Nelson et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Plaintiff: Annette Nelson, Carrie Oliveras, Evette Sepulveda, Joyce Sanders, Louis Perillo, Brian Smoot, Alice Anne Ronzo, Gerald Sherlock, James Williams, Elizabeth Santana, Thomas Shea, Helen Ross, Paul Prevost, Paulette Sherlock, Harry Richardson, Barbara Peras, Mark Richman, Lynn Robinson, Daniel Rowe, Rafael Daudua, Miriam Ortiz, Donna Rainone, Charaya Simmons, Marta Rivera, Michael Rizzo, Clarence Smith, Thomas Ranford, William Sorensen, Robert Fuentes, Mark W. Rapp, Beverly Pearson, Elenor Ross, Rosemary Saporito, Israel Reznick, Annette Reynolds, Miguel Ortiz, Oswald Samson, Ramnarine Ramesar, Rita Smith, Michael Perry, Star Pacitto, Susan Rego, Elena Robledo, Albertha Smith, Louise Perillo, Clarissa Rowe, Michael James O'Donnell, Theresa Pagnotta, Fabian Njoku, Raymond Soldiviero, Deidhra Rowland, Patricia Reynolds, Raisa Reznick, Ahmed Shaheed, Joan Sherwood, Eugenie Rose, Steven Rego, Agnes Onwuanumpke, Vanessa Rambharose, Prince Sills, Richard Nolan, Wendy Rosenthal, Magdalena Nixon, Barbara Scharf, Geraldine Robinson, Joseph Schepisi, Stella Quaglierini, Yadira Ortiz, Nicole Ranford, Iliana Prevost, Jeremy Peterson, Roberta Raymond, Rosemarie Ramdhari, Toni Palmieri, Sharon Richman, Hazel Shannon, Paul Reynolds, Carmen Rengifo, Mary Orbes-Akers, Carol Perry, Michael Ross, Elizabeth Quisgard, Charles Ruppert, Jeanette Sierra, Daniel Santiago, Anthony Sepulveda, Robert Ronzo, Kevin Rosenthal, Julie O'Donnell, Gladys Santana, Louis Railey, Gregory Roeske, Verity Robertson, Winifred Obi, Robert Jr. Price and Ramon Oliveras
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina and Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv12375
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331tt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. Document filed by Brian Smoot, Mark Richman, Yadira Ortiz, Raisa Reznick, Louise Perillo, William Sorensen, Mark W. Rapp, Patricia Reynolds, Mary Orbes-Akers, Michael Rizzo, Charaya Simmons, Hazel Shannon, Winifred Obi, Paul Reynolds, Daniel Rowe, Carrie Oliveras, Jeremy Peterson, Susan Rego, Robert Jr. Price, Joseph Schepisi, Charles Ruppert, Prince Sills, Michael Perry, Iliana Prevost, Ramnarine Ramesar, Marta Rivera, Miguel Ortiz, Carmen Rengifo, Helen Ross(Individually), Miriam Ortiz, Gerald Sherlock, Nicole Ranford, Rita Smith, Steven Rego, Oswald Samson, Verity Robertson(As Administrator of Estate of Joy Robertson, deceased), Elena Robledo, Theresa Pagnotta, Kevin Rosenthal, Harry Richardson, Jeanette Sierra, Richard Nolan, Eugenie Rose, Robert Ronzo, Carol Perry, Louis Railey, Stella Quaglierini, Louis Perillo, Joan Sherwood, Paulette Sherlock, Michael Ross, Anthony Sepulveda, Helen Ross(As Administrator of Estate of David Ross, Deceased), Joyce Sanders, Annette Nelson, Annette Reynolds, Evette Sepulveda, Verity Robertson(Individually), Elizabeth Quisgard, Donna Rainone, Rosemarie Ramdhari, Elenor Ross, Agnes Onwuanumpke, Ahmed Shaheed, Clarence Smith, Barbara Scharf, Rosemary Saporito, James Williams, Robert Fuentes, Rafael Daudua, Star Pacitto, Elizabeth Santana, Alice Anne Ronzo, Paul Prevost, Deidhra Rowland, Michael James O'Donnell, Thomas Ranford, Sharon Richman, Gregory Roeske, Barbara Peras, Clarissa Rowe, Wendy Rosenthal, Fabian Njoku, Thomas Shea, Roberta Raymond, Geraldine Robinson, Magdalena Nixon, Israel Reznick, Toni Palmieri(As Executor of the Estate of Maryann Valenti), Albertha Smith, Beverly Pearson, Julie O'Donnell, Vanessa Rambharose, Ramon Oliveras, Raymond Soldiviero, Gladys Santana, Daniel Santiago, Toni Palmieri(Individually), Lynn Robinson.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Stephenie Jay Lannigan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Not all of the filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephenie Jay Lannigan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Stephenie Jay Lannigan. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Annette Nelson. The party was added to the case in error. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephenie Jay Lannigan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Sorenson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL1570. Document filed by Rafael Daudua, Robert Fuentes, Annette Nelson, Magdalena Nixon, Fabian Njoku, Richard Nolan, Julie O'Donnell, Michael James O'Donnell, Winifred Obi, Carrie Oliveras, Ramon Oliveras, Agnes Onwuanumpke, Mary Orbes-Akers, Miguel Ortiz, Miriam Ortiz, Yadira Ortiz, Star Pacitto, Theresa Pagnotta, Toni Palmieri(As Executor of the Estate of Maryann Valenti), Toni Palmieri(Individually), Beverly Pearson, Barbara Peras, Louis Perillo, Louise Perillo, Carol Perry, Michael Perry, Jeremy Peterson, Iliana Prevost, Paul Prevost, Robert Jr. Price, Stella Quaglierini, Elizabeth Quisgard, Louis Railey, Donna Rainone, Vanessa Rambharose, Rosemarie Ramdhari, Ramnarine Ramesar, Nicole Ranford, Thomas Ranford, Mark W. Rapp, Roberta Raymond, Steven Rego, Susan Rego, Carmen Rengifo, Annette Reynolds, Patricia Reynolds, Paul Reynolds, Israel Reznick, Raisa Reznick, Harry Richardson, Mark Richman, Sharon Richman, Marta Rivera, Michael Rizzo, Verity Robertson(As Administrator of Estate of Joy Robertson, deceased), Verity Robertson(Individually), Geraldine Robinson, Lynn Robinson, Elena Robledo, Gregory Roeske, Alice Anne Ronzo, Robert Ronzo, Eugenie Rose, Kevin Rosenthal, Wendy Rosenthal, Elenor Ross, Helen Ross(Individually), Helen Ross(As Administrator of Estate of David Ross, Deceased), Michael Ross, Clarissa Rowe, Daniel Rowe, Deidhra Rowland, Charles Ruppert, Oswald Samson, Joyce Sanders, Elizabeth Santana, Gladys Santana, Daniel Santiago, Rosemary Saporito, Barbara Scharf, Joseph Schepisi, Anthony Sepulveda, Evette Sepulveda, Ahmed Shaheed, Hazel Shannon, Thomas Shea, Gerald Sherlock, Paulette Sherlock, Joan Sherwood, Jeanette Sierra, Prince Sills, Charaya Simmons, Albertha Smith, Clarence Smith, Rita Smith, Brian Smoot, Raymond Soldiviero, William Sorenson, James Williams.