Sagne v. Shirley Express LLC et al
Plaintiff: Soulema Sagne
Defendant: Richard J. Cantos and Shirley Express LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00423
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/5/2019. (ade)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/4/2019) (rro)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Condon McMahon on behalf of Soulema Sagne. (McMahon, Gregory)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schwartz, Bryan)
January 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jared Arthur Turco to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple citizenship of principal parties for the defendant were selected. Choose one. (pc)
January 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jared Arthur Turco. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:1508; Dollar Demand blank; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1441nr; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared Arthur Turco on behalf of Richard J. Cantos, Shirley Express LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service for Notice of Appearance)(Turco, Jared)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Richard J. Cantos, Shirley Express LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service-Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Schwartz, Bryan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Richard J. Cantos, Shirley Express LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service-Jury Demand)(Schwartz, Bryan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schwartz, Bryan) Modified on 1/16/2019 (pc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 155708/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16193655).Document filed by Richard J. Cantos, Shirley Express LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service-Notice of Removal-Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint and Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars and other Discovery Demands, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Response to Combined Demands)(Schwartz, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sagne v. Shirley Express LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Cantos
Represented By: Bryan T. Schwartz
Represented By: Jared Arthur Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Express LLC
Represented By: Bryan T. Schwartz
Represented By: Jared Arthur Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soulema Sagne
Represented By: Gregory Condon McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?