DiGiovanni et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Plaintiff: Louis DiGiovanni, Rosa M Ferrer, Denise Guidice, Daphne Francis, Anthony C. Huggins, Mort Heisler, Caroline Gallo, Catherine Hinphy, Karen Jeffrey, Dorrance Henderson, Catherine Held, Adnan Hageko, Judy Fezza, Norberto Feliciano, Neil A Frank, Marie Disogra, Laura Guinan, Dennis Grogan, Judith Hertz, Arwilda Jackson, Anna Hernandez, Felix Jr. Hernandez, Carlos Figueroa, June Gordon, Andre Facey, Anthony Espinal, Ruby Fuller, Melissa Farmer, Barbara Francis, Lloyd King, Jean Dormarunno, Salwa Farag, James Doktor, Glendora Henry, Cindy DiGiovanni, Donald Fuller, Sophia Facey, Hyman Grossman, Joseph Durante, Dorothy Ingram, Concepcion Y Inguano, Dominick Gallo, Henry Hayes, Dorrin Ferguson, Lawrence Howard, Roberto Fox, Eddie E Pozo, Kinaz Alhalabialidelbi, Joanne Falvey, Michael Jedrezyk, Elsie Gonzalez, Thomas J Elsasser, Priscilla Harris, Thomas Hall, James Ingram, Angelo Giardino, Donna Harrington, Armando R Henry, Kathyann Kowalski, Michael Johnson, Mary Hall, Noel Joseph, William Hirsch, Sylvia Everett, Joseph Everett, Sybil Johnson, Anita Grayson, Lucia Eugenio, Gurda Edwards, Matthew Jr. Kaider, Amelia Hendricks, Richard K Korzenko, Aurea Hernandez, Arline Grossman, Marcia Hirsch, Purcell Gibbs, Carol Heisler, Evelyn Feliciano, Anthony Grogan, Brian Hinphy, Linda Griffin, Maria Furtado, Colleen Geiger, Steven Kinzelberg, Ethel Gamble, Doreen Ditoro, Kevin Geiger, Joyce Harrison, Jacqueline Elsasser, Luis Franceschi, Thomas Kelly, Carrie Erskine-Hargrove, James Graves, Melanie Engel, Joseph Gionet and Miriam Giardino
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Case Number: 1:2018cv12376
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331tt
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Stephenie Jay Lannigan to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;Add party Jan Kwartowitz. Due to omitted party not all of the filers were selected for the pleading; Jan Kwartowitz. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03 MDL 1570. Document filed by Kinaz Alhalabialidelbi, Cindy DiGiovanni, Louis DiGiovanni, Marie Disogra, Doreen Ditoro(As Administrator of the Estate of Michael Ditoro, deceased), Doreen Ditoro, James Doktor, Jean Dormarunno, Joseph Durante, Gurda Edwards, Jacqueline Elsasser, Thomas J Elsasser, Melanie Engel, Carrie Erskine-Hargrove(As Administrator of the Estate of Rolando F. Erskine, deceased), Carrie Erskine-Hargrove(Individually), Anthony Espinal, Lucia Eugenio, Joseph Everett, Sylvia Everett, Andre Facey, Sophia Facey, Joanne Falvey, Salwa Farag, Melissa Farmer, Evelyn Feliciano, Norberto Feliciano, Dorrin Ferguson, Rosa M Ferrer, Judy Fezza, Carlos Figueroa, Roberto Fox, Luis Franceschi, Barbara Francis, Daphne Francis, Neil A Frank, Donald Fuller, Ruby Fuller, Maria Furtado, Caroline Gallo, Dominick Gallo, Ethel Gamble, Colleen Geiger, Kevin Geiger, Angelo Giardino, Miriam Giardino, Purcell Gibbs, Joseph Gionet, Elsie Gonzalez, June Gordon(Individually), June Gordon(As Administrator of the Estate of Arthur Fenty), James Graves, Anita Grayson, Linda Griffin, Anthony Grogan, Dennis Grogan, Arline Grossman, Hyman Grossman, Denise Guidice, Laura Guinan, Adnan Hageko, Mary Hall, Thomas Hall, Donna Harrington(Individually), Donna Harrington(As Administrator of the Estate of Alan Harrington, deceased), Priscilla Harris, Joyce Harrison, Henry Hayes, Carol Heisler, Mort Heisler, Catherine Held, Dorrance Henderson, Amelia Hendricks, Armando R Henry, Glendora Henry, Anna Hernandez, Aurea Hernandez, Felix Jr. Hernandez, Judith Hertz, Brian Hinphy, Catherine Hinphy, Marcia Hirsch, William Hirsch, Lawrence Howard, Anthony C. Huggins, Dorothy Ingram, James Ingram, Concepcion Y Inguano, Arwilda Jackson, Michael Jedrezyk, Karen Jeffrey, Michael Johnson, Sybil Johnson, Noel Joseph, Matthew Jr. Kaider, Thomas Kelly, Lloyd King, Steven Kinzelberg, Richard K Korzenko, Kathyann Kowalski, Eddie E Pozo.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Richard K Korzenko, Aurea Hernandez, Catherine Hinphy, Steven Kinzelberg, Felix Jr. Hernandez, Lloyd King, Matthew Jr. Kaider, Amelia Hendricks, Noel Joseph, Armando R Henry, Karen Jeffrey, Lawrence Howard, William Hirsch, Marcia Hirsch, Anthony C. Huggins, Sybil Johnson, Judith Hertz, Arwilda Jackson, James Ingram, Thomas Kelly, Michael Jedrezyk, Kathyann Kowalski, Concepcion Y Inguano, Michael Johnson, Dorothy Ingram, Glendora Henry, Anna Hernandez, Brian Hinphy added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Richard K Korzenko, Aurea Hernandez, Catherine Hinphy, Steven Kinzelberg, Felix Jr. Hernandez, Lloyd King, Matthew Jr. Kaider, Amelia Hendricks, Noel Joseph, Armando R Henry, Karen Jeffrey, Lawrence Howard, William Hirsch, Marcia Hirsch, Anthony C. Huggins, Sybil Johnson, Judith Hertz, Arwilda Jackson, James Ingram, Thomas Kelly, Michael Jedrezyk, Kathyann Kowalski, Concepcion Y Inguano, Michael Johnson, Dorothy Ingram, Glendora Henry, Anna Hernandez, Brian Hinphy. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Joyce Harrison, Dorrance Henderson, Henry Hayes, Donna Harrington, Donna Harrington, Carol Heisler, Priscilla Harris, Mort Heisler, Catherine Held added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Joyce Harrison, Dorrance Henderson, Henry Hayes, Donna Harrington, Donna Harrington, Carol Heisler, Priscilla Harris, Mort Heisler, Catherine Held. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Purcell Gibbs, James Graves, Joseph Gionet, Colleen Geiger, Angelo Giardino, Kinaz Alhalabialidelbi, Anthony Grogan, Linda Griffin, Anita Grayson, Dennis Grogan, Mary Hall, June Gordon, Laura Guinan, Hyman Grossman, Adnan Hageko, Denise Guidice, Thomas Hall, Arline Grossman, Miriam Giardino, Elsie Gonzalez, June Gordon added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Purcell Gibbs, James Graves, Joseph Gionet, Colleen Geiger, Angelo Giardino, Kinaz Alhalabialidelbi, Anthony Grogan, Linda Griffin, Anita Grayson, Dennis Grogan, Mary Hall, June Gordon, Laura Guinan, Hyman Grossman, Adnan Hageko, Denise Guidice, Thomas Hall, Arline Grossman, Miriam Giardino, Elsie Gonzalez, June Gordon. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Neil A Frank, Luis Franceschi, Kevin Geiger, Salwa Farag, Rosa M Ferrer, Ruby Fuller, Melissa Farmer, Ethel Gamble, Andre Facey, Caroline Gallo, Sophia Facey, Daphne Francis, Maria Furtado, Barbara Francis, Donald Fuller, Carlos Figueroa, Norberto Feliciano, Joanne Falvey, Judy Fezza, Eddie E Pozo, Roberto Fox, Dominick Gallo, Dorrin Ferguson, Evelyn Feliciano added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Neil A Frank, Luis Franceschi, Kevin Geiger, Salwa Farag, Rosa M Ferrer, Ruby Fuller, Melissa Farmer, Ethel Gamble, Andre Facey, Caroline Gallo, Sophia Facey, Daphne Francis, Maria Furtado, Barbara Francis, Donald Fuller, Carlos Figueroa, Norberto Feliciano, Joanne Falvey, Judy Fezza, Eddie E Pozo, Roberto Fox, Dominick Gallo, Dorrin Ferguson, Evelyn Feliciano. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
