Baker v. Weber et al
Plaintiff: Tanisia N Baker
Defendant: Carl Weber, Urban Books LLC, Vickie Stringer, Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC, Kensington Publishing Corporation, Vickie Stringer Agency LLC and Urban Books Media LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01093
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys of record for all parties who have appeared in this action, that the time for defendant KENSINGTON PUBLISHING CORPORATION to answer, move or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint in this action, filed on February 6, 2019, is extended through and including April 26, 2019. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and electronic or facsimile signatures shall be treated as originals. SO ORDERED. (Kensington Publishing Corporation answer due 4/26/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/26/2019) (rro)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Kensington Publishing Corporation. (Lane, John)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kensington Publishing Corporation.(Lane, John)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Mark Lane on behalf of Kensington Publishing Corporation. (Lane, John)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Francelina Maria Perdomo on behalf of Tanisia N Baker. (Perdomo, Francelina)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,,,, served. Kensington Publishing Corporation served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. Service was accepted by Barbara M. Bennett. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Process Server)(Perdomo, Francelina)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER to #5 Complaint,,,,,,., CROSSCLAIM against Vickie Stringer(as an officer of Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC), Vickie Stringer(individually), Vickie Stringer Agency LLC, Vickie Stringer Agency LLC, Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC. Document filed by Carl Weber(as officer of Urban Books Media LLC), Urban Books LLC, Carl Weber(a resident of New York, as officer of Urban Books, LLC), Carl Weber(a resident of New York, individually), Urban Books Media LLC.(Lane, John)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Urban Books LLC, Urban Books Media LLC, Carl Weber(as officer of Urban Books Media LLC), Carl Weber(a resident of New York, individually), Carl Weber(a resident of New York, as officer of Urban Books, LLC).(Lane, John)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Mark Lane on behalf of Urban Books LLC, Urban Books Media LLC, Carl Weber(as officer of Urban Books Media LLC), Carl Weber(a resident of New York, individually), Carl Weber(a resident of New York, as officer of Urban Books, LLC). (Lane, John)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Urban Books LLC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fedex Delivery Confirmation)(Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Urban Books Media LLC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fedex Delivery Confirmation)(Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Carl Weber(as officer of Urban Books Media LLC) served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019; Carl Weber(as officer of Kensington Publishing Corporation) served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019; Carl Weber(a resident of New York, individually) served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019; Carl Weber(a resident of New York, as officer of Urban Books, LLC) served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fedex Delivery Confirmation)(Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kensington Publishing Corporation. (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kensington Publishing Corporation, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl Weber. (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC. (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vickie Stringer Agency LLC. (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vickie Stringer(individually). (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl Weber(a resident of New York, individually). (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Urban Books LLC. (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Urban Books Media LLC. (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; The defendant name reflected on the PDF must exactly match the party of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Vickie Stringer. The party was added to the case in error. (dnh)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Vickie Stringer ; Vickie Stringer ; Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC ; Carl Weber ;Carl Weber ; Carl Weber. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vickie Stringer Agency LLC, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vickie Stringer, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carl Weber, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kensington Publishing Corporation, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta) Modified on 2/7/2019 (dnh).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Urban Books LLC, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Urban Books Media LLC, re: #5 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kensington Publishing Corporation, Vickie Stringer, Vickie Stringer(as an officer of Vickie Stringer Agency LLC), Vickie Stringer(as an officer of Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC), Vickie Stringer(individually), Urban Books LLC, Urban Books Media LLC, Vickie Stringer Agency LLC, Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC, Carl Weber(as an officer of Urban Books Media LLC), Carl Weber(as an officer of Kensington Publishing Corporation), Carl Weber(individually), Carl Weber. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Declaration, #2 Exhibit Urban Books LLC, #3 Exhibit Urban Books Media LLC, #4 Exhibit Kensington Publishing, #5 Exhibit VS Publishing LLC, #6 Exhibit VS Agency LLC, #7 Exhibit Triple Crown Publication Dissolution, #8 Exhibit Triple Crown Production, #9 Exhibit Copyright registration Sheisty, #10 Exhibit Copyright registration Still Sheisty, #11 Exhibit Works Assignment, #12 Exhibit 09-08-2018 Letter Weber, #13 Exhibit Licensing Agreement, #14 Exhibit 09-18-2018 Letter Weber, #15 Exhibit Demand AAA, #16 Exhibit Emai VS out of print dissolution, #17 Exhibit Email VS Agreement terminated, #18 Exhibit AAA decision, #19 Affidavit Declaration T N Baker, #20 Exhibit Publishing Agreement, #21 Exhibit 2009 Royalties payment, #22 Exhibit IRS lien, #23 Exhibit 10-10-2011 Termination Letter, #24 Exhibit 10-09-2011-TCP Letter, #25 Exhibit 12-14-2014 email VS to TNB, #26 Exhibit FB message to Weber, #27 Exhibit Demand AAA, #28 Exhibit Stringer Admission Email)(Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carl Weber, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova on behalf of Tanisia N Baker. (Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet)(Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 17:101;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2201;. (jgo)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties, Carl Weber with party text 'individually', Urban Books LLC, Urban Books Media, LLC, Kesington Publishing Corporation, and, Vickie Stringer with party text 'individually'; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tanisia N Baker; Carl Weber; Urban Books LLC; Urban Books Media LLC; Kensington Publishing Corporation; Vickie Stringer; Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC; Vickie Stringer Agency LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Kensington Publishing Corporation, Vickie Stringer, Urban Books LLC, Urban Books Media LLC, Vickie Stringer Agency LLC, Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC, Carl Weber, Carl Weber, Carl Weber, Carl Weber, Vickie Stringer, Vickie Stringer, Vickie Stringer added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,.Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,.(Tarpanova, Antoaneta)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kensington Publishing Corporation, Vickie Stringer, Urban Books LLC, Urban Books Media LLC, Vickie Stringer Agency LLC, Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC, Carl Weber. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16296645)Document filed by Tanisia N Baker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Declaration, #2 Exhibit Urban Books LLC, #3 Exhibit Urban Books Media LLC, #4 Exhibit Kensington Publishing, #5 Exhibit VS Publishing LLC, #6 Exhibit VS Agency LLC, #7 Exhibit Triple Crown Publication Dissolution, #8 Exhibit Triple Crown Production, #9 Exhibit Copyright registration Sheisty, #10 Exhibit Copyright registration Still Sheisty, #11 Exhibit Works Assignment, #12 Exhibit 09-08-2018 Letter Weber, #13 Exhibit Licensing Agreement, #14 Exhibit 09-18-2018 Letter Weber, #15 Exhibit Demand AAA, #16 Exhibit Emai VS out of print dissolution, #17 Exhibit Email VS Agreement terminated, #18 Exhibit AAA decision, #19 Affidavit Declaration T N Baker, #20 Exhibit Publishing Agreement, #21 Exhibit 2009 Royalties payment, #22 Exhibit IRS lien, #23 Exhibit 10-10-2011 Termination Letter, #24 Exhibit 10-09-2011-TCP Letter, #25 Exhibit 12-14-2014 email VS to TNB, #26 Exhibit FB message to Weber, #27 Exhibit Demand AAA, #28 Exhibit Stringer Admission Email)(Tarpanova, Antoaneta) Modified on 2/6/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Weber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Weber
Represented By: John Mark Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Books LLC
Represented By: John Mark Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Stringer Publishing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kensington Publishing Corporation
Represented By: John Mark Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Stringer Agency LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Books Media LLC
Represented By: John Mark Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanisia N Baker
Represented By: Antoaneta Velitchkova Tarpanova
Represented By: Francelina Maria Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?