Agro et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Adam Blacharski, Jeanette L. Barnard Langford, Mattie Strother, Leslie Vissers, Jane Waite, Jerry Arma, John Sullivan, Alan Vitellaro, Theresa Archili, Jose Torres, Wanda Tanks, Elizabeth Trencheny, Kathleen Bruzza, De'Von Lighty, Anna Velez, Galina Topaller, Linda Storace, Camille Agro, Deborah J Watkins, Lenore Westberry, Wendy Tarantino, Karolyn Long-Colena, Adam Blacharsk, Karolyn Barrett, Robert Zanowski, Ana Bassi, Michael Weinstein, Elaine D. Bayes, Dorrette Winslow, Barbara Tucker, Kathleen Sztropkalyi, Dawn Carluzzo, Jean M. Hartmann, Melissa Vassell, David Yanovsky, Santiago Bermudez, Sandra Cooper, Lorraine Van Baulen, Angel Cordaro, Lorenzina Corso, Maureen Conmy, Leonard Wong, Robert Tucker, Karleek Sutton, Anna Antico, Delphine Thompson, Miriam Tropp, Elizabeth Alicea, Donna Wash, Bryan Trotman and Barbara Tesi
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv12402
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (vf)
January 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (vf)
January 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Sandra Cooper, Camille Agro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Camille Agro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Surviving Spouse of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nick Antico, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Surviving Spouse of Nick Antico, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vildo Archili, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Surviving Spouse of Vildo Archili, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Surviving Spouse of Julia Arma, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julia Arma, Deceased), Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Barnard, Deceased), Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Surviving Spouse of James Barnard, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Surviving Spouse of David Barrett, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Personal Representative of the Estate of David Barrett, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Surviving Spouse of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Surviving Spouse of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Surviving Parent of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Adam Blacharsk, Adam Blacharski, Kathleen Bruzza(as Surviving Spouse of James Bruzza, Deceased), Kathleen Bruzza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bruzza, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Surviving Spouse of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Conmy, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Surviving Spouse of John Conmy, Deceased), Sandra Cooper, Angel Cordaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Angel Cordaro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Lorenzina Corso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Umberto Corso, Deceased), Lorenzina Corso(as Surviving Spouse of Umberto Corso, Deceased), Jean M. Hartmann, Jean M. Hartmann, De'Von Lighty(as Surviving Son of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), De'Von Lighty(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Surviving Spouse of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Linda Storace(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Storace, Deceased), Linda Storace(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Storace, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Surviving Parent of Quentin Strother, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Quentin Strother, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Personal Representative Of the Estate of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Surviving Brother of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Surviving Spouse of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Surviving Child of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Surviving Spouse of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Surviving Sister of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Surviving Spouse of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edith Torres, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Surviving Parent of Edith Torres, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Tropp, Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Surviving Son of James Tropp, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Surviving Spouse of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Barbara Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Barbara Tucker(as Surviving Parent of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Surviving Spouse of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Surviving Spouse of Dennis Van Baulen, Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis Van Baulen Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Surviving Child of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Surviving Spouse of Louis Velez, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Velez, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Surviving Brother of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Surviving Spouse of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Jane Waite(as Surviving Spouse of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Jane Waite(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Surviving Spouse of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Deborah J Watkins, Deborah J Watkins, Michael Weinstein(as Surviving Son of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Michael Weinstein(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as the Surviving Parent of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Dorrette Winslow(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Dorrette Winslow(as Surviving Spouse of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Wong, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Surviving Child of Mary Wong, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Surviving Grandson of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), Robert Zanowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased), Robert Zanowski(as Surviving Child of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased). (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Aoife-Roisin Bourke dated 12/31/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-MDL-1570 Action. Document filed by Sandra Cooper, Camille Agro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Camille Agro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Surviving Spouse of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nick Antico, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Surviving Spouse of Nick Antico, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vildo Archili, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Surviving Spouse of Vildo Archili, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Surviving Spouse of Julia Arma, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julia Arma, Deceased), Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Barnard, Deceased), Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Surviving Spouse of James Barnard, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Surviving Spouse of David Barrett, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Personal Representative of the Estate of David Barrett, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Surviving Spouse of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Surviving Spouse of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Surviving Parent of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Adam Blacharsk, Adam Blacharski, Kathleen Bruzza(as Surviving Spouse of James Bruzza, Deceased), Kathleen Bruzza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bruzza, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Surviving Spouse of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Conmy, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Surviving Spouse of John Conmy, Deceased), Sandra Cooper, Angel Cordaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Angel Cordaro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Lorenzina Corso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Umberto Corso, Deceased), Lorenzina Corso(as Surviving Spouse of Umberto Corso, Deceased), Jean M. Hartmann, Jean M. Hartmann, De'Von Lighty(as Surviving Son of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), De'Von Lighty(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Surviving Spouse of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Linda Storace(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Storace, Deceased), Linda Storace(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Storace, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Surviving Parent of Quentin Strother, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Quentin Strother, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Personal Representative Of the Estate of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Surviving Brother of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Surviving Spouse of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Surviving Child of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Surviving Spouse of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Surviving Sister of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Surviving Spouse of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edith Torres, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Surviving Parent of Edith Torres, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Tropp, Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Surviving Son of James Tropp, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Surviving Spouse of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Barbara Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Barbara Tucker(as Surviving Parent of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Surviving Spouse of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Surviving Spouse of Dennis Van Baulen, Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis Van Baulen Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Surviving Child of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Surviving Spouse of Louis Velez, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Velez, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Surviving Brother of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Surviving Spouse of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Jane Waite(as Surviving Spouse of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Jane Waite(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Surviving Spouse of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Deborah J Watkins, Deborah J Watkins, Michael Weinstein(as Surviving Son of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Michael Weinstein(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as the Surviving Parent of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Dorrette Winslow(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Dorrette Winslow(as Surviving Spouse of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Wong, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Surviving Child of Mary Wong, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Surviving Grandson of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), Robert Zanowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased), Robert Zanowski(as Surviving Child of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased).(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke dated 12/31/2018 re: Request for Inclusion in 03-MDL-1570 Action. Document filed by Sandra Cooper, Camille Agro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Camille Agro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Surviving Spouse of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nick Antico, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Surviving Spouse of Nick Antico, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vildo Archili, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Surviving Spouse of Vildo Archili, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Surviving Spouse of Julia Arma, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julia Arma, Deceased), Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Barnard, Deceased), Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Surviving Spouse of James Barnard, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Surviving Spouse of David Barrett, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Personal Representative of the Estate of David Barrett, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Surviving Spouse of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Surviving Spouse of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Surviving Parent of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Adam Blacharsk, Adam Blacharski, Kathleen Bruzza(as Surviving Spouse of James Bruzza, Deceased), Kathleen Bruzza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bruzza, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Surviving Spouse of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Conmy, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Surviving Spouse of John Conmy, Deceased), Sandra Cooper, Angel Cordaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Angel Cordaro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Lorenzina Corso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Umberto Corso, Deceased), Lorenzina Corso(as Surviving Spouse of Umberto Corso, Deceased), Jean M. Hartmann, Jean M. Hartmann, De'Von Lighty(as Surviving Son of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), De'Von Lighty(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Surviving Spouse of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Linda Storace(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Storace, Deceased), Linda Storace(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Storace, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Surviving Parent of Quentin Strother, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Quentin Strother, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Personal Representative Of the Estate of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Surviving Brother of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Surviving Spouse of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Surviving Child of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Surviving Spouse of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Surviving Sister of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Surviving Spouse of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edith Torres, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Surviving Parent of Edith Torres, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Tropp, Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Surviving Son of James Tropp, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Surviving Spouse of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Barbara Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Barbara Tucker(as Surviving Parent of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Surviving Spouse of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Surviving Spouse of Dennis Van Baulen, Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis Van Baulen Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Surviving Child of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Surviving Spouse of Louis Velez, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Velez, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Surviving Brother of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Surviving Spouse of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Jane Waite(as Surviving Spouse of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Jane Waite(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Surviving Spouse of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Deborah J Watkins, Deborah J Watkins, Michael Weinstein(as Surviving Son of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Michael Weinstein(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as the Surviving Parent of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Dorrette Winslow(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Dorrette Winslow(as Surviving Spouse of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Wong, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Surviving Child of Mary Wong, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Surviving Grandson of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), Robert Zanowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased), Robert Zanowski(as Surviving Child of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased).