Bush et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Susan Lori Magazine, Christina Martinez, Noah R McCloskey, Judith McNeil, Walter McNeil, Jr, Annie Harris, Shaun Mason, Jimmie L Willson, Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger, Bronx Public Administrator, Donald Mauro, Joseph Mardovich, Sherman Acker, Corey Hawkins, Catherine Mascali, Edward Mardovich, Jr, Christian Lyons, Marquis Lyons, McCarthy Elizabeth, Ali Mohamed Malahi, Nancy McMahon, Ellen Mello, Vivian Mattic, Douglas Mello, Jarid Maldonado, Miriam R Carrasquillo, Kevin J McHale, Julie E McMahon, Mathew McMahon, John Mello, John F McHale, Jr, Linda D May, Andrew Magazine, Dwain Mattson, Leslie Edwards, John Mascali, Leigh Mardovich, Nabeela Malahi, Donna Mascali Russo, Arnold F Mascali, Jr, Frances Firth, Elizabeth McCarthy, Malek Malahi, Frances Douglas, Saul Melendez-Hernandez, Erik F Melnichenko, Michele Magazine, Frances Mercado, Fares Malahi, Gabriel Martinez, Alexsandr Melnichenko, Shannon Mason, Joseph M McHale, April Fitzgerald, Victoria Catanese, Marie Martinez, Laura Balemian, Mary Mattson, Nelson Johnson, Yaritza Franco, Kim McNeil, Janet Wexler Magee, Gene Maloy, Marco A Melendez, Dale Mattson, Daisy N Melendez, Jean Neal, Rodney Bush, Anne McCloskey, Elvia Diaz, Joanne Johnson, William Eugene Clark, Jordan Maldonado, Peter McMahon and Michael McMahon
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11964
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Sherman Acker, Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, individually, as surviving spouse of Edward J. Mardovich), Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward J. Mardovich, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward J. Mardovich), Bronx Public Administrator, Rodney Bush, Miriam R Carrasquillo, Victoria Catanese, William Eugene Clark, Elvia Diaz, Frances Douglas, Leslie Edwards, Frances Firth, April Fitzgerald(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Merlyn Maloy, deceased, the late parent of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(individually, as surviving sibling of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gene Maloy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gene Maloy), Yaritza Franco, Annie Harris, Corey Hawkins, Joanne Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sareatha Wilson, deceased, the late parent of Ada L. Mason), Joanne Johnson(individually, as surviving sibling of Ada L. Mason), Nelson Johnson, Christian Lyons, Marquis Lyons, Andrew Magazine, Michele Magazine, Susan Lori Magazine(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jay R. Magazine, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jay R. Magazine), Susan Lori Magazine(individually, as surviving spouse of Jay R. Magazine), Janet Wexler Magee(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles W. Magee, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles W. Magee), Janet Wexler Magee(individually, as surviving spouse of Charles W. Magee), Ali Mohamed Malahi(individually, as surviving parent of Abdu Ali Malahi), Ali Mohamed Malahi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abdu Ali Malahi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abdu Ali Malahi), Fares Malahi, Malek Malahi, Nabeela Malahi, Jarid Maldonado, Jordan Maldonado, Gene Maloy, Edward Mardovich, Jr, Joseph Mardovich, Leigh Mardovich, Christina Martinez, Gabriel Martinez(individually, as surviving parent of Robert G. Martinez), Gabriel Martinez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert G Martinez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert G, Martinez), Marie Martinez, Catherine Mascali(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arnold Mascali, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Joseph A. Mascali), Catherine Mascali(individually, as surviving parent of Joseph A. Mascali), John Mascali, Arnold F Mascali, Jr, Shannon Mason, Shaun Mason, Vivian Mattic, Dale Mattson(individually, as surviving sibling of Dean E. Mattson), Dale Mattson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bernice Mattson, deceased, the late parent of Dean E. Mattson), Dwain Mattson, Mary Mattson, Donald Mauro(individually, as surviving spouse of Nancy Mauro), Donald Mauro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nancy Mauro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nancy Mauro), Linda D May, Elizabeth McCarthy(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas McHale), Elizabeth McCarthy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John F. McHale, deceased, the late parent of Thomas McHale), Anne McCloskey(individually, as surviving parent of Katie M. McCloskey), Anne McCloskey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie M. McCloskey, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Katie M. McCloskey), Noah R McCloskey, John F McHale, Jr, Joseph M McHale, Kevin J McHale, Julie E McMahon(individually, as surviving spouse of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. McMahon, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(Natural Guardian of PM, as Natural Guardian of PM, a minor, as surviving child of Robert D. McMahon), Mathew McMahon, Michael McMahon, Nancy McMahon, Peter McMahon, Judith McNeil, Kim McNeil(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter A. McNeil, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Walter A. McNeil), Kim McNeil(individually, as