Angelini et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran Featured Case
Plaintiff: Tracey Osborne, Timothy Clarke, Mary M. Angelini, NA BNY Mellon, Annmarie Angelini, Anne Angelini, Kelly Anne Clarke, Kathleen L. Clarke Head, Patricia Clarke Scudder, Michael P. Angelini, BNY Mellon, NA. and Kelly Clarke Anne
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 1:2018cv12368
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570(GBD)(SN). Document filed by Anne Angelini, Annmarie Angelini, Mary M. Angelini, Michael P. Angelini, Kelly Clarke Anne, BNY Mellon, NA., Timothy Clarke, Kathleen L. Clarke Head, Patricia Clarke Scudder, Tracey Osborne.(Kreindler, James)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Timothy Clarke, Kelly Clarke Anne, Annmarie Angelini, Mary M. Angelini, Michael P. Angelini, Anne Angelini, Kathleen L. Clarke Head, Tracey Osborne, BNY Mellon, NA., Patricia Clarke Scudder. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kreindler, James)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney James P. Kreindler to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Due to party modification the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Kelly Anne Clarke; NA BNY Mellon. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James P. Kreindler. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Anne Angelini, Annmarie Angelini, Mary M. Angelini, Michael P. Angelini, NA BNY Mellon, Kelly Anne Clarke, Timothy Clarke, Kathleen L. Clarke Head, Patricia Clarke Scudder, Tracey Osborne. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text contained a typographical error. (dnh)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Timothy Clarke, Kelly Anne Clarke, Annmarie Angelini, Mary M. Angelini, Michael P. Angelini, Anne Angelini, Kathleen L. Clarke Head, Tracey Osborne, NA BNY Mellon, Patricia Clarke Scudder. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kreindler, James) Modified on 1/2/2019 (dnh).
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570(GBD)(SN). Document filed by Anne Angelini, Annmarie Angelini, Mary M. Angelini, Michael P. Angelini, NA BNY Mellon, Kelly Anne Clarke, Timothy Clarke, Kathleen L. Clarke Head, Patricia Clarke Scudder, Tracey Osborne.(Kreindler, James)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kreindler, James)
December 31, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mary M. Angelini, Timothy Clarke, NA BNY Mellon, Kathleen L. Clarke Head, Michael P. Angelini, Tracey Osborne, Kelly Anne Clarke, Patricia Clarke Scudder added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Mary M. Angelini, Timothy Clarke, NA BNY Mellon, Kathleen L. Clarke Head, Michael P. Angelini, Tracey Osborne, Kelly Anne Clarke, Patricia Clarke Scudder. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Kreindler, James)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16120499)Document filed by Annmarie Angelini, Anne Angelini. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kreindler, James) Modified on 1/2/2019 (dnh).
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16120499)Document filed by Annmarie Angelini, Anne Angelini. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1)(Kreindler, James) Modified on 1/2/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angelini et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Osborne
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Clarke
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary M. Angelini
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NA BNY Mellon
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annmarie Angelini
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Angelini
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Anne Clarke
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen L. Clarke Head
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Clarke Scudder
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Angelini
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNY Mellon, NA.
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Clarke Anne
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?