Washington et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Steven Espinal, John Doe, Pariis Tillery and Davon Washington
Defendant: Ryan Lawson, Matthew Labombard, Frank Foe Shield #323, "John" Harris, Vincent Adams, Thuan Ton, Frank Foes #1-12, Jarred Jarosz, Frank Foes #17-18, John Williams, Frank Foes #14-16, Joseph Kelly, Trent Shaver, Jane Walker, Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, Eugene Ratigan, Michael Grimes, County of Albany, Brian Sullivan, Mark Valvo, Cynthia Brann, Michael Beliveau, The City of New York, William Reddy, Josiah Haley, "John" Colangione, Michael Lyons, Frank Foe Shield #99, Kelly Thompson, Timothy Kehn, Craig D Apple, Sr., Dan Poole, Damien Anzalone, Frank Foe #13, Frank Harris, Anthony Torrisi, Frank Foes #19-21, Anthony Degonza, DOC Deputy Warden Sharlisa Walker, City Of New York and DOC Captain Edward Williams
Case Number: 1:2018cv12306
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 67 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Melissa "Missy" Mylroie.(Tripp, Timothy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss (joinder of defendant Brian Sullivan in City defendants' motion to dismiss and for joinder of State Commission of Correction at Docket 48). Document filed by Brian Sullivan.(Zuckerman, Mark)
February 25, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Frank Foe #13, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo.(Liguori, John)
February 22, 2019 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Douglas E. Lieb in Support re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by John Doe, Steven Espinal(on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated ), Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Captain Edward Williams)(Lieb, Douglas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 63 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . and in Opposition to The New York City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 48]. Document filed by John Doe, Steven Espinal(on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated ), Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Lieb, Douglas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Doug E. Lieb dated February 22, 2019 re: Status of Criminal Charges Against Steven Espinal. Document filed by Steven Espinal.(Lieb, Douglas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Sever . Document filed by Melissa "Missy" Mylroie. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Tripp, Timothy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 60 DECLARATION of John W. Liguori, Esq. in Support re: #58 MOTION to Sever pursuant to Rule 21 of the Fed. R. Civ. P.. MOTION to Transfer Case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a).. Document filed by Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liguori, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #58 MOTION to Sever pursuant to Rule 21 of the Fed. R. Civ. P.. MOTION to Transfer Case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). . Document filed by Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo. (Liguori, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to Sever pursuant to Rule 21 of the Fed. R. Civ. P.., MOTION to Transfer Case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Document filed by Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo.(Liguori, John)
February 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 10:15 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (ne)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. We can discuss a stay at the conference. I do not need another motion. See you March 8 at 10:15 AM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/15/2019) (ne)
February 14, 2019 Filing 56 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Modify Briefing Schedule) addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Douglas E. Lieb dated February 14, 2019. Document filed by John Doe, Steven Espinal(on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated ), Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington.(Lieb, Douglas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, Sharlisa Walker, Edward Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 54 DECLARATION of C.O. Peggy Joseph in Opposition re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, Sharlisa Walker, Edward Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Zuckerman, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Mark D. Zuckerman in Opposition re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, Sharlisa Walker, Edward Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I)(Zuckerman, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), (6) and (7), Fed. R. Civ. P. and for order to plaintiffs to join State Commission of Correction as defendant. . Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, Sharlisa Walker, Edward Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 51 DECLARATION of C.O. Peggy Joseph in Support re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), (6) and (7), Fed. R. Civ. P. and for order to plaintiffs to join State Commission of Correction as defendant.. Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, Sharlisa Walker, Edward Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Zuckerman, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John W. Liguori, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Affidavit Declaration of Michael J. Lyons, Superintendent of the Albany County Correctional Facility, #14 Affidavit Declaration of Lieutenant Ronald Murray)(Liguori, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Mark D. Zuckerman in Support re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), (6) and (7), Fed. R. Civ. P. and for order to plaintiffs to join State Commission of Correction as defendant.. Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, Sharlisa Walker, Edward Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I)(Zuckerman, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), (6) and (7), Fed. R. Civ. P. and for order to plaintiffs to join State Commission of Correction as defendant. Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, Sharlisa Walker, Edward Williams.(Zuckerman, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/8/2019. (All represented Parties present except for Albany County and Def. Mylroie, who appeared by phone).Decision: Status conference held. Defendant Mylroie may have until 2/25/2019 to file her Answer.Submitted by: Kyla Magun. (mde)
