Jacobs et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Van Mobley, Janette Montalvo, Albert Lucas, Laura Kandelman, Marcia Lewis, Alexander Montoya, Jean Kennedy, Lori Kennedy, Lucille Miller, Virginia McGarrity, Catherine Longsworth, Gregory W McGowan, Jacqueline McKinnon, Lateshia Jones-Walker, Michele Miller, Dorothea Maxwell, Naomi James, David Lasky, Milagros Monserrate, Donna Johnson, Patricia Kersey, Olga Levitanskaya, Maria Kohnken, Karen Lawton, Rosa Matos, Lashawn S Lucas, Veena Kapoor, Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez, Jean Mimy, Josephine Matoske, Sharon Lax, Amanda Ann Jacobs, Dianne Metzger, Cesar Matos, Tracy A McDowell, Mathew Mathisson, Frederick Kaufman, Chante Jennings, Elaine Jurs, Robin Messing, Annette Millhorn, Philippe Mao, Mary Mazzeo, Nefertiti Leach, Felicia Lynch, Monica Mikoleski, Suzanne Lograsso, Dymphna Matai, Afiya Lewis and Herbert E Mahler
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv12286
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alexander Montoya. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jean Kennedy, Herbert E Mahler, Philippe Mao, Amanda Ann Jacobs(as the Surviving Daughter of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Amanda Ann Jacobs (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Naomi James(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Naomi James(as Surviving Friend of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Surviving Daughter of Sharon Jennings, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sharon Jennings, Deceased), Donna Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Donna Johnson(as Surviving Daughter of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jones Walker, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker (as Surviving Daughter of Jones Walker, Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Surviving Spouse of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Surviving Spouse of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Frederick Kaufman(as Surviving Spouse of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Frederick Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Lori Kennedy, Jean Kennedy, Lori Kennedy, Patricia Kersey(as Surviving Spouse of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Patricia Kersey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Surviving Sister of Jesus Avila, Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jesus Avila, Deceased), David Lasky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), David Lasky(as Surviving Spouse of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Surviving Daughter of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Nefertiti Leach(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Nefertiti Leach(as Surviving Daughter of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Surviving Daughter of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Marcia Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Marcia Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Surviving Daughter of June Solla, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathleen Lograsso, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Personal Representative of the Estate of June Solla, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Surviving Sister of June Solla, Deceased), Albert Lucas, Albert Lucas, Lashawn S Lucas(as Surviving Spouse of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Lashawn S Lucas(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Surviving Daughter of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Herbert E Mahler, Philippe Mao, Dymphna Matai(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Dymphna Matai(as Surviving Spouse of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Surviving Spouse of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Cesar Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Matos, Deceased), Cesar Matos(as Surviving Brother of Martha Matos, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Surviving Daughter of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Surviving Son of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Dorothea Maxwell(as Surviving Spouse of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Dorothea Maxwell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Surviving Parent of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Tracy A McDowell(as Surviving Daughter of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Tracy A McDowell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Virginia McGarrity(as Surviving Daughter of Silvia Perez-Spiess, Deceased), Virginia McGarrity(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Silvia Perez-Spiess Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Surviving Son of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Surviving Spouse of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Robin Messing(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Robin Messing(as Surviving Spouse of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Dianne Metzger(as Surviving Spouse of John Metzger, Deceased), Dianne Metzger(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Metzger, Deceased), Monica Mikoleski(as Surviving Spouse of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Monica Mikoleski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Surviving Spouse of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Michele Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Michele Miller(as Surviving Daughter of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Surviving Spouse of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Jean Mimy(as the Surviving Friend of Martha Castro, Deceased), Jean Mimy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Castro, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Karen Franco, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Surviving Son of Karen Franco, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Surviving Daughter of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Alexander Montoya, Alexander Montoya. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/28/2018 re: Request for inclusion in 03-md-1570. Document filed by Jean Kennedy, Herbert E Mahler, Philippe Mao, Amanda Ann Jacobs(as the Surviving Daughter of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Amanda Ann Jacobs (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Naomi James(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Naomi James(as Surviving Friend of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Surviving Daughter of Sharon Jennings, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sharon Jennings, Deceased), Donna Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Donna Johnson(as Surviving Daughter of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jones Walker, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker (as Surviving Daughter of Jones Walker, Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Surviving Spouse of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Surviving Spouse of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Frederick Kaufman(as Surviving Spouse of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Frederick Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Lori Kennedy, Jean Kennedy, Lori Kennedy, Patricia Kersey(as Surviving Spouse of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Patricia Kersey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Surviving Sister of Jesus Avila, Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jesus Avila, Deceased), David Lasky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), David Lasky(as Surviving Spouse of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Surviving Daughter of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Nefertiti