Acosta et al. v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Plaintiff: Robert Beliveau, Patrick Burns, Ralph Baez, Peter Franco, Coretta Faulk, John Stephen Gilbert, Idalgo Encalada, John Creighton, Piedad Garzon, Pamela Grant, Arthur Baldwin, Jacqueline Deas, Beatriz Chavez, Juvenal Cabarcas, Samuel Gaiter, Howard Goldman, Coral Grant, Gary Franklin, Charlene Barker, Terrell Hayden, Karen Bornstein-Mohr, Leticia Collazo, Emory Calhoun, Miguel Garcia Jr., Candiace Baker, Claudia Cano, Patricia Herbert, Nadeige Ambroise, Jozef Filipkowski, Michael Childs, David Fontanez, Daniel Fuscaldo, Joaquin Campuzano, Derven Francis, Thomas Crane, Leonardo Colon, Thomas Egan, Alex Andrews, Toby Cohen, Anthony Buonadonna, Arnulfo Aguero, Gary DeAguiar, Ernest Haering, Carlos Alvarez, Elieser Cuevas, Edgar Gutierrez, Keletha Ferrell, LaTomya Doctor, Robert Finkle, Elizabeth Freid, Irene Bonet, Stephen Badala, Jennifer Finley, Edward Daingerfield, Michael Cook, Patrick Cullen, Ronald Dominique, Deirdre Frazier, John Gatto, Marlene Ayala, Edwin Cordero, Enieda Hamilton, Edward Carey, William Burns, Jose Colon, Peter DePalma, Phyllis Edwards, Leslie Diaz, Thomas Farney, Joseph Antonakos, Christopher DeLuca, Thomas Barry, Allen Gordon, Gerardo Delgado, Gregory Corona, John Duffy, Maria Bajguz, Michael Golden, Maria Auxiliadora Herrera, Graciela Garcia, Rocco DiRicco, Todd DeMatteo, Gale Gavini, William Covan, Iris Fontanez, Philip Bilello, Joseph Cerverizzo, Bruce Carley, Antonio Aldo, Nelson Goyes, Arthur Grenci, Regina Thorp, Ruben Acosta and Annet Grant
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina and Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv12039
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Gregory J. Cannata and Robert A. Grochow dated 12-21-18 re: Joining 03 MDL 01570-GBD-SN In Re: Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001. Document filed by Ruben Acosta, Arnulfo Aguero, Antonio Aldo, Carlos Alvarez, Nadeige Ambroise, Alex Andrews(on behalf of all survivors of Annamma Andrews, deceased), Alex Andrews(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Annamma Andrews), Alex Andrews(as the spouse of Annamma Andrews, deceased), Joseph Antonakos, Marlene Ayala, Stephen Badala, Ralph Baez, Maria Bajguz(as the spouse of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Maria Bajguz(on behalf of all survivors of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Maria Bajguz(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Aleksander Bajguz), Candiace Baker, Arthur Baldwin, Charlene Barker, Thomas Barry, Robert Beliveau, Philip Bilello, Irene Bonet, Karen Bornstein-Mohr, Anthony Buonadonna(on behalf of all survivors of John Wyatt, deceased), Anthony Buonadonna(as the Executor of the Estate of John Wyatt), Patrick Burns, William Burns, Juvenal Cabarcas, Emory Calhoun, Joaquin Campuzano, Claudia Cano, Edward Carey, Bruce Carley, Joseph Cerverizzo, Beatriz Chavez, Michael Childs, Toby Cohen, Leticia Collazo, Jose Colon, Leonardo Colon, Michael Cook, Edwin Cordero, Gregory Corona, William Covan, Thomas Crane, John Creighton, Elieser Cuevas, Patrick Cullen, Edward Daingerfield, Gary DeAguiar, Christopher DeLuca(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of the Estate of Lawrence DeLuca ), Christopher DeLuca(on behalf of all survivors of Lawrence DeLuca, deceased), Todd DeMatteo, Peter DePalma, Jacqueline Deas, Gerardo Delgado, Rocco DiRicco, Leslie Diaz(as sibling of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), Leslie Diaz(as Administrator of the Estate of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), Leslie Diaz(on behalf of all survivors of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), LaTomya Doctor, Ronald Dominique, John Duffy, Phyllis Edwards, Thomas Egan, Idalgo Encalada, Thomas Farney, Coretta Faulk, Keletha Ferrell, Jozef Filipkowski, Robert Finkle, Jennifer Finley, David Fontanez, Iris Fontanez, Derven Francis, Peter Franco, Gary Franklin, Deirdre Frazier, Elizabeth Freid, Daniel Fuscaldo(as the spouse of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased), Daniel Fuscaldo(on behalf of all survivors of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased ), Daniel Fuscaldo(as the Administrator of the Estate of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased), Samuel Gaiter, Graciela Garcia(as the Administrator of the Estate of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Graciela Garcia(as the spouse of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Graciela Garcia(on behalf of all survivors of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Miguel Garcia Jr., Piedad Garzon, John Gatto, Gale Gavini, John Stephen Gilbert, Michael Golden, Howard Goldman, Allen Gordon, Nelson Goyes, Annet Grant, Coral Grant, Pamela Grant, Arthur Grenci, Edgar Gutierrez, Ernest Haering, Enieda Hamilton, Terrell Hayden, Patricia Herbert, Maria Auxiliadora Herrera, Regina Thorp(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Cyril Hodge, deceased), Regina Thorp(as the child of Cyril Hodge, deceased), Regina Thorp(on behalf of all survivors of Cyril Hodge, deceased).