February 7, 2019 Filing 47 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Counsel from Chief Judge Colleen McMahon dated 2/7/2019 re: The conference must go forward tomorrow. For one thing, I want to know what the City's plans are with respect to moving to dismiss the complaint. For another, I want to explore whether a significant portion of this case does not need to be severed and moved to the Northern District of New York. Cases involving allegation of brutality by corrections officers located in the NDNY are litigated in the NDNY, not in NYC. Adding allegations that the City is somehow responsible for that brutality because it transferred the plaintiffs to Albany knowing that they would/might be abused does not change that. All that means is that there is some overlap is discovery. But I cannot for the life of me see why I should be litigating the conditions in the Albany County Jail down here. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/7/2019) (mml)
February 7, 2019 Filing 46 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #45 Letter, filed by Steven Espinal. ENDORSEMENT: Look, I do not take letter motions and I do not accept letter briefs in response to motions. So everyone get this straight - if Plaintiff wants to MOVE for expedited discovery MAKE A MOTION WITH ALL SUPPORTING PAPERS. Defendant(s) must RESPOND WITH PROPER PAPERS AND A BRIEF. If I were the City, I would move to dismiss promptly - and in response to the preliminary injunction motion to which a response is due on Feb. 11. (Responses due by 2/11/2019.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/6/2019) (mml)
February 6, 2019 Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Douglas E. Lieb dated February 6, 2019 re: Response to City Defendants' Request for Consolidated Briefing [Dkt 44]. Document filed by Steven Espinal(on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated ).(Lieb, Douglas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Mark D. Zuckerman dated February 5, 2019 re: response to plaintiff's request for expedited discovery at Docket 39 and request to combine briefing on application for preliminary injunction with proposed motion to dismiss. Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Zuckerman, Mark)
January 30, 2019 Filing 43 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #42 Letter, filed by City Of New York, Cynthia Brann. ENDORSEMENT: Ok. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/30/2019) (mml)
January 29, 2019 Filing 42 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Mark D. Zuckerman dated January 29, 2019 re: responses to request for expedited discovery and application for preliminary injunction. Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York.(Zuckerman, Mark)
January 29, 2019 Filing 41 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Frank Foe #13, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Frank Foes #1-12, Frank Foes #14-16, Frank Foes #17-18, Frank Foes #19-21, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Brian Sullivan, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo, Sharlisa Walker, Edward Williams with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Davon Washington, Pariis Tillery, John Doe, Steven Espinal. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Katherine R. Rosenfeld to RE-FILE re: Document No. #30 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties Davon Washington with party text 'on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated', Pariis Tillery with party text 'on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated', John Doe with party text 'on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated', Steven Espinal with party text 'on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated', Sharlisa Walker with party text 'DOC Deputy Warden', and, Edward Williams with party text 'DOC Captain'; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 29, 2019 Filing 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #39 Letter filed by Steven Espinal. ENDORSEMENT: Conference on for 2/8/19 at 10:00 a.m. Participants in Albany may appear by phone by calling Chambers at the specified date and time above. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/29/2019) (mro)
January 28, 2019 Filing 39 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Katherine Rosenfeld dated January 28, 2019 re: requesting narrowly tailored expedited discovery. Document filed by Steven Espinal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Katherine Rosenfeld in Support re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Steven Espinal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30)(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Ruben Dario Fernandez in Support re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Steven Espinal. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Robert M. Quackenbush in Support re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Steven Espinal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affirmation of Robert M. Quackenbush)(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Dr. Andrea Weisman in Support re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Steven Espinal. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Pariis Tillery in Support re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Steven Espinal. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Steven Espinal in Support re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Steven Espinal. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Steven Espinal. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Steven Espinal.(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 30 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Frank Foe #13, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Frank Foes #1-12, Frank Foes #14-16, Frank Foes #17-18, Frank Foes #19-21, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Brian Sullivan, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo, Jane Walker, John Williams with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Steven Espinal, Davon Washington, Pariis Tillery, John Doe. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Rosenfeld, Katherine) Modified on 1/29/2019 (jgo).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ok - but it is not clear to me that the claims against the Albany defendants should be litigated in this Court. Vincent Adams answer due 2/25/2019; Damien Anzalone answer due 2/25/2019; Craig D Apple, Sr answer due 2/25/2019; Michael Beliveau answer due 2/25/2019; "John" Colangione answer due 2/25/2019; County of Albany answer due 2/25/2019; Anthony Degonza answer due 2/25/2019; Frank Foe #13 answer due 2/25/2019; Frank Foe Shield #323 answer due 2/25/2019; Frank Foe Shield #99 answer due 2/25/2019; Michael Grimes answer due 2/25/2019; Josiah Haley answer due 2/25/2019; "John" Harris answer due 2/25/2019; Frank Harris answer due 2/25/2019; Jarred Jarosz answer due 2/25/2019; Timothy Kehn answer due 2/25/2019; Joseph Kelly answer due 2/25/2019; Matthew Labombard answer due 2/25/2019; Ryan Lawson answer due 2/25/2019; Michael Lyons answer due 2/25/2019; Dan Poole answer due 2/25/2019; Eugene Ratigan answer due 2/25/2019; William Reddy answer due 2/25/2019; Trent Shaver answer due 2/25/2019; Kelly Thompson answer due 2/25/2019; Thuan Ton answer due 2/25/2019; Anthony Torrisi answer due 2/25/2019; Mark Valvo answer due 2/25/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/28/2019) (mml)