Leach(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Nefertiti Leach(as Surviving Daughter of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Surviving Daughter of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Marcia Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Marcia Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Surviving Daughter of June Solla, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathleen Lograsso, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Personal Representative of the Estate of June Solla, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Surviving Sister of June Solla, Deceased), Albert Lucas, Albert Lucas, Lashawn S Lucas(as Surviving Spouse of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Lashawn S Lucas(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Surviving Daughter of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Herbert E Mahler, Philippe Mao, Dymphna Matai(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Dymphna Matai(as Surviving Spouse of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Surviving Spouse of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Cesar Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Matos, Deceased), Cesar Matos(as Surviving Brother of Martha Matos, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Surviving Daughter of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Surviving Son of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Dorothea Maxwell(as Surviving Spouse of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Dorothea Maxwell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Surviving Parent of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Tracy A McDowell(as Surviving Daughter of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Tracy A McDowell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Virginia McGarrity(as Surviving Daughter of Silvia Perez-Spiess, Deceased), Virginia McGarrity(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Silvia Perez-Spiess Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Surviving Son of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Surviving Spouse of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Robin Messing(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Robin Messing(as Surviving Spouse of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Dianne Metzger(as Surviving Spouse of John Metzger, Deceased), Dianne Metzger(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Metzger, Deceased), Monica Mikoleski(as Surviving Spouse of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Monica Mikoleski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Surviving Spouse of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Michele Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Michele Miller(as Surviving Daughter of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Surviving Spouse of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Jean Mimy(as the Surviving Friend of Martha Castro, Deceased), Jean Mimy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Castro, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Karen Franco, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Surviving Son of Karen Franco, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Surviving Daughter of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Alexander Montoya, Alexander Montoya.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/28/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-md-1570. Document filed by Jean Kennedy, Herbert E Mahler, Philippe Mao, Amanda Ann Jacobs(as the Surviving Daughter of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Amanda Ann Jacobs (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Naomi James(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Naomi James(as Surviving Friend of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Surviving Daughter of Sharon Jennings, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sharon Jennings, Deceased), Donna Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Donna Johnson(as Surviving Daughter of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jones Walker, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker (as Surviving Daughter of Jones Walker, Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Surviving Spouse of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Surviving Spouse of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Frederick Kaufman(as Surviving Spouse of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Frederick Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Lori Kennedy, Jean Kennedy, Lori Kennedy, Patricia Kersey(as Surviving Spouse of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Patricia Kersey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Surviving Sister of Jesus Avila, Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jesus Avila, Deceased), David Lasky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), David Lasky(as Surviving Spouse of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Surviving Daughter of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Nefertiti Leach(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Nefertiti Leach(as Surviving Daughter of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Surviving Daughter of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Marcia Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Marcia Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Surviving Daughter of June Solla, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathleen Lograsso, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Personal Representative of the Estate of June Solla, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Surviving Sister of June Solla, Deceased), Albert Lucas, Albert Lucas, Lashawn S Lucas(as Surviving Spouse of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Lashawn S Lucas(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Surviving Daughter of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Herbert E Mahler, Philippe Mao, Dymphna Matai(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Dymphna Matai(as Surviving Spouse of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Surviving Spouse of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Cesar Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Matos, Deceased), Cesar Matos(as Surviving Brother of Martha Matos, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Surviving Daughter of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Surviving Son of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Dorothea Maxwell(as Surviving Spouse of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Dorothea Maxwell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Surviving Parent of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Tracy A McDowell(as Surviving Daughter of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Tracy A McDowell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Virginia McGarrity(as Surviving Daughter of Silvia Perez-Spiess, Deceased), Virginia McGarrity(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Silvia Perez-Spiess Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Surviving Son of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Surviving Spouse of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Robin Messing(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Robin Messing(as Surviving Spouse of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Dianne Metzger(as Surviving Spouse of John Metzger, Deceased), Dianne Metzger(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Metzger, Deceased), Monica Mikoleski(as Surviving Spouse of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Monica Mikoleski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Surviving Spouse of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Michele Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Michele Miller(as Surviving Daughter of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Surviving Spouse of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Jean Mimy(as the Surviving Friend of Martha Castro, Deceased), Jean Mimy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Castro, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Karen Franco, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Surviving Son of Karen Franco, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Surviving Daughter of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Alexander Montoya, Alexander Montoya.