Buzzfeed, Inc. v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Plaintiff: Buzzfeed, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv01219
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Upon consideration of the MOTION FOR NABIHA SYED TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL FOR BUZZFEED, INC., it is this 18th day of March 2019, hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Nabiha Syed terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/18/2019) (mro)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Bretz, Emily)
March 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2019. Argument is set for July 2, 2019 at 4:00pm. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/5/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Upon consideration of the CONSENT MOTION FOR MATTHEW L. SCHAFER TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL FOR BUZZFEED, INC., it is this 3rd day of March 2019, hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. (Attorney Matthew Lynn Schafer terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/3/2019) (jwh)
March 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Elizabeth Bretz on behalf of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Bretz, Emily)
February 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/25/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Adam Chase on behalf of Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Chase, Jeremy)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service on U.S. Attorney - SDNY, #2 Exhibit Service on U.S. Attorney General, #3 Exhibit Service on U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services)(Schafer, Matthew)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/11/2019) (jwh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Lynn Schafer on behalf of Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Schafer, Matthew)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate NBCUniversal Media LLC for Buzzfeed, Inc.. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc..(Syed, Nabiha)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Syed, Nabiha)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Syed, Nabiha)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16315479)Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment, #3 Exhibit C - Expedited Processing)(Syed, Nabiha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buzzfeed, Inc. v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buzzfeed, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Lynn Schafer
Represented By: Nabiha Syed
Represented By: Jeremy Adam Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?