Sundar v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al.

Plaintiff: Ravi Sundar
Defendant: Greyhound, Inc., Greyhound Lines, Inc. and Greyhound Bus Lines, Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Greyhound Bus Lines
Case Number: 1:2019cv00290
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446mv
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Greyhound Bus Lines, Inc., Greyhound Lines, Inc., Greyhound, Inc.. (Budd, Eileen)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Eileen Budd dated March 6, 2019 re: January 30, 2019 Order. Document filed by Greyhound Bus Lines, Inc., Greyhound Lines, Inc., Greyhound, Inc..(Budd, Eileen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Feinstein on behalf of Ravi Sundar. (Feinstein, Charles)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on March 15, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by March 7, 2019, addressing the following in separate paragraphs. By the date of the IPTC, counsel for all parties are required to register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures of Electronic Case Filing and file a Notice of Appearance. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/30/2019) (ama)
January 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eileen Theresa Budd. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Greyhound Bus Lines, Greyhound, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Greyhound Bus Lines, Greyhound Lines, Inc., Greyhound, Inc..(Budd, Eileen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Budd, Eileen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 30685/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16172893).Document filed by Greyhound Bus Lines, Greyhound, Inc., Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(Budd, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundar v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen Theresa Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen Theresa Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Bus Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen Theresa Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Greyhound Bus Lines
Represented By: Eileen Theresa Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravi Sundar
Represented By: Charles Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?