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Jean Kennedy, Herbert E Mahler, Philippe Mao, Amanda Ann Jacobs(as the Surviving Daughter of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Amanda Ann Jacobs (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Naomi James(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Naomi James(as Surviving Friend of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Surviving Daughter of Sharon Jennings, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sharon Jennings, Deceased), Donna Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Donna Johnson(as Surviving Daughter of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jones Walker, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker (as Surviving Daughter of Jones Walker, Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Surviving Spouse of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Surviving Spouse of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Frederick Kaufman(as Surviving Spouse of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Frederick Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Lori Kennedy, Jean Kennedy, Lori Kennedy, Patricia Kersey(as Surviving Spouse of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Patricia Kersey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Surviving Sister of Jesus Avila, Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jesus Avila, Deceased), David Lasky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), David Lasky(as Surviving Spouse of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Surviving Daughter of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Nefertiti Leach(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Nefertiti Leach(as Surviving Daughter of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Surviving Daughter of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Marcia Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Marcia Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Surviving Daughter of June Solla, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathleen Lograsso, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Personal Representative of the Estate of June Solla, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Surviving Sister of June Solla, Deceased), Albert Lucas, Albert Lucas, Lashawn S Lucas(as Surviving Spouse of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Lashawn S Lucas(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Surviving Daughter of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Herbert E Mahler, Philippe Mao, Dymphna Matai(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Dymphna Matai(as Surviving Spouse of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Surviving Spouse of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Cesar Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Matos, Deceased), Cesar Matos(as Surviving Brother of Martha Matos, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Surviving Daughter of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Surviving Son of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Dorothea Maxwell(as Surviving Spouse of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Dorothea Maxwell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Surviving Parent of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Tracy A McDowell(as Surviving Daughter of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Tracy A McDowell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Virginia McGarrity(as Surviving Daughter of Silvia Perez-Spiess, Deceased), Virginia McGarrity(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Silvia Perez-Spiess Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Surviving Son of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Surviving Spouse of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Robin Messing(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Robin Messing(as Surviving Spouse of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Dianne Metzger(as Surviving Spouse of John Metzger, Deceased), Dianne Metzger(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Metzger, Deceased), Monica Mikoleski(as Surviving Spouse of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Monica Mikoleski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Surviving Spouse of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Michele Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Michele Miller(as Surviving Daughter of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Surviving Spouse of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Jean Mimy(as the Surviving Friend of Martha Castro, Deceased), Jean Mimy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Castro, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Karen Franco, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Surviving Son of Karen Franco, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Surviving Daughter of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Alexander Montoya, Alexander Montoya.(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16117300)Document filed by Nefertiti Leach(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Surviving Daughter of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Surviving Spouse of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Lori Kennedy, Tracy A McDowell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Donna Johnson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Robin Messing(as Surviving Spouse of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Surviving Sister of Jesus Avila, Deceased), Alexander Montoya, Frederick Kaufman(as Surviving Spouse of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Tracy A McDowell(as Surviving Daughter of Estherena D Elcock, Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Surviving Spouse of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Surviving Daughter of June Solla, Deceased), Philippe Mao, Monica Mikoleski(as Surviving Spouse of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Virginia McGarrity(as Surviving Daughter of Silvia Perez-Spiess, Deceased), David Lasky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Dymphna Matai(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Cesar Matos(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Matos, Deceased), Jean Kennedy, Jean Mimy(as the Surviving Friend of Martha Castro, Deceased), Annette Millhorn (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Milhorn, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker (as Surviving Daughter of Jones Walker, Deceased), Sharon Lax(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Estelle Lax, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Jean Mimy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Martha Castro, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Surviving Spouse of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Albert Lucas, Michele Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Karen Franco, Deceased), Jacqueline