(Cannata, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gregory J. Cannata and Robert A. Grochow dated 12-21-18 re: Joining 03 MDL 01570-GBD-SN In Re: Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001. Document filed by Ruben Acosta, Arnulfo Aguero, Antonio Aldo, Carlos Alvarez, Nadeige Ambroise, Alex Andrews(on behalf of all survivors of Annamma Andrews, deceased), Alex Andrews(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Annamma Andrews), Alex Andrews(as the spouse of Annamma Andrews, deceased), Joseph Antonakos, Marlene Ayala, Stephen Badala, Ralph Baez, Maria Bajguz(as the spouse of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Maria Bajguz(on behalf of all survivors of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Maria Bajguz(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Aleksander Bajguz), Candiace Baker, Arthur Baldwin, Charlene Barker, Thomas Barry, Robert Beliveau, Philip Bilello, Irene Bonet, Karen Bornstein-Mohr, Anthony Buonadonna(on behalf of all survivors of John Wyatt, deceased), Anthony Buonadonna(as the Executor of the Estate of John Wyatt), Patrick Burns, William Burns, Juvenal Cabarcas, Emory Calhoun, Joaquin Campuzano, Claudia Cano, Edward Carey, Bruce Carley, Joseph Cerverizzo, Beatriz Chavez, Michael Childs, Toby Cohen, Leticia Collazo, Jose Colon, Leonardo Colon, Michael Cook, Edwin Cordero, Gregory Corona, William Covan, Thomas Crane, John Creighton, Elieser Cuevas, Patrick Cullen, Edward Daingerfield, Gary DeAguiar, Christopher DeLuca(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of the Estate of Lawrence DeLuca ), Christopher DeLuca(on behalf of all survivors of Lawrence DeLuca, deceased), Todd DeMatteo, Peter DePalma, Jacqueline Deas, Gerardo Delgado, Rocco DiRicco, Leslie Diaz(as sibling of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), Leslie Diaz(as Administrator of the Estate of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), Leslie Diaz(on behalf of all survivors of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), LaTomya Doctor, Ronald Dominique, John Duffy, Phyllis Edwards, Thomas Egan, Idalgo Encalada, Thomas Farney, Coretta Faulk, Keletha Ferrell, Jozef Filipkowski, Robert Finkle, Jennifer Finley, David Fontanez, Iris Fontanez, Derven Francis, Peter Franco, Gary Franklin, Deirdre Frazier, Elizabeth Freid, Daniel Fuscaldo(as the spouse of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased), Daniel Fuscaldo(on behalf of all survivors of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased ), Daniel Fuscaldo(as the Administrator of the Estate of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased), Samuel Gaiter, Graciela Garcia(as the Administrator of the Estate of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Graciela Garcia(as the spouse of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Graciela Garcia(on behalf of all survivors of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Miguel Garcia Jr., Piedad Garzon, John Gatto, Gale Gavini, John Stephen Gilbert, Michael Golden, Howard Goldman, Allen Gordon, Nelson Goyes, Annet Grant, Coral Grant, Pamela Grant, Arthur Grenci, Edgar Gutierrez, Ernest Haering, Enieda Hamilton, Terrell Hayden, Patricia Herbert, Maria Auxiliadora Herrera, Regina Thorp(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Cyril Hodge, deceased), Regina Thorp(as the child of Cyril Hodge, deceased), Regina Thorp(on behalf of all survivors of Cyril Hodge, deceased).(Cannata, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03cv1570. Document filed by Ruben Acosta, Arnulfo Aguero, Antonio Aldo, Carlos Alvarez, Nadeige Ambroise, Alex Andrews(on behalf of all survivors of Annamma Andrews, deceased), Alex Andrews(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Annamma Andrews), Alex Andrews(as the spouse of Annamma Andrews, deceased), Joseph Antonakos, Marlene Ayala, Stephen Badala, Ralph Baez, Maria Bajguz(as the spouse of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Maria Bajguz(on behalf of all survivors of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Maria Bajguz(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Aleksander Bajguz), Candiace Baker, Arthur Baldwin, Charlene Barker, Thomas Barry, Robert Beliveau, Philip Bilello, Irene Bonet, Karen Bornstein-Mohr, Anthony Buonadonna(on behalf of all survivors of John Wyatt, deceased), Anthony Buonadonna(as the Executor of the Estate of John Wyatt), Patrick Burns, William Burns, Juvenal Cabarcas, Emory Calhoun, Joaquin Campuzano, Claudia Cano, Edward Carey, Bruce Carley, Joseph Cerverizzo, Beatriz Chavez, Michael Childs, Toby Cohen, Leticia Collazo, Jose Colon, Leonardo Colon, Michael Cook, Edwin Cordero, Gregory Corona, William Covan, Thomas Crane, John Creighton, Elieser Cuevas, Patrick Cullen, Edward Daingerfield, Gary DeAguiar, Christopher