United States of America v. Cuello et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Jonathan Orbe, Arismendy Cuello and Noel Cuello
Case Number: 1:2019cv01148
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7407
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/26/2019) (rro)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Noel Cuello. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arismendy Cuello. (dnh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Orbe. (dnh)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Noel Cuello, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Bergman, Jacob)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arismendy Cuello, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Bergman, Jacob)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Orbe, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Bergman, Jacob)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bergman, Jacob)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Arismendy Cuello, Noel Cuello, Jonathan Orbe. Document filed by United States of America.(Bergman, Jacob)
February 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jacob Max Bergman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jacob Max Bergman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
February 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacob Max Bergman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
February 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jacob Max Bergman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arismendy Cuello, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bergman, Jacob) Modified on 2/7/2019 (sj).
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Noel Cuello, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bergman, Jacob) Modified on 2/7/2019 (sj).
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Orbe, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bergman, Jacob) Modified on 2/7/2019 (sj).
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Bergman, Jacob) Modified on 2/7/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cuello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Orbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arismendy Cuello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Cuello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jacob Max Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?