Shtivelman et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Plaintiff: Warren Smith, Rosemary Watson, David Yunatanov, Joseph Volpato, Gregory Witkowski, Beth Vail, Kate Walsh, Larry Wilson, Elizabeth Wallen, Renard Wright, Joanne St. Thomas, Shounia Shtivelman, Carlton Wong, Manuela Yeng, Everton M. Taylor, Zelma Singleton, Joan Sullivant-Atton, Rick Syroka, Benedett Valenti, Garry Williams, Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk, William Surace, Mikhail Sokovikov, Donna Turner, Diane Veiga, Ann Marie Venditti, Jon Yenick, Mariano Zambrano, Alvin Steinberg, Tatiana Timanovskaia, Rebecca Thomason, Leonid Vayntrub, Lisa Yenick, Frank Tucker III, James Wright, Anthony Suchon, Stanley Wright, Luz C. Torres and Stephen Spratley
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina and Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv12067
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gregory J. Cannata and Robert A. Grochow dated 12/21/18 re: Joining 03 MDL 01570-GBD-SN In Re: Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001. Document filed by Shounia Shtivelman, Zelma Singleton, Warren Smith, Mikhail Sokovikov(as the child of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(as Co-Executor of the Estate of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(on behalf of all survivors of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Stephen Spratley, Joanne St. Thomas, Alvin Steinberg, Anthony Suchon, Joan Sullivant-Atton, William Surace, Rick Syroka, Everton M. Taylor, Rebecca Thomason, Tatiana Timanovskaia, Luz C. Torres, Frank Tucker III, Donna Turner, Beth Vail, Benedett Valenti, Leonid Vayntrub, Diane Veiga(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of Estate of Joseph P. Landolfi), Diane Veiga(on behalf of all survivors of the Joseph P. Landolfi, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti(on behalf of all survivors of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti(as the Executor of the Estate of Daniel Venditti), Ann Marie Venditti(as the Spouse of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Joseph Volpato, Elizabeth Wallen, Kate Walsh(as the Executor of the Estate of William Walsh), Kate Walsh(on behalf of all survivors of William Walsh, deceased), Kate Walsh(as the child of William Walsh, deceased), Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk, Rosemary Watson, Garry Williams, Larry Wilson, Gregory Witkowski, Carlton Wong, James Wright, Renard Wright, Stanley Wright, Manuela Yeng, Lisa Yenick (on behalf of all survivors of Michael Jon Yenick, ), Lisa Yenick (as the spouse of Michael Jon Yenick), Lisa Yenick (as the Personal Representative Michael Jon Yenick and/or Proposed Administrator of Estate of ), David Yunatanov, Mariano Zambrano.(Cannata, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03md1570. Document filed by Shounia Shtivelman, Zelma Singleton, Warren Smith, Mikhail Sokovikov(as the child of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(as Co-Executor of the Estate of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(on behalf of all survivors of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Stephen Spratley, Joanne St. Thomas, Alvin Steinberg, Anthony Suchon, Joan Sullivant-Atton, William Surace, Rick Syroka, Everton M. Taylor, Rebecca Thomason, Tatiana Timanovskaia, Luz C. Torres, Frank Tucker III, Donna Turner, Beth Vail, Benedett Valenti, Leonid Vayntrub, Diane Veiga(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of Estate of Joseph P. Landolfi), Diane Veiga(on behalf of all survivors of the Joseph P. Landolfi, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti(on behalf of all survivors of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti(as the Executor of the Estate of Daniel Venditti), Ann Marie Venditti(as the Spouse of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Joseph Volpato, Elizabeth Wallen, Kate Walsh(as the Executor of the Estate of William Walsh), Kate Walsh(on behalf of all survivors of William Walsh, deceased), Kate Walsh(as the child of William Walsh, deceased), Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk, Rosemary Watson, Garry Williams, Larry Wilson, Gregory Witkowski, Carlton Wong, James Wright, Renard Wright, Stanley Wright, Manuela Yeng, Lisa Yenick (on behalf of all survivors of Michael Jon Yenick, ), Lisa Yenick (as the spouse of Michael Jon Yenick), Lisa Yenick (as the Personal Representative Michael Jon Yenick and/or Proposed Administrator of Estate of ), David Yunatanov, Mariano Zambrano.(Cannata, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA and SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION FOR RELIEF OF BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Shounia Shtivelman, Zelma Singleton, Warren Smith, Mikhail Sokovikov(as the child of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(as Co-Executor of the Estate of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(on behalf of all survivors of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Stephen Spratley, Joanne St. Thomas, Alvin Steinberg, Anthony Suchon, Joan Sullivant-Atton, William Surace, Rick Syroka, Everton M. Taylor, Rebecca Thomason, Tatiana Timanovskaia, Luz C. Torres, Frank Tucker III, Donna Turner, Beth Vail, Benedett Valenti, Leonid Vayntrub, Diane Veiga(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of Estate of Joseph P. Landolfi), Diane Veiga(on behalf of all survivors of the Joseph P. Landolfi, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti(on