DeLuca(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of the Estate of Lawrence DeLuca ), Christopher DeLuca(on behalf of all survivors of Lawrence DeLuca, deceased), Todd DeMatteo, Peter DePalma, Jacqueline Deas, Gerardo Delgado, Rocco DiRicco, Leslie Diaz(as sibling of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), Leslie Diaz(as Administrator of the Estate of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), Leslie Diaz(on behalf of all survivors of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), LaTomya Doctor, Ronald Dominique, John Duffy, Phyllis Edwards, Thomas Egan, Idalgo Encalada, Thomas Farney, Coretta Faulk, Keletha Ferrell, Jozef Filipkowski, Robert Finkle, Jennifer Finley, David Fontanez, Iris Fontanez, Derven Francis, Peter Franco, Gary Franklin, Deirdre Frazier, Elizabeth Freid, Daniel Fuscaldo(as the spouse of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased), Daniel Fuscaldo(on behalf of all survivors of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased ), Daniel Fuscaldo(as the Administrator of the Estate of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased), Samuel Gaiter, Graciela Garcia(as the Administrator of the Estate of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Graciela Garcia(as the spouse of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Graciela Garcia(on behalf of all survivors of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Miguel Garcia Jr., Piedad Garzon, John Gatto, Gale Gavini, John Stephen Gilbert, Michael Golden, Howard Goldman, Allen Gordon, Nelson Goyes, Annet Grant, Coral Grant, Pamela Grant, Arthur Grenci, Edgar Gutierrez, Ernest Haering, Enieda Hamilton, Terrell Hayden, Patricia Herbert, Maria Auxiliadora Herrera, Regina Thorp(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Cyril Hodge, deceased), Regina Thorp(as the child of Cyril Hodge, deceased), Regina Thorp(on behalf of all survivors of Cyril Hodge, deceased).(Cannata, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (pc)
December 21, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1570. (pc)
December 21, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 21, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cannata, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA and SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION FOR RELIEF OF BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Ruben Acosta, Arnulfo Aguero, Antonio Aldo, Carlos Alvarez, Nadeige Ambroise, Alex Andrews(on behalf of all survivors of Annamma Andrews, deceased), Alex Andrews(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Annamma Andrews), Alex Andrews(as the spouse of Annamma Andrews, deceased), Joseph Antonakos, Marlene Ayala, Stephen Badala, Ralph Baez, Maria Bajguz(as the spouse of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Maria Bajguz(on behalf of all survivors of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Maria Bajguz(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Aleksander Bajguz), Candiace Baker, Arthur Baldwin, Charlene Barker, Thomas Barry, Robert Beliveau, Philip Bilello, Irene Bonet, Karen Bornstein-Mohr, Anthony Buonadonna(on behalf of all survivors of John Wyatt, deceased), Anthony Buonadonna(as the Executor of the Estate of John Wyatt), Patrick Burns, William Burns, Juvenal Cabarcas, Emory Calhoun, Joaquin Campuzano, Claudia Cano, Edward Carey, Bruce Carley, Joseph Cerverizzo, Beatriz Chavez, Michael Childs, Toby Cohen, Leticia Collazo, Jose Colon, Leonardo Colon, Michael Cook, Edwin Cordero, Gregory Corona, William Covan, Thomas Crane, John Creighton, Elieser Cuevas, Patrick Cullen, Edward Daingerfield, Gary DeAguiar, Christopher DeLuca(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of the Estate of Lawrence DeLuca ), Christopher DeLuca(on behalf of all survivors of Lawrence DeLuca, deceased), Todd DeMatteo, Peter DePalma, Jacqueline Deas, Gerardo Delgado, Rocco DiRicco, Leslie Diaz(as sibling of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), Leslie Diaz(as Administrator of the Estate of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), Leslie Diaz(on behalf of all survivors of Ferdinand Sanchez, deceased), LaTomya Doctor, Ronald Dominique, John Duffy, Phyllis Edwards, Thomas Egan, Idalgo Encalada, Thomas Farney, Coretta Faulk, Keletha Ferrell, Jozef Filipkowski, Robert Finkle, Jennifer Finley, David Fontanez, Iris Fontanez, Derven Francis, Peter Franco, Gary Franklin, Deirdre Frazier, Elizabeth Freid, Daniel Fuscaldo(as the spouse of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased), Daniel Fuscaldo(on behalf of all survivors of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased ), Daniel Fuscaldo(as the Administrator of the Estate of Patricia Fuscaldo, deceased), Samuel Gaiter, Graciela Garcia(as the Administrator of the Estate of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Graciela Garcia(as the spouse of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Graciela Garcia(on behalf