NetSoc, LLC v. Yahoo! Inc.

Plaintiff: NetSoc, LLC
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12267
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338pt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
February 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NetSoc, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William Ramey, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
February 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 AMENDED MOTION for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NetSoc, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William Ramey, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) Modified on 2/14/2019 (bcu).
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.(Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/23/2019) (gr)
January 18, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote, Patent Judge. Judge Deborah A. Batts is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED STANDING ORDER IN RE IMPLEMENTATION OF PATENT PILOT PROGRAM IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 21, 2011). It appearing that the Court has elected to participate in the Pilot Project for Patent Cases established pursuant to Pub L. No. 111-349, 124 Stat. 3674. Therefore, effective November 21, 2011, the Court's participation in the Patent Pilot Project will commence and shall include pro se cases. The Pilot program will be subject to the following procedures: When a designated Pilot judge receives a patent case on initial assignment, the case shall be assigned to that judge for all purposes, without further notice to the Assignment Committee and the Case Assignment Unit.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 03/29/2012) (bcu)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Yahoo! Inc. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. Service was accepted by Legal Representative of CSC. Document filed by NetSoc, LLC. (Hoffman, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh)
January 9, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Hoffman, David)
December 28, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16115366. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 1) missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas (our court does not accept state bar certificates for Texas); and 2) missing Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - see Local Rule 1.3. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for William P. Ramey III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16115366. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NetSoc, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice)(Ramey, William) Modified on 12/28/2018 (jc).
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yahoo! Inc.. (dnh)
December 28, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 28, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
December 28, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NetSoc, LLC.(Ramey, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yahoo! Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by NetSoc, LLC. (Ramey, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ramey, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yahoo! Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16113517)Document filed by NetSoc, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hoffman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NetSoc, LLC v. Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NetSoc, LLC
Represented By: David John Hoffman
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?