Anaya et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Brandon Michael Anaya, Cecelia Kauth, Denise Brady, Vivian Lanham-Lowe, Helen L. Colhoun, John M. Duffy, Patrick M. Kauth, Eileen R. Lee, John M. Galvin, Jr., Myasia Micki Laurence, Ann Ferrus, Joseph DiMartino, Carlos DaCosta, Jr., Thomas Frank Getzendanner, Judith King, Deodat Guman, Lucille Dionisio, Stephanie Dionisio, Jasmine Lanham, John M. Galvin, Casey King, Kathy Galvin Callahan, Tracy Anne Larkey, Gary Lanham, Peter A. Dionisio, Diverra Galvin, Elizabeth A. Emery, William James Larkey, Donovan Lanham, Brigid Colhoun, Marykay Duffy-Kemper, Rebecca Anaya, Brian K. Emery, Christina Guman, Rosalie A. Marti, Khalik Lowe, M. Rita Dacosta, Vanessa Graham, Phillip Samuel Lowe, Oliver Robin Larkey, Rosa Notaro, Andrew King, Charnice Lowe, Tammeka Lowe, Martha Lingen, David Lowe, Daniel DaCosta, Donna M. Hall, Rosaria Reneo, Carlo Notaro, Danielle Dimartino, Samantha Dimartino, Kerina Williams, Gary A. Lee, Nicholas Blair Larkey, Lynn Galvin, Barbara M. Duffy, Deborah Ann Phinney, Mario Truglio, Charisma Lowe, Matthew J. Kauth, Bryan Kauth, Kristina-Marie Anaya, Mary K. Grossi, Lidia Kriso, Marie Laure Anaya, Carly King and Ann Ferris
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2018cv12341
Filed: December 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,, against Islamic Republic of Iran with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John M. Galvin(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas E. Galvin), John M. Galvin, Jr, Carlo Notaro(Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniela R. Notaro), Andrew King, Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio), Eileen R. Lee(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary H. Lee), Helen L. Colhoun(Personal Representative of the Estate of Liam Joseph Colhoun), Charisma Lowe, John M. Duffy, Peter A. Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Gary A. Lee, Danielle Dimartino, Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Babita Girjamatie Guman), Bryan Kauth, Phillip Samuel Lowe, Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael W. Lowe), Marykay Duffy-Kemper, Vanessa Graham(Individually), Judith King(Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Marshal King), Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Rosaria Reneo, Carlo Notaro(Individually), M. Rita Dacosta(Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos DaCosta), John M. Galvin(Individually), Kathy Galvin Callahan, Daniel DaCosta, Rosa Notaro, Myasia Micki Laurence, Donna M. Hall(Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Boy Hall), Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger R. Marti), Jasmine Lanham, Tracy Anne Larkey(Individually), Elizabeth A. Emery(Personal Representative of the Estate of Edgar H. Emery, Jr.), Matthew J. Kauth(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth A. Getzendanner), Carly King, Lidia Kriso, Vanessa Graham(Personal Representative of the Estate of Winifred R. Graham), Carlos DaCosta, Jr, Samantha Dimartino, Tammeka Lowe, Judith King(Individually), Denise Brady, Tracy Anne Larkey(Personal Representative of the Estate of Robin Blair Larkey), Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Individually), Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Melaissa Guman), Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael A. Marti), Gary Lanham, Lucille Dionisio(Individually), Casey King, Cecelia Kauth, Nicholas Blair Larkey, Eileen R. Lee(Individually), Oliver Robin Larkey, Marie Laure Anaya(Personal Representative of the Estate of Calizto Anaya, Jr.), Peter A. Dionisio(Individually), Marie Laure Anaya(Individually), Rosalie A. Marti, Brian K. Emery, Khalik Lowe, Barbara M. Duffy(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Joseph Duffy), Elizabeth A. Emery(Individually), David Lowe, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Getzendanner), Donovan Lanham, Joseph DiMartino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Deborah Ann Dimartino), William James Larkey, Mary K. Grossi, Matthew J. Kauth(Individually), Barbara M. Duffy(Individually), Patrick M. Kauth, Charnice Lowe, Martha Lingen, Stephanie Dionisio, Christina Guman, Deborah Ann Phinney, Joseph DiMartino(Individually), Helen L. Colhoun(Individually), Kerina Williams, Kristina-Marie Anaya, Lynn Galvin, M. Rita Dacosta(Individually), Donna M. Hall(Individually), Brigid Colhoun, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Getzendanner), Brandon Michael Anaya, Diverra Galvin, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Individually), Deodat Guman(Individually), Rebecca Anaya, Ann Ferris, Ann Ferris. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Identification of Plaintiffs)(Bonner, James)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting (4395) Motion for Joseph Peter Drennan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (23) Motion for Joseph Peter Drennan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion for Joseph Peter Drennan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN; granting (23) Motion for Joseph Peter Drennan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion for Joseph Peter Drennan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (ras)
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Peter Drennan on behalf of Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(Drennan, Joseph)
February 5, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (26 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 23 in 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 4395 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 23 in 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN) MOTION for Joseph Peter Drennan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16291886. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(wb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Joseph Peter Drennan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16291886. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Peter Drennan, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Virginia), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (D.C.), #4 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(Drennan, Joseph)
January 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Y McLane on behalf of Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(McLane, Patrick)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting (4372) Motion for Patrick York McLane to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (20) Motion for Patrick York McLane to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN; granting (23) Motion for Patrick York McLane to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN; granting (20) Motion for Patrick York McLane to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN; granting (22) Motion for Patrick York McLane to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN (ras)