of all survivors of Miguel A. Garcia, deceased), Miguel Garcia Jr., Piedad Garzon, John Gatto, Gale Gavini, John Stephen Gilbert, Michael Golden, Howard Goldman, Allen Gordon, Nelson Goyes, Annet Grant, Coral Grant, Pamela Grant, Arthur Grenci, Edgar Gutierrez, Ernest Haering, Enieda Hamilton, Terrell Hayden, Patricia Herbert, Maria Auxiliadora Herrera, Regina Thorp(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Administrator of the Estate of Cyril Hodge, deceased), Regina Thorp(as the child of Cyril Hodge, deceased), Regina Thorp(on behalf of all survivors of Cyril Hodge, deceased). (Cannata, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners John Stephen Gilbert, Coral Grant, Michael Golden, Piedad Garzon, John Gatto, Regina Thorp, Arthur Grenci, Pamela Grant, Annet Grant, Edgar Gutierrez, Regina Thorp, Allen Gordon, Patricia Herbert, Ernest Haering, Maria Auxiliadora Herrera, Terrell Hayden, Regina Thorp, Enieda Hamilton, Gale Gavini, Howard Goldman, Nelson Goyes added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,.Document filed by John Stephen Gilbert, Coral Grant, Michael Golden, Piedad Garzon, John Gatto, Regina Thorp, Arthur Grenci, Pamela Grant, Annet Grant, Edgar Gutierrez, Regina Thorp, Allen Gordon, Patricia Herbert, Ernest Haering, Maria Auxiliadora Herrera, Terrell Hayden, Regina Thorp, Enieda Hamilton, Gale Gavini, Howard Goldman, Nelson Goyes. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,.(Cannata, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Graciela Garcia, John Duffy, Coretta Faulk, Graciela Garcia, Phyllis Edwards, Graciela Garcia, Daniel Fuscaldo, Rocco DiRicco, Daniel Fuscaldo, LaTomya Doctor, Deirdre Frazier, Robert Finkle, Jozef Filipkowski, Keletha Ferrell, Jennifer Finley, Daniel Fuscaldo, Idalgo Encalada, Peter Franco, David Fontanez, Samuel Gaiter, Gary Franklin, Miguel Garcia Jr., Derven Francis, Elizabeth Freid, Iris Fontanez, Ronald Dominique, Thomas Egan, Thomas Farney added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,.Document filed by Graciela Garcia, John Duffy, Coretta Faulk, Graciela Garcia, Phyllis Edwards, Graciela Garcia, Daniel Fuscaldo, Rocco DiRicco, Daniel Fuscaldo, LaTomya Doctor, Deirdre Frazier, Robert Finkle, Jozef Filipkowski, Keletha Ferrell, Jennifer Finley, Daniel Fuscaldo, Idalgo Encalada, Peter Franco, David Fontanez, Samuel Gaiter, Gary Franklin, Miguel Garcia Jr., Derven Francis, Elizabeth Freid, Iris Fontanez, Ronald Dominique, Thomas Egan, Thomas Farney. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,.(Cannata, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16088450)Document filed by Philip Bilello, Alex Andrews(on behalf of all survivors of Annamma Andrews, deceased), William Burns, Arthur Baldwin, Arnulfo Aguero, Ruben Acosta, Charlene Barker, Candiace Baker, Patrick Burns, Anthony Buonadonna(on behalf of all survivors of John Wyatt, deceased), Robert Beliveau, Maria Bajguz(on behalf of all survivors of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Anthony Buonadonna(as the Executor of the Estate of John Wyatt), Marlene Ayala, Stephen Badala, Irene Bonet, Maria Bajguz(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Aleksander Bajguz), Karen Bornstein-Mohr, Alex Andrews(as the Personal Representative and/or proposed Administrator of the Estate of Annamma Andrews), Antonio Aldo, Joseph Antonakos, Ralph Baez, Maria Bajguz(as the spouse of Aleksander Bajguz, deceased), Alex Andrews(as the spouse of Annamma Andrews, deceased), Carlos Alvarez, Thomas Barry, Nadeige Ambroise, William Covan, Leslie Diaz, Michael Cook, Christopher DeLuca, Jacqueline Deas, Claudia Cano, Leslie Diaz, Michael Childs, Christopher DeLuca, Thomas Crane, Edward Carey, Gerardo Delgado, Todd DeMatteo, Leslie Diaz, Gary DeAguiar, Juvenal Cabarcas, Edward Daingerfield, Emory Calhoun, Peter DePalma, Gregory Corona, Elieser Cuevas, Edwin Cordero, John Creighton, Leonardo Colon, Bruce Carley, Joaquin Campuzano, Leticia Collazo, Toby Cohen, Patrick Cullen, Jose Colon, Beatriz Chavez, Joseph Cerverizzo.(Cannata, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta et al. v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Beliveau
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Burns
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Baez
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Franco
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coretta Faulk
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stephen Gilbert
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idalgo Encalada
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Creighton
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piedad Garzon
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Grant
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Baldwin
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Deas
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Chavez
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juvenal Cabarcas
