Martinez v. Acar Leasing Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Marrtinez and Crystal Martinez
Defendant: Acar Leasing of Maryland, Edward Short and Acar Leasing Ltd
Case Number: 1:2019cv01144
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332au
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/5/2019) (kv)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The March 14 initial conference is adjourned to April 10, 2019, at 10:10 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 10:10 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on March 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Peter Baron, Esq. dated March 13, 2019. Document filed by Crystal Martinez. Return Date set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM.(Baron, Peter)
March 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Scheduling Notice - In view of the stipulated discontinuance of the ACAR defendants, the March 14 conference will instead proceed as an initial conference with the remaining parties. (jar)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ACAR LEASING LTD.: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for plaintiff Crystal Martinez and defendant ACAR Leasing Ltd. a/k/a ACAR Leasing of Maryland, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued without prejudice as to defendants, ACAR LEASING LTD. and ACAR LEASING OF MARYLAND, without costs to either party as against the other; the parties agree to bear their own costs and fees, including attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that ACAR Leasing Ltd. and ACAR Leasing of Maryland shall be deleted from the caption and the caption shall be amended to reflect same. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, this stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. SO ORDERED. Acar Leasing Ltd and Acar Leasing of Maryland terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/11/2019) (kv)
March 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #13 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Edgardo Ramos for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Acar Leasing of Maryland, Acar Leasing Ltd and without costs. Document filed by Acar Leasing of Maryland, Acar Leasing Ltd. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff..(Wolff, Brandon)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Crystal Martinez and without costs. Document filed by Acar Leasing of Maryland, Acar Leasing Ltd. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff..(Wolff, Brandon)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re: #9 Proposed Order for Substitution of Attorney filed by Crystal Martinez, Attorney Peter D. Baron for Crystal Martinez added. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/7/2019) (kv)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent General Motors Financial Company, Inc., Corporate Parent GM Financial, Corporate Parent AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. Dba GM Financial for Acar Leasing Ltd, Acar Leasing of Maryland. Document filed by Acar Leasing Ltd, Acar Leasing of Maryland.(Wolff, Brandon)
March 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Brandon Lee Wolff to RE-FILE Document #7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Crystal Martinez. (Baron, Peter)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Letter filed by Acar Leasing of Maryland, Acar Leasing Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: A pre-motion conference will be held on March 14, 2019 at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 619, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York. Plaintiff may respond by March 7, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/4/2019) (kv)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate General Motors Financial Company, Inc., Other Affiliate General Motor Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. Dba GM Financial for Acar Leasing Ltd, Acar Leasing of Maryland. Document filed by Acar Leasing Ltd, Acar Leasing of Maryland.(Wolff, Brandon) Modified on 3/6/2019 (ldi).
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brandon L. Wolff dated March 1, 2019 re: Pre Motion Notice. Document filed by Acar Leasing Ltd, Acar Leasing of Maryland.(Wolff, Brandon)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Lee Wolff on behalf of Acar Leasing Ltd, Acar Leasing of Maryland. (Wolff, Brandon)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Edward Short (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Service of Jury Demand)(Cotignola, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael N Cotignola. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 2,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 2,000,000. (sj)
February 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael N Cotignola. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Crystal Martinez. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cotignola, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Edward Short.(Cotignola, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 26703/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16305190).Document filed by Edward Short. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer of Acar Leasing, #3 Exhibit Answer of Edward Short, #4 Exhibit CPLR 3017(c) Demand for Amount of Damages Claimed, #5 Exhibit Order of State Court filed 02/05/19, #6 Exhibit Response to CPLR 3017(c) Demand, #7 Exhibit Emails of Counsel for Acar Leasing)(Cotignola, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Acar Leasing Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acar Leasing of Maryland
Represented By: Brandon Lee Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Short
Represented By: Michael N Cotignola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acar Leasing Ltd
Represented By: Brandon Lee Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Marrtinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Martinez
Represented By: Peter D. Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?