Goolsarran v. HSBC USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nalini Goolsarran
Defendant: HSBC USA, Inc. and HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12132
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference adjourned to 3/8/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Initial Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/31/2019) (mml)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Walker G. Harman, Jr. dated January 30, 2019. Document filed by Nalini Goolsarran.(Harman, Walker)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. waiver sent on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. Document filed by Nalini Goolsarran. (Harman, Walker)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #7 Amended Complaint, against HSBC Bank USA, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Nalini Goolsarran. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint,.(Harman, Walker)
January 29, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents HSBC Bank USA, N.A. added. Party added pursuant to #7 Amended Complaint,.Document filed by Nalini Goolsarran. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint,.(Harman, Walker)
January 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Walker Green Harman, Jr. to RE-FILE re: Document No. #7 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party HSBC Bank USA, N.A.; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) Modified on 1/29/2019 (jgo).
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Nalini Goolsarran with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Nalini Goolsarran. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Harman, Walker) Modified on 1/29/2019 (jgo).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED as follows: Counsel receiving this order shall contact all counsel of record (or where a party is not yet represented, such party) and, if necessary, provide them with a copy of this order. If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via fax specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must appear for a conference on 3/1/2019 in courtroom 24A,. 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007 at 10:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/7/19) (yv)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HSBC USA, Inc.. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Walker Green Harman, Jr.. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: HSBC USA, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edgar Mikel Rivera on behalf of Nalini Goolsarran. (Rivera, Edgar)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HSBC USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nalini Goolsarran. (Harman, Walker)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Harman, Walker)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HSBC USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16100095)Document filed by Nalini Goolsarran.(Harman, Walker)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goolsarran v. HSBC USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nalini Goolsarran
Represented By: Walker Green Harman, Jr.
Represented By: Edgar Mikel Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?