behalf of all survivors of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti(as the Executor of the Estate of Daniel Venditti), Ann Marie Venditti(as the Spouse of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Joseph Volpato, Elizabeth Wallen, Kate Walsh(as the Executor of the Estate of William Walsh), Kate Walsh(on behalf of all survivors of William Walsh, deceased), Kate Walsh(as the child of William Walsh, deceased), Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk, Rosemary Watson, Garry Williams, Larry Wilson, Gregory Witkowski, Carlton Wong, James Wright, Renard Wright, Stanley Wright, Manuela Yeng, Lisa Yenick (on behalf of all survivors of Michael Jon Yenick, ), Lisa Yenick (as the spouse of Michael Jon Yenick), Lisa Yenick (as the Personal Representative Michael Jon Yenick and/or Proposed Administrator of Estate of ), David Yunatanov, Mariano Zambrano. (Cannata, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. Document filed by Kate Walsh(as the Executor of the Estate of William Walsh), David Yunatanov, Larry Wilson, Stephen Spratley, Mariano Zambrano, Kate Walsh(on behalf of all survivors of William Walsh, deceased), Luz C. Torres, Zelma Singleton, Shounia Shtivelman, Manuela Yeng, Frank Tucker III, Stanley Wright, Ann Marie Venditti(on behalf of all survivors of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Tatiana Timanovskaia, Garry Williams, Carlton Wong, Gregory Witkowski, Kate Walsh(as the child of William Walsh, deceased), Diane Veiga(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of Estate of Joseph P. Landolfi), Leonid Vayntrub, Beth Vail, Everton M. Taylor, Renard Wright, Ann Marie Venditti(as the Executor of the Estate of Daniel Venditti), Anthony Suchon, Lisa Yenick (on behalf of all survivors of Michael Jon Yenick, ), Joan Sullivant-Atton, Rosemary Watson, Diane Veiga(on behalf of all survivors of the Joseph P. Landolfi, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti(as the Spouse of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Rick Syroka, Lisa Yenick (as the spouse of Michael Jon Yenick), Mikhail Sokovikov(as the child of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Warren Smith, Benedett Valenti, James Wright, Alvin Steinberg, William Surace, Rebecca Thomason, Joanne St. Thomas, Joseph Volpato, Mikhail Sokovikov(as Co-Executor of the Estate of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Elizabeth Wallen, Lisa Yenick (as the Personal Representative Michael Jon Yenick and/or Proposed Administrator of Estate of ), Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk, Donna Turner, Mikhail Sokovikov(on behalf of all survivors of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased).(Cannata, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Lisa Yenick, Lisa Yenick, Kate Walsh(as the child of William Walsh, deceased) added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Lisa Yenick, Lisa Yenick, Kate Walsh(as the child of William Walsh, deceased). Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cannata, Gregory)
December 21, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03md1570. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 21, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory J. Cannata to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons; you must include c/o on second line of the "To" field . Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Gregory J. Cannata to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory J. Cannata to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;(Lisa Yenick as the spouse of Michael Jon Yenick, deceased; on behalf of all survivors of Michael Jon Yenick, deceased; Kate Walsh as the child of William Walsh, deceased must be added) the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 21, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Gregory J. Cannata. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Jon Yenick. The party was added to the case in error. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03md1570. Document filed by Shounia Shtivelman, Zelma Singleton, Warren Smith, Mikhail Sokovikov(as the child of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(as Co-Executor of the Estate of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(on behalf of all survivors of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Stephen Spratley, Joanne St. Thomas, Alvin Steinberg, Anthony Suchon, Joan Sullivant-Atton, William Surace, Rick Syroka, Everton M. Taylor, Rebecca Thomason, Tatiana Timanovskaia, Luz C. Torres, Frank Tucker III, Donna Turner, Beth Vail, Benedett Valenti, Leonid Vayntrub, Diane Veiga(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of Estate of Joseph P. Landolfi), Diane Veiga(on behalf of all survivors of the Joseph P. Landolfi, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti(on behalf of all survivors of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti, Ann Marie Venditti(as the Spouse of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Joseph Volpato, Elizabeth Wallen, Kate Walsh(as the Executor of the Estate of William Walsh), Kate Walsh(on behalf of all survivors of William Walsh, deceased), Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk, Rosemary Watson, Garry Williams, Larry Wilson, Gregory Witkowski, Carlton Wong, James Wright, Renard Wright, Stanley Wright, Manuela Yeng, Jon Yenick, Lisa Yenick, David Yunatanov, Mariano Zambrano.(Cannata, Gregory) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj).