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Raymond Soldiviero, Joyce Sanders, Barbara Scharf, Brian Smoot, Elizabeth Santana, Rita Smith, Albertha Smith, Deidhra Rowland, Charaya Simmons, Charles Ruppert, Robert Fuentes, Evette Sepulveda, Anthony Sepulveda, Joseph Schepisi, Ahmed Shaheed, Prince Sills, Daniel Santiago, Paulette Sherlock, Hazel Shannon, Clarence Smith, Joan Sherwood, William Sorenson, Gerald Sherlock, Jeanette Sierra, Thomas Shea, Oswald Samson, Gladys Santana, Rosemary Saporito added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Raymond Soldiviero, Joyce Sanders, Barbara Scharf, Brian Smoot, Elizabeth Santana, Rita Smith, Albertha Smith, Deidhra Rowland, Charaya Simmons, Charles Ruppert, Robert Fuentes, Evette Sepulveda, Anthony Sepulveda, Joseph Schepisi, Ahmed Shaheed, Prince Sills, Daniel Santiago, Paulette Sherlock, Hazel Shannon, Clarence Smith, Joan Sherwood, William Sorenson, Gerald Sherlock, Jeanette Sierra, Thomas Shea, Oswald Samson, Gladys Santana, Rosemary Saporito. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Marta Rivera, Lynn Robinson, Michael Rizzo, Clarissa Rowe, Harry Richardson, Daniel Rowe, Mark Richman, Helen Ross, Gregory Roeske, Elena Robledo, James Williams, Robert Ronzo, Michael Ross, Verity Robertson, Wendy Rosenthal, Alice Anne Ronzo, Elenor Ross, Kevin Rosenthal, Helen Ross, Eugenie Rose, Sharon Richman, Verity Robertson, Geraldine Robinson added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Marta Rivera, Lynn Robinson, Michael Rizzo, Clarissa Rowe, Harry Richardson, Daniel Rowe, Mark Richman, Helen Ross, Gregory Roeske, Elena Robledo, James Williams, Robert Ronzo, Michael Ross, Verity Robertson, Wendy Rosenthal, Alice Anne Ronzo, Elenor Ross, Kevin Rosenthal, Helen Ross, Eugenie Rose, Sharon Richman, Verity Robertson, Geraldine Robinson. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Paul Reynolds, Susan Rego, Louis Railey, Nicole Ranford, Patricia Reynolds, Donna Rainone, Robert Jr. Price, Stella Quaglierini, Annette Reynolds, Raisa Reznick, Carmen Rengifo, Israel Reznick, Roberta Raymond, Vanessa Rambharose, Elizabeth Quisgard, Mark W. Rapp, Thomas Ranford, Steven Rego, Ramnarine Ramesar, Rosemarie Ramdhari added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Paul Reynolds, Susan Rego, Louis Railey, Nicole Ranford, Patricia Reynolds, Donna Rainone, Robert Jr. Price, Stella Quaglierini, Annette Reynolds, Raisa Reznick, Carmen Rengifo, Israel Reznick, Roberta Raymond, Vanessa Rambharose, Elizabeth Quisgard, Mark W. Rapp, Thomas Ranford, Steven Rego, Ramnarine Ramesar, Rosemarie Ramdhari. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Toni Palmieri, Carol Perry, Beverly Pearson, Paul Prevost, Toni Palmieri, Barbara Peras, Jeremy Peterson, Michael Perry, Star Pacitto, Iliana Prevost, Louise Perillo, Theresa Pagnotta, Louis Perillo added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Toni Palmieri, Carol Perry, Beverly Pearson, Paul Prevost, Toni Palmieri, Barbara Peras, Jeremy Peterson, Michael Perry, Star Pacitto, Iliana Prevost, Louise Perillo, Theresa Pagnotta, Louis Perillo. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Miriam Ortiz, Richard Nolan, Rafael Daudua, Carrie Oliveras, Winifred Obi, Miguel Ortiz, Fabian Njoku, Michael James O'Donnell, Mary Orbes-Akers, Agnes Onwuanumpke, Annette Nelson, Yadira Ortiz, Ramon Oliveras, Magdalena Nixon, Julie O'Donnell added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Miriam Ortiz, Richard Nolan, Rafael Daudua, Carrie Oliveras, Winifred Obi, Miguel Ortiz, Fabian Njoku, Michael James O'Donnell, Mary Orbes-Akers, Agnes Onwuanumpke, Annette Nelson, Yadira Ortiz, Ramon Oliveras, Magdalena Nixon, Julie O'Donnell. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16120676)Document filed by Annette Nelson.(Lannigan, Stephenie) Modified on 1/2/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Nelson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Oliveras
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evette Sepulveda
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Sanders
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Perillo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Smoot
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Anne Ronzo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Sherlock
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Williams
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Santana
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Shea