McKinnon(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Norman McKinnon, Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Lashawn S Lucas(as Surviving Spouse of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Rosa Matos(as Surviving Daughter of Myra Quinones, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Dymphna Matai(as Surviving Spouse of Eteuati Matai, Deceased), Marcia Lewis(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Elaine Jurs(as Surviving Spouse of John Jurs, Jr., Deceased), Veena Kapoor(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vijay Kapoor, Deceased), Dianne Metzger(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Metzger, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Surviving Daughter of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Surviving Spouse of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Philippe Mao, Virginia McGarrity(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Silvia Perez-Spiess Deceased), Josephine Matoske(as Surviving Son of Victor Matoski, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Personal Representative of the Estate of June Solla, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Surviving Spouse of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Surviving Son of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Jean Kennedy, Cesar Matos(as Surviving Brother of Martha Matos, Deceased), Herbert E Mahler, Dorothea Maxwell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Surviving Parent of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Dorothea Maxwell(as Surviving Spouse of Grant Maxwell, Deceased), Amanda Ann Jacobs(as the Surviving Daughter of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Frederick Kaufman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth Berger, Deceased), Amanda Ann Jacobs (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynette Williams, Deceased), Michele Miller(as Surviving Daughter of Kenneth Wallace, Deceased), Karen Lawton(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lawton, Deceased), Alexander Montoya, Dianne Metzger(as Surviving Spouse of John Metzger, Deceased), Maria Kohnken(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jesus Avila, Deceased), David Lasky(as Surviving Spouse of Yolanda Lasky, Deceased), Monica Mikoleski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Mikoleski, Deceased), Gregory W McGowan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodney McGowan, Deceased), Afiya Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Emily Hunte, Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Mary Mazzeo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Mazzeo, Deceased), Mathew Mathisson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rhoda Mathisson, Deceased), Lashawn S Lucas(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Latroy Judd, Deceased), Patricia Kersey(as Surviving Spouse of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Herbert E Mahler, Robin Messing(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bodanoff, Deceased), Lori Kennedy, Marcia Lewis(as Surviving Parent of Odarri Lewis, Deceased), Catherine Longsworth(as Surviving Sister of June Solla, Deceased), Patricia Kersey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Johnny Kersey Jr., Deceased), Laura Kandelman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Kandelman, Deceased), Milagros Monserrate(as Surviving Daughter of Angelica Monserrate, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Surviving Daughter of Sharon Jennings, Deceased), Lucille Miller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Arthur Miller, Deceased), Naomi James(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Lerner, Deceased), Van Mobley(as Surviving Son of Karen Franco, Deceased), Lateshia Jones-Walker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jones Walker, Deceased), Felicia Lynch(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Fredric Walker, Deceased), Albert Lucas, Donna Johnson(as Surviving Daughter of Patricia Nicole James-Collins, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Surviving Daughter of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Janette Montalvo(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Ruchin, Deceased), Naomi James(as Surviving Friend of Joseph Brown, Deceased), Nefertiti Leach(as Surviving Daughter of Raymond Leach, Deceased), Olga Levitanskaya(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofia Lobkovskaya, Deceased), Suzanne Lograsso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathleen Lograsso, Deceased), Chante Jennings(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sharon Jennings, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Mobley
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette Montalvo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Lucas
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Kandelman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Lewis
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Montoya
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Kennedy
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Kennedy
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Miller
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia McGarrity
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Longsworth
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory W McGowan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline McKinnon
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lateshia Jones-Walker
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Miller
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Maxwell
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi James
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lasky
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milagros Monserrate
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Johnson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Kersey
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Levitanskaya
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Kohnken
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lawton
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Matos
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashawn S Lucas
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veena Kapoor
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivyan Lerner-Dedominguez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Mimy
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Matoske
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lax
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Ann Jacobs
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Metzger
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Matos
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy A McDowell
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Mathisson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Kaufman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chante Jennings
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Jurs
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Messing
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Millhorn
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philippe Mao
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mazzeo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nefertiti Leach
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Lynch
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Mikoleski
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Lograsso
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dymphna Matai
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afiya Lewis
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert E Mahler
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?