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Gaiter
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Goldman
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Grant
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Franklin
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Barker
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Hayden
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bornstein-Mohr
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Collazo
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emory Calhoun
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Garcia Jr.
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candiace Baker
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Cano
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Herbert
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadeige Ambroise
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jozef Filipkowski
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Childs
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fontanez
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Fuscaldo
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Campuzano
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derven Francis
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Crane
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Colon
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Egan
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Andrews
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Cohen
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Buonadonna
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnulfo Aguero
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary DeAguiar
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Haering
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Alvarez
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elieser Cuevas
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Gutierrez
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keletha Ferrell
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTomya Doctor
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Finkle
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Freid
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Bonet
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Badala
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Finley
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Daingerfield
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cook
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Cullen
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Dominique
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deirdre Frazier
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gatto
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Ayala
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Cordero
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enieda Hamilton
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Carey
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Burns
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Colon
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter DePalma
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Edwards
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Diaz
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Farney
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Antonakos
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher DeLuca
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Barry
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Gordon
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Delgado
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Corona
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Duffy
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Bajguz
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Golden
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Auxiliadora Herrera
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Garcia
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocco DiRicco
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd DeMatteo
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Gavini
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Covan
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Fontanez
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Bilello
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cerverizzo
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Carley
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Aldo
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Goyes
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Grenci
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Thorp
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Acosta
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annet Grant
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?