Crews v. Caraballo et al

Plaintiff: Nicole Crews
Defendant: Julio Caraballo and Central Laundry Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01030
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446mv
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Except for amendments permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1) and this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases ("Individual Rules"), amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 7/5/2019. Depositions due by 7/10/2019. Expert Discovery due by 8/20/2019. Motions due by 9/20/2019. The joint pretrial order shall be due 30 days from the close of discovery, or if any dispositive motion is filed, 21 days from the Courts decision on such motion. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 4 to 6 days. Status Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/14/2019) (anc)
March 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/12/2019. (Court Reporter Tom Murray) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. In the order scheduling the initial pretrial conference in this matter, the parties were directed to submit a joint letter via ECF and to email a joint proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order to Chambers. The Court has received the parties' joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan via ECF, however the parties have not submitted the Case Management Plan by email as directed. The parties are directed to email their joint proposed Case Management Plan to Chambers forthwith. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on March 7, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Chad P. Ayoub, Esq. dated March 5, 2019 re: Jointly Submitted Initial Status Correspondence. Document filed by Nicole Crews.(Ayoub, Chad)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Nicole Crews. (Ayoub, Chad)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chad Peter Ayoub on behalf of Nicole Crews. (Ayoub, Chad)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Notice of Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Document filed by Julio Caraballo, Central Laundry Service, Inc.. (Toker, Matthew)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/7/2019) (anc)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Julio Caraballo, Central Laundry Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Toker, Matthew)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Order with Notice of Entry. Document filed by Julio Caraballo, Central Laundry Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Toker, Matthew)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Bronx County on February 1, 2018. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than February 15, 2019. Additionally, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Defendants are directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/5/2019) (mro)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Toker, Matthew)
February 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Isaac Toker. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 75,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 75,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Matthew Isaac Toker to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 20426-2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16283151).Document filed by Central Laundry Service, Inc., Julio Caraballo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civl Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Toker, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crews v. Caraballo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Caraballo
Represented By: Matthew Isaac Toker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Laundry Service, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Isaac Toker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Crews
Represented By: Chad Peter Ayoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?