January 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (4372 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 20 in 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 23 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 22 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN, 20 in 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN) MOTION for Patrick York McLane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(wb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Patrick York McLane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick York McLane, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Texas Supreme Court), #3 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of P. York McLane)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(McLane, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Susan M. Davies on behalf of Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. New Address: Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP, 565 Fifth Avenue, 7th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10017, 212-239-4460. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(Davies, Susan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James Patrick Bonner on behalf of Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. New Address: Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP, 565 Fifth Avenue, 7th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10017, 9085162066. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Bonner, James)
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Louis Rocco on behalf of Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Rocco, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Peter Donahue on behalf of Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Donahue, Thomas)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Michael Donahue on behalf of Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Donahue, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Donahue on behalf of Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Donahue, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting (4348) Motion for Patrick Michael Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (9) Motion for Patrick Michael Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for Patrick Michael Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN; granting (9) Motion for Patrick Michael Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN; granting (11) Motion for Patrick Michael Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (ras)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting (4347) Motion for Patrick Joseph Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (8) Motion for Patrick Joseph Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN; granting (11) Motion for Patrick Joseph Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN; granting (8) Motion for Patrick Joseph Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN; granting (10) Motion for Patrick Joseph Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (ras)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting (4343) Motion for Thomas Peter Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (7) Motion for Thomas Peter Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN; granting (10) Motion for Thomas Peter Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN;granting (7) Motion for Thomas Peter Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN; granting (9) Motion for Thomas Peter Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (ras)
January 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. (10 in 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 13 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 4349 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 10 in 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN) MOTION for Patrick York McLane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16190810. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as A Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(wb)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Patrick York McLane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16190810. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. York McLane, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Texas), #3 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of P. York McLane)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(McLane, Patrick) Modified on 1/15/2019 (wb).
January 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (12 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 4348 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 11 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN, 9 in 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 9 in 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN) MOTION for Patrick Michael Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(bcu)
January 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for (12 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 9 in 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 4348 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 11 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN, 9 in 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN) MOTION for Patrick Michael Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16185071.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(Donahue, Patrick)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Patrick Michael Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Michael Donahue, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Maryland), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (D.C.), #4 Proposed Order for Admission pro hac vice of Patrick Michael Donahue)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(Donahue, Patrick)
January 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (11 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 8 in 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 4347 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 10 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN, 8 in 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 31 in 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN) MOTION for Patrick Joseph Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16183817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Patrick Joseph Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16183817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Donahue, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Maryland), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (D.C.), #4 Proposed Order for Admission pro hac vice of Patrick J. Donahue)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Donahue, Patrick)
January 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (7 in 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 9 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN, 4343 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 7 in 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 10 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN) MOTION for Thomas Peter Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16179856. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(wb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas Peter Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16179856. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marie Anaya, Hugh Chairnoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Peter Donahue, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(Donahue, Thomas) Modified on 1/14/2019 (bcu).
