Liu et al v. Congress
Plaintiff: Lewis Y. Liu and Equal Vote America Corp
Defendant: Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi, Congress, Kevin McCarthy and Charles Schumer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00311
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Extension of time to file CMPlan OK, but I want to conference this case on 4/26/19 at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/5/2019) (mml)
March 5, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (mml)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and Adjournment of Initial Conference addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven J. Kochevar dated 03/04/2019. Document filed by Congress, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi, Charles Schumer.(Kochevar, Steven)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Congress, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi, Charles Schumer. (pc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Congress, Nancy Pelosi, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, and Charles Schumer, re: #9 Amended Complaint, #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Equal Vote America Corp, Lewis Y. Liu. (Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 2/12/2019 (pc). Modified on 2/12/2019 (pc).
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Complaint, #1 Complaint, against Congress, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi, Charles Schumer.Document filed by Lewis Y. Liu, Equal Vote America Corp. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Complaint, #1 Complaint,.(Liu, Yu-Xi)
February 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yu-Xi Liu to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
February 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yu-Xi Liu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nancy Pelosi; Kevin McCarthy; Mitch McConnell; Charles Schumer. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
February 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Liu, Yu-Xi to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Congress, Nancy Pelosi, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, and Charles Schumer, re: #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Equal Vote America Corp. (Liu, Yu-Xi)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Complaint, #1 Complaint, against Congress, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi, Charles Schumer.Document filed by Equal Vote America Corp. Related document: #6 Complaint, #1 Complaint.(Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 2/11/2019 (sj).
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Congress. Document filed by Equal Vote America Corp.(Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 2/11/2019 (sj).
February 8, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Nancy Pelosi, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, Charles Schumer added. Party added pursuant to #6 Complaint, #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Equal Vote America Corp. Related document: #6 Complaint, #1 Complaint,.(Liu, Yu-Xi)
February 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yu-Xi Liu to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. 'As to' Error; Summons may only be requested for parties of record.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
February 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Yu-Xi Liu. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Hon. Nancy Pelosi ; Kevin McCarthy; Mitch McConnell ; Charles Schumer. The party was added to the case in error. (dnh)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/4/2019) (ne)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nancy Pelosi, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, Charles Schumer, and Congress, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lewis Y. Liu. (Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 2/5/2019 (dnh).
February 4, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Lewis Y. Liu added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Lewis Y. Liu. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Liu, Yu-Xi)
January 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yu-Xi Liu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2403; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
January 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Yu-Xi Liu to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption; Nature of Suit code - multiple selections; Jury Demand code - no selection; Office code - no selection; the PDF was not signed or dated by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
January 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yu-Xi Liu to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties Equal Vote America Corp., and, Congress; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yu-Xi Liu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lewis Y. Liu. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
January 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
January 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yu-Xi Liu to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'as to' docket entry text is incorrect; the PDF 'To' section must name the party(ies) whom summons is for;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
January 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 1/14/2019 (jgo).
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lewis Y. Liu, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by LEWIS Y LIU. (Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 1/14/2019 (jgo).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against LEWIS Y LIU. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16175181)Document filed by LEWIS Y LIU.(Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 1/14/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu et al v. Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Y. Liu
Represented By: Yu-Xi Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Vote America Corp
Represented By: Yu-Xi Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Represented By: Steven John Kochevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Represented By: Steven John Kochevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congress
Represented By: Steven John Kochevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCarthy
Represented By: Steven John Kochevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schumer
Represented By: Steven John Kochevar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?