January 2, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Sylvia Everett, Anthony Espinal, Doreen Ditoro, Lucia Eugenio, Jacqueline Elsasser, James Doktor, Carrie Erskine-Hargrove, Doreen Ditoro, Jean Dormarunno, Melanie Engel, Thomas J Elsasser, Cindy DiGiovanni, Carrie Erskine-Hargrove, Gurda Edwards, Marie Disogra, Joseph Durante, Joseph Everett added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Sylvia Everett, Anthony Espinal, Doreen Ditoro, Lucia Eugenio, Jacqueline Elsasser, James Doktor, Carrie Erskine-Hargrove, Doreen Ditoro, Jean Dormarunno, Melanie Engel, Thomas J Elsasser, Cindy DiGiovanni, Carrie Erskine-Hargrove, Gurda Edwards, Marie Disogra, Joseph Durante, Joseph Everett. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lannigan, Stephenie)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16120694)Document filed by Louis DiGiovanni.(Lannigan, Stephenie) Modified on 1/4/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiGiovanni et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis DiGiovanni
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa M Ferrer
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Guidice
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Francis
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony C. Huggins
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mort Heisler
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Gallo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Hinphy
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Jeffrey
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorrance Henderson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Held
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adnan Hageko
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Fezza
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norberto Feliciano
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil A Frank
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Disogra
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Guinan
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Grogan
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Hertz
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arwilda Jackson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Hernandez
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Jr. Hernandez
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Figueroa
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Gordon
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Facey
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Espinal
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Fuller
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Farmer
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Francis
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd King
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Dormarunno
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salwa Farag
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Doktor
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glendora Henry
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy DiGiovanni
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Fuller
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Facey
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyman Grossman
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Durante
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Ingram
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concepcion Y Inguano
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Gallo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Hayes
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorrin Ferguson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Howard
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Fox
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie E Pozo
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinaz Alhalabialidelbi
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Falvey
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jedrezyk
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Gonzalez
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J Elsasser
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Harris
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hall
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ingram
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Giardino
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Harrington
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando R Henry
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathyann Kowalski
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hall
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Joseph
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hirsch
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Everett
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Everett
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sybil Johnson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Grayson
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Eugenio
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurda Edwards
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jr. Kaider
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Hendricks
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard K Korzenko
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurea Hernandez
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arline Grossman
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Hirsch
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purcell Gibbs
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Heisler
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Feliciano
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Grogan
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hinphy
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Griffin
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Furtado
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Geiger
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kinzelberg
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Gamble
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Ditoro
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Geiger
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Harrison
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Elsasser
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Franceschi
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kelly
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Erskine-Hargrove
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Graves
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Engel
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gionet
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Giardino
Represented By: Stephenie Jay Lannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?