Nachshen v. ESRT 10 Union Square, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Defendant: Panera, LLC and ESRT 10 Union Square, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00632
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of Steven Nachshen. (Hanski, Adam)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric William Ruden on behalf of ESRT 10 Union Square, L.L.C.. (Ruden, Eric)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eve I. Klein on behalf of ESRT 10 Union Square, L.L.C.. (Klein, Eve)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on May 31, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. Pursuant to section 1.C of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, requests to adjourn the IPTC or any other conference must be made in writing at least 48 hours before the scheduled conference. Plaintiffs are encouraged to serve defendants promptly. No later than May 3, 2019, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this case. No later than May 23, 2019, the parties must submit a joint letter of no more than five pages addressing the following in separate paragraphs. Before the date of the IPTC, counsel for each party must (1) register as a filing user in accordance with the Procedures of Electronic Case Filing and (2) file a Notice of Appearance. The Defendant(s)' time to move against or answer the Complaint is stayed until the date of the IPTC, unless otherwise ordered. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/23/2019) (ama)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Panera, LLC. (sj)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ESRT 10 Union Square, L.L.C.. (sj)
January 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ESRT 10 Union Square, L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Panera, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ESRT 10 Union Square, L.L.C., Panera, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16225235)Document filed by Steven Nachshen.(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nachshen v. ESRT 10 Union Square, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panera, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESRT 10 Union Square, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eve I. Klein
Represented By: Eric William Ruden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?