Einhorn et al v. NST Invention Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Einhorn and Kelly Einhorn
Defendant: MV STOLT INVENTION, Stolt Tankers B.V. and NST Invention Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00095
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NST Invention Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. Document filed by Douglas Einhorn; Kelly Einhorn. (Shisha, Jacob)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Stolt Tankers B.V. waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. Document filed by Douglas Einhorn; Kelly Einhorn. (Shisha, Jacob)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MV Stolt Invention waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. Document filed by Douglas Einhorn; Kelly Einhorn. (Shisha, Jacob)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 14, 2019 is ADJOURNED to April 3, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. By March 27, 2019, the parties shall file their joint letter and proposed case management plan. Initial Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/11/2019) (cf)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jacob Shisha dated January 11, 2019. Document filed by Douglas Einhorn.(Shisha, Jacob)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shisha, Jacob)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/7/2019) (cf)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 11:20 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/7/2019) (cf)
January 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jacob Shisha. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
January 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jacob Shisha to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc)
January 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacob Shisha. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MV STOLT INVENTION. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shisha, Jacob) Modified on 1/7/2019 (pc).
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MV STOLT INVENTION, NST Invention Inc., Stolt Tankers B.V.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16138879)Document filed by Douglas Einhorn, Kelly Einhorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter of Undertaking)(Shisha, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Einhorn et al v. NST Invention Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV STOLT INVENTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stolt Tankers B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NST Invention Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Einhorn
Represented By: Jacob Shisha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Einhorn
Represented By: Jacob Shisha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?