surviving child of Walter A. McNeil), Walter McNeil, Jr, Daisy N Melendez, Marco A Melendez, Saul Melendez-Hernandez, Douglas Mello, Ellen Mello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Christopher D. Mello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Christopher D. Mello), Ellen Mello(individually, as surviving parent of Christopher D. Mello), John Mello, Alexsandr Melnichenko(individually, as surviving spouse of Yelena Melnichenko), Alexsandr Melnichenko(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Yelena Melnichenko, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Yelena Melnichenko), Erik F Melnichenko, Frances Mercado, Jean Neal(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret E. Mattic, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie I. Mattic, deceased, the late parent of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(individually, as surviving sibling of Margaret E. Mattic), Donna Mascali Russo, Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger, Jimmie L Willson. (Strong, Bruce)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 3/21/2019. Document filed by Gabriel Martinez(individually, as surviving parent of Robert G. Martinez); Christina Martinez; Frances Mercado; Douglas Mello; Anne McCloskey(individually, as surviving parent of Katie M. McCloskey); Linda D May; Michele Magazine; Kim McNeil(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter A. McNeil, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Walter A. McNeil); Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, individually, as surviving spouse of Edward J. Mardovich); Leslie Edwards; Julie E McMahon(individually, as surviving spouse of Robert D. McMahon); Miriam R Carrasquillo; Joanne Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sareatha Wilson, deceased, the late parent of Ada L. Mason); Frances Douglas; Daisy N Melendez; Mathew McMahon; Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward J. Mardovich, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward J. Mardovich); Dale Mattson(individually, as surviving sibling of Dean E. Mattson); Donald Mauro(individually, as surviving spouse of Nancy Mauro); Jordan Maldonado; Alexsandr Melnichenko(individually, as surviving spouse of Yelena Melnichenko); Ellen Mello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Christopher D. Mello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Christopher D. Mello); Janet Wexler Magee(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles W. Magee, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles W. Magee); Edward Mardovich, Jr; Marie Martinez; Ali Mohamed Malahi(individually, as surviving parent of Abdu Ali Malahi); John Mello; Michael McMahon; Sherman Acker; Yaritza Franco; Alexsandr Melnichenko(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Yelena Melnichenko, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Yelena Melnichenko); Nancy McMahon; Noah R McCloskey; Victoria Catanese; Shannon Mason; Catherine Mascali(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arnold Mascali, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Joseph A. Mascali); Anne McCloskey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie M. McCloskey, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Katie M. McCloskey); Elizabeth McCarthy(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas McHale); Dale Mattson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bernice Mattson, deceased, the late parent of Dean E. Mattson); Catherine Mascali(individually, as surviving parent of Joseph A. Mascali); Ali Mohamed Malahi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abdu Ali Malahi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abdu Ali Malahi); Fares Malahi; Jean Neal(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret E. Mattic, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Margaret E. Mattic); Walter McNeil, Jr; Dwain Mattson; William Eugene Clark; Julie E McMahon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. McMahon, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert D. McMahon); Shaun Mason; Saul Melendez-Hernandez; Peter McMahon; Jarid Maldonado; Donald Mauro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nancy Mauro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nancy Mauro); Vivian Mattic; Elizabeth McCarthy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John F. McHale, deceased, the late parent of Thomas McHale); Kevin J McHale; Joseph M McHale; Elvia Diaz; Corey Hawkins; Rodney Bush; Ellen Mello(individually, as surviving parent of Christopher D. Mello); Joseph Mardovich; Judith McNeil; April Fitzgerald(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Merlyn Maloy, deceased, the late parent of Gene Maloy); Leigh Mardovich; Julie E McMahon(Natural Guardian of PM, as Natural Guardian of PM, a minor, as surviving child of Robert D. McMahon); Bronx Public Administrator; Arnold F Mascali, Jr; Nabeela Malahi; Mary Mattson; John F McHale, Jr; Annie Harris; Gene Maloy; Jean Neal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie I. Mattic, deceased, the late parent of Margaret E. Mattic); Kim McNeil(individually, as surviving child of Walter A. McNeil); Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger; April Fitzgerald(individually, as surviving sibling of Gene Maloy); Jimmie L Willson; April Fitzgerald(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gene