(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Sandra Cooper, Camille Agro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Camille Agro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Surviving Spouse of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nick Antico, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Surviving Spouse of Nick Antico, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vildo Archili, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Surviving Spouse of Vildo Archili, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Surviving Spouse of Julia Arma, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julia Arma, Deceased), Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Barnard, Deceased), Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Surviving Spouse of James Barnard, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Surviving Spouse of David Barrett, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Personal Representative of the Estate of David Barrett, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Surviving Spouse of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Surviving Spouse of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Surviving Parent of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Adam Blacharsk, Adam Blacharski, Kathleen Bruzza(as Surviving Spouse of James Bruzza, Deceased), Kathleen Bruzza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bruzza, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Surviving Spouse of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Conmy, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Surviving Spouse of John Conmy, Deceased), Sandra Cooper, Angel Cordaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Angel Cordaro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Lorenzina Corso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Umberto Corso, Deceased), Lorenzina Corso(as Surviving Spouse of Umberto Corso, Deceased), Jean M. Hartmann, Jean M. Hartmann, De'Von Lighty(as Surviving Son of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), De'Von Lighty(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Surviving Spouse of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Linda Storace(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Storace, Deceased), Linda Storace(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Storace, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Surviving Parent of Quentin Strother, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Quentin Strother, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Personal Representative Of the Estate of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Surviving Brother of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Surviving Spouse of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Surviving Child of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Surviving Spouse of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Surviving Sister of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Surviving Spouse of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edith Torres, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Surviving Parent of Edith Torres, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Tropp, Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Surviving Son of James Tropp, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Surviving Spouse of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Barbara Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Barbara Tucker(as Surviving Parent of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Surviving Spouse of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Surviving Spouse of Dennis Van Baulen, Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis Van Baulen Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Surviving Child of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Surviving Spouse of Louis Velez, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Velez, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Surviving Brother of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Surviving Spouse of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Jane Waite(as Surviving Spouse of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Jane Waite(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Surviving Spouse of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Deborah J Watkins, Deborah J Watkins, Michael Weinstein(as Surviving Son of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Michael Weinstein(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as the Surviving Parent of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Dorrette Winslow(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Dorrette Winslow(as Surviving Spouse of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Wong, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Surviving Child of Mary Wong, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Surviving Grandson of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), Robert Zanowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased), Robert Zanowski(as Surviving Child of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased).(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16121552)Document filed by Lorenzina Corso(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Umberto Corso, Deceased), Angel Cordaro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Michael Weinstein(as Surviving Son of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), Adam Blacharsk, Barbara Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vildo Archili, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Surviving Brother of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Surviving Spouse of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Robert Zanowski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Surviving Spouse of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Barbara Tucker(as Surviving Parent of Mitchel Tucker, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Surviving Spouse of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Surviving Parent of Quentin Strother, Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Jane Waite(as Surviving Spouse of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Surviving Spouse of Dennis Van Baulen, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Personal Representative of the Estate of John Conmy, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Wong, Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edith Torres, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Surviving Parent of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as the Surviving Parent of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Michael Weinstein(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Morris Weinstein, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Surviving Spouse of Julia Arma, Deceased), Angel Cordaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Cordaro, Deceased), Jean M. Hartmann, Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Barnard, Deceased), Lenore Westberry(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Laticia Westberry, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Surviving Spouse of Louis Velez, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Surviving Spouse of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Deborah