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran. (dnh)
January 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 7, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Brandon Michael Anaya, Kristina-Marie Anaya, Marie Laure Anaya(Personal Representative of the Estate of Calizto Anaya, Jr.), Marie Laure Anaya(Individually), Rebecca Anaya, Denise Brady, Kathy Galvin Callahan, Brigid Colhoun, Helen L. Colhoun(Personal Representative of the Estate of Liam Joseph Colhoun), Helen L. Colhoun(Individually), Carlos DaCosta, Jr, Daniel DaCosta, M. Rita Dacosta(Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos DaCosta), M. Rita Dacosta(Individually), Joseph DiMartino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Deborah Ann Dimartino), Joseph DiMartino(Individually), Danielle Dimartino, Samantha Dimartino, Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio), Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Lucille Dionisio(Individually), Peter A. Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Peter A. Dionisio(Individually), Stephanie Dionisio, Barbara M. Duffy(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Joseph Duffy), Barbara M. Duffy(Individually), John M. Duffy, Marykay Duffy-Kemper, Brian K. Emery, Elizabeth A. Emery(Personal Representative of the Estate of Edgar H. Emery, Jr.), Elizabeth A. Emery(Individually), Ann Ferrus(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Ann Ferrus(Individually), Diverra Galvin, John M. Galvin, Jr, John M. Galvin(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas E. Galvin), John M. Galvin(Individually), Lynn Galvin, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth A. Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Individually), Vanessa Graham(Individually), Vanessa Graham(Personal Representative of the Estate of Winifred R. Graham), Mary K. Grossi, Christina Guman, Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Babita Girjamatie Guman), Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Melaissa Guman), Deodat Guman(Individually), Donna M. Hall(Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Boy Hall), Donna M. Hall(Individually), Bryan Kauth, Cecelia Kauth, Matthew J. Kauth(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Matthew J. Kauth(Individually), Patrick M. Kauth, Andrew King, Carly King, Casey King, Judith King(Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Marshal King), Judith King(Individually), Lidia Kriso, Donovan Lanham, Gary Lanham, Jasmine Lanham, Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael W. Lowe), Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Individually), Nicholas Blair Larkey, Oliver Robin Larkey, Tracy Anne Larkey(Individually), Tracy Anne Larkey(Personal Representative of the Estate of Robin Blair Larkey), William James Larkey, Myasia Micki Laurence, Eileen R. Lee(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary H. Lee), Eileen R. Lee(Individually), Gary A. Lee, Martha Lingen, Charisma Lowe, Charnice Lowe, David Lowe, Khalik Lowe, Phillip Samuel Lowe, Tammeka Lowe, Rosalie A. Marti, Carlo Notaro(Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniela R. Notaro), Carlo Notaro(Individually), Rosa Notaro, Deborah Ann Phinney, Rosaria Reneo, Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger R. Marti), Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael A. Marti), Kerina Williams. (Bonner, James)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran. (pne)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-MD-1570. (pne)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
December 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan M. Davies on behalf of Brandon Michael Anaya, Kristina-Marie Anaya, Marie Laure Anaya(Personal Representative of the Estate of Calizto Anaya, Jr.), Marie Laure Anaya(Individually), Rebecca Anaya, Denise Brady, Kathy Galvin Callahan, Brigid Colhoun, Helen L. Colhoun(Personal Representative of the Estate of Liam Joseph Colhoun), Helen L. Colhoun(Individually), Carlos DaCosta, Jr, Daniel DaCosta, M. Rita Dacosta(Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos DaCosta), M. Rita Dacosta(Individually), Joseph DiMartino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Deborah Ann Dimartino), Joseph DiMartino(Individually), Danielle Dimartino, Samantha Dimartino, Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio), Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Lucille Dionisio(Individually), Peter A. Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Peter A. Dionisio(Individually), Stephanie Dionisio, Barbara M. Duffy(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Joseph Duffy), Barbara M. Duffy(Individually), John M. Duffy, Marykay Duffy-Kemper, Brian K. Emery, Elizabeth A. Emery(Personal Representative of the Estate of Edgar H. Emery, Jr.), Elizabeth A. Emery(Individually), Ann Ferrus(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Ann Ferrus(Individually), Diverra Galvin, John M. Galvin, Jr, John M. Galvin(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas E. Galvin), John M. Galvin(Individually), Lynn Galvin, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth A. Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Individually), Vanessa Graham(Individually), Vanessa Graham(Personal Representative of the Estate of Winifred R. Graham), Mary K. Grossi, Christina Guman, Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Babita Girjamatie Guman), Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Melaissa Guman), Deodat Guman(Individually), Donna M. Hall(Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Boy Hall), Donna M. Hall(Individually), Bryan Kauth, Cecelia Kauth, Matthew J. Kauth(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Matthew J. Kauth(Individually), Patrick M. Kauth, Andrew King, Carly King, Casey King, Judith King(Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Marshal King), Judith King(Individually), Lidia Kriso, Donovan Lanham, Gary Lanham, Jasmine Lanham, Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael W. Lowe), Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Individually), Nicholas Blair Larkey, Oliver Robin Larkey, Tracy Anne Larkey(Individually), Tracy Anne Larkey(Personal Representative of the Estate of Robin Blair Larkey), William James Larkey, Myasia Micki Laurence, Eileen R. Lee(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary H. Lee), Eileen R. Lee(Individually), Gary A. Lee, Martha Lingen, Charisma Lowe, Charnice Lowe, David Lowe, Khalik Lowe, Phillip Samuel Lowe, Tammeka Lowe, Rosalie A. Marti, Carlo Notaro(Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniela R. Notaro), Carlo Notaro(Individually), Rosa Notaro, Deborah Ann Phinney, Rosaria Reneo, Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger R. Marti), Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael A. Marti), Kerina Williams. (Davies, Susan)
December 29, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Brandon Michael Anaya, Kristina-Marie Anaya, Marie Laure Anaya(Personal Representative of the Estate of Calizto Anaya, Jr.), Marie Laure Anaya(Individually), Rebecca Anaya, Denise Brady, Kathy Galvin Callahan, Brigid Colhoun, Helen L. Colhoun(Personal Representative of the Estate of Liam Joseph Colhoun), Helen L. Colhoun(Individually), Carlos DaCosta, Jr, Daniel DaCosta, M. Rita Dacosta(Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos DaCosta), M. Rita Dacosta(Individually), Joseph DiMartino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Deborah Ann Dimartino), Joseph DiMartino(Individually), Danielle Dimartino, Samantha Dimartino, Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio), Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Lucille Dionisio(Individually), Peter A. Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Peter A. Dionisio(Individually), Stephanie Dionisio, Barbara M. Duffy(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Joseph Duffy), Barbara M. Duffy(Individually), John M. Duffy, Marykay Duffy-Kemper, Brian K. Emery, Elizabeth A. Emery(Personal Representative of the Estate of Edgar H. Emery, Jr.), Elizabeth A. Emery(Individually), Ann Ferrus(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Ann Ferrus(Individually), Diverra Galvin, John M. Galvin, Jr, John M. Galvin(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas E. Galvin), John M. Galvin(Individually), Lynn Galvin, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth A. Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Individually), Vanessa Graham(Individually), Vanessa Graham(Personal Representative of the Estate of Winifred R. Graham), Mary K. Grossi, Christina Guman, Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Babita Girjamatie Guman), Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Melaissa Guman), Deodat Guman(Individually), Donna M. Hall(Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Boy Hall), Donna M. Hall(Individually), Bryan Kauth, Cecelia Kauth, Matthew J. Kauth(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Matthew J. Kauth(Individually), Patrick M. Kauth, Andrew King, Carly King, Casey King, Judith King(Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Marshal King), Judith King(Individually), Lidia Kriso, Donovan Lanham, Gary Lanham, Jasmine Lanham, Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael W. Lowe), Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Individually), Nicholas Blair Larkey, Oliver Robin Larkey, Tracy Anne Larkey(Individually), Tracy Anne Larkey(Personal Representative of the Estate of Robin Blair Larkey), William James Larkey, Myasia Micki Laurence, Eileen R. Lee(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary H. Lee), Eileen R. Lee(Individually), Gary A. Lee, Martha Lingen, Charisma Lowe, Charnice Lowe, David Lowe, Khalik Lowe, Phillip Samuel Lowe, Tammeka Lowe, Rosalie A. Marti, Carlo Notaro(Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniela R. Notaro), Carlo Notaro(Individually), Rosa Notaro, Deborah Ann Phinney, Rosaria Reneo, Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger R. Marti), Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael A. Marti), Kerina Williams. (Bonner, James)