Maloy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gene Maloy); Malek Malahi; Susan Lori Magazine(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jay R. Magazine, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jay R. Magazine); Marco A Melendez; Christian Lyons; Frances Firth; Erik F Melnichenko; Jean Neal(individually, as surviving sibling of Margaret E. Mattic); Janet Wexler Magee(individually, as surviving spouse of Charles W. Magee); Joanne Johnson(individually, as surviving sibling of Ada L. Mason); Donna Mascali Russo; Andrew Magazine; Marquis Lyons; Gabriel Martinez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert G Martinez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert G, Martinez); John Mascali; Nelson Johnson; Susan Lori Magazine(individually, as surviving spouse of Jay R. Magazine). (Goldman, Jerry)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (dnh)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570. Document filed by Sherman Acker, Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, individually, as surviving spouse of Edward J. Mardovich), Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward J. Mardovich, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward J. Mardovich), Bronx Public Administrator, Rodney Bush, Miriam R Carrasquillo, Victoria Catanese, William Eugene Clark, Elvia Diaz, Frances Douglas, Leslie Edwards, Frances Firth, April Fitzgerald(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Merlyn Maloy, deceased, the late parent of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(individually, as surviving sibling of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gene Maloy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gene Maloy), Yaritza Franco, Annie Harris, Corey Hawkins, Joanne Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sareatha Wilson, deceased, the late parent of Ada L. Mason), Joanne Johnson(individually, as surviving sibling of Ada L. Mason), Nelson Johnson, Christian Lyons, Marquis Lyons, Andrew Magazine, Michele Magazine, Susan Lori Magazine(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jay R. Magazine, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jay R. Magazine), Susan Lori Magazine(individually, as surviving spouse of Jay R. Magazine), Janet Wexler Magee(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles W. Magee, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles W. Magee), Janet Wexler Magee(individually, as surviving spouse of Charles W. Magee), Ali Mohamed Malahi(individually, as surviving parent of Abdu Ali Malahi), Ali Mohamed Malahi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abdu Ali Malahi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abdu Ali Malahi), Fares Malahi, Malek Malahi, Nabeela Malahi, Jarid Maldonado, Jordan Maldonado, Gene Maloy, Edward Mardovich, Jr, Joseph Mardovich, Leigh Mardovich, Christina Martinez, Gabriel Martinez(individually, as surviving parent of Robert G. Martinez), Gabriel Martinez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert G Martinez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert G, Martinez), Marie Martinez, Catherine Mascali(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arnold Mascali, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Joseph A. Mascali), Catherine Mascali(individually, as surviving parent of Joseph A. Mascali), John Mascali, Arnold F Mascali, Jr, Shannon Mason, Shaun Mason, Vivian Mattic, Dale Mattson(individually, as surviving sibling of Dean E. Mattson), Dale Mattson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bernice Mattson, deceased, the late parent of Dean E. Mattson), Dwain Mattson, Mary Mattson, Donald Mauro(individually, as surviving spouse of Nancy Mauro), Donald Mauro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nancy Mauro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nancy Mauro), Linda D May, Elizabeth McCarthy(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas McHale), Elizabeth McCarthy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John F. McHale, deceased, the late parent of Thomas McHale), Anne McCloskey(individually, as surviving parent of Katie M. McCloskey), Anne McCloskey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie M. McCloskey, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Katie M. McCloskey), Noah R McCloskey, John F McHale, Jr, Joseph M McHale, Kevin J McHale, Julie E McMahon(individually, as surviving spouse of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. McMahon, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(Natural Guardian of PM, as Natural Guardian of PM, a minor, as surviving child of Robert D. McMahon), Mathew McMahon, Michael McMahon, Nancy McMahon, Peter McMahon, Judith McNeil, Kim McNeil(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter A. McNeil, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Walter A. McNeil), Kim McNeil(individually, as surviving child of Walter A. McNeil), Walter McNeil, Jr, Daisy N Melendez, Marco A Melendez, Saul Melendez-Hernandez, Douglas Mello, Ellen Mello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Christopher D. Mello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Christopher D. Mello), Ellen Mello(individually, as surviving parent of Christopher D. Mello), John Mello, Alexsandr Melnichenko(individually, as surviving spouse of Yelena Melnichenko), Alexsandr Melnichenko(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Yelena Melnichenko, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Yelena Melnichenko), Erik F Melnichenko, Frances Mercado, Jean Neal(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret E. Mattic, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie I. Mattic, deceased, the late parent of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(individually, as surviving sibling of Margaret E. Mattic), Donna Mascali Russo, Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger, Jimmie L Willson.