Skyrocket LLC v. Cloud Commerce Systems Limited

Plaintiff: Skyrocket LLC
Defendant: Cloud Commerce Systems Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv00284
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by Skyrocket LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. The initial conference in this case is adjourned and rescheduled for April 12, 2019, at 3:45 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 03:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/4/2019) (anc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Dwana S. Dixon dated 2/1/2019 re: Waiver of Service and Deadline to Answer. Document filed by Skyrocket LLC.(Dixon, Dwana)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Skyrocket LLC.(Dixon, Dwana)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/14/2019) (ne)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (sj)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cloud Commerce Systems Limited. (sj)
January 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dwana Shae Dixon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:0044. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1114. (sj)
January 11, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16171512, paid on 1/10/2019. (sj)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cloud Commerce Systems Limited d/b/a Fasttech d/b/a Fasttech.com, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Skyrocket LLC. (Dixon, Dwana)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerry Brenae Brownlee on behalf of Skyrocket LLC. (Brownlee, Kerry)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashly Erin Sands on behalf of Skyrocket LLC. (Sands, Ashly)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason M. Drangel on behalf of Skyrocket LLC. (Drangel, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Dixon, Dwana)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Dixon, Dwana)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dixon, Dwana)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cloud Commerce Systems Limited. Document filed by Skyrocket LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dixon, Dwana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skyrocket LLC v. Cloud Commerce Systems Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyrocket LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Drangel
Represented By: Dwana Shae Dixon
Represented By: Kerry Brenae Brownlee
Represented By: Ashly Erin Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloud Commerce Systems Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?