AIG Property Casualty Company v. Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Defendant: PENTAIR RESIDENTIAL FILTRATION LLC and Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00253
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 15 Notice of Appearance. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (db)
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affirmation of Service by E-Filing served on Pentair Residential Filtration on 3/8/19. Document filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Smith, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., Other Affiliate AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY U.S., INC., Other Affiliate AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY, INC. for AIG Property Casualty Company. Document filed by AIG Property Casualty Company.(Smith, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affirmation of Service by E-Filing served on Pentair Residential Filtration on 3/8/19. Document filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Smith, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Scott Smith on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company. (Smith, David)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. (Gibson, Brian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Brian Keith Gibson dated March 7, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC.(Gibson, Brian)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pre-trial conference is adjourned to March 14, 2010, at 12:00 p.m. All pre-conference materials shall be due one week prior. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/12/2019) Initial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (ks)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Status Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Brian Keith Gibson dated February 11, 2019. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. Return Date set for 2/21/2019 at 02:30 PM.(Gibson, Brian)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Copy of Court's January 25, 2019 Order and Notice of Initial Conference served on Plaintiff on January 25, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. (Gibson, Brian)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on February 21, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by February 14, 2019, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by February 14, 2019, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. Defendant is ordered to serve Plaintiff with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/25/2019) (ama)
January 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
January 25, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-00251-RA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-00251. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC.(Gibson, Brian)
January 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Brian Keith Gibson, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (jc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC.(Gibson, Brian)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pentair Water Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Pentair Plc, Corporate Parent Pentair Nanosoft U.S. Holding, LLC for Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC.(Gibson, Brian)
January 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Brian Keith Gibson to RE-FILE Document #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Pentair Plc for Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC.(Gibson, Brian) Modified on 1/15/2019 (lb).
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on AIG Property Casualty Company on January 10, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC. (Gibson, Brian)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gibson, Brian)
January 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 19cv251. (pc)
January 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
January 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Keith Gibson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 245 (Tort Product Liability); Dollar Demand $126,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 385 (Prop. Damage Prod. Liability); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
January 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brian Keith Gibson to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Second page is missing. (pc)
January 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Keith Gibson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PENTAIR RESIDENTIAL FILTRATION LLC, AIG Property Casualty Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gibson, Brian) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pc).
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 161191-18. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16165916).Document filed by PENTAIR RESIDENTIAL FILTRATION LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit New York Dept. of Financial Services Information, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Terry R. Vreeke)(Gibson, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG Property Casualty Company v. Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENTAIR RESIDENTIAL FILTRATION LLC
Represented By: Brian Keith Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Residential Filtration, LLC
Represented By: Brian Keith Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: David Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?