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Sherman Acker, Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, individually, as surviving spouse of Edward J. Mardovich), Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward J. Mardovich, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward J. Mardovich), Bronx Public Administrator, Rodney Bush, Miriam R Carrasquillo, Victoria Catanese, William Eugene Clark, Elvia Diaz, Frances Douglas, Leslie Edwards, Frances Firth, April Fitzgerald(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Merlyn Maloy, deceased, the late parent of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(individually, as surviving sibling of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gene Maloy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gene Maloy), Yaritza Franco, Annie Harris, Corey Hawkins, Joanne Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sareatha Wilson, deceased, the late parent of Ada L. Mason), Joanne Johnson(individually, as surviving sibling of Ada L. Mason), Nelson Johnson, Christian Lyons, Marquis Lyons, Andrew Magazine, Michele Magazine, Susan Lori Magazine(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jay R. Magazine, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jay R. Magazine), Susan Lori Magazine(individually, as surviving spouse of Jay R. Magazine), Janet Wexler Magee(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles W. Magee, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles W. Magee), Janet Wexler Magee(individually, as surviving spouse of Charles W. Magee), Ali Mohamed Malahi(individually, as surviving parent of Abdu Ali Malahi), Ali Mohamed Malahi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abdu Ali Malahi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abdu Ali Malahi), Fares Malahi, Malek Malahi, Nabeela Malahi, Jarid Maldonado, Jordan Maldonado, Gene Maloy, Edward Mardovich, Jr, Joseph Mardovich, Leigh Mardovich, Christina Martinez, Gabriel Martinez(individually, as surviving parent of Robert G. Martinez), Gabriel Martinez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert G Martinez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert G, Martinez), Marie Martinez, Catherine Mascali(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arnold Mascali, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Joseph A. Mascali), Catherine Mascali(individually, as surviving parent of Joseph A. Mascali), John Mascali, Arnold F Mascali, Jr, Shannon Mason, Shaun Mason, Vivian Mattic, Dale Mattson(individually, as surviving sibling of Dean E. Mattson), Dale Mattson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bernice Mattson, deceased, the late parent of Dean E. Mattson), Dwain Mattson, Mary Mattson, Donald Mauro(individually, as surviving spouse of Nancy Mauro), Donald Mauro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nancy Mauro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nancy Mauro), Linda D May, Elizabeth McCarthy(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas McHale), Elizabeth McCarthy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John F. McHale, deceased, the late parent of Thomas McHale), Anne McCloskey(individually, as surviving parent of Katie M. McCloskey), Anne McCloskey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie M. McCloskey, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Katie M. McCloskey), Noah R McCloskey, John F McHale, Jr, Joseph M McHale, Kevin J McHale, Julie E McMahon(individually, as surviving spouse of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. McMahon, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(Natural Guardian of PM, as Natural Guardian of PM, a minor, as surviving child of Robert D. McMahon), Mathew McMahon, Michael McMahon, Nancy McMahon, Peter McMahon, Judith McNeil, Kim McNeil(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter A. McNeil, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Walter A. McNeil), Kim McNeil(individually, as surviving child of Walter A. McNeil), Walter McNeil, Jr, Daisy N Melendez, Marco A Melendez, Saul Melendez-Hernandez, Douglas Mello, Ellen Mello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Christopher D. Mello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Christopher D. Mello), Ellen Mello(individually, as surviving parent of Christopher D. Mello), John Mello, Alexsandr Melnichenko(individually, as surviving spouse of Yelena Melnichenko), Alexsandr Melnichenko(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Yelena Melnichenko, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Yelena Melnichenko), Erik F Melnichenko, Frances Mercado, Jean Neal(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret E. Mattic, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie I. Mattic, deceased, the late parent of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(individually, as surviving sibling of Margaret E. Mattic), Donna Mascali Russo, Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger, Jimmie L Willson. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Gabriel Martinez(individually, as surviving parent of Robert G. Martinez), Christina Martinez, Frances Mercado, Douglas Mello, Anne McCloskey(individually, as surviving parent of Katie M. McCloskey), Linda D May, Michele Magazine, Kim McNeil(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter A. McNeil, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Walter A. McNeil), Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, individually, as surviving spouse of Edward J. Mardovich), Leslie Edwards, Julie E McMahon(individually, as surviving spouse of Robert D. McMahon), Miriam R Carrasquillo, Joanne Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sareatha Wilson, deceased, the late parent of Ada L. Mason), Frances Douglas, Daisy N Melendez, Mathew McMahon, Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward J. Mardovich, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward J. Mardovich), Dale Mattson(individually, as surviving sibling of Dean E. Mattson), Donald Mauro(individually, as surviving spouse of Nancy Mauro), Jordan Maldonado, Alexsandr Melnichenko(individually, as surviving spouse of Yelena Melnichenko), Ellen Mello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Christopher D. Mello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Christopher D. Mello), Janet Wexler Magee(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles W. Magee, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles W. Magee), Edward Mardovich, Jr, Marie Martinez, Ali Mohamed Malahi(individually, as surviving parent of Abdu Ali Malahi), John Mello, Michael McMahon, Sherman Acker, Yaritza Franco, Alexsandr Melnichenko(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Yelena Melnichenko, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Yelena Melnichenko), Nancy McMahon, Noah R McCloskey, Victoria Catanese, Shannon Mason, Catherine Mascali(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arnold Mascali, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Joseph A. Mascali), Anne McCloskey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie M. McCloskey, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Katie M. McCloskey), Elizabeth McCarthy(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas McHale), Dale Mattson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bernice Mattson, deceased, the late parent of Dean E. Mattson), Catherine Mascali(individually, as surviving parent of Joseph A. Mascali), Ali Mohamed Malahi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abdu Ali Malahi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abdu Ali Malahi), Fares Malahi, Jean Neal(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret E. Mattic, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Margaret E. Mattic), Walter McNeil, Jr, Dwain Mattson, William Eugene Clark, Julie E McMahon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. McMahon, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert D. McMahon), Shaun Mason, Saul Melendez-Hernandez, Peter McMahon, Jarid Maldonado, Donald Mauro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nancy Mauro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nancy Mauro), Vivian Mattic, Elizabeth McCarthy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John F. McHale, deceased, the late parent of Thomas McHale), Kevin J McHale, Joseph M McHale, Elvia Diaz, Corey Hawkins, Rodney Bush, Ellen Mello(individually, as surviving parent of Christopher D. Mello), Joseph Mardovich, Judith McNeil, April Fitzgerald(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Merlyn Maloy, deceased, the late parent of Gene Maloy), Leigh Mardovich, Julie E McMahon(Natural Guardian of PM, as Natural Guardian of PM, a minor, as surviving child of Robert D. McMahon), Bronx Public Administrator, Arnold F Mascali, Jr, Nabeela Malahi, Mary Mattson, John F McHale, Jr, Annie Harris, Gene Maloy, Jean Neal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie I. Mattic, deceased, the late parent of Margaret E. Mattic), Kim McNeil(individually, as surviving child of Walter A. McNeil), Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger, April Fitzgerald(individually, as surviving sibling of Gene Maloy), Jimmie L Willson, April Fitzgerald(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gene Maloy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gene Maloy), Malek Malahi, Susan Lori Magazine(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jay R. Magazine, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jay R. Magazine), Marco A Melendez, Christian Lyons, Frances Firth, Erik F Melnichenko, Jean Neal(individually, as surviving sibling of Margaret E. Mattic), Janet Wexler Magee(individually, as surviving spouse of Charles W. Magee), Joanne Johnson(individually, as surviving sibling of Ada L. Mason), Donna Mascali Russo, Andrew Magazine, Marquis Lyons, Gabriel Martinez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert G Martinez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert G, Martinez), John Mascali, Nelson Johnson, Susan Lori Magazine(individually, as surviving spouse of Jay R. Magazine).