J Watkins, Dorrette Winslow(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Anna Velez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Velez, Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Tropp, Deceased), Sandra Cooper, Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Elizabeth Trencheny(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Trencheny, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), Delphine Thompson(as Surviving Sister of Brenda Lee Thompson, Deceased), Linda Storace(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Storace, Deceased), Jeanette L. Barnard Langford(as Surviving Spouse of James Barnard, Deceased), Ana Bassi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Bassi, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Surviving Child of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Surviving Spouse of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Barbara Tesi(as Surviving Spouse of Michael Tesi Jr., Deceased), Lorraine Van Baulen(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis Van Baulen Deceased), Miriam Tropp(as Surviving Son of James Tropp, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Personal Representative Of the Estate of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Surviving Spouse of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Surviving Child of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Santiago Bermudez(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Santy Bermudez, Deceased), Jose Torres(as Surviving Parent of Edith Torres, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Surviving Spouse of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Surviving Spouse of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Bryan Trotman(as Surviving Spouse of Rosamund Trotman, Deceased), Camille Agro(as Surviving Spouse of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Elaine D. Bayes(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Bayes, Deceased), Camille Agro(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Agro, Deceased), Deborah J Watkins, Sandra Cooper, Robert Zanowski(as Surviving Child of Raymond Zanowski, Deceased), Alan Vitellaro(as Surviving Spouse of Linette Vitellaro, Deceased), Dawn Carluzzo(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosario Carluzzo, Deceased), Maureen Conmy(as Surviving Spouse of John Conmy, Deceased), Jane Waite(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Curtis Waite, Deceased), Melissa Vassell(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Olive Allwood, Deceased), Karolyn Long-Colena(as Surviving Spouse of Kevin Colena, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Surviving Spouse of David Barrett, Deceased), Robert Tucker(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Tucker, Deceased), Galina Topaller(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Victor Topaller, Deceased), Kathleen Sztropkalyi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Sztropkalyi, Deceased), Kathleen Bruzza(as Surviving Spouse of James Bruzza, Deceased), Wendy Tarantino(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas Tarantino, Deceased), Leslie Vissers(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Vissers, Deceased), Adam Blacharski, Linda Storace(as Surviving Spouse of Joseph Storace, Deceased), John Sullivan(as Surviving Brother of Bernadette Sullivan, Deceased), Kathleen Bruzza(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Bruzza, Deceased), Karolyn Barrett(as Personal Representative of the Estate of David Barrett, Deceased), Leonard Wong(as Surviving Child of Mary Wong, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Surviving Spouse of Nick Antico, Deceased), Donna Wash(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Wash, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Jean M. Hartmann, Dorrette Winslow(as Surviving Spouse of Charles Preston Winslow, Deceased), Jerry Arma(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Julia Arma, Deceased), Wanda Tanks(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Tanks, Deceased), Karleek Sutton(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Koquita Sutton, Deceased), Theresa Archili(as Surviving Spouse of Vildo Archili, Deceased), De'Von Lighty(as Surviving Son of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), David Yanovsky(as Surviving Grandson of Sofya Kucherovsky, Deceased), Elizabeth Alicea(as Surviving Spouse of Luice Alicea, Deceased), Lorenzina Corso(as Surviving Spouse of Umberto Corso, Deceased), De'Von Lighty(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Brothers, Deceased), Mattie Strother(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Quentin Strother, Deceased), Anna Antico(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nick Antico, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix 1)(Bourke, Aoife-Roisin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agro et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Blacharski
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette L. Barnard Langford
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Strother
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Vissers
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Waite
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Arma
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sullivan
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Vitellaro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Archili
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Torres
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Tanks
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Trencheny
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Bruzza
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Von Lighty
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Velez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galina Topaller
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Storace
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Agro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah J Watkins
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenore Westberry
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Tarantino
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karolyn Long-Colena
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Blacharsk
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karolyn Barrett
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zanowski
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Bassi
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Weinstein
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine D. Bayes
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorrette Winslow
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Tucker
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Sztropkalyi
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Carluzzo
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean M. Hartmann
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Vassell
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Yanovsky
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Bermudez
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Cooper
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Van Baulen
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Cordaro
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzina Corso
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Conmy
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Wong
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tucker
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karleek Sutton
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Antico
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delphine Thompson
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Tropp
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Alicea
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Wash
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Trotman
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Tesi
Represented By: Aoife-Roisin Nora Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?