Rosario v. Reynolds et al

Plaintiff: YESENIA ROSARIO
Defendant: Isaac Reynolds and Music Express, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00833
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E532210018384 on 3/27/2019. (kv)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter filed by Yesenia Rosario. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court is directed to remand this case to the New York State Supreme Court, Bronx County. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/26/2019) (kv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file her response no later than March 28, 2019. If Plaintiff does not file her response by March 28, 2019, the Court will consider the motion fully briefed. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 3/28/2019.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/25/2019) (kv)
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Shanna Bailey, Esq. dated March 26, 2019 re: Motion to Remand. Document filed by Yesenia Rosario.(Bailey, Shanna)
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIRMATION of Maria Ciccia in Opposition re: #11 MOTION to Remand . MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Music Express, Inc., Isaac Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Leff, Richard)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #11 MOTION to Remand . MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Music Express, Inc., Isaac Reynolds. (Leff, Richard)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #11 MOTION to Remand . MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Isaac Reynolds. (Cook, Kerryann)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. On February 25, 2019, Plaintiff filed a motion to remand. Dkt. No. 11. Defendants' response was due March 11, 2019. See Local Civil Rule 6.1. To date, the Court has not received a response from Defendants. Accordingly, Defendants shall file their response no later than March 15, 2019. If Defendants do not file a response by March 15, 2019, the Court will consider the motion fully briefed. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 3/15/2019) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/12/2019) (rjm)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Notice (Other) filed by Music Express, Inc., Isaac Reynolds. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Kerryann Marie Cook terminated. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/28/2019) (kv)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Music Express, Inc., Isaac Reynolds. (Leff, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Remand ., MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Yesenia Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Police Report, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Answer)(Bailey, Shanna) Modified on 3/15/2019 (db).
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shanna Bailey on behalf of Yesenia Rosario. (Bailey, Shanna)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, June 28, 2019 at 3:30pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/11/2019) (kv)
February 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
February 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
February 11, 2019 Transmission to Case Assignment Clerk. Transmitted re: #2 Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order,,,,, to the Case Assignment Clerk for preparation of notice of case assignment/reassignment. (gp)
February 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Eric Leff. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Yesenia Rosario. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps and party role was entered incorrectly. (gp)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court of the City of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 34064/2018..Document filed by Music Express, Inc., Isaac Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Affidavit)(Leff, Richard)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Leff, Richard)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Kerryann Marie Cook. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
February 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kerryann Marie Cook to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct ((the Civil Cover Sheet was attached instead of the Notice of Removal)). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Music Express, Inc., Isaac Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE)(Leff, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Music Express, Inc., Isaac Reynolds.(Leff, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO REOPEN CASE: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order (15-MC-131):. The deficiency(ies) has been cured and the party(ies) seek to reopen the civil case. (Leff, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court of the City of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 34064/2018E..Document filed by Music Express, Inc., Isaac Reynolds.(Leff, Richard) Modified on 2/8/2019 (gp).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 4/8/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (gp)
February 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
February 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (gp)
January 31, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Music Express, Inc., Isaac Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE)(Cook, Kerryann)
January 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kerryann Marie Cook to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 2/4/2019. (sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario v. Reynolds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Reynolds
Represented By: Richard Eric Leff
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Music Express, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Eric Leff
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YESENIA ROSARIO
Represented By: Shanna Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?