December 29, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Brandon Michael Anaya, Kristina-Marie Anaya, Marie Laure Anaya(Personal Representative of the Estate of Calizto Anaya, Jr.), Marie Laure Anaya(Individually), Rebecca Anaya, Denise Brady, Kathy Galvin Callahan, Brigid Colhoun, Helen L. Colhoun(Personal Representative of the Estate of Liam Joseph Colhoun), Helen L. Colhoun(Individually), Carlos DaCosta, Jr, Daniel DaCosta, M. Rita Dacosta(Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos DaCosta), M. Rita Dacosta(Individually), Joseph DiMartino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Deborah Ann Dimartino), Joseph DiMartino(Individually), Danielle Dimartino, Samantha Dimartino, Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio), Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Lucille Dionisio(Individually), Peter A. Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Peter A. Dionisio(Individually), Stephanie Dionisio, Barbara M. Duffy(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Joseph Duffy), Barbara M. Duffy(Individually), John M. Duffy, Marykay Duffy-Kemper, Brian K. Emery, Elizabeth A. Emery(Personal Representative of the Estate of Edgar H. Emery, Jr.), Elizabeth A. Emery(Individually), Ann Ferrus(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Ann Ferrus(Individually), Diverra Galvin, John M. Galvin, Jr, John M. Galvin(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas E. Galvin), John M. Galvin(Individually), Lynn Galvin, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth A. Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Getzendanner), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Individually), Vanessa Graham(Individually), Vanessa Graham(Personal Representative of the Estate of Winifred R. Graham), Mary K. Grossi, Christina Guman, Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Babita Girjamatie Guman), Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Melaissa Guman), Deodat Guman(Individually), Donna M. Hall(Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Boy Hall), Donna M. Hall(Individually), Bryan Kauth, Cecelia Kauth, Matthew J. Kauth(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Matthew J. Kauth(Individually), Patrick M. Kauth, Andrew King, Carly King, Casey King, Judith King(Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Marshal King), Judith King(Individually), Lidia Kriso, Donovan Lanham, Gary Lanham, Jasmine Lanham, Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael W. Lowe), Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Individually), Nicholas Blair Larkey, Oliver Robin Larkey, Tracy Anne Larkey(Individually), Tracy Anne Larkey(Personal Representative of the Estate of Robin Blair Larkey), William James Larkey, Myasia Micki Laurence, Eileen R. Lee(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary H. Lee), Eileen R. Lee(Individually), Gary A. Lee, Martha Lingen, Charisma Lowe, Charnice Lowe, David Lowe, Khalik Lowe, Phillip Samuel Lowe, Tammeka Lowe, Rosalie A. Marti, Carlo Notaro(Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniela R. Notaro), Carlo Notaro(Individually), Rosa Notaro, Deborah Ann Phinney, Rosaria Reneo, Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger R. Marti), Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael A. Marti), Kerina Williams.(Bonner, James)
December 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Identification of Plaintiffs)(Bonner, James)
December 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16119237)Document filed by John M. Galvin(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas E. Galvin), John M. Galvin, Jr, Carlo Notaro(Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniela R. Notaro), Andrew King, Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio), Eileen R. Lee(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary H. Lee), Helen L. Colhoun(Personal Representative of the Estate of Liam Joseph Colhoun), Charisma Lowe, John M. Duffy, Peter A. Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Gary A. Lee, Danielle Dimartino, Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Babita Girjamatie Guman), Bryan Kauth, Phillip Samuel Lowe, Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael W. Lowe), Marykay Duffy-Kemper, Vanessa Graham(Individually), Judith King(Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrew Marshal King), Lucille Dionisio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Dionisio, Jr.), Rosaria Reneo, Carlo Notaro(Individually), M. Rita Dacosta(Personal Representative of the Estate of Carlos DaCosta), John M. Galvin(Individually), Kathy Galvin Callahan, Daniel DaCosta, Rosa Notaro, Myasia Micki Laurence, Donna M. Hall(Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Boy Hall), Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Roger R. Marti), Jasmine Lanham, Tracy Anne Larkey(Individually), Elizabeth A. Emery(Personal Representative of the Estate of Edgar H. Emery, Jr.), Matthew J. Kauth(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth A. Getzendanner), Carly King, Lidia Kriso, Vanessa Graham(Personal Representative of the Estate of Winifred R. Graham), Carlos DaCosta, Jr, Samantha Dimartino, Tammeka Lowe, Ann Ferrus(Personal Representative of the Estate of Don Jerome Kauth), Judith King(Individually), Denise Brady, Tracy Anne Larkey(Personal Representative of the Estate of Robin Blair Larkey), Vivian Lanham-Lowe(Individually), Deodat Guman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Melaissa Guman), Mario Truglio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael A. Marti), Gary Lanham, Lucille Dionisio(Individually), Casey King, Cecelia Kauth, Nicholas Blair Larkey, Eileen R. Lee(Individually), Oliver Robin Larkey, Marie Laure Anaya(Personal Representative of the Estate of Calizto Anaya, Jr.), Peter A. Dionisio(Individually), Marie Laure Anaya(Individually), Rosalie A. Marti, Brian K. Emery, Khalik Lowe, Barbara M. Duffy(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Joseph Duffy), Elizabeth