Brown v. The City of New York et al

Plaintiff: Shareaf Brown
Defendant: District Attorney John Doe, The City of New York, Detective John Doe, Defendants City of New York, Detective John Doe of New York Police Department-Bronx New York and District Attorneys John and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00261
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Received returned mail re: #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case. Mail was addressed to Shareaf Brown, ID No. 237793, Westchester County Jail, 10 Woods Road, Valhalla, NY 10595 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender Attempted - Not Known Unable to Forward, RTS. (vn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Aaron Gutmann on behalf of The City of New York. (Gutmann, Joseph)
February 20, 2019 Mailed a copy of #8 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Shareaf Brown ID No. 237793 Westchester County Jail 10 Woods Road Valhalla, NY 10595. (vba)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/20/2019) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 19, 2019 Mailed a copy of #6 Order of Service, #2 Complaint, to New York City Law Department at: 100 Church Street, New York, NY 10007. (vba)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Shareaf Brown ID No. 237793, at Westchester County Jail 10 Woods Road Valhalla, NY 10595, on 2/15/2019 Re: #6 Order of Service via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (bwa)
February 15, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 2/15/2019 Re: Judge Lorna G. Schofield #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)City of New York. (bwa)
February 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City of New York. (bwa)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. An "Amended Complaint" form is attached to this order. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the address for the City of New York and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to the New York City Law Department at: 100 Church Street, New York, NY 10007. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (As further set forth in this Order.) Waiver of Service due by 3/18/2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/14/2019) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
February 12, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Shareaf Brown ID No. 237793 Westchester County Jail 10 Woods Road Valhalla, NY 10595; The Superintendent Westchester County Jail 10 Woods Road Valhalla, NY 10595. (vba)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/11/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/11/2019) (sac).
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Shareaf Brown.(rdz)
January 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Defendants City of New York, Detective John Doe, Detective John Doe of New York Police Department-Bronx New York, District Attorney John Doe, District Attorneys John and Jane Doe, The City of New York. Document filed by Shareaf Brown.(rdz)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Shareaf Brown.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Joseph Aaron Gutmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective John Doe of New York Police Department-Bronx New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorneys John and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shareaf Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?