Zelmanowitz et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Trevor S. Rescorla, Terence Owens, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Tyler W. Graf, Jessica K. Kostaris, Daryl Gabriel, Debra Zeplin, Susan G. Rescorla, Damon McMahon, Ryan Harris Zeplin, Thomas F. Owens, John Muldowney, John Owens, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Timothy Soulas, Jr., Katherine Soulas, Kevin Owens, Jack Zelmanowitz, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Aaron Straub, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Christopher Soulas, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Kimberly J. Rescorla, Constance Muldowney, Matthew Soulas, Richard Gary, Wesley J. Graf, BNY Mellon, Andrew McMahon, Gonzalo Morales, Andrew Soulas, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Ethan Gabriel Zeplin and Kristen C Graf
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv12381
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Daryl Gabriel, Richard Gary, Kristen C Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Wesley J. Graf, Jessica K. Kostaris, Andrew McMahon, Damon McMahon, BNY Mellon, Gonzalo Morales, Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), John Muldowney, Constance Muldowney (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), John Owens, Kevin Owens, Terence Owens, Thomas F. Owens, Kimberly J. Rescorla, Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Trevor S. Rescorla, Andrew Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), Matthew Soulas, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Aaron Straub, Jack Zelmanowitz(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abraham Zelmanowitz, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abraham Zelmanowitz), Jack Zelmanowitz(individually, as surviving sibling of Abraham Zelmanowitz), Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez, Debra Zeplin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Marc Scott Zeplin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Marc Scott Zeplin), Debra Zeplin(individually, as surviving spouse of Marc Scott Zeplin), Ethan Gabriel Zeplin, Ryan Harris Zeplin. (Strong, Bruce)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 4/3/2019. Document filed by Ethan Gabriel Zeplin; Debra Zeplin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Marc Scott Zeplin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Marc Scott Zeplin); Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl; Kevin Owens; Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney); Andrew McMahon; Jack Zelmanowitz(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abraham Zelmanowitz, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abraham Zelmanowitz); Jack Zelmanowitz(individually, as surviving sibling of Abraham Zelmanowitz); Daryl Gabriel; Trevor S. Rescorla; Kimberly J. Rescorla; Aaron Straub; Richard Gary; Wesley J. Graf; Christopher Soulas; Thomas F. Owens; Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas); Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl; Damon McMahon; Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas); Ryan Harris Zeplin; Constance Muldowney (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney); Matthew Soulas; Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl; Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla); Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney); BNY Mellon; Kristen C Graf; Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl; Timothy Soulas, Jr; Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl; Gonzalo Morales; Andrew Soulas; Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl; John Muldowney; Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas); Debra Zeplin(individually, as surviving spouse of Marc Scott Zeplin); John Owens; Tyler W. Graf; Jessica K. Kostaris; Terence Owens; Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez; Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla). (Goldman, Jerry)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (vf)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (vf)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570. Document filed by Daryl Gabriel, Richard Gary, Kristen C Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Wesley J. Graf, Jessica K. Kostaris, Andrew McMahon, Damon McMahon, BNY Mellon, Gonzalo Morales, Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), John Muldowney, Constance Muldowney (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), John Owens, Kevin Owens, Terence Owens, Thomas F. Owens, Kimberly J. Rescorla, Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Trevor S. Rescorla, Andrew Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), Matthew Soulas, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Aaron Straub, Jack Zelmanowitz(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abraham Zelmanowitz, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abraham Zelmanowitz), Jack Zelmanowitz(individually, as surviving sibling of Abraham Zelmanowitz), Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez, Debra Zeplin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Marc Scott Zeplin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Marc Scott Zeplin), Debra Zeplin(individually, as surviving spouse of Marc Scott Zeplin), Ethan Gabriel Zeplin, Ryan Harris Zeplin.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Daryl Gabriel, Richard Gary, Kristen C Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Wesley J. Graf, Jessica K. Kostaris, Andrew McMahon, Damon McMahon, BNY Mellon, Gonzalo Morales, Constance Muldowney(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard Muldowney), Constance Muldowney(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Muldowney, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard Muldowney), John Muldowney, Constance Muldowney (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Muldowney, deceased, the late child of Richard Muldowney), John Owens, Kevin Owens, Terence Owens, Thomas F. Owens, Kimberly J. Rescorla, Susan G. Rescorla(individually, as surviving spouse of Richard C. Rescorla), Susan G. Rescorla(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard C. Rescorla, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Richard C. Rescorla), Trevor S. Rescorla, Andrew Soulas, Christopher Soulas, Katherine Soulas(as Natural Guardian of DRS, a minor, as surviving child of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Soulas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Soulas), Katherine Soulas(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Soulas), Matthew Soulas, Timothy Soulas, Jr, Aaron Straub, Jack Zelmanowitz(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abraham Zelmanowitz, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abraham Zelmanowitz), Jack Zelmanowitz(individually, as surviving sibling of Abraham Zelmanowitz), Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez, Debra Zeplin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Marc Scott Zeplin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Marc Scott Zeplin), Debra Zeplin(individually, as surviving spouse of Marc Scott Zeplin), Ethan Gabriel Zeplin, Ryan Harris Zeplin. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldman, Jerry)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16120879)Document filed by Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl, Jack Zelmanowitz(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Abraham Zelmanowitz, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Abraham Zelmanowitz), Jack Zelmanowitz(individually, as surviving sibling of Abraham Zelmanowitz), Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl, Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl, BNY Mellon, Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl, Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl, Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl, Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez, Constance Muldowney, Katherine Soulas, Constance Muldowney, Christopher Soulas, Trevor S. Rescorla, Ethan Gabriel Zeplin, Katherine Soulas, Kristen C Graf, Andrew Soulas, Thomas F. Owens, Ryan Harris Zeplin, Kimberly J. Rescorla, Matthew Soulas, Katherine Soulas, Susan G. Rescorla, Gonzalo Morales, Susan G. Rescorla, Debra Zeplin, Timothy Soulas, Jr, John Muldowney, Terence Owens, Constance Muldowney, John Owens, Andrew McMahon, Debra Zeplin, Daryl Gabriel, Wesley J. Graf, Tyler W. Graf, Damon McMahon, Kevin Owens, Aaron Straub, Richard Gary, Jessica K. Kostaris, Kingdom of Saudi Arabia.(Goldman, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zelmanowitz et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor S. Rescorla
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Owens
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eusebio Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler W. Graf
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica K. Kostaris
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Gabriel
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Zeplin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan G. Rescorla
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon McMahon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Harris Zeplin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas F. Owens
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Muldowney
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Owens
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Soulas, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Soulas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Owens
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Zelmanowitz
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfino Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Straub
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Soulas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria P.M. Zempoaltecatl Cortez
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glafira Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly J. Rescorla
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Muldowney
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Soulas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gary
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley J. Graf
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNY Mellon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew McMahon
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Morales
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Soulas
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Morales Zempoaltecatl
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Gabriel Zeplin
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen C Graf
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?