Kiarie v. Dumbstruck, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kihara Kiarie and Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust
Defendant: Jeff Tetrault, Dumbstruck, Inc., Peter Allegretti and Michael Tanski
Case Number: 1:2019cv00827
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Jeff Tetrault, Peter Allegretti, Dumbstruck, Inc., Michael Tanski.(Massaroni, Christopher)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dumbstruck, Inc..(Massaroni, Christopher)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter is hereby extended through and including March 22, 2019. There has been no previous request for an extension of time. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Defendants agree to waive all defenses under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2)(4) and (5), but Defendants expressly preserve all other defenses. SO ORDERED., Peter Allegretti answer due 3/22/2019; Dumbstruck, Inc. answer due 3/22/2019; Michael Tanski answer due 3/22/2019; Jeff Tetrault answer due 3/22/2019., Motions terminated: #18 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Christopher Massaroni dated 2/26/2019. filed by Dumbstruck, Inc., Jeff Tetrault, Michael Tanski, Peter Allegretti. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/27/2019) (rj)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Christopher Massaroni dated 2/26/2019. Document filed by Peter Allegretti, Dumbstruck, Inc., Michael Tanski, Jeff Tetrault. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation Extending Time to Answer)(Massaroni, Christopher)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Massaroni on behalf of Peter Allegretti, Dumbstruck, Inc., Michael Tanski, Jeff Tetrault. (Massaroni, Christopher)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Dumbstruck, Inc. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. Service was made by Secretary of State. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie; Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust. (Heller, Maurice)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Peter Allegretti served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. Service was accepted by Peter Allegretti. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie; Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust. (Heller, Maurice)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Michael Tanski served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. Service was accepted by Michael Tanski. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie; Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust. (Heller, Maurice)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Jeff Tetrault served on 2/10/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. Service was accepted by Jeff Tetrault. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie; Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust. (Heller, Maurice)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Peter Allegretti served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. Service was made by Nail and Mail. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie; Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust. (Heller, Maurice)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Michael Tanski served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. Service was made by Nail and Mail. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie; Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust. (Heller, Maurice)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Heller, Maurice)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeff Tetrault. (sj)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Tanski. (sj)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Allegretti. (sj)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dumbstruck, Inc.. (sj)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Maurice W. Heller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 1,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Maurice W. Heller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kihara Kiarie. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Maurice W. Heller re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF (Kihara Kiarie must be added again in their addition capacity). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeff Tetrault, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie. (Heller, Maurice)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Tanski, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie. (Heller, Maurice)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter Allegretti, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie. (Heller, Maurice)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dumbstruck, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kihara Kiarie. (Heller, Maurice)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Heller, Maurice)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Peter Allegretti, Dumbstruck, Inc., Michael Tanski, Jeff Tetrault. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16254869)Document filed by Kihara Kiarie.(Heller, Maurice) Modified on 1/29/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiarie v. Dumbstruck, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Tetrault
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dumbstruck, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Allegretti
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tanski
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kihara Kiarie
Represented By: Maurice W. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kihara Kiarie, as trustee of the Kihara Kiarie Revocable Trust
Represented By: Maurice W. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?