Haddad et al v. Zimmer Inc et al
Plaintiff: Louis Haddad, Jr. and Debra Haddad
Defendant: Zimmer Inc. and Zimmer Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00900
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER NO. 6 PLAINTIFFS' EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE AND PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE AUTHORITY, DUTIES AND RESPONSIBILITIES: In Order No. 2, the Court appointed the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee ("PEC") and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee ("PSC"). This Order defines the authority, duties, and responsibilities of the members of the PEC and PSC. Specific guidelines and rules for staffing, fees, expenses, and billing records is governed by Proposed Order No. 5 regarding Management of Timekeeping, Cost Reimbursement, and Related Common Benefit Issues. Nothing in this Order shall be interpreted to affect any proceedings other than those involving the authorities, duties, responsibilities, guidelines, and rules of and for plaintiffs' counsel, as discussed herein, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al. (mml)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER NO. 5 MANAGEMENT OF TIMEKEEPING, COST REIMBURSEMENT AND RELATEDCOMMON BENEFIT ISSUES: The Court hereby adopts the following guidelines for (a) tasks performed for the common benefit of all plaintiffs ("Common Benefit Work") and (b) time expended, or expenses incurred, in performing Common Benefit Work ("Common Benefit Expenses"), which shall be compensated from the Common Benefit Fund ONLY in accordance with the rules set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al. (mml)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER NO. 4 WEBSITE ORDER: Counsel need to ensure that the Website is compatible with the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system in place in this court. The Website should contain appropriate linkages to information available through the ECF system. Counsel may recommend, by motion, that a portion of the Website be accessible only to counsel for Plaintiffs, counsel for Defendants, or both. Any limitations, however, should be restricted to (1) matters that represent the work product of attorneys for Plaintiffs or Defendants and are not otherwise available to other persons, and (2) matters that are confidential under a protective order issued by this Court. The Website should be established so that it is compatible with most communications software, with a view toward making it publicly available. Counsel are expected to use computers to prepare documents sent to the clerk or to chambers and to provide electronic versions of all documents, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al. (mml)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER NO. 3 MASTER SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2019. Fact Discovery due by 11/22/2019. Discovery due by 8/16/2019. Deadline for Zimmer Defendants to produce all discovery previously produced relating to the M/L Taper Hip Prosthesis or M/L Taper Hip Prosthesis with Kinectiv Technology and Versys Femoral Head as one certified MDL production: 4/29/2019. This off-the-record background tutorial regarding the products and science relevant to this litigation will take place following the next Case Management Conference on Wednesday, March 27, 2019, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al. (mml)
January 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
January 30, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
January 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
January 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
January 30, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
January 30, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Connecticut; Case Number: 3:18-cv-02102. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Southern District of New York. (signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the MDL Panel on 1/22/19.) (Barry, Donna) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Zimmer Inc waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019 filed by Debra Haddad; Louis Haddad, Jr. (Cates, Brittany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019 filed by Debra Haddad; Louis Haddad, Jr. (Cates, Brittany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany S. Cates on behalf of Debra Haddad, Louis Haddad, Jr (Cates, Brittany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel Thomas Faxon* *Faxon Law Group, LLC* *59 Elm St.* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Pesta, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Louis Haddad Signed by Clerk on 12/21/18.(Pesta, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/21/18.(Pesta, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/21/18.(Pesta, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2019 Discovery due by 6/22/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2019 Signed by Clerk on 12/21/18.(Pesta, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Walker, A) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc. n/k/a Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc.. (Faxon, Joel) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Holdings, Inc. n/k/a Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5096366.), filed by Louis Haddad.(Faxon, Joel) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haddad et al v. Zimmer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Haddad, Jr.
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Represented By: Brittany Sarah Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Haddad
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Represented By: Brittany Sarah Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?