A. Emery(Individually), David Lowe, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph W. Getzendanner), Donovan Lanham, Joseph DiMartino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Deborah Ann Dimartino), William James Larkey, Mary K. Grossi, Matthew J. Kauth(Individually), Barbara M. Duffy(Individually), Patrick M. Kauth, Charnice Lowe, Martha Lingen, Stephanie Dionisio, Christina Guman, Deborah Ann Phinney, Joseph DiMartino(Individually), Helen L. Colhoun(Individually), Kerina Williams, Kristina-Marie Anaya, Lynn Galvin, M. Rita Dacosta(Individually), Ann Ferrus(Individually), Donna M. Hall(Individually), Brigid Colhoun, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Susan Getzendanner), Brandon Michael Anaya, Diverra Galvin, Thomas Frank Getzendanner(Individually), Deodat Guman(Individually), Rebecca Anaya. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Identification of Plaintiffs)(Bonner, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anaya et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Michael Anaya
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelia Kauth
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Brady
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Lanham-Lowe
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen L. Colhoun
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Duffy
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Kauth
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen R. Lee
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Galvin, Jr.
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myasia Micki Laurence
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Ferrus
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph DiMartino
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos DaCosta, Jr.
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Frank Getzendanner
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith King
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deodat Guman
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Dionisio
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Dionisio
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Lanham
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Galvin
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey King
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Galvin Callahan
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Anne Larkey
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lanham
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A. Dionisio
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diverra Galvin
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Emery
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William James Larkey
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Lanham
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigid Colhoun
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marykay Duffy-Kemper
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Anaya
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Emery
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Guman
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie A. Marti
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalik Lowe
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Rita Dacosta
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Graham
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Samuel Lowe
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Robin Larkey
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Notaro
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew King
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charnice Lowe
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammeka Lowe
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Lingen
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lowe
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel DaCosta
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Hall
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosaria Reneo
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Notaro
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Dimartino
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Dimartino
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerina Williams
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary A. Lee
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Blair Larkey
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Galvin
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara M. Duffy
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Phinney
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Truglio
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charisma Lowe
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Kauth
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Kauth
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina-Marie Anaya
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary K. Grossi
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Kriso
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Laure Anaya
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Patrick Y McLane
Represented By: Thomas Peter Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carly King
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Ferris
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?