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cannata, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA and SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION FOR RELIEF OF BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shounia Shtivelman, Zelma Singleton, Warren Smith, Mikhail Sokovikov(as the child of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(as Co-Executor of the Estate of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mikhail Sokovikov(on behalf of all survivors of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Stephen Spratley, Joanne St. Thomas, Alvin Steinberg, Anthony Suchon, Joan Sullivant-Atton, William Surace, Rick Syroka, Everton M. Taylor, Rebecca Thomason, Tatiana Timanovskaia, Luz C. Torres, Frank Tucker III, Donna Turner, Beth Vail, Benedett Valenti, Leonid Vayntrub, Diane Veiga(as the Personal Representative and/or Proposed Executor of Estate of Joseph P. Landolfi), Diane Veiga(on behalf of all survivors of the Joseph P. Landolfi, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti(on behalf of all survivors of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Ann Marie Venditti, Ann Marie Venditti(as the Spouse of Daniel Venditti, deceased), Joseph Volpato, Elizabeth Wallen, Kate Walsh(as the Executor of the Estate of William Walsh), Kate Walsh(on behalf of all survivors of William Walsh, deceased), Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk, Rosemary Watson, Garry Williams, Larry Wilson, Gregory Witkowski, Carlton Wong, James Wright, Renard Wright, Stanley Wright, Manuela Yeng, Jon Yenick, Lisa Yenick, David Yunatanov, Mariano Zambrano. (Cannata, Gregory) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj).
December 20, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Stephen Spratley, Luz C. Torres, Zelma Singleton, Shounia Shtivelman, Frank Tucker III, Tatiana Timanovskaia, Beth Vail, Everton M. Taylor, Anthony Suchon, Joan Sullivant-Atton, Rick Syroka, Mikhail Sokovikov(as the child of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Warren Smith, Alvin Steinberg, William Surace, Rebecca Thomason, Joanne St. Thomas, Mikhail Sokovikov(as Co-Executor of the Estate of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Donna Turner, Mikhail Sokovikov(on behalf of all survivors of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mariano Zambrano, Larry Wilson, Stanley Wright, Gregory Witkowski, Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk, Rosemary Watson, Jon Yenick, Garry Williams, Carlton Wong, Lisa Yenick, Manuela Yeng, David Yunatanov, Renard Wright, James Wright added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Stephen Spratley, Luz C. Torres, Zelma Singleton, Shounia Shtivelman, Frank Tucker III, Tatiana Timanovskaia, Beth Vail, Everton M. Taylor, Anthony Suchon, Joan Sullivant-Atton, Rick Syroka, Mikhail Sokovikov(as the child of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Warren Smith, Alvin Steinberg, William Surace, Rebecca Thomason, Joanne St. Thomas, Mikhail Sokovikov(as Co-Executor of the Estate of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Donna Turner, Mikhail Sokovikov(on behalf of all survivors of Andrey Sokovikov, deceased), Mariano Zambrano, Larry Wilson, Stanley Wright, Gregory Witkowski, Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk, Rosemary Watson, Jon Yenick, Garry Williams, Carlton Wong, Lisa Yenick, Manuela Yeng, David Yunatanov, Renard Wright, James Wright. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cannata, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16091622)Document filed by Diane Veiga, Ann Marie Venditti, Kate Walsh, Diane Veiga, Ann Marie Venditti, Kate Walsh, Elizabeth Wallen, Benedett Valenti, Joseph Volpato, Leonid Vayntrub, Ann Marie Venditti.(Cannata, Gregory) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shtivelman et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Smith
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Watson
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Yunatanov
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Volpato
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Witkowski
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Vail
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Walsh
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wilson
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wallen
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renard Wright
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne St. Thomas
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shounia Shtivelman
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Wong
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuela Yeng
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everton M. Taylor
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zelma Singleton
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Sullivant-Atton
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Syroka
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benedett Valenti
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Williams
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marialisa Walton-Zywotchenk
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Surace
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikhail Sokovikov
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Turner
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Veiga
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Venditti
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Yenick
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Zambrano
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Steinberg
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Timanovskaia
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Thomason
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonid Vayntrub
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Yenick
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Tucker III
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wright
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Suchon
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Wright
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz C. Torres
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Spratley
Represented By: Gregory J. Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?