January 25, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously . . Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York. (Zuckerman, Mark)
January 24, 2019 Filing 27 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John Liguori dated 1/24/19. Document filed by Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo.(Liguori, John)
January 24, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John William Liguori on behalf of Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo. (Liguori, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously . . Document filed by Melissa "Missy" Mylroie. (Tripp, Timothy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Patrick Tripp on behalf of Melissa "Missy" Mylroie. (Tripp, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Granted, Responses due by 1/25/2019 (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/17/2019) (cf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin Bartlett Phelan on behalf of Melissa "Missy" Mylroie. (Phelan, Robin)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ok. Cynthia Brann answer due 2/25/2019; City Of New York answer due 2/25/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/17/2019) (mml)
January 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Jane Weall on behalf of Cynthia Brann, City Of New York. (Weall, Katherine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Response to motion of plaintiff John Doe to proceed anonymously at Docket 10) addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Mark D. Zuckerman dated January 17, 2019. Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York.(Zuckerman, Mark)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Mark D. Zuckerman dated January 17, 2019. Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City Of New York.(Zuckerman, Mark)
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Zuckerman on behalf of Cynthia Brann, City Of New York. (Zuckerman, Mark)
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. Cynthia Brann served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Brian Sullivan served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Jane Walker served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; John Williams served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. Service was accepted by C.O. 'JOHN' Morgan, Co-Worker of Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Steven Espinal; Davon Washington; Pariis Tillery; John Doe. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. Melissa "Missy" Mylroie served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service was accepted by Nurse Melissa "Missy" Mylroie (Personally Served). Document filed by Steven Espinal; Davon Washington; Pariis Tillery; John Doe. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. County of Albany served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. Service was accepted by Mary Heffner. Document filed by Steven Espinal; Davon Washington; Pariis Tillery; John Doe. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. Vincent Adams served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Damien Anzalone served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Craig D Apple, Sr served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Michael Beliveau served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; "John" Colangione served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Anthony Degonza served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Michael Grimes served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Josiah Haley served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; "John" Harris served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Frank Harris served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Jarred Jarosz served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Timothy Kehn served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Joseph Kelly served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Matthew Labombard served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Ryan Lawson served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Michael Lyons served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Dan Poole served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Eugene Ratigan served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; William Reddy served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Trent Shaver served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Kelly Thompson served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Thuan Ton served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Anthony Torrisi served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; Mark Valvo served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. Service was accepted by Michael S. Monteleone, Undersheriff. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Steven Espinal; Davon Washington; Pariis Tillery; John Doe. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. City Of New York served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. Service was accepted by Ariton Marke. Document filed by Steven Espinal; Davon Washington; Pariis Tillery; John Doe. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/8/2019) (rj)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously . . Document filed by John Doe, Steven Espinal, Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Lieb, Douglas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously . Document filed by John Doe, Steven Espinal, Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington.(Lieb, Douglas)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven H. Goldman on behalf of John Doe, Steven Espinal, Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Goldman, Steven)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, Cynthia Brann, City Of New York, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Frank Foe #13, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Frank Foes #1-12, Frank Foes #14-16, Frank Foes #17-18, Frank Foes #19-21, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Brian Sullivan, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo, Jane Walker, John Williams. (pne)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York; New York City Department of Correction ("DOC") Commissioner Cynthia Brann; DOC Bureau Chief Brian Sullivan; DOC Deputy Warden "Jane" Walker; DOC Captain "John" Williams; DOC Correction Officers Frank Foes #1-12; County of Albany; Albany County Sheriff Craig D. Apple, Sr.; Albany County Correctional Facility Superintendent Michael Lyons; Lieutenants Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo, Frank Foe #13 a.k.a. "Superman," and Frank Foes #14-16; Captain "John" Harris; Sergeants Dan Poole, Michael Grimes, "John" Colangione, and Frank Foes #17-18, Correction Officers Matthew Labombard, Josiah Haley, Michael Beliveau, Vincent Adams, Joseph Kelly, William Reddy, Damien Anzalone, Ryan Lawson, Jarred Jarosz, Frank Harris, Thuan Ton, Timothy Kehn, Trent Shaver, Eugene Ratigan, Anthony Degonza, Kelly Thompson, Frank Foe Shield #99, Frank Foe Shield #323, and Frank Foes #19-21; and Nurse Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by John Doe, Steven Espinal, Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Lieb, Douglas)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK; NEW YORK, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe, Steven Espinal, Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Lieb, Douglas) Modified on 1/2/2019 (pne).
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Katherine R. Rosenfeld to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Write the name of each party listed on the summons on the docket entry. Not 'City of New York, et al.';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Katherine R. Rosenfeld. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (pc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Edward Lieb on behalf of John Doe, Steven Espinal, Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Lieb, Douglas)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, et al., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by John Doe, Steven Espinal, Pariis Tillery, Davon Washington. (Rosenfeld, Katherine) Modified on 1/2/2019 (pc).
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vincent Adams, Damien Anzalone, Craig D Apple, Sr, Michael Beliveau, Cynthia Brann, "John" Colangione, County of Albany, Anthony Degonza, Frank Foe #13, Frank Foe Shield #323, Frank Foe Shield #99, Frank Foes #1-12, Frank Foes #14-16, Frank Foes #17-18, Frank Foes #19-21, Michael Grimes, Josiah Haley, "John" Harris, Frank Harris, Jarred Jarosz, Timothy Kehn, Joseph Kelly, Matthew Labombard, Ryan Lawson, Michael Lyons, Melissa "Missy" Mylroie, Dan Poole, Eugene Ratigan, William Reddy, Trent Shaver, Brian Sullivan, The City of New York, Kelly Thompson, Thuan Ton, Anthony Torrisi, Mark Valvo, Jane Walker, John Williams. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16116766)Document filed by Steven Espinal, Davon Washington, Pariis Tillery, John Doe.(Rosenfeld, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lawson
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Labombard
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Foe Shield #323
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "John" Harris
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Adams
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thuan Ton
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Foes #1-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarred Jarosz
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Foes #17-18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Foes #14-16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kelly
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Shaver
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa "Missy" Mylroie
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Tripp
Represented By: Robin Bartlett Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Ratigan
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Grimes
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Albany
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sullivan
Represented By: Mark David Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Valvo
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Brann
Represented By: Katherine Jane Weall
Represented By: Mark David Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beliveau
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Reddy
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josiah Haley
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "John" Colangione
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lyons
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Foe Shield #99
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Thompson
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Kehn
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig D Apple, Sr.
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Poole
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien Anzalone
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Foe #13
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Harris
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Torrisi
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Foes #19-21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Degonza
Represented By: John William Liguori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOC Deputy Warden Sharlisa Walker
Represented By: Mark David Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Katherine Jane Weall
Represented By: Mark David Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOC Captain Edward Williams
Represented By: Mark David Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Espinal
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Steven H. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Steven H. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pariis Tillery
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Steven H. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davon Washington
Represented By: Douglas Edward Lieb
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Steven H. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?