Sarroca v. Chandrapaul

Plaintiff: Plaintiff Jose Sarroca and Jose Sarroca
Defendant: Defendant Shamraj Chandrapaul and Shamraj Chandrapaul
Case Number: 1:2018cv12239
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed: 1. This case is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. 2. This case may be refiled. Upon refiling, all pleadings, and discovery, as well as all affirmative defenses including Statutes of Limitations, will be in accordance as they were at the time the original Complaint was filed. 3. Counsel for defendant agrees to accept service of any re-filed Complaint. 4. If this case is re-filed without any malpractice defendants, defendant's rights to again remove this case to Federal Court based on diversity are preserved. 5. If the case is re-filed with malpractice defendants, it is agreed that there would be no diversity and the case would not be subject to removal. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/10/2019) (rjm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Fredric Paul Gallin dated January 10, 2019 re: requesting Consent Order of Dismissal with prejudice be so ordered. Document filed by Shamraj Chandrapaul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Order of Dismissal without Prejudice)(Gallin, Fredric)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Shamraj Chandrapaul.(Gallin, Fredric)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent of Magistrate. Document filed by Jose Sarroca. (Goldberg, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 28, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
December 28, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
December 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Fredric Paul Gallin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gallin, Fredric)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Shamraj Chandrapaul.(Gallin, Fredric)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Michael Goldberg, Esq. on December 27, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Shamraj Chandrapaul. (Gallin, Fredric)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gallin, Fredric) Modified on 12/28/2018 (pc).
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 33822/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16111144).Document filed by Shamraj Chandrapaul.(Gallin, Fredric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarroca v. Chandrapaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Shamraj Chandrapaul
Represented By: Fredric Paul Gallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamraj Chandrapaul
Represented By: Fredric Paul Gallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff Jose Sarroca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Sarroca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?