Juscinska v. Park Stone Venture ltd et al

Plaintiff: Natalia Juscinska
Defendant: Moddc Venture llc and Park Stone Venture ltd
Case Number: 1:2019cv01218
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. All filing deadlines and conference dates are adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/28/2019) (cf)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer complaint by a 30 day dismissal order addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Adam I. Kleinberg dated March 28, 2019. Document filed by Moddc Venture llc, Park Stone Venture ltd.(Kleinberg, Adam)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the parties in the above-captioned action, that defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended up to and including March 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Moddc Venture llc answer due 3/29/2019; Park Stone Venture ltd answer due 3/29/2019. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/28/2019) (kv)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Moddc Venture llc, Park Stone Venture ltd. (Kleinberg, Adam)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Moddc Venture llc served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019; Park Stone Venture ltd served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. Service was accepted by secretary of state. Document filed by Natalia Juscinska. (Sekendiz, Ismail)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam I. Kleinberg on behalf of Moddc Venture llc, Park Stone Venture ltd. (Kleinberg, Adam)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Moddc Venture llc, Park Stone Venture ltd. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sekendiz, Ismail)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PARK STONE VENTURE LTD. and MODDC VENTURE LLC,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Natalia Juscinska. (Sekendiz, Ismail)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Moddc Venture llc, Park Stone Venture ltd. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16315388)Document filed by Natalia Juscinska.(Sekendiz, Ismail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juscinska v. Park Stone Venture ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Juscinska
Represented By: Ismail Sinan Sekendiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moddc Venture llc
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Stone Venture ltd
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?