Firshein v. UnitedHealth Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Firshein
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00778
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332ni
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Jacqueline Aiello, Esq. dated 3/12/19 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by UnitedHealth Group, Inc..(Aiello, Jacqueline)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION: It is hereby STIPULATED and AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant denominated as UnitedHealth Group, Inc. d.b.a UnitedHealthcare and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) that the time for said Defendant to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until March 13, 2019. No prior extensions of time have been granted. IT IS SO ORDERED. (UnitedHealth Group, Inc. answer due 3/13/2019.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/21/2019) (anc) Modified on 2/22/2019 (anc).
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Marie Aiello on behalf of UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Aiello, Jacqueline)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Aiello, Jacqueline)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. Service was accepted by Kaylee Feiock, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Firshein. (Baldinger, Bruce)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (pne)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UnitedHealth Group, Inc. d.b.a. UnitedHealthCare, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Firshein. (Baldinger, Bruce)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. Document filed by Richard Firshein.(Baldinger, Bruce)
January 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Bruce E. Baldinger to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name error as whom the summons request is for; party name must match exactly as pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
January 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bruce E. Baldinger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 95,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 95,000. (sj)
January 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Bruce E. Baldinger to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
January 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bruce E. Baldinger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Unitedhealth Group, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Firshein. (Baldinger, Bruce) Modified on 1/28/2019 (sj).
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Baldinger, Bruce)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Richard Firshein. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16246846)Document filed by Richard Firshein.(Baldinger, Bruce) Modified on 1/28/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firshein v. UnitedHealth Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Firshein
Represented By: Bruce E. Baldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?