(Goldman, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; party name was modified to correspond with pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Elizabeth McCarthy. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons; party name was modified to correspond with pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement; party name was modified to correspond with pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 999,999,999,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000. (sj)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS - FILER ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Sherman Acker, Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, individually, as surviving spouse of Edward J. Mardovich), Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward J. Mardovich, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward J. Mardovich), Bronx Public Administrator, Rodney Bush, Miriam R Carrasquillo, Victoria Catanese, William Eugene Clark, Elvia Diaz, Frances Douglas, Leslie Edwards, McCarthy Elizabeth, Frances Firth, April Fitzgerald(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Merlyn Maloy, deceased, the late parent of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(individually, as surviving sibling of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gene Maloy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gene Maloy), Yaritza Franco, Annie Harris, Corey Hawkins, Joanne Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sareatha Wilson, deceased, the late parent of Ada L. Mason), Joanne Johnson(individually, as surviving sibling of Ada L. Mason), Nelson Johnson, Christian Lyons, Marquis Lyons, Andrew Magazine, Michele Magazine, Susan Lori Magazine(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jay R. Magazine, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jay R. Magazine), Susan Lori Magazine(individually, as surviving spouse of Jay R. Magazine), Janet Wexler Magee(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles W. Magee, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles W. Magee), Janet Wexler Magee(individually, as surviving spouse of Charles W. Magee), Ali Mohamed Malahi(individually, as surviving parent of Abdu Ali Malahi), Ali Mohamed Malahi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abdu Ali Malahi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abdu Ali Malahi), Fares Malahi, Malek Malahi, Nabeela Malahi, Jarid Maldonado, Jordan Maldonado, Gene Maloy, Edward Mardovich, Jr, Joseph Mardovich, Leigh Mardovich, Christina Martinez, Gabriel Martinez(individually, as surviving parent of Robert G. Martinez), Gabriel Martinez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert G Martinez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert G, Martinez), Marie Martinez, Catherine Mascali(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arnold Mascali, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Joseph A. Mascali), Catherine Mascali(individually, as surviving parent of Joseph A. Mascali), John Mascali, Arnold F Mascali, Jr, Shannon Mason, Shaun Mason, Vivian Mattic, Dale Mattson(individually, as surviving sibling of Dean E. Mattson), Dale Mattson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bernice Mattson, deceased, the late parent of Dean E. Mattson), Dwain Mattson, Mary Mattson, Donald Mauro(individually, as surviving spouse of Nancy Mauro), Donald Mauro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nancy Mauro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nancy Mauro), Linda D May, Elizabeth McCarthy, Anne McCloskey(individually, as surviving parent of Katie M. McCloskey), Anne McCloskey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie M. McCloskey, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Katie M. McCloskey), Noah R McCloskey, John F McHale, Jr, Joseph M McHale, Kevin J McHale, Julie E McMahon(individually, as surviving spouse of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. McMahon, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(Natural Guardian of PM, as Natural Guardian of PM, a minor, as surviving child of Robert D. McMahon), Mathew McMahon, Michael McMahon, Nancy McMahon, Peter McMahon, Judith McNeil, Kim McNeil(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter A. McNeil, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Walter A. McNeil), Kim McNeil(individually, as surviving child of Walter A. McNeil), Walter McNeil, Jr, Daisy N Melendez, Marco A Melendez, Saul Melendez-Hernandez, Douglas Mello, Ellen Mello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Christopher D. Mello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Christopher D. Mello), Ellen Mello(individually, as surviving parent of Christopher D. Mello), John Mello, Alexsandr Melnichenko(individually, as surviving spouse of Yelena Melnichenko), Alexsandr Melnichenko(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Yelena Melnichenko, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Yelena Melnichenko), Erik F Melnichenko, Frances Mercado, Jean Neal(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret E. Mattic, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie I. Mattic, deceased, the late parent of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(individually, as surviving sibling of Margaret E. Mattic), Donna Mascali Russo, Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger, Jimmie L Willson.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (sj).