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Ross
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Prevost
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Sherlock
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Richardson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Peras
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Richman
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Robinson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rowe
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Daudua
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Ortiz
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Rainone
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charaya Simmons
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Rivera
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rizzo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Smith
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ranford
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sorensen
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fuentes
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W. Rapp
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Pearson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elenor Ross
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Saporito
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Reznick
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Reynolds
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Ortiz
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oswald Samson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramnarine Ramesar
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Smith
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Perry
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Star Pacitto
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Rego
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Robledo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertha Smith
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Perillo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa Rowe
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James O'Donnell
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Pagnotta
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Njoku
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Soldiviero
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidhra Rowland
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Reynolds
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raisa Reznick
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Shaheed
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Sherwood
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenie Rose
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rego
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Onwuanumpke
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Rambharose
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Sills
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nolan
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Rosenthal
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Nixon
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Scharf
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Robinson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Schepisi
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Quaglierini
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Ortiz
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ranford
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iliana Prevost
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Peterson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Raymond
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Ramdhari
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Palmieri
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Richman
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Shannon
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Reynolds
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Rengifo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Orbes-Akers
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Perry
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ross
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Quisgard
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ruppert
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Sierra
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Santiago
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sepulveda
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ronzo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Rosenthal
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie O'Donnell
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Santana
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Railey
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Roeske
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verity Robertson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winifred Obi
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jr. Price
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Oliveras
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?