Delcid Orellana et al v. Yale Stone LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana
Defendant: John Doe Corp., Yale Tile & Stone LLC, Yale Stone LLC, Fredy Leonardo Espinoza, Francesco Lorenti, Antonio Dattolo and F.B.S. Construction Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12081
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Haleigh Amant terminated. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/11/2019) (jca)
February 8, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Antonio Dattolo, Francesco Lorenti, Yale Stone LLC, Yale Tile & Stone LLC.(Shillito, Nils)
February 8, 2019 Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yale Stone LLC, Yale Tile & Stone LLC.(Shillito, Nils)
February 8, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Haleigh Rae Amant to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Amant, Haleigh)
February 6, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, consented and agreed to, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the respective parties herein, that the time for Defendant FREDY LEONARDO ESPINOZA to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff LELIS EDGARDO DELCID ORELLANA's Complaint in this action is hereby extended to March 4, 2019. Fredy Leonardo Espinoza answer due 3/4/2019. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/6/2019) (mro)
February 6, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Jacqueline Isaacson on behalf of Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Isaacson, Sara)
February 6, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Antonio Faillace on behalf of Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Fredy Leonardo Espinoza. (Arcia, Eloy)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, Application Granted. (Antonio Dattolo answer due 2/8/2019; Francesco Lorenti answer due 2/8/2019; Yale Stone LLC answer due 2/8/2019; Yale Tile & Stone LLC answer due 2/8/2019.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/28/19) (yv)
January 25, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen D. Hans on behalf of Antonio Dattolo, Francesco Lorenti, Yale Stone LLC, Yale Tile & Stone LLC. (Hans, Stephen)
January 25, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #4 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nils C. Shillito dated January 25, 2019. Document filed by Antonio Dattolo, Francesco Lorenti, Yale Stone LLC, Yale Tile & Stone LLC.(Shillito, Nils)
January 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nils C. Shillito on behalf of Antonio Dattolo, Francesco Lorenti, Yale Stone LLC, Yale Tile & Stone LLC. (Shillito, Nils)
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Francesco Lorenti served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. Service was accepted by Rigo Quintero, Co-Worker. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually); Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Antonio Dattolo served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. Service was accepted by Rigo Quintero, Co-Worker. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually); Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Fredy Leonardo Espinoza served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. Service was accepted by Mr. Jose, Co-Tenant. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually); Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. F.B.S. Construction Corp. served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually); Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Yale Tile & Stone LLC served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually); Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Yale Stone LLC served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually); Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fredy Leonardo Espinoza. (vf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Francesco Lorenti. (vf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Antonio Dattolo. (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fredy Leonardo Espinoza, re: #4 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Francesco Lorenti, re: #4 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Antonio Dattolo, re: #4 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yale Tile & Stone LLC. (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yale Stone LLC. (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to F.B.S. Construction Corp. (vf)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yale Tile & Stone LLC (d/b/a Yale Tile & Stone), re: #4 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yale Stone LLC (d/b/a Yale Tile & Stone), re: #4 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to F.B.S. Construction Corp. (d/b/a F.B.S. Construction), re: #4 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Antonio Dattolo, Fredy Leonardo Espinoza, Francesco Lorenti, Yale Stone LLC, Yale Tile & Stone LLC, F.B.S. Construction Corp. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Faillace, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Haleigh Amant on behalf of Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Amant, Haleigh)
December 21, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 21, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
December 21, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antonio Dattolo, Fredy Leonardo Espinoza, John Doe Corp., Francesco Lorenti, Yale Stone LLC, Yale Tile & Stone LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16092504)Document filed by Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(individually), Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delcid Orellana et al v. Yale Stone LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale Tile & Stone LLC
Represented By: Nils C. Shillito
Represented By: Stephen D. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale Stone LLC
Represented By: Nils C. Shillito
Represented By: Stephen D. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredy Leonardo Espinoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesco Lorenti
Represented By: Nils C. Shillito
Represented By: Stephen D. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Dattolo
Represented By: Nils C. Shillito
Represented By: Stephen D. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B.S. Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lelis Edgardo Delcid Orellana
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?