Giurca v. Orange Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Dan Giurca
Defendant: Dr. Richard Wang, Dr. Ulrick Vieux, MBA Jerry Dunlavey, Garnet Health, formerly known as, Greater Hudson Valley Health System, Orange Regional Medical Center, Garnet Health, Drs. Ulrick Vieux, Dr. Gerard Galarneau and Jerry Dunlavey
Case Number: 1:2019cv01096
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIRMATION of Joseph A. Saccomano, Jr. in Support re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by Jerry Dunlavey, Gerard Galarneau, Garnet Health, Orange Regional Medical Center, Ulrick Vieux, Richard Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Saccomano, Joseph)
March 22, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by Jerry Dunlavey, Gerard Galarneau, Garnet Health, Orange Regional Medical Center, Ulrick Vieux, Richard Wang. (Saccomano, Joseph)
March 22, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Jerry Dunlavey, Gerard Galarneau, Garnet Health, Orange Regional Medical Center, Ulrick Vieux, Richard Wang.(Saccomano, Joseph)
March 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arin Mossovitz Liebman on behalf of Richard Wang. (Liebman, Arin)
March 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Saccomano, Jr on behalf of Richard Wang. (Saccomano, Joseph)
March 21, 2019 NOTICE of RECORD. The Court left a telephone message for Joseph A. Saccomano, Jr. informing him that pursuant to the Individual Practices of Judge Louis L. Stanton, a pre-motion conference is not required before making a motion to dismiss in lieu of an answer.(Notice of record entered on ECF by direction of Judge Stanton's Chambers on 3/21/19.)(Landers, Rigoberto)
March 20, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Joseph A. Saccomano, Jr. dated March 20, 2019. Document filed by Jerry Dunlavey, Gerard Galarneau, Garnet Health, Orange Regional Medical Center, Ulrick Vieux.(Saccomano, Joseph)
March 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arin Mossovitz Liebman on behalf of Jerry Dunlavey, Gerard Galarneau, Garnet Health, Orange Regional Medical Center, Ulrick Vieux. (Liebman, Arin)
March 19, 2019 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Garnet Health.(Saccomano, Joseph)
March 19, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Orange Regional Medical Center.(Saccomano, Joseph)
March 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Saccomano, Jr on behalf of Jerry Dunlavey, Gerard Galarneau, Garnet Health, Orange Regional Medical Center, Ulrick Vieux. (Saccomano, Joseph)
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gerard Galarneau. (pc)
February 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Wayne Sadowski to RE-FILE Document No. #18 Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 Request for Issuance of Summons, #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; These parties were already previously issued summonses. If you require a new summons, you may request an amended summons. Please include the word "amended" in front of "summons in a civil action". Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Wayne Sadowski to RE-FILE re: Document No. #19 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court's leave has not been granted. You will need permission from Chambers in order to file an corrected Amended Complaint. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (pc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #13 Amended Complaint, against Jerry Dunlavey, Gerard Galarneau, Garnet Health, Orange Regional Medical Center, Ulrick Vieux with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dan Giurca. Related document: #13 Amended Complaint,.(Sadowski, Robert) Modified on 2/14/2019 (pc).
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Ulrick Vieux, re: #13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert) Modified on 2/14/2019 (pc).
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Orange Regional Medical Center, re: #13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert) Modified on 2/14/2019 (pc).
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Garnet Health, re: #13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert) Modified on 2/14/2019 (pc).
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gerard Galarneau, re: #13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jerry Dunlavey, re: #13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert) Modified on 2/14/2019 (pc).
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Jerry Dunlavey, Garnet Health, Orange Regional Medical Center, Ulrick Vieux, Gerard Galarneau with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dan Giurca. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Sadowski, Robert)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Wang. (pc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Garnet Health. (pc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ulrick Vieux. (pc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Orange Regional Medical Center. (pc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jerry Dunlavey. (pc)
February 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
February 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
February 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Wayne Sadowski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
February 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Wayne Sadowski. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Garnet Health, formerly known as, Greater Hudson Valley Health System. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sadowski, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Richard Wang, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Ulrick Vieux, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Orange Regional Medical Center, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Garnet Health, formerly known as, Greater Hudson Valley Health System, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jerry Dunlavey, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jerry Dunlavey, Garnet Health, formerly known as, Greater Hudson Valley Health System, Orange Regional Medical Center, Ulrick Vieux, Richard Wang. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16297775)Document filed by Dan Giurca.(Sadowski, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giurca v. Orange Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Wang
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Saccomano, Jr
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ulrick Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBA Jerry Dunlavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garnet Health, formerly known as, Greater Hudson Valley Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Saccomano, Jr
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garnet Health
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Saccomano, Jr
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drs. Ulrick Vieux
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Saccomano, Jr
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gerard Galarneau
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Saccomano, Jr
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Dunlavey
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Saccomano, Jr
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Dan Giurca
Represented By: Robert Wayne Sadowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?