Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Mejia et al
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Carmen Mejia, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, City Register of the City of New York, Bronx County, New York City Environmental Control Board and New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau
Case Number: 1:2018cv12051
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. Service was accepted by Stephon Campbell, Legal Assistant. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. Service was accepted by Laverne Sterling, Legal Assistant. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Carmen Mejia served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. Service was accepted by Jordana Paz, Daughter. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York City Parking Violations Bureau served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. Service was accepted by B. Mazyck, Clerk. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York City Environmental Control Board served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. Service was accepted by B. Mazyck, Clerk. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City Register of the City of New York, Bronx County served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. Service was accepted by B. Mazyck, Clerk. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Register of the City of New York, Bronx County, Carmen Mejia, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau. (pc)
December 21, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 21, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
December 21, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Vargas, Stephen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CARMEN MEJIA, CITY REGISTER OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, BRONX COUNTY, NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU, NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD, NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vargas, Stephen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Register of the City of New York, Bronx County, Carmen Mejia, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16089941)Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CPLR 3012-B)(Vargas, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Mejia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Parking Violations Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Register of the City of New York, Bronx County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Environmental Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Stephen John Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?