Harraz v. EgyptAir Airlines Company et al
Plaintiff: Iman Harraz
Defendant: EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY, Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited, Gamal Maher Emom Aly, Paul John Weston and Port Authority of New York & New Jersey
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: MAHER EMON ALY GAMAL, Iman Harris, John Paul Weston and Port Authority of NY & NJ
Case Number: 1:2018cv12364
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Letter filed by Iman Harraz. ENDORSEMENT: The prior order dismissing Plaintiff's motion to remand, Doc. 14, is hereby vacated. Defendants have until March 1, 2019 to oppose Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiff have until March 15, 2019 to reply. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 3/1/2019, Replies due by 3/15/2019.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/1/2019) (kv)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher F. Holbrook dated 01/31/2019 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Iman Harraz.(Holbrook, Christopher)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 Vacated as per Judges Order dated 2/1/2019, Doc. #16
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Iman Harraz. (Holbrook, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Christopher F. Holbrook in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Iman Harraz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint (Supreme Court Bronx), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service EgyptAir Airlines, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Service Virgin Atlantic, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Service Gamal Maher Emom Aly, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Service Paul John Weston, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Service Port Authority NY&NJ, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Notice of Removal)(Holbrook, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST MOTION to Remand . Document filed by Iman Harraz.(Holbrook, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christopher F. Holbrook to RE-FILE Document #10 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. (db)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Iman Harraz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint (Supreme Bronx), #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - EgyptAir, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Virgin Atlantic, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Gamal Maher Emom Aly, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - John Paul Weston, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Port Authority of NY&NJ, #8 Exhibit Notice of Removal filed by defendant, #9 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #10 Affidavit Memorandum of Law)(Holbrook, Christopher) Modified on 1/30/2019 (db).
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Carlsen, Christopher)
January 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christopher Carlsen to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; party name error. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Carlsen, Christopher)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Singapore Airlines, Corporate Parent Virgin Group for Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited. Document filed by Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited.(Carlsen, Christopher)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Egyptair Holding Company for EgyptAir Airlines Company. Document filed by EgyptAir Airlines Company.(Carlsen, Christopher)
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christopher Carlsen to RE-FILE Document #1 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Port Authority of New York & New Jersey.(Carlsen, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by EgyptAir Airlines Company.(Carlsen, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher Carlsen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher Carlsen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Iman Harraz; EgyptAir Airlines Company; Gamal Maher Emom Aly; Paul John Weston; Port Aurthority of New York & New Jersey. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Carlsen, Christopher) Modified on 1/7/2019 (sj).
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supeme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 33405/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16120395).Document filed by EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit)(Carlsen, Christopher)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY.(Carlsen, Christopher) Modified on 1/3/2019 (lb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harraz v. EgyptAir Airlines Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: MAHER EMON ALY GAMAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Iman Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: John Paul Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Port Authority of NY & NJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Carlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited
Represented By: Christopher Carlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamal Maher Emom Aly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul John Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Authority of New York & New Jersey
Represented By: Christopher Carlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iman Harraz
Represented By: Christopher F. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?