American Civil Liberties Union et al v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation filed a complaint under the Freedom of Information Act seeking the release of agency records from Defendants Office of Director of National Intelligence, National Security Agency, Central Intelligence Agency and Department of Justice relating to the Uniting and Strengthening America by Fulfilling Rights and Ensuring Effective Discipline Over Monitoring Act of 2015 (USA Freedom Act).

Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of Justice and National Security Agency
Case Number: 1:2018cv12131
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #28 Letter filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 19, 2019, is hereby adjourned to March 19, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. By March 15, 2019, the parties shall submit their proposed briefing schedule and state whether the conference is necessary to resolve any open issues. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/13/2019) (kv)
February 12, 2019 Filing 28 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Noor Zafar dated February 12, 2019 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(Zafar, Noor)
January 25, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noor Zafar on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Zafar, Noor)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion to Stay. Application GRANTED. This case is stayed as set forth above, and all deadlines are tolled as set forth above. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/18/2019) (cf)
January 17, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION to Stay pending restoration of Justice Department funding addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David S. Jones dated January 17, 2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Standing Order staying certain cases pending restoration of Justice Department funding)(Jones, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stuart Jones on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Jones, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General of the United States on 01/02/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York on 01/02/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 1/2/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). National Security Agency served on 1/2/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Department Of Justice served on 1/2/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Central Intelligence Agency served on 1/2/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Toomey, Patrick)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Patrick Toomey dated January 14, 2019 re: Confirming Service of Scheduling Order and Individual Rules. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(Toomey, Patrick)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/4/2019) (jca)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Security Agency. (pc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
December 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Patrick Christopher Toomey to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant name error, defendant name listed on PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency. (vf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick) Modified on 12/28/2018 (vf).
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Patrick Christopher Toomey to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'C/o' Error; 'C/o' or 'via' must be included before second party name. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Justice. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(Toomey, Patrick)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick) Modified on 12/26/2018 (dnh).
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick) Modified on 12/26/2018 (dnh).
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Toomey, Patrick)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Toomey, Patrick)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16099893)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(Toomey, Patrick)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16099893)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(Toomey, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union et al v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Toomey
Represented By: Noor Zafar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Toomey
Represented By: Noor Zafar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of Justice
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Agency
Represented By: David Stuart Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?