Roberts v. Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Norman Roberts
Defendant: George Malanga, Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc., Spyridon Magoulas, Angeliki N. Frangou, Shunji Sasada and John Stratakis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00655
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Justin J. Santolli in Support re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by Angeliki N. Frangou, George Malanga, Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc., Shunji Sasada, John Stratakis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Navios Form F-4, 12/21/18 (without annexes), #3 Exhibit Navios Schedule TO, 12/21/18, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Designation, Series G Preferred Stock, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Designation, Series H Preferred Stock, #6 Exhibit Navios Prospectus, 2/4/19 (without annexes), #7 Exhibit Navios Amendment No. 2 to Schedule TO, 2/4/19, #8 Exhibit Navios Press Release, 2/4/19, #9 Exhibit Navios Prospectus, 2/19/19 (without annexes), #10 Exhibit Navios Amendment No. 3 to Schedule TO, 2/19/19, #11 Exhibit Navios Press Release, 2/19/19, #12 Exhibit Navios Press Release, 3/4/19, #13 Exhibit Navios Prospectus, 3/4/19 (without annexes), #14 Exhibit Navios Amendment No. 4 to Schedule TO, 3/4/19, #15 Exhibit Navios Schedule TO, 9/19/16, #16 Exhibit Complaint in First Roberts Action, 16-07860, #17 Exhibit Letter in First Roberts Action, 11.28.16, #18 Exhibit Opinion and Order in First Roberts Action, 9.26.17)(David, Israel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by Angeliki N. Frangou, George Malanga, Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc., Shunji Sasada, John Stratakis. (David, Israel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Angeliki N. Frangou, George Malanga, Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc., Shunji Sasada, John Stratakis.(David, Israel)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2019. Post discovery summary judgment motions due by 6/21/2019. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Replies due by 7/22/2019. Deposition due by 6/14/2019. All Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Oral Argument set for 6/21/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 7/29/2019, and as further specified and set forth in this Civil Case Management Plan. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/27/2019). (rjm)
February 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Joseph Santolli on behalf of Angeliki N. Frangou, George Malanga, Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc., Shunji Sasada, John Stratakis. (Santolli, Justin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Israel David on behalf of Angeliki N. Frangou, George Malanga, Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc., Shunji Sasada, John Stratakis. (David, Israel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc..(David, Israel)
February 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/13/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/11/2019) (jwh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Angeliki N. Frangou served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; George Malanga served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc. served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; John Stratakis served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service was accepted by Israel David. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Shunji Sasada served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Service was accepted by Shunji Sasada. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angeliki N. Frangou. (dnh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angeliki N. Frangou, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Malanga. (pc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Stratakis. (pc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc.. (pc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc.. (pc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shunji Sasada. (pc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Spyridon Magoulas. (pc)
January 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
January 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark Lebovitch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
January 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
January 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Lebovitch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Norman Roberts. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
January 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mark Lebovitch to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on the summons does not match what is listed on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spyridon Magoulas, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shunji Sasada, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc. c/o Navios Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc. c/o The Trust Company of the Marshal Islands, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Stratakis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Malanga, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angeliki Frangou, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Norman Roberts. (Lebovitch, Mark) Modified on 1/24/2019 (pc).
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lebovitch, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angeliki N. Frangou, Spyridon Magoulas, George Malanga, Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc., Shunji Sasada, John Stratakis. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16230821)Document filed by Norman Roberts.(Lebovitch, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Roberts
Represented By: Mark Lebovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Malanga
Represented By: Justin Joseph Santolli
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navios Maritime Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Joseph Santolli
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spyridon Magoulas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angeliki N. Frangou
Represented By: Justin Joseph Santolli
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shunji Sasada
Represented By: Justin Joseph Santolli
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stratakis
Represented By: Justin Joseph Santolli
Represented By: Israel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?