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sherman Acker, Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, individually, as surviving spouse of Edward J. Mardovich), Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward J. Mardovich, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward J. Mardovich), Bronx Public Administrator, Rodney Bush, Miriam R Carrasquillo, Victoria Catanese, William Eugene Clark, Elvia Diaz, Frances Douglas, Leslie Edwards, McCarthy Elizabeth, Frances Firth, April Fitzgerald(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Merlyn Maloy, deceased, the late parent of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(individually, as surviving sibling of Gene Maloy), April Fitzgerald(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gene Maloy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gene Maloy), Yaritza Franco, Annie Harris, Corey Hawkins, Joanne Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sareatha Wilson, deceased, the late parent of Ada L. Mason), Joanne Johnson(individually, as surviving sibling of Ada L. Mason), Nelson Johnson, Christian Lyons, Marquis Lyons, Andrew Magazine, Michele Magazine, Susan Lori Magazine(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jay R. Magazine, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jay R. Magazine), Susan Lori Magazine(individually, as surviving spouse of Jay R. Magazine), Janet Wexler Magee(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles W. Magee, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles W. Magee), Janet Wexler Magee(individually, as surviving spouse of Charles W. Magee), Ali Mohamed Malahi(individually, as surviving parent of Abdu Ali Malahi), Ali Mohamed Malahi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abdu Ali Malahi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abdu Ali Malahi), Fares Malahi, Malek Malahi, Nabeela Malahi, Jarid Maldonado, Jordan Maldonado, Gene Maloy, Edward Mardovich, Jr, Joseph Mardovich, Leigh Mardovich, Christina Martinez, Gabriel Martinez(individually, as surviving parent of Robert G. Martinez), Gabriel Martinez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert G Martinez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert G, Martinez), Marie Martinez, Catherine Mascali(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arnold Mascali, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Joseph A. Mascali), Catherine Mascali(individually, as surviving parent of Joseph A. Mascali), John Mascali, Arnold F Mascali, Jr, Shannon Mason, Shaun Mason, Vivian Mattic, Dale Mattson(individually, as surviving sibling of Dean E. Mattson), Dale Mattson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bernice Mattson, deceased, the late parent of Dean E. Mattson), Dwain Mattson, Mary Mattson, Donald Mauro(individually, as surviving spouse of Nancy Mauro), Donald Mauro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nancy Mauro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nancy Mauro), Linda D May, Elizabeth McCarthy, Anne McCloskey(individually, as surviving parent of Katie M. McCloskey), Anne McCloskey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie M. McCloskey, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Katie M. McCloskey), Noah R McCloskey, John F McHale, Jr, Joseph M McHale, Kevin J McHale, Julie E McMahon(individually, as surviving spouse of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. McMahon, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert D. McMahon), Julie E McMahon(Natural Guardian of PM, as Natural Guardian of PM, a minor, as surviving child of Robert D. McMahon), Mathew McMahon, Michael McMahon, Nancy McMahon, Peter McMahon, Judith McNeil, Kim McNeil(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter A. McNeil, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Walter A. McNeil), Kim McNeil(individually, as surviving child of Walter A. McNeil), Walter McNeil, Jr, Daisy N Melendez, Marco A Melendez, Saul Melendez-Hernandez, Douglas Mello, Ellen Mello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Christopher D. Mello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Christopher D. Mello), Ellen Mello(individually, as surviving parent of Christopher D. Mello), John Mello, Alexsandr Melnichenko(individually, as surviving spouse of Yelena Melnichenko), Alexsandr Melnichenko(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Yelena Melnichenko, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Yelena Melnichenko), Erik F Melnichenko, Frances Mercado, Jean Neal(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret E. Mattic, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie I. Mattic, deceased, the late parent of Margaret E. Mattic), Jean Neal(individually, as surviving sibling of Margaret E. Mattic), Donna Mascali Russo, Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger, Jimmie L Willson. (Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (sj).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16077725)Document filed by Gabriel Martinez(individually, as surviving parent of Robert G. Martinez), Christina Martinez, Frances Mercado, Douglas Mello, Anne McCloskey(individually, as surviving parent of Katie M. McCloskey), Linda D May, Michele Magazine, Kim McNeil(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter A. McNeil, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Walter A. McNeil), Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, individually, as surviving spouse of Edward J. Mardovich), Leslie Edwards, Julie E McMahon(individually, as surviving spouse of Robert D. McMahon), Miriam R Carrasquillo, Joanne Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sareatha Wilson, deceased, the late parent of Ada L. Mason), Frances Douglas, Daisy N Melendez, Mathew McMahon, Laura Balemian(aka Laura E. Mardovich Balemian, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward J. Mardovich, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Edward J. Mardovich), Dale Mattson(individually, as surviving sibling of Dean E. Mattson), Donald Mauro(individually, as surviving spouse of Nancy Mauro), Jordan Maldonado, Alexsandr Melnichenko(individually, as surviving spouse of Yelena Melnichenko), Ellen Mello(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Christopher D. Mello, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Christopher D. Mello), Janet Wexler Magee(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles W. Magee, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Charles W. Magee), Edward Mardovich, Jr, Marie Martinez, Ali Mohamed Malahi(individually, as surviving parent of Abdu Ali Malahi), John Mello, Michael McMahon, Sherman Acker, Yaritza Franco, Alexsandr Melnichenko(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Yelena Melnichenko, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Yelena Melnichenko), Nancy McMahon, Noah R McCloskey, Victoria Catanese, Shannon Mason, Catherine Mascali(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arnold Mascali, Sr., deceased, the late parent of Joseph A. Mascali), Anne McCloskey(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie M. McCloskey, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Katie M. McCloskey), Dale Mattson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Bernice Mattson, deceased, the late parent of Dean E. Mattson), Catherine Mascali(individually, as surviving parent of Joseph A. Mascali), Ali Mohamed Malahi(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abdu Ali Malahi, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abdu Ali Malahi), Fares Malahi, Jean Neal(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Margaret E. Mattic, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Margaret E. Mattic), Walter McNeil, Jr, Dwain Mattson, William Eugene Clark, Julie E McMahon(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert D. McMahon, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert D. McMahon), Shaun Mason, McCarthy Elizabeth, Saul Melendez-Hernandez, Peter McMahon, Jarid Maldonado, Donald Mauro(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Nancy Mauro, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Nancy Mauro), Vivian Mattic, Elizabeth McCarthy, Kevin J McHale, Joseph M McHale, Elvia Diaz, Corey Hawkins, Rodney Bush, Ellen Mello(individually, as surviving parent of Christopher D. Mello), Joseph Mardovich, Judith McNeil, April Fitzgerald(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Merlyn Maloy, deceased, the late parent of Gene Maloy), Leigh Mardovich, Julie E McMahon(Natural Guardian of PM, as Natural Guardian of PM, a minor, as surviving child of Robert D. McMahon), Bronx Public Administrator, Arnold F Mascali, Jr, Nabeela Malahi, Mary Mattson, John F McHale, Jr, Annie Harris, Gene Maloy, Jean Neal(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Katie I. Mattic, deceased, the late parent of Margaret E. Mattic), Kim McNeil(individually, as surviving child of Walter A. McNeil), Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger, April Fitzgerald(individually, as surviving sibling of Gene Maloy), Jimmie L Willson, April Fitzgerald(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Gene Maloy, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Gene Maloy), Malek Malahi, Susan Lori Magazine(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jay R. Magazine, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Jay R. Magazine), Marco A Melendez, Christian Lyons, Frances Firth, Erik F Melnichenko, Jean Neal(individually, as surviving sibling of Margaret E. Mattic), Janet Wexler Magee(individually, as surviving spouse of Charles W. Magee), Joanne Johnson(individually, as surviving sibling of Ada L. Mason), Donna Mascali Russo, Andrew Magazine, Marquis Lyons, Gabriel Martinez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert G Martinez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Robert G, Martinez), John Mascali, Nelson Johnson, Susan Lori Magazine(individually, as surviving spouse of Jay R. Magazine).(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 12/19/2018 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lori Magazine
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Martinez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah R McCloskey
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith McNeil
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter McNeil, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Harris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Mason
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie L Willson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathyanne Mascali Sprenger
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bronx Public Administrator
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Mauro
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mardovich
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Acker
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Hawkins
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Mascali
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Mardovich, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Lyons
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Lyons
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCarthy Elizabeth
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Mohamed Malahi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy McMahon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Mello
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Mattic
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Mello
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarid Maldonado
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam R Carrasquillo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J McHale
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie E McMahon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew McMahon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mello
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F McHale, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda D May
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Magazine
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwain Mattson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Edwards
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mascali
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Mardovich
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabeela Malahi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Mascali Russo
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold F Mascali, Jr
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Firth
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth McCarthy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malek Malahi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Douglas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Melendez-Hernandez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik F Melnichenko
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Magazine
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Mercado
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fares Malahi
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Martinez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexsandr Melnichenko
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Mason
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M McHale
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Catanese
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Martinez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Balemian
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mattson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Johnson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaritza Franco
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim McNeil
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Wexler Magee
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Maloy
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco A Melendez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Mattson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy N Melendez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Neal
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Bush
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne McCloskey
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvia Diaz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Johnson
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Eugene Clark
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Maldonado
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter McMahon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McMahon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?