Roca v. Amplify Media Inc.

Plaintiff: John Roca
Defendant: Amplify Media Inc. and Prometheus Global Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00299
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Bayard on behalf of Prometheus Global Media, LLC. (Bayard, Samuel)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Prometheus Global Media, LLC.(Feder, Eric)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Billboard Media Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Mirror Media IP Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Valence Media Group LLC for Prometheus Global Media, LLC. Document filed by Prometheus Global Media, LLC.(Feder, Eric)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Joel Feder on behalf of Prometheus Global Media, LLC. (Feder, Eric)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prometheus Global Media, LLC. (pc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prometheus Global Media, LLC, re: #8 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by John Roca. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Prometheus Global Media, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Roca. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/10/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/11/2019) (cf)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amplify Media Inc.. (pne)
January 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
January 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Liebowitz, Richard)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amplify Media Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Roca. (Liebowitz, Richard)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amplify Media Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16173774)Document filed by John Roca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roca v. Amplify Media Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roca
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amplify Media Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prometheus Global Media, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Bayard
Represented By: Eric Joel Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?