AIG Property Casualty Company v. Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Defendant: PENTAIR RESIDENTIAL FILTRATION LLC and Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00251
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affirmation of Service by E-Filing served on Pentair Residential Filtration on 3/8/19. Document filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Smith, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., Other Affiliate AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY U.S., INC., Other Affiliate AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY, INC. for AIG Property Casualty Company. Document filed by AIG Property Casualty Company.(Smith, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affirmation of Service by E-Filing served on Pentair Residential Filtration on 3/8/19. Document filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Smith, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Scott Smith on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company. (Smith, David)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. (Gibson, Brian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Brian Keith Gibson dated March 7, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC.(Gibson, Brian)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pre-trial conference is adjourned to March 14, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. All pre-conference materials shall be due one week prior. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/12/2019) Initial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (ks)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Status Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Brian Keith Gibson dated February 11, 2019. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. Return Date set for 2/21/2019 at 02:30 PM.(Gibson, Brian)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC.(Gibson, Brian)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Copy of Court's January 14, 2019 Order and Notice of Initial Conference served on Plaintiff on January 15, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. (Gibson, Brian)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pentair Water Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Pentair Plc, Corporate Parent Pentair Nanosoft U.S. Holding, LLC for Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC.(Gibson, Brian)
January 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Brian Keith Gibson to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/14/2019) (mro)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Pentair Plc for Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC.(Gibson, Brian) Modified on 1/15/2019 (lb).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on AIG Property Casualty Company on January 10, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. (Gibson, Brian)
January 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Keith Gibson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 245 (Tort Product Liability); Dollar Demand $131,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 385 (Prop. Damage Prod. Liability); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
January 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Keith Gibson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PENTAIR RESIDENTIAL FILTRATION LLC, AIG Property Casualty Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gibson, Brian)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 161204-18. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-16165535).Document filed by PENTAIR RESIDENTIAL FILTRATION LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit New York Dept. of Financial Services Information, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Terry R. Vreeke)(Gibson, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG Property Casualty Company v. Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENTAIR RESIDENTIAL FILTRATION LLC
Represented By: Brian Keith Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC
Represented By: Brian Keith Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: David Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?