dara Berliner, Roger Kyte, Elisa P Malani, Catherine Lauria, Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, John Koecheler, Judith "Judy" M Hesse, Walter Hicks, Sophia W. M. Feliciano, Vincent Linnane, Patricia Lenoir, Betty Moore-Gooding, Eileen Kennedy, Jewel Lyons, Carolyn DeRosier, James Kennedy, Allison Garger, Jeanne Kavinski, Michael P Kimelman, Katherine Lenoir, Alexander Lopez, Julio C Lillo, Andre LaFrance, Maureen Koecheler, Annmarie Williams, Lev Khalif, Pamela Lawson Dixon, Marvin Levin, Raymond Lightbourn, Bernard Lopes, Maureen MacDonald, Kathleen E Zetscher, Lorraine Lopes, Terre Susan Wallach, Evelyn Robinson, Susan M King, Alexandra Lopes, Berdie Hicks, Audrey Levin, Elizabeth Khalif, Mary Jo Koecheler, Antoinette Solowsky, Rennea Butler, Scott Kimelman, Gene Koecheler, Michael B Kuras, Paul Koecheler, Robert Kennedy, Robert Murray, Antoinette Lauria, Judy Schneider, Michael Lopez Feliciano, Rebecca Lightbourn, Olga Colon, Nicole Lopes, Morgan Kyte, John E Allen, Jr, Michael Kennedy, Marilyn Matthews, Hans A Klein, William Kennedy, Ilia E Rodriguez, Michael G Kimelman, Paul Thomas Lynch, Karen Barrett, Jody C Howard, Brenda Lynch, Kellie Work, John A Lenoir, Thomas Kuras, Patrick Lenoir, Mindy Gottenberg and Jem A Howard
Defendant: Kingdom Of Saudi Arabi and Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11950
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of John E Allen, Jr, Karen Barrett(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucille T. King, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lucille T. King), Karen Barrett (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard King, deceased, the late spouse of Lucille T. King), Dara Berliner, Rennea Butler, Olga Colon, Carolyn DeRosier, Pamela Lawson Dixon(individually, as surviving child of Nathaniel Lawson), Pamela Lawson Dixon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nathaniel Lawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nathaniel Lawson), Michael Lopez Feliciano, Sophia W. M. Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of George Lopez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of George Lopez), Sophia W. M. Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of George Lopez), Iliana E Flores, Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas Kennedy), Allison Garger(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas Kennedy), Mindy Gottenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Alisha C. Levin), Mindy Gottenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alisha C. Levin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alisha C. Levin), Judith "Judy" M Hesse(individually, as surviving sibling of James T. Lynch), Judith "Judy" M Hesse (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael B. Lynch, deceased, the late sibling of James T. Lynch), Berdie Hicks, Walter Hicks, Jody C Howard, Jem A Howard, Jeanne Kavinski(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol A. LaPlante, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol A. LaPlante), Jeanne Kavinski(individually, as surviving sibling of Carol A. LaPlante), Brian Kennedy, Eileen Kennedy, James Kennedy, Michael Kennedy, Robert Kennedy, William Kennedy, Elizabeth Khalif, Lev Khalif, Michael P Kimelman, Michael G Kimelman(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Michael G Kimelman(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Scott Kimelman, Susan M King, Hans A Klein, Gene Koecheler, John Koecheler, Mary Jo Koecheler, Maureen Koecheler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary E. Koecheler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary E. Koecheler), Maureen Koecheler(individually, as surviving spouse of Gary E. Koecheler), Paul Koecheler, Michael B Kuras, Thomas Kuras(individually, as surviving sibling of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia A. Kuras, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Frances Kuras, deceased, the late parent of Patricia A. Kuras), Morgan Kyte, Roger Kyte(individually, as surviving spouse of Angela R. Kyte), Roger Kyte(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela R. Kyte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angela R. Kyte), Andre LaFrance, Steven LaFrance, Antoinette Lauria(individually, as surviving parent of Stephen J. Lauria), Antoinette Lauria(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen J. Lauria, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Stephen J. Lauria), Catherine Lauria, John A Lenoir, Katherine Lenoir, Patricia Lenoir, Patrick Lenoir, Audrey Levin, Marvin Levin, Raymond Lightbourn, Rebecca Lightbourn(individually, as surviving parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Lightbourn, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Julio C Lillo, Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, Vincent Linnane(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert T. Linnane), Vincent Linnane(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert T. Linnane, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert T. Linnane), Alexandra Lopes, Bernard Lopes, Lorraine Lopes(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore Lopes), Lorraine Lopes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore Lopes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore Lopes), Nicole Lopes, Alexander Lopez, Brenda Lynch(individually, as surviving spouse of James T. Lynch), Brenda Lynch(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Lynch, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James T. Lynch), Paul Thomas Lynch, Jewel Lyons(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nehamon Lyons, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nehamon Lyons), Jewel Lyons(individually, as surviving parent of Nehamon Lyons), Maureen MacDonald, Elisa P Malani(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lomax, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Lomax), Elisa P Malani (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Erica Partosoedarso, deceased, the late spouse of Michael Lomax), Marilyn Matthews, Betty Moore-Gooding, Robert Murray, Evelyn Robinson, Ilia E Rodriguez(individually, as surviving parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Ilia E Rodriguez (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julio Cesar Lillo Torres, deceased, the late parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Judy Schneider, Antoinette Solowsky, Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Annmarie Williams, Kellie Work, Kathleen E Zetscher. (Strong, Bruce)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 7, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 3/21/2019. Document filed by Annmarie Williams; Robert Murray; Hans A Klein; Brenda Lynch(individually, as surviving spouse of James T. Lynch); Lorraine Lopes(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore Lopes); James Kennedy; Karen Barrett (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard King, deceased, the late spouse of Lucille T. King); Vincent Linnane(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert T. Linnane); Kellie Work; Ilia E Rodriguez(individually, as surviving parent of Carlos R. Lillo); Judith "Judy" M Hesse(individually, as surviving sibling of James T. Lynch); Michael P Kimelman; Maureen MacDonald; Ilia E Rodriguez (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julio Cesar Lillo Torres, deceased, the late parent of Carlos R. Lillo); Nahid Mashayekhi Lin; Katherine Lenoir; Vincent Linnane(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert T. Linnane, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert T. Linnane); John A Lenoir; Andre LaFrance; Karen Barrett(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucille T. King, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lucille T. King); Betty Moore-Gooding; Steven LaFrance; Lev Khalif; Mindy Gottenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Alisha C. Levin); Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman); Antoinette Lauria(individually, as surviving parent of Stephen J. Lauria); Marilyn Matthews; Pamela Lawson Dixon(individually, as surviving child of Nathaniel Lawson); Paul Koecheler; Elisa P Malani(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lomax, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Lomax); Maureen Koecheler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary E. Koecheler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary E. Koecheler); Judith "Judy" M Hesse (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael B. Lynch, deceased, the late sibling of James T. Lynch); Roger Kyte(individually, as surviving spouse of Angela R. Kyte); Audrey Levin; Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman); Jewel Lyons(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nehamon Lyons, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nehamon Lyons); Dara Berliner; Evelyn Robinson; Catherine Lauria; Iliana E Flores; Carolyn DeRosier; Rebecca Lightbourn(individually, as surviving parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen); Patrick Lenoir; Susan M King; John Koecheler; Gene Koecheler; Sophia W. M. Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of George Lopez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of George Lopez); Judy Schneider; Antoinette Lauria(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen J. Lauria, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Stephen J. Lauria); Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas Kennedy); Scott Kimelman; Allison Garger(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas Kennedy); Morgan Kyte; Lorraine Lopes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore Lopes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore Lopes); Jeanne Kavinski(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol A. LaPlante, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol A. LaPlante); Thomas Kuras(individually, as surviving sibling of Patricia A. Kuras); Alexander Lopez; Mindy Gottenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alisha C. Levin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alisha C. Levin); Berdie Hicks; Kathleen E Zetscher; Jem A Howard ; Michael B Kuras; Elisa P Malani (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Erica Partosoedarso, deceased, the late spouse of Michael Lomax); Jeanne Kavinski(individually, as surviving sibling of Carol A. LaPlante); Rebecca Lightbourn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Lightbourn, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen); Pamela Lawson Dixon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nathaniel Lawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nathaniel Lawson); Sophia W. M. Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of George Lopez); Marvin Levin; Paul Thomas Lynch; Michael G Kimelman(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman); Thomas Kuras(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia A. Kuras, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patricia A. Kuras); Roger Kyte(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela R. Kyte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angela R. Kyte); Brenda Lynch(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Lynch, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James T. Lynch); Patricia Lenoir; Rebecca Lightbourn(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen); Jewel Lyons(individually, as surviving parent of Nehamon Lyons); Michael Lopez Feliciano; Mary Jo Koecheler; Thomas Kuras (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Frances Kuras, deceased, the late parent of Patricia A. Kuras); John E Allen, Jr; Antoinette Solowsky; Alexandra Lopes; Michael G Kimelman(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman); Walter Hicks; Julio C Lillo; Eileen Kennedy; Brian Kennedy; Rennea Butler; Bernard Lopes; Elizabeth Khalif; Raymond Lightbourn; Maureen Koecheler(individually, as surviving spouse of Gary E. Koecheler); Michael Kennedy; Robert Kennedy; Olga Colon; Nicole Lopes; Jody C Howard; William Kennedy. (Goldman, Jerry)
January 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 7, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570. Document filed by John E Allen, Jr, Karen Barrett(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucille T. King, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lucille T. King), Karen Barrett (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard King, deceased, the late spouse of Lucille T. King), Dara Berliner, Rennea Butler, Olga Colon, Carolyn DeRosier, Pamela Lawson Dixon(individually, as surviving child of Nathaniel Lawson), Pamela Lawson Dixon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nathaniel Lawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nathaniel Lawson), Michael Lopez Feliciano, Sophia W. M. Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of George Lopez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of George Lopez), Sophia W. M. Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of George Lopez), Iliana E Flores, Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas Kennedy), Allison Garger(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas Kennedy), Mindy Gottenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Alisha C. Levin), Mindy Gottenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alisha C. Levin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alisha C. Levin), Judith "Judy" M Hesse(individually, as surviving sibling of James T. Lynch), Judith "Judy" M Hesse (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael B. Lynch, deceased, the late sibling of James T. Lynch), Berdie Hicks, Walter Hicks, Jody C Howard, Jem A Howard, Jeanne Kavinski(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol A. LaPlante, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol A. LaPlante), Jeanne Kavinski(individually, as surviving sibling of Carol A. LaPlante), Brian Kennedy, Eileen Kennedy, James Kennedy, Michael Kennedy, Robert Kennedy, William Kennedy, Elizabeth Khalif, Lev Khalif, Michael P Kimelman, Michael G Kimelman(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Michael G Kimelman(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Scott Kimelman, Susan M King, Hans A Klein, Gene Koecheler, John Koecheler, Mary Jo Koecheler, Maureen Koecheler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary E. Koecheler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary E. Koecheler), Maureen Koecheler(individually, as surviving spouse of Gary E. Koecheler), Paul Koecheler, Michael B Kuras, Thomas Kuras(individually, as surviving sibling of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia A. Kuras, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Frances Kuras, deceased, the late parent of Patricia A. Kuras), Morgan Kyte, Roger Kyte(individually, as surviving spouse of Angela R. Kyte), Roger Kyte(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela R. Kyte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angela R. Kyte), Andre LaFrance, Steven LaFrance, Antoinette Lauria(individually, as surviving parent of Stephen J. Lauria), Antoinette Lauria(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen J. Lauria, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Stephen J. Lauria), Catherine Lauria, John A Lenoir, Katherine Lenoir, Patricia Lenoir, Patrick Lenoir, Audrey Levin, Marvin Levin, Raymond Lightbourn, Rebecca Lightbourn(individually, as surviving parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Lightbourn, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Julio C Lillo, Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, Vincent Linnane(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert T. Linnane), Vincent Linnane(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert T. Linnane, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert T. Linnane), Alexandra Lopes, Bernard Lopes, Lorraine Lopes(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore Lopes), Lorraine Lopes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore Lopes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore Lopes), Nicole Lopes, Alexander Lopez, Brenda Lynch(individually, as surviving spouse of James T. Lynch), Brenda Lynch(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Lynch, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James T. Lynch), Paul Thomas Lynch, Jewel Lyons(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nehamon Lyons, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nehamon Lyons), Jewel Lyons(individually, as surviving parent of Nehamon Lyons), Maureen MacDonald, Elisa P Malani(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lomax, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Lomax), Elisa P Malani (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Erica Partosoedarso, deceased, the late spouse of Michael Lomax), Marilyn Matthews, Betty Moore-Gooding, Robert Murray, Evelyn Robinson, Ilia E Rodriguez(individually, as surviving parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Ilia E Rodriguez (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julio Cesar Lillo Torres, deceased, the late parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Judy Schneider, Antoinette Solowsky, Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Annmarie Williams, Kellie Work, Kathleen E Zetscher.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by John E Allen, Jr, Karen Barrett(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucille T. King, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lucille T. King), Karen Barrett (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard King, deceased, the late spouse of Lucille T. King), Dara Berliner, Rennea Butler, Olga Colon, Carolyn DeRosier, Pamela Lawson Dixon(individually, as surviving child of Nathaniel Lawson), Pamela Lawson Dixon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nathaniel Lawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nathaniel Lawson), Michael Lopez Feliciano, Sophia W. M. Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of George Lopez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of George Lopez), Sophia W. M. Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of George Lopez), Iliana E Flores, Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas Kennedy), Allison Garger(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas Kennedy), Mindy Gottenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Alisha C. Levin), Mindy Gottenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alisha C. Levin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alisha C. Levin), Judith "Judy" M Hesse(individually, as surviving sibling of James T. Lynch), Judith "Judy" M Hesse (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael B. Lynch, deceased, the late sibling of James T. Lynch), Berdie Hicks, Walter Hicks, Jody C Howard, Jem A Howard, Jeanne Kavinski(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol A. LaPlante, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol A. LaPlante), Jeanne Kavinski(individually, as surviving sibling of Carol A. LaPlante), Brian Kennedy, Eileen Kennedy, James Kennedy, Michael Kennedy, Robert Kennedy, William Kennedy, Elizabeth Khalif, Lev Khalif, Michael P Kimelman, Michael G Kimelman(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Michael G Kimelman(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Scott Kimelman, Susan M King, Hans A Klein, Gene Koecheler, John Koecheler, Mary Jo Koecheler, Maureen Koecheler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary E. Koecheler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary E. Koecheler), Maureen Koecheler(individually, as surviving spouse of Gary E. Koecheler), Paul Koecheler, Michael B Kuras, Thomas Kuras(individually, as surviving sibling of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia A. Kuras, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Frances Kuras, deceased, the late parent of Patricia A. Kuras), Morgan Kyte, Roger Kyte(individually, as surviving spouse of Angela R. Kyte), Roger Kyte(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela R. Kyte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angela R. Kyte), Andre LaFrance, Steven LaFrance, Antoinette Lauria(individually, as surviving parent of Stephen J. Lauria), Antoinette Lauria(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen J. Lauria, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Stephen J. Lauria), Catherine Lauria, John A Lenoir, Katherine Lenoir, Patricia Lenoir, Patrick Lenoir, Audrey Levin, Marvin Levin, Raymond Lightbourn, Rebecca Lightbourn(individually, as surviving parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Lightbourn, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Julio C Lillo, Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, Vincent Linnane(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert T. Linnane), Vincent Linnane(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert T. Linnane, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert T. Linnane), Alexandra Lopes, Bernard Lopes, Lorraine Lopes(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore Lopes), Lorraine Lopes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore Lopes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore Lopes), Nicole Lopes, Alexander Lopez, Brenda Lynch(individually, as surviving spouse of James T. Lynch), Brenda Lynch(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Lynch, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James T. Lynch), Paul Thomas Lynch, Jewel Lyons(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nehamon Lyons, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nehamon Lyons), Jewel Lyons(individually, as surviving parent of Nehamon Lyons), Maureen MacDonald, Elisa P Malani(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lomax, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Lomax), Elisa P Malani (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Erica Partosoedarso, deceased, the late spouse of Michael Lomax), Marilyn Matthews, Betty Moore-Gooding, Robert Murray, Evelyn Robinson, Ilia E Rodriguez(individually, as surviving parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Ilia E Rodriguez (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julio Cesar Lillo Torres, deceased, the late parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Judy Schneider, Antoinette Solowsky, Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Annmarie Williams, Kellie Work, Kathleen E Zetscher. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Annmarie Williams, Robert Murray, Hans A Klein, Brenda Lynch(individually, as surviving spouse of James T. Lynch), Lorraine Lopes(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore Lopes), James Kennedy, Karen Barrett (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard King, deceased, the late spouse of Lucille T. King), Vincent Linnane(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert T. Linnane), Kellie Work, Ilia E Rodriguez(individually, as surviving parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Judith "Judy" M Hesse(individually, as surviving sibling of James T. Lynch), Michael P Kimelman, Maureen MacDonald, Ilia E Rodriguez (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julio Cesar Lillo Torres, deceased, the late parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, Katherine Lenoir, Vincent Linnane(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert T. Linnane, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert T. Linnane), John A Lenoir, Andre LaFrance, Karen Barrett(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucille T. King, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lucille T. King), Betty Moore-Gooding, Steven LaFrance, Lev Khalif, Mindy Gottenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Alisha C. Levin), Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Antoinette Lauria(individually, as surviving parent of Stephen J. Lauria), Marilyn Matthews, Pamela Lawson Dixon(individually, as surviving child of Nathaniel Lawson), Paul Koecheler, Elisa P Malani(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lomax, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Lomax), Maureen Koecheler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary E. Koecheler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary E. Koecheler), Judith "Judy" M Hesse (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael B. Lynch, deceased, the late sibling of James T. Lynch), Roger Kyte(individually, as surviving spouse of Angela R. Kyte), Audrey Levin, Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Jewel Lyons(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nehamon Lyons, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nehamon Lyons), Dara Berliner, Evelyn Robinson, Catherine Lauria, Iliana E Flores, Carolyn DeRosier, Rebecca Lightbourn(individually, as surviving parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Patrick Lenoir, Susan M King, John Koecheler, Gene Koecheler, Sophia W. M. Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of George Lopez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of George Lopez), Judy Schneider, Antoinette Lauria(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen J. Lauria, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Stephen J. Lauria), Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas Kennedy), Scott Kimelman, Allison Garger(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas Kennedy), Morgan Kyte, Lorraine Lopes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore Lopes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore Lopes), Jeanne Kavinski(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol A. LaPlante, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol A. LaPlante), Thomas Kuras(individually, as surviving sibling of Patricia A. Kuras), Alexander Lopez, Mindy Gottenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alisha C. Levin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alisha C. Levin), Berdie Hicks, Kathleen E Zetscher, Jem A Howard, Michael B Kuras, Elisa P Malani (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Erica Partosoedarso, deceased, the late spouse of Michael Lomax), Jeanne Kavinski(individually, as surviving sibling of Carol A. LaPlante), Rebecca Lightbourn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Lightbourn, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Pamela Lawson Dixon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nathaniel Lawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nathaniel Lawson), Sophia W. M. Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of George Lopez), Marvin Levin, Paul Thomas Lynch, Michael G Kimelman(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Thomas Kuras(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia A. Kuras, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patricia A. Kuras), Roger Kyte(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela R. Kyte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angela R. Kyte), Brenda Lynch(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Lynch, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James T. Lynch), Patricia Lenoir, Rebecca Lightbourn(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Jewel Lyons(individually, as surviving parent of Nehamon Lyons), Michael Lopez Feliciano, Mary Jo Koecheler, Thomas Kuras (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Frances Kuras, deceased, the late parent of Patricia A. Kuras), John E Allen, Jr, Antoinette Solowsky, Alexandra Lopes, Michael G Kimelman(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Walter Hicks, Julio C Lillo, Eileen Kennedy, Brian Kennedy, Rennea Butler, Bernard Lopes, Elizabeth Khalif, Raymond Lightbourn, Maureen Koecheler(individually, as surviving spouse of Gary E. Koecheler), Michael Kennedy, Robert Kennedy, Olga Colon, Nicole Lopes, Jody C Howard, William Kennedy.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Annmarie Williams, Robert Murray, Hans A Klein, Brenda Lynch(individually, as surviving spouse of James T. Lynch), Lorraine Lopes(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore Lopes), James Kennedy, Karen Barrett (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard King, deceased, the late spouse of Lucille T. King), Vincent Linnane(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert T. Linnane), Kellie Work, Ilia E Rodriguez(individually, as surviving parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Judith "Judy" M Hesse(individually, as surviving sibling of James T. Lynch), Michael P Kimelman, Maureen MacDonald, Ilia E Rodriguez (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julio Cesar Lillo Torres, deceased, the late parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, Katherine Lenoir, Vincent Linnane(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert T. Linnane, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert T. Linnane), John A Lenoir, Andre LaFrance, Karen Barrett(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucille T. King, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lucille T. King), Betty Moore-Gooding, Steven LaFrance, Lev Khalif, Mindy Gottenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Alisha C. Levin), Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Antoinette Lauria(individually, as surviving parent of Stephen J. Lauria), Marilyn Matthews, Pamela Lawson Dixon(individually, as surviving child of Nathaniel Lawson), Paul Koecheler, Elisa P Malani(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lomax, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Lomax), Maureen Koecheler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary E. Koecheler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary E. Koecheler), Judith "Judy" M Hesse (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael B. Lynch, deceased, the late sibling of James T. Lynch), Roger Kyte(individually, as surviving spouse of Angela R. Kyte), Audrey Levin, Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Jewel Lyons(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nehamon Lyons, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nehamon Lyons), Dara Berliner, Evelyn Robinson, Catherine Lauria, Iliana E Flores, Carolyn DeRosier, Rebecca Lightbourn(individually, as surviving parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Patrick Lenoir, Susan M King, John Koecheler, Gene Koecheler, Sophia W. M. Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of George Lopez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of George Lopez), Judy Schneider, Antoinette Lauria(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen J. Lauria, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Stephen J. Lauria), Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas Kennedy), Scott Kimelman, Allison Garger(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas Kennedy), Morgan Kyte, Lorraine Lopes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore Lopes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore Lopes), Jeanne Kavinski(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol A. LaPlante, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol A. LaPlante), Thomas Kuras(individually, as surviving sibling of Patricia A. Kuras), Alexander Lopez, Mindy Gottenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alisha C. Levin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alisha C. Levin), Berdie Hicks, Kathleen E Zetscher, Michael B Kuras, Elisa P Malani (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Erica Partosoedarso, deceased, the late spouse of Michael Lomax), Jeanne Kavinski(individually, as surviving sibling of Carol A. LaPlante), Rebecca Lightbourn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Lightbourn, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Pamela Lawson Dixon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nathaniel Lawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nathaniel Lawson), Sophia W. M. Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of George Lopez), Marvin Levin, Paul Thomas Lynch, Michael G Kimelman(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Thomas Kuras(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia A. Kuras, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patricia A. Kuras), Roger Kyte(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela R. Kyte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angela R. Kyte), Brenda Lynch(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Lynch, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James T. Lynch), Patricia Lenoir, Rebecca Lightbourn(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Jewel Lyons(individually, as surviving parent of Nehamon Lyons), Michael Lopez Feliciano, Mary Jo Koecheler, Thomas Kuras (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Frances Kuras, deceased, the late parent of Patricia A. Kuras), John E Allen, Jr, Antoinette Solowsky, Alexandra Lopes, Michael G Kimelman(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Walter Hicks, Julio C Lillo, Eileen Kennedy, Brian Kennedy, Rennea Butler, Bernard Lopes, Elizabeth Khalif, Raymond Lightbourn, Maureen Koecheler(individually, as surviving spouse of Gary E. Koecheler), Michael Kennedy, Robert Kennedy, Olga Colon, Nicole Lopes, Jody C Howard, William Kennedy, Jem A Howard added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,.Document filed by Annmarie Williams, Robert Murray, Hans A Klein, Brenda Lynch(individually, as surviving spouse of James T. Lynch), Lorraine Lopes(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore Lopes), James Kennedy, Karen Barrett (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard King, deceased, the late spouse of Lucille T. King), Vincent Linnane(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert T. Linnane), Kellie Work, Ilia E Rodriguez(individually, as surviving parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Judith "Judy" M Hesse(individually, as surviving sibling of James T. Lynch), Michael P Kimelman, Maureen MacDonald, Ilia E Rodriguez (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julio Cesar Lillo Torres, deceased, the late parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, Katherine Lenoir, Vincent Linnane(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert T. Linnane, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert T. Linnane), John A Lenoir, Andre LaFrance, Karen Barrett(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucille T. King, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lucille T. King), Betty Moore-Gooding, Steven LaFrance, Lev Khalif, Mindy Gottenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Alisha C. Levin), Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Antoinette Lauria(individually, as surviving parent of Stephen J. Lauria), Marilyn Matthews, Pamela Lawson Dixon(individually, as surviving child of Nathaniel Lawson), Paul Koecheler, Elisa P Malani(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lomax, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Lomax), Maureen Koecheler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary E. Koecheler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary E. Koecheler), Judith "Judy" M Hesse (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael B. Lynch, deceased, the late sibling of James T. Lynch), Roger Kyte(individually, as surviving spouse of Angela R. Kyte), Audrey Levin, Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Jewel Lyons(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nehamon Lyons, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nehamon Lyons), Dara Berliner, Evelyn Robinson, Catherine Lauria, Iliana E Flores, Carolyn DeRosier, Rebecca Lightbourn(individually, as surviving parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Patrick Lenoir, Susan M King, John Koecheler, Gene Koecheler, Sophia W. M. Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of George Lopez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of George Lopez), Judy Schneider, Antoinette Lauria(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen J. Lauria, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Stephen J. Lauria), Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all filers were not entered/selected for the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (pne)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong all filers were not entered/selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Jem A. Howard must be added to CM ECF; all filers were not added/selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-MD-1570. (pne)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570. Document filed by John E Allen, Jr, Karen Barrett(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucille T. King, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lucille T. King), Karen Barrett (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard King, deceased, the late spouse of Lucille T. King), Dara Berliner, Rennea Butler, Olga Colon, Carolyn DeRosier, Pamela Lawson Dixon(individually, as surviving child of Nathaniel Lawson), Pamela Lawson Dixon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nathaniel Lawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nathaniel Lawson), Michael Lopez Feliciano, Sophia W. M. Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of George Lopez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of George Lopez), Sophia W. M. Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of George Lopez), Iliana E Flores, Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas Kennedy), Allison Garger(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas Kennedy), Mindy Gottenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Alisha C. Levin), Mindy Gottenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alisha C. Levin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alisha C. Levin), Judith "Judy" M Hesse(individually, as surviving sibling of James T. Lynch), Judith "Judy" M Hesse (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael B. Lynch, deceased, the late sibling of James T. Lynch), Berdie Hicks, Walter Hicks, Jody C Howard, Jeanne Kavinski(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol A. LaPlante, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol A. LaPlante), Jeanne Kavinski(individually, as surviving sibling of Carol A. LaPlante), Brian Kennedy, Eileen Kennedy, James Kennedy, Michael Kennedy, Robert Kennedy, William Kennedy, Elizabeth Khalif, Lev Khalif, Michael P Kimelman, Michael G Kimelman(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Michael G Kimelman(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Scott Kimelman, Susan M King, Hans A Klein, Gene Koecheler, John Koecheler, Mary Jo Koecheler, Maureen Koecheler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary E. Koecheler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary E. Koecheler), Maureen Koecheler(individually, as surviving spouse of Gary E. Koecheler), Paul Koecheler, Michael B Kuras, Thomas Kuras(individually, as surviving sibling of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia A. Kuras, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Frances Kuras, deceased, the late parent of Patricia A. Kuras), Morgan Kyte, Roger Kyte(individually, as surviving spouse of Angela R. Kyte), Roger Kyte(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela R. Kyte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angela R. Kyte), Andre LaFrance, Steven LaFrance, Antoinette Lauria(individually, as surviving parent of Stephen J. Lauria), Antoinette Lauria(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen J. Lauria, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Stephen J. Lauria), Catherine Lauria, John A Lenoir, Katherine Lenoir, Patricia Lenoir, Patrick Lenoir, Audrey Levin, Marvin Levin, Raymond Lightbourn, Rebecca Lightbourn(individually, as surviving parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Lightbourn, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Julio C Lillo, Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, Vincent Linnane(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert T. Linnane), Vincent Linnane(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert T. Linnane, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert T. Linnane), Alexandra Lopes, Bernard Lopes, Lorraine Lopes(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore Lopes), Lorraine Lopes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore Lopes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore Lopes), Nicole Lopes, Alexander Lopez, Brenda Lynch(individually, as surviving spouse of James T. Lynch), Brenda Lynch(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Lynch, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James T. Lynch), Paul Thomas Lynch, Jewel Lyons(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nehamon Lyons, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nehamon Lyons), Jewel Lyons(individually, as surviving parent of Nehamon Lyons), Maureen MacDonald, Elisa P Malani(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lomax, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Lomax), Elisa P Malani (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Erica Partosoedarso, deceased, the late spouse of Michael Lomax), Marilyn Matthews, Betty Moore-Gooding, Robert Murray, Evelyn Robinson, Ilia E Rodriguez(individually, as surviving parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Ilia E Rodriguez (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julio Cesar Lillo Torres, deceased, the late parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Judy Schneider, Antoinette Solowsky, Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Annmarie Williams, Kellie Work, Kathleen E Zetscher.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (pne).
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint . Document filed by John E Allen, Jr, Karen Barrett(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucille T. King, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Lucille T. King), Karen Barrett (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard King, deceased, the late spouse of Lucille T. King), Dara Berliner, Rennea Butler, Olga Colon, Carolyn DeRosier, Pamela Lawson Dixon(individually, as surviving child of Nathaniel Lawson), Pamela Lawson Dixon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nathaniel Lawson, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nathaniel Lawson), Michael Lopez Feliciano, Sophia W. M. Feliciano(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of George Lopez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of George Lopez), Sophia W. M. Feliciano(individually, as surviving spouse of George Lopez), Iliana E Flores, Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas Kennedy), Allison Garger(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas Kennedy), Mindy Gottenberg(individually, as surviving sibling of Alisha C. Levin), Mindy Gottenberg(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alisha C. Levin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Alisha C. Levin), Judith "Judy" M Hesse(individually, as surviving sibling of James T. Lynch), Judith "Judy" M Hesse (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael B. Lynch, deceased, the late sibling of James T. Lynch), Berdie Hicks, Walter Hicks, Jody C Howard, Jeanne Kavinski(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol A. LaPlante, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Carol A. LaPlante), Jeanne Kavinski(individually, as surviving sibling of Carol A. LaPlante), Brian Kennedy, Eileen Kennedy, James Kennedy, Michael Kennedy, Robert Kennedy, William Kennedy, Elizabeth Khalif, Lev Khalif, Michael P Kimelman, Michael G Kimelman(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Michael G Kimelman(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Scott Kimelman, Susan M King, Hans A Klein, Gene Koecheler, John Koecheler, Mary Jo Koecheler, Maureen Koecheler(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary E. Koecheler, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gary E. Koecheler), Maureen Koecheler(individually, as surviving spouse of Gary E. Koecheler), Paul Koecheler, Michael B Kuras, Thomas Kuras(individually, as surviving sibling of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia A. Kuras, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Patricia A. Kuras), Thomas Kuras (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Frances Kuras, deceased, the late parent of Patricia A. Kuras), Morgan Kyte, Roger Kyte(individually, as surviving spouse of Angela R. Kyte), Roger Kyte(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela R. Kyte, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Angela R. Kyte), Andre LaFrance, Steven LaFrance, Antoinette Lauria(individually, as surviving parent of Stephen J. Lauria), Antoinette Lauria(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen J. Lauria, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Stephen J. Lauria), Catherine Lauria, John A Lenoir, Katherine Lenoir, Patricia Lenoir, Patrick Lenoir, Audrey Levin, Marvin Levin, Raymond Lightbourn, Rebecca Lightbourn(individually, as surviving parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Rebecca Lightbourn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Lightbourn, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Samantha Lightbourn-Allen), Julio C Lillo, Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, Vincent Linnane(individually, as surviving sibling of Robert T. Linnane), Vincent Linnane(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert T. Linnane, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert T. Linnane), Alexandra Lopes, Bernard Lopes, Lorraine Lopes(individually, as surviving spouse of Salvatore Lopes), Lorraine Lopes(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Salvatore Lopes, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Salvatore Lopes), Nicole Lopes, Alexander Lopez, Brenda Lynch(individually, as surviving spouse of James T. Lynch), Brenda Lynch(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Lynch, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James T. Lynch), Paul Thomas Lynch, Jewel Lyons(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nehamon Lyons, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nehamon Lyons), Jewel Lyons(individually, as surviving parent of Nehamon Lyons), Maureen MacDonald, Elisa P Malani(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lomax, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Michael Lomax), Elisa P Malani (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Erica Partosoedarso, deceased, the late spouse of Michael Lomax), Marilyn Matthews, Betty Moore-Gooding, Robert Murray, Evelyn Robinson, Ilia E Rodriguez(individually, as surviving parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Ilia E Rodriguez (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julio Cesar Lillo Torres, deceased, the late parent of Carlos R. Lillo), Judy Schneider, Antoinette Solowsky, Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Annmarie Williams, Kellie Work, Kathleen E Zetscher. (Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (pne).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom Of Saudi Arabi. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16077549)Document filed by Robert Murray, James Kennedy, Kellie Work, Michael P Kimelman, Karen Barrett, Lev Khalif, Terre Susan Wallach(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Terre Susan Wallach(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Dara Berliner, Susan M King, Allison Garger(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Kennedy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Thomas Kennedy), Scott Kimelman, Allison Garger(individually, as surviving spouse of Thomas Kennedy), Michael G Kimelman(as the co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Jo Kimelman, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Mary Jo Kimelman), Michael G Kimelman(individually, as surviving parent of Mary Jo Kimelman), Eileen Kennedy, Brian Kennedy, Elizabeth Khalif, Michael Kennedy, Robert Kennedy, William Kennedy, Maureen MacDonald, Alexandra Lopes, Pamela Lawson Dixon, Maureen Koecheler, Evelyn Robinson, Gene Koecheler, Iliana E Flores, Jewel Lyons, Catherine Lauria, John Koecheler, Judith "Judy" M Hesse, Carolyn DeRosier, Antoinette Lauria, Sophia W. M. Feliciano, Judith "Judy" M Hesse, Ilia E Rodriguez, Patrick Lenoir, Marilyn Matthews, Karen Barrett, Kathleen E Zetscher, Nahid Mashayekhi Lin, Rebecca Lightbourn, Jeanne Kavinski, Hans A Klein, Betty Moore-Gooding, Rennea Butler, Walter Hicks, Olga Colon, Berdie Hicks, Lorraine Lopes, Jewel Lyons, Elisa P Malani, Andre LaFrance, Michael B Kuras, Thomas Kuras, Audrey Levin, Thomas Kuras, Brenda Lynch, Jeanne Kavinski, Thomas Kuras, Michael Lopez Feliciano, Julio C Lillo, Elisa P Malani, Mary Jo Koecheler, Jody C Howard, Rebecca Lightbourn, Lorraine Lopes, Roger Kyte, Patricia Lenoir, Antoinette Lauria, Mindy Gottenberg, Raymond Lightbourn, Steven LaFrance, Rebecca Lightbourn, Mindy Gottenberg, Antoinette Solowsky, Pamela Lawson Dixon, John E Allen, Jr, Bernard Lopes, Ilia E Rodriguez, Nicole Lopes, Morgan Kyte, Marvin Levin, Annmarie Williams, Roger Kyte, Paul Koecheler, Maureen Koecheler, Brenda Lynch, Vincent Linnane, Vincent Linnane, Paul Thomas Lynch, Alexander Lopez, Judy Schneider, Katherine Lenoir, Sophia W. M. Feliciano, John A Lenoir.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garger et al v. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kennedy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven LaFrance
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iliana E Flores
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dara Berliner
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Kyte
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa P Malani
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Lauria
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nahid Mashayekhi Lin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Koecheler
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith "Judy" M Hesse
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Hicks
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia W. M. Feliciano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Linnane
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lenoir
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Moore-Gooding
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Kennedy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Lyons
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn DeRosier
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kennedy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Garger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Kavinski
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P Kimelman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Lenoir
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Lopez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio C Lillo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre LaFrance
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Koecheler
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annmarie Williams
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lev Khalif
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lawson Dixon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Levin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Lightbourn
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Lopes
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen MacDonald
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen E Zetscher
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Lopes
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terre Susan Wallach
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Robinson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M King
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Lopes
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berdie Hicks
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Levin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Khalif
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jo Koecheler
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Solowsky
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rennea Butler
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kimelman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Koecheler
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B Kuras
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Koecheler
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kennedy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Murray
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Lauria
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Schneider
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lopez Feliciano
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lightbourn
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Colon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Lopes
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Kyte
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Allen, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Matthews
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans A Klein
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kennedy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilia E Rodriguez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Kimelman
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Thomas Lynch
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Barrett
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody C Howard
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lynch
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Work
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Lenoir
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kuras
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Lenoir
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy Gottenberg
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